« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Kay, Treena
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Lori N Daybell - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
F
Attorney
Per, Pro
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2021-001704-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Lori N Daybell
Crime Date
7/11/2019
Date
4/22/2025
Description
MURDER 1ST DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1105A (F1)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2025
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2025
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2025
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/25/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEALED JURY QUESTIONNAIRES
Filing Date
4/24/2025
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/24/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/2025
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/2025
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1
Filing Date
4/22/2025
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/2025
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/2025
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL/HEARING WORKSHEET
Filing Date
4/22/2025
Description
JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/2025
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/22/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/21/2025
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/21/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/21/2025
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Filing Date
4/18/2025
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
COURT TV
Filing Date
4/18/2025
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2025
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/16/2025
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/16/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/16/2025
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/16/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/14/2025
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMAIL
Filing Date
4/12/2025
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
State Third Motion to Preclude Defendant Witnesses
Filing Date
4/12/2025
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION IN LIMINE RE: QUESTIONING
POLICE
Filing Date
4/11/2025
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
MIL RE: TESTIMONY OF VIDEO
OBSERVED BY JANIS COX AND SUMMER
SHIFLET
Filing Date
4/11/2025
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/11/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2025
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
State Of Arizona vs. Daybell;
Filing Date
4/10/2025
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2025
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2025
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2025
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
State Of Arizona vs. Daybell;
Filing Date
4/9/2025
Description
AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
State Of Arizona vs. Daybell;
Filing Date
4/9/2025
Description
AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
State Of Arizona vs. Daybell;
Filing Date
4/9/2025
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/9/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/8/2025
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/9/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
State Of Arizona vs. Daybell;
Filing Date
4/8/2025
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/9/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
State Of Arizona vs. Daybell;
Filing Date
4/8/2025
Description
AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/9/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
State Of Arizona vs. Daybell;
Filing Date
4/8/2025
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION FOR RELEASE OF EVIDENCE ITEM CH-131035-1
Filing Date
4/8/2025
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/7/2025
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO DISCLOSE EXCULPATORY EVIDENCE AND PROSECUTORIAL MISCONDUCT
Filing Date
4/7/2025
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/25/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2025
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/4/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/3/2025
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/3/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/1/2025
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Filing Date
3/28/2025
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/7/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL/IN SUPPORT OF NATE EATONS EMERGENCY MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
3/28/2025
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/31/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
State Supplemental Motion to Preclude Defense Witnesses and Expert
Filing Date
3/28/2025
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/31/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
Defendant's Response to States Request for Rule 609 Hearing
Filing Date
3/27/2025
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2025
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE MEDIA
FROM DISPLAYING OR DISLOSING
PHONE NUMBERS AND EMAIL FOR
WITNESSES AND VICTIMS
Filing Date
3/26/2025
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
NATE EATON'S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
3/26/2025
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Compliance
Filing Date
3/26/2025
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
Response to States Motion to Preclude Defense Expert Lonnie Dworkin and Preclude Noticed Witnesses
Filing Date
3/26/2025
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/26/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/2025
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/26/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2025
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/31/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2025
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION
TO DISMISS FOR VIOLATION OF
CONFIDENTIAL COMMUNICATION AND
THE SIXTH AMENDMENT
Filing Date
3/23/2025
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/24/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO DISCLOSE ALL 404(b)
EVIDENCE
Filing Date
3/23/2025
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/24/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR
PROSECUTORIAL MISCONDUCT
Filing Date
3/23/2025
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/24/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION
TO EXCLUDE STATE WITNESSES
Filing Date
3/23/2025
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/24/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S AMENDED FINAL TRIAL
MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
STATEMENT
Filing Date
3/21/2025
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/24/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR PROSECUTORIAL MISCONDUCT
Filing Date
3/21/2025
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE STATE WILL USE TRIAL PAD TO
DISPLAY EXHIBITS
Filing Date
3/20/2025
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/24/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
NOTICE OF OBJECTION TO JURY QUESTIONNAIRE
Filing Date
3/20/2025
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2025
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
NON-PARTY MARICOPA COUNTY SHERIFF OFFICE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR DEFENDANT TO HAVE REMOVED RESTRAINTS IN TRIAL
Filing Date
3/19/2025
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY SHERIFF JERRY SHERIDAN’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO APPEAR IN CIVILIAN CLOTHES
Filing Date
3/18/2025
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR VIOLATION OF CONFIDENTIAL COMMUNICATION AND THE SIXTH AMENDMENT
Filing Date
3/18/2025
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXCLUDE STATE WITNESSES
Filing Date
3/18/2025
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DEFENDANT TO HAVE REMOVED RESTRAINTS IN TRIAL
Filing Date
3/18/2025
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DEFENDANT TO WEAR CIVILIAN CLOTHING AT TRIAL
Filing Date
3/18/2025
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISCLOSE ALL 404(B) EVIDENCE
Filing Date
3/17/2025
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/26/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/17/2025
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/26/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/17/2025
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/26/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/16/2025
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/17/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE DEFENSE
EXPERT LONNIE DWORKIN AND
PRECLUDE NOTICED WITNESSES
Filing Date
3/16/2025
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/17/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF
RULE 15.7 REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS
Filing Date
3/16/2025
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH
DISCLOSURE OF JANUARY 31, 2019
RECORDINGS
Filing Date
3/14/2025
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/2025
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S FINAL TRIAL MANAGEMENT
CONFERENCE PRETRIAL STATEMENT
Filing Date
3/12/2025
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
Defendants Supplemental Rule 15.2 Notice of Defenses and Disclosure
Filing Date
3/10/2025
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/11/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION IN LIMINE: TO PRECLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY
OF DANIEL COONS #258
Filing Date
3/10/2025
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/11/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST TO HOLD TRIAL IN
SOUTH COURT TOWER COURTROOM
Filing Date
3/9/2025
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/11/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
3/6/2025
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENTAL
RULE 15.2 NOTICE OF DEFENSES
AND DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
3/6/2025
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
3/3/2025
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO
STATE’S MOTION IN LIMINE RE: ALEX
COX STATEMENTS
Filing Date
3/3/2025
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
Response to States Motion in Limine Re: Alex Cox Statements
Filing Date
2/27/2025
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/26/2025
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/26/2025
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2025
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
2/25/2025
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
2/22/2025
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/24/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO
STATE’S MOTION IN LIMINE RE: TYLEE
RYAN HEARSAY STATEMENTS
Filing Date
2/21/2025
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/24/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION IN LIMINE RE: TYLEE RYAN HEARSAY STATEMENTS
Filing Date
2/16/2025
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/18/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION IN LIMINE RE: TYLEE RYAN
HEARSAY STATEMENTS
Filing Date
2/13/2025
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
Reply to State's Response to Motion to Dismiss CR2021-001704-001 and CR2022-001242-001 for Violation of Speedy Trial Act
Filing Date
2/10/2025
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/11/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION
TO DISMISS FOR VIOLATION OF SPEEDY
TRIAL ACT
Filing Date
2/6/2025
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/7/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
2/4/2025
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
Motion to Dismiss CR2021-001704-001 and CR2022-001242-001 for Violation of Speedy Trial Act
Filing Date
2/3/2025
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/4/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUR-REPLY TO DEFENDANT’S REPLY TO
STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR
SPECIFIC DISCOVERY (DR 19-1804
RECORDED INTERVIEW)
Filing Date
2/3/2025
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/5/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE
TO MOTION FOR SPECIFIC
DISCOVERY
(DR 19-1804 RECORDED
INTERVIEW)
Filing Date
1/31/2025
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/4/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S OBJECTIONS TO COURT T.V.’S MEDIA REQUEST FOR TRIAL
Filing Date
1/29/2025
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
1/29/2025
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Maricopa County Sheriffs Response to Motion Ordering MCSO to Update System
Filing Date
1/28/2025
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
Reply to States Response to Motion for Specific Discovery (Communications)
Filing Date
1/28/2025
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUESTED LIMITATIONS RE:
COURT TV MEDIA REQUEST
Filing Date
1/21/2025
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
Motion Ordering M.C.S.O. to Update S.H.I.E.L.D. System to Reflect Judges January 10, 2025, Name Change Order
Filing Date
1/17/2025
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/22/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SPECIFIC
DISCOVERY (Communications)
Filing Date
1/14/2025
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/14/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/14/2025
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/17/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS CR-2022-001242-001 FOR LACK OF SPEEDY TRIAL
Filing Date
1/13/2025
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/13/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/10/2025
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/21/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR SPECIFIC DISCOVERY
Filing Date
1/10/2025
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/15/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR SPECIFIC DISCOVERY
Filing Date
1/8/2025
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/8/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/5/2025
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/7/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO
ORDER STATE OF ARIZONA TO PRODUCE
DISCOVERY OF EXTRADITION
Filing Date
12/19/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY SHERIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ORDER MARICOPA COUNTY SHERIFF [SIC] OFFICE DEFENDANT'S RECORDS
Filing Date
12/19/2024
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF
TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO ORDER STATE OF ARIZONA
TO PRODUCE DISCOVERY OF
EXTRADITION
Filing Date
12/16/2024
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/18/2024
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO ORDER STATE OF ARIZONA TO PRODUCE DISCOVERY OF EXTRADITION
Filing Date
12/16/2024
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/18/2024
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO ORDER MARICOPA COUNTY SHERIFF OFFICE DEFENDANTS RECORDS
Filing Date
12/12/2024
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/9/2024
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/9/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF RIGHT TO COUNSEL AND WAIVER
Filing Date
12/6/2024
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/10/2024
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATES RESPONSE MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY
Filing Date
12/6/2024
Description
123 - ME: Mental Exam Def Competent - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/6/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/5/2024
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/5/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/4/2024
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/27/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/27/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/22/2024
Description
122 - ME: Mental Exam Experts Appt - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/21/2024
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/20/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/20/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO WITHDDRAW PRIOR COUNSEL'S MOTION FOR RULE II EVALUATION
Filing Date
11/19/2024
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/2024
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2024
Description
RDM - Response to Defendant’s Motion for Discovery - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
COMPEL DISCOVERY
Filing Date
11/13/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
motion to waive defendant appearance
Filing Date
11/13/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2024
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2024
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2024
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2024
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/2024
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/6/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2024
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/31/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WITHDRAW RULE 11 EVALUATION REQUEST
Filing Date
10/25/2024
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 11 ORDER OF APPOINTMENT
Filing Date
10/24/2024
Description
906 - ME: Response/Reply Times Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2024
Description
120 - ME: Hrg/Motion/Rule 11 Exam - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2024
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/28/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY SHERIFF RUSSELL SKINNER'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ORDERO MCSO TO ALLOW ACCESS TO A LAPTOP FOR DISCOVERY REVIEW
Filing Date
10/22/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO MCSO RUSSELL SKINNER'S OBJECTION TO MOTION TO ORDER MCSO TO ALLOW ACCESS TO A LAPTOP FOR DISCOVERY REVIEW
Filing Date
10/22/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR A FULL RULE 11 EVALUATION
Filing Date
10/21/2024
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2024
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO WAIVE COUNSEL
Filing Date
10/21/2024
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2024
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO WAIVE COUNSEL
Filing Date
10/21/2024
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Withdrawal
Filing Date
10/17/2024
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO
RESPOND TO DEFENSE MOTION TO
COMPEL DISCOVERY
Filing Date
10/17/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY
(TURNDOWN MATERIAL)
Filing Date
10/9/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DEFENSE MOTION FOR RULE 11 EVALUATION
Filing Date
10/7/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL
THE REPLY TO MCSO RUSSELL
SKINNER’S OBJECTION TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO ORDER
MCSO TO ALLOW ACCESS TO A
LAPTOP FOR DISCOVERY REVIEW
Filing Date
10/1/2024
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing Document under Seal
Filing Date
9/30/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2024
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/2/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO STATE'S MOTION FOR DEFENSE TO COMPLY WITH RULE 15.4(e)
Filing Date
9/27/2024
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/25/2024
Description
AVL - Avowal - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
AVOWAL
Filing Date
9/25/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/24/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO ORDER MCSO TO ALLOW ACCESS TO A LAPTOP FOR DISCOVERY REVIEW
Filing Date
9/24/2024
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION FOR DEFENSE TO
COMPLY WITH RULE 15.4{e)
Filing Date
9/17/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO ORDER MCSO TO ALLOW ACCESS TO A LAPTOP FOR DISCOVERY REVIEW
Filing Date
9/10/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO CAMERA COVERAGE AND PHOTOGRAPHY FOR SEPTEMBER 6, 2024 COURT HEARING
Filing Date
9/5/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO CAMERA COVERAGE AND PHOTOGRAPHY FOR SEPTEMBER 6, 2024, COURT HEARING
Filing Date
9/5/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/4/2024
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/4/2024
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/3/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT
TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
8/29/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/29/2024
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/21/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR COURT REPORTER
Filing Date
8/19/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO
DISCLOSE “NO BILL” GRAND JURY
TRANSCRIPTS
Filing Date
8/19/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WAIVE APPEARANCE FOR SEPTEMBER 6, 2024, HEARING
Filing Date
8/15/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION
Filing Date
8/14/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PROVIDE NOTICE AND TIME TO OBJECT IF A REQUEST FOR COURT CAMERA FOOTAGE (“FTR”) IS MADE BEFORE DISCLOSING IT TO BE BROADCAST
Filing Date
8/14/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISCLOSE “NO BILL”
GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPTS
Filing Date
8/14/2024
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/7/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/7/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/2/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE ALL MEDIA REQUESTS INTO THE RECORD
Filing Date
7/15/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION
Filing Date
7/9/2024
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO MCSO OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO APPEAR IN CIVILIAN CLOTHES AT ALL FUTURE HEARINGS WHERE THE MEDIA WILL BROADCAST FOOTAGE
Filing Date
7/8/2024
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY SHERIFF ‘S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO APPEAR IN CIVILIAN CLOTHES AT ALL FUTURE HEARINGS WHERE THE MEDIA WILL BROADCAST FOOTAGE
Filing Date
7/3/2024
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/3/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/3/2024
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/3/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/2/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
OBJECTION TO CAMERA COVERAGE AND PHOTOGRAPHY FOR JULY 2, 2024, COURT HEARING
Filing Date
7/2/2024
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/28/2024
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT
TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
6/27/2024
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/2/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/26/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO ALLOW THE DEFENDANT TO APPEAR IN CIVILIAN CLOTHES AT ALL FUTURE HEARINGS WHERE THE MEDIA WILL BROADCAST FOOTAGE
Filing Date
6/26/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DEFENDANT’S OBJECTION TO CAMERA COVERAGE AND PHOTOGRAPHY FOR JULY 2, 2024, COURT HEARING
Filing Date
6/21/2024
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
6/18/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO ORDER MEDIA TO COMPLY WITH ARIZONA SUPREME COURT RULE 122 BEFORE BROADCASTING COURT FOOTAGE VIDEO
Filing Date
6/18/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO ORDER MEDIA TO
COMPLY WITH ARIZONA
SUPREME COURT RULE 122
BEFORE BROADCASTING COURT
FOOTAGE VIDEO
Filing Date
6/13/2024
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2024
Description
AVL - Avowal - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
AVOWAL
Filing Date
6/6/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/6/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/6/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER TO CORRECT MINUTE ENTRY REGARDING DEFENSE MOTION AT JUNE 5, 2024 COURT HEARING
Filing Date
6/6/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
6/2/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
5/10/2024
Description
AVL - Avowal - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Avowal
Filing Date
4/25/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT
TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
4/17/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
4/16/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT THE DEFENSE COUNSEL RESTRICT DISSEMINATION OF THE PROTECTED INFORMATION CONTAINED WITHIN
Filing Date
2/22/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/16/2024
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT
REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
HEARING DATE: February 21, 2024
Filing Date
1/24/2024
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2024
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2024
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2024
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2024
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE TO DEFENDANT
Filing Date
1/17/2024
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/2024
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2024
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2024
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
1/16/2024
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
STATEMENT
Filing Date
1/16/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RULE 15.2
NOTICE OF DEFENSES
AND DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
1/16/2024
Description
AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE
OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE
SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. §
13-703 OR A.R.S. § 13-704
Filing Date
1/16/2024
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR
RULE 609 HEARING
Filing Date
1/16/2024
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING
CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
1/12/2024
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/12/2024
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/12/2024
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
1/11/2024
Description
RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF
TIME TO CHALLENGE THE
GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
1/4/2024
Description
590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/3/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
THIS MATTER BE DESIGNATED COMPLEX, PURSUANT TO RULE 8.2 (A) (3) OF THE ARIZONA RULES OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE, AND IN COMPLIANCE MARICOPA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-127. A NEW LAST DAY SHALL BE CALCULATED ACCORDINGLY.
Filing Date
12/22/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR COMPLEX CASE
DESIGNATION IN CR2021-001704-001 AND
CR2022-001242-001
Filing Date
12/19/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESTRICT DISSEMINATION OF PROTECTED INFORMATION
Filing Date
12/15/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER
Filing Date
12/8/2023
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/2023
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
12/7/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/18/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
12/4/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Motion for Protective Order with Exhibits
Filing Date
12/3/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER
Filing Date
12/1/2023
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/30/2023
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
11/30/2023
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
2/2/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION
Filing Date
2/2/2023
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ALLOWING STATE TO DISCLOSE INDICTMENTS
Filing Date
2/2/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO FILE STATE'S MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO DISCLOSE INDICTMENTS UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
7/2/2021
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/2/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/28/2021
Description
WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
FILED FOR EXTRADITION PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
6/24/2021
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/24/2021
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/24/2021
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
11/30/2023
Time
2:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
12/7/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
1/18/2024
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
2/21/2024
Time
8:20
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/21/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
3/28/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
4/4/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/24/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/5/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/1/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/2/2024
Time
8:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
7/2/2024
Time
8:20
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/25/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/1/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/6/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/24/2024
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/6/2024
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/14/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
11/20/2024
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/5/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
12/6/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/10/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/10/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/24/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/11/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/18/2025
Time
8:15
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/31/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/1/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/2/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/3/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/7/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/8/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/9/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/10/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/14/2025
Time
10:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/15/2025
Time
10:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/16/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/17/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/21/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/22/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/23/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/24/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/30/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/1/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/5/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/6/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/7/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/8/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/12/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/13/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/14/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/15/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/30/2025
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference