« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Hogard, Brittany
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Yaaliyah E Jackson - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Glover, Todd
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2020-115390-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Yaaliyah E Jackson 
Crime Date
4/10/2020
Date
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - AGGRAVATED ASSAULT
ARSCode
13-1204 (F5)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/15/2020
Description
592 - ME: Transfer/Remand To Juvenile - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/15/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/15/2020
Description
OOR - Order Of Release - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/17/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/24/2020
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/18/2020
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/18/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2020
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/18/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO TRANSFER
Filing Date
8/17/2020
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/2020
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/14/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/2020
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/14/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/2020
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/14/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND APPOINTING SUCCESSOR COUNSEL
Filing Date
8/12/2020
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/14/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND APPOINTING SUCCESSOR COUNSEL
Filing Date
8/12/2020
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/12/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
8/6/2020
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/7/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Filing Date
7/23/2020
Description
RAD - Request For Automatic Additional Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/24/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR AUTOMATIC DISCLOSURE REQUIRED BY RULE 15.1(a) and (b) AND REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DISCLOSURE REQUIRED BY RULE 15.1(c)
Filing Date
7/23/2020
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
7/23/2020
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR SPECIFIC ITEMS OF EVIDENCE
Filing Date
7/16/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/20/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
Filing Date
7/13/2020
Description
MTT - Motion To Transfer - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/14/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE TO JUVENILE COURT
Filing Date
7/8/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/8/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/8/2020
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/8/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/8/2020
Description
161 - ME: Guilty Plea Set Aside - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/8/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/8/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/10/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE OF DEFENDANT’S DCS RECORDS AND PROPOSED ORDER
Filing Date
7/1/2020
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/2/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue and Motion to Transport With Proposed Order
Filing Date
6/26/2020
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/1/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO TRANSPORT DEFENDANT
Filing Date
6/22/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/22/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO TRANSPORT DEFENDANT FROM ADJC TO MARICOPA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT FOR HEARING
Filing Date
6/8/2020
Description
102 - ME: Waiver Prelim Hrg/Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/1/2020
Description
WWP - Waiver With a Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/9/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/1/2020
Description
INF - Information - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/1/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
INFORMATION
Filing Date
5/1/2020
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/1/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/16/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF CHRONIC FELONY OFFENDER STATUS
Filing Date
4/15/2020
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
4/15/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
INVOCATION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS
Filing Date
4/14/2020
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/14/2020
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/14/2020
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
4/14/2020
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
5/1/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
6/1/2020
Time
13:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
6/1/2020
Time
13:31
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
7/1/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Acceptance Of Plea/Snt
Date
7/1/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
7/1/2020
Time
8:31
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
8/10/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/12/2020
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
9/10/2020
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
9/10/2020
Time
11:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/21/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/28/2020
Time
8:00
Event
Trial