« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Mediate, Carmine
Judge
Case #
Party Name
William Henry Grewell - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Collins, Ernest
Judge
Garfinkel
Case #
CR2019-113599-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
William Henry Grewell 
Crime Date
1/1/2014
Date
4/10/2019
Description
FRAUDULENT SCHEMES/ARTIFICES
ARSCode
13-2310 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
William Henry Grewell 
Crime Date
1/1/2014
Date
4/10/2019
Description
DEPT REV-FAIL TO PAY TAX
ARSCode
42-1127B1 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
William Henry Grewell 
Crime Date
1/11/2015
Date
4/10/2019
Description
DEPT REV-PREPARE N RETURN
ARSCode
42-1127B2 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
William Henry Grewell 
Crime Date
1/16/2016
Date
4/10/2019
Description
DEPT REV-PREPARE N RETURN
ARSCode
42-1127B2 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
William Henry Grewell 
Crime Date
3/30/2017
Date
4/10/2019
Description
DEPT REV-PREPARE N RETURN
ARSCode
42-1127B2 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
William Henry Grewell 
Crime Date
1/11/2018
Date
4/10/2019
Description
DEPT REV-PREPARE N RETURN
ARSCode
42-1127B2 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
William Henry Grewell 
Crime Date
1/1/2014
Date
3/18/2022
Description
FRAUDULENT SCHEMES/ARTIFICES
ARSCode
13-2310 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
William Henry Grewell 
Crime Date
1/1/2014
Date
3/18/2022
Description
DEPT REV-FAIL TO PAY TAX
ARSCode
42-1127B1 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
William Henry Grewell 
Crime Date
1/11/2015
Date
3/18/2022
Description
DEPT REV-PREPARE N RETURN
ARSCode
42-1127B2 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
William Henry Grewell 
Crime Date
1/16/2015
Date
3/18/2022
Description
DEPT REV-PREPARE N RETURN
ARSCode
42-1127B2 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
William Henry Grewell 
Crime Date
3/30/2017
Date
3/18/2022
Description
DEPT REV-PREPARE N RETURN
ARSCode
42-1127B2 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
William Henry Grewell 
Crime Date
1/11/2018
Date
3/18/2022
Description
DEPT REV-PREPARE N RETURN
ARSCode
42-1127B2 (F5)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
William Henry Grewell 
Crime Date
2/25/2019
Date
3/18/2022
Description
DEPT REV-PREPARE N RETURN
ARSCode
42-1127B2 (F5)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2024
Description
ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
2/7/2024
Description
ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
10/13/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/10/2023
Description
MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/11/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
9/21/2023
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TERMINATE PROBATION
Filing Date
8/31/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Terminate Probation
Filing Date
7/21/2023
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/2023
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT STIPULATION AS TO RESTITUTION
Filing Date
7/20/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/31/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESTITUTION
Filing Date
7/18/2023
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT STIPULATION AS TO RESTITUTION
Filing Date
7/14/2023
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2023
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2023
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2023
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue Restitution Hearing
Filing Date
3/7/2023
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2023
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
2/21/2023
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/2023
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNEL OF RECORD FOR DEFENDANT WILLIAM HENRY GREWELL
Filing Date
1/23/2023
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF RESTITUTION
Filing Date
12/5/2022
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/5/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2022
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE States Motion for Restitution Hearing
Filing Date
11/2/2022
Description
MFH - Motion For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Motion for Restitution Hearing
Filing Date
6/2/2022
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/6/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/2022
Description
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation
Filing Date
5/18/2022
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
5/18/2022
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
5/18/2022
Description
TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms and Conditions of Probation
Filing Date
5/18/2022
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
5/18/2022
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
3/31/2022
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/31/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ALLOW TRAVEL
Filing Date
3/23/2022
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRAVEL (UNOPPOSED)
Filing Date
3/21/2022
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/2022
Description
331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/2022
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLEA AGREEMENT
Filing Date
3/9/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/3/2022
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/3/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/2/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE FINAL TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE
Filing Date
2/28/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO REFER THIS CASE BACK TO COMMISSIONER MONICA GARFINKEL FOR FURTHER SETTLEMENT PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
2/16/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/16/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/20/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATUS UPDATE
Filing Date
12/10/2021
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/10/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/2021
Description
SFC - Stipulation For Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO CONTINUE FIRM TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE
Filing Date
11/18/2021
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/18/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/5/2021
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/5/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/2/2021
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/2/2021
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO CONTINUE FIRM TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE
Filing Date
10/13/2021
Description
331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/13/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/6/2021
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/6/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2021
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2021
Description
SFC - Stipulation For Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO CONTINUE FIRM TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE AND PERMIT THE PARTIES TO SET A CHANGE OF PLEA BEFORE THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE JUDGE
Filing Date
9/20/2021
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/16/2021
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Settlement Info
Filing Date
9/15/2021
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
9/1/2021
Description
SFC - Stipulation For Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/2/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
stipulation TO CONTINUE COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, FIRM TRIAL management CONFERENCE, AND TRIAL SETTING
Filing Date
8/6/2021
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/6/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/2/2021
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/4/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE FIRM TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE
Filing Date
6/2/2021
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/26/2021
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/27/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE FIRM TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE
Filing Date
5/26/2021
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/27/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DECLARATION OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
3/18/2021
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/15/2021
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to continue Firm Trial Management Conference and Trial Date
Filing Date
1/22/2021
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/22/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2021
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/19/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Parties Stipulation to Continue Firm Trial Management Conference and Trial Date
Filing Date
11/23/2020
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/23/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2020
Description
SFC - Stipulation For Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/18/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
PARTIES’ STIPULATION TO CONTINUE FIRM TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE
Filing Date
9/17/2020
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/17/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/15/2020
Description
SFC - Stipulation For Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/15/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Parties Stipulation to Continue Firm Trial Management Conference and Trial Date
Filing Date
9/4/2020
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/4/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Supplemental Disclosure Notice Pursuant to Ariz. R. Crim. P. 15.6
Filing Date
7/23/2020
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/23/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/8/2020
Description
SFC - Stipulation For Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/10/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Parties Stipulation to Continue Firm Trial Management Conference and Trial Date
Filing Date
5/6/2020
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/6/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2020
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/1/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Motion to Continue Firm Trial Management Conference and Trial Date
Filing Date
1/21/2020
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/21/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/14/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/15/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
THIRD JOINT COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
12/30/2019
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/30/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Second Supplemental Disclosure
Filing Date
12/19/2019
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/19/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/17/2019
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/18/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SECOND JOINT COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
10/31/2019
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/31/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2019
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/28/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Motion to Continue Complex Case Management Conference
Filing Date
9/5/2019
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF RULE 38 (D) CONSENT TO LAW STUDENT APPEARING FOR THE STATE
Filing Date
8/30/2019
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/30/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/26/2019
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/26/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO MOTION TO RELEASE SEIZED PERSONAL PROPERTY
Filing Date
8/23/2019
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/26/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
FIRST JOINT COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
8/20/2019
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to States Response to Defendants Motion to Release seized electronic devices
Filing Date
8/20/2019
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Response To Motion To Release Seized Personal Property
Filing Date
7/31/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO RELEASE SEIZED PERSONAL PROPERTY
Filing Date
7/1/2019
Description
590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/1/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2019
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/2/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
States First Supplemental Disclosure
Filing Date
6/20/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/21/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Designate as Complex
Filing Date
6/11/2019
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2019
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/11/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/10/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2019
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/10/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/6/2019
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/10/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/6/2019
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/11/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/6/2019
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/11/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/31/2019
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/31/2019
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Substitution of Counsel with Clients consent
Filing Date
5/28/2019
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/29/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Extension of Time
Filing Date
5/24/2019
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/28/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF DEFENSES WITNESSES EVIDENCE AND REQUEST FOR REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
5/22/2019
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure
Filing Date
5/3/2019
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/9/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/2019
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/22/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2019
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
4/19/2019
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2019
Description
ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supervised Release
Filing Date
4/18/2019
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS REQUEST TO SUBMIT FOR RULING ON THE MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
4/10/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Motion to Modify Release Conditions
Filing Date
4/9/2019
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2019
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/9/2019
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/9/2019
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2019
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/9/2019
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2019
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/29/2019
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/1/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
3/28/2019
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2019
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/29/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
3/28/2019
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/29/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2019
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/29/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
4/10/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/16/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
4/16/2019
Time
8:45
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
4/19/2019
Time
16:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
5/28/2019
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
6/12/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
6/26/2019
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
8/28/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/5/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/12/2019
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/29/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/17/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/16/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/13/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/20/2020
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
5/14/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/21/2020
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/13/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/15/2020
Time
9:5
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/20/2020
Time
10:31
Event
Trial
Date
9/17/2020
Time
10:15
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/23/2020
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
11/18/2020
Time
9:40
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/3/2020
Time
11:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/20/2021
Time
10:50
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/4/2021
Time
11:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/18/2021
Time
10:40
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
4/1/2021
Time
11:00
Event
Trial
Date
5/25/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/10/2021
Time
11:00
Event
Trial
Date
8/3/2021
Time
9:10
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/17/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/15/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/16/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
9/16/2021
Time
16:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
9/28/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
9/28/2021
Time
16:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
10/4/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/19/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
11/4/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/4/2021
Time
9:15
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/17/2021
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/18/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
12/8/2021
Time
8:35
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/6/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/25/2022
Time
8:50
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/8/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/7/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/11/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
3/18/2022
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/22/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
5/18/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Acceptance Of Plea/Snt
Date
12/1/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Restitution Hearing
Date
2/13/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Restitution Hearing
Date
3/6/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/6/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Restitution Hearing
Date
5/8/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Restitution Hearing
Date
7/10/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Restitution Hearing
Date
7/14/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Restitution Hearing