« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Hogard, Brittany
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Yaaliyah E Jackson - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Glover, Todd
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2020-126163-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Yaaliyah E Jackson 
Crime Date
7/3/2020
Date
Description
AGGRAVATED ASSAULT
ARSCode
13-1204 (F5)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/24/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/24/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/16/2020
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/16/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/16/2020
Description
OOR - Order Of Release - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/16/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
9/16/2020
Description
OOR - Order Of Release - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/16/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
8/24/2020
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/2020
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/12/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Filing Date
8/12/2020
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/14/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/2020
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/23/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTED
Filing Date
7/16/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/20/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
Filing Date
7/14/2020
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/16/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
HEARING
Filing Date
7/14/2020
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE WITH PROPOSED ORDER
Filing Date
7/14/2020
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/16/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PROPOSED ORDER
Filing Date
7/13/2020
Description
MTT - Motion To Transfer - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/14/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE TO JUVENILE COURT
Filing Date
7/7/2020
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/8/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
7/7/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/8/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
INVOCATION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS
Filing Date
7/6/2020
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/6/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
7/6/2020
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/6/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
7/5/2020
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/6/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/5/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/6/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF CHRONIC FELONY OFFENDER STATUS
Filing Date
7/5/2020
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/6/2020
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
7/10/2020
Time
9:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/14/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
7/20/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
8/12/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/17/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
9/10/2020
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/14/2020
Time
13:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing