« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
County Attorney, T R L Central Valley
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Lamont Payne - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Public Defender-, Ccc
Judge
Phillips
Case #
CR2019-001865-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Lamont Payne
Crime Date
10/31/2018
Date
5/16/2019
Description
AGG ASLT-PUBLIC DEFENDER
ARSCode
13-1204A8I (F6)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2019
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/26/2019
Description
DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/29/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/23/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/23/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/22/2019
Description
DHI - Dispo: Revoke/prison - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DHI - Disposition Order - Imprisonment
Filing Date
7/19/2019
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/19/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Monetary Orders
Filing Date
7/19/2019
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/19/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Right of Review
Filing Date
7/19/2019
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/19/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
7/19/2019
Description
PVR - Probation Violation Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/19/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROBATION VIOLATION REPORT
Filing Date
7/15/2019
Description
112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/16/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
WAIVE COUNSEL
Filing Date
7/8/2019
Description
PRW = Petition To Revoke Probation - Warrantless Arrest - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/8/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1
Filing Date
7/5/2019
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
7/5/2019
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/8/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
7/2/2019
Description
RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/3/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request to Establish Start Date
Filing Date
6/13/2019
Description
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation
Filing Date
6/12/2019
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
6/12/2019
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/12/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
6/12/2019
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Right of Review
Filing Date
6/12/2019
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
6/12/2019
Description
OOR - Order Of Release - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Release
Filing Date
5/21/2019
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/21/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/2019
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/20/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2019
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO WAIVE COUNSEL
Filing Date
4/19/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/22/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO WAIVE COUNSEL
Filing Date
4/18/2019
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2019
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/8/2019
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2019
Description
173 - ME: Arraignment Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2019
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
$2500
Filing Date
3/28/2019
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2019
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
03/27/2019
Filing Date
3/28/2019
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
3/28/2019
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
3/26/2019
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2019
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/26/2019
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2019
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/26/2019
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2019
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
3/28/2019
Time
2:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
4/4/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
4/4/2019
Time
15:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
4/12/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Arraignment Hearing
Date
5/14/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/16/2019
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
5/16/2019
Time
13:45
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
5/24/2019
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
6/12/2019
Time
8:29
Event
Sentencing
Date
6/18/2019
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
6/24/2019
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
7/5/2019
Time
8:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
7/11/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing
Date
7/11/2019
Time
8:31
Event
Disposition Hearing
Date
7/19/2019
Time
8:29
Event
Disposition Hearing