« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Alleman, Paula
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Casimiro Sanchez-Cruz - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Public Defender-, Ccc
Judge
Kemp
Case #
CR2017-146942-001
Party Name
Luis Miguel Madrid-Suazo - (3)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
LEGAL DEFENDER'S OFFICE,
Judge
Kemp
Case #
CR2017-146942-002
Party Name
Isauro Abraham Quinones-Quinones - (4)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Iacob, Anca
Judge
Kemp
Case #
CR2017-146942-003
Party Name
Jose Renieri Anariba-Perez - (5)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Gagic, Vladimir
Judge
Kemp
Case #
CR2017-146942-004
Party Name
Carlos Mauricio Sierra-Rodriguez - (6)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Mitchell, Tyrone
Judge
Kemp
Case #
CR2017-146942-005
Party Name
Erik Bermudez-Lopez - (7)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Kemp
Case #
CR2017-146942-006
Party Name
Mario Humberto Acosta-Portillo - (8)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Atkins, W
Judge
Kemp
Case #
CR2017-146942-007
Party Name
Jose Ramon Bacasegua-Valenzuela - (9)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
LEATHERS, MATTHEW
Judge
Kemp
Case #
CR2017-146942-008
Party Name
Jose Raudales-Avila - (10)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Godley, Davina
Judge
Kemp
Case #
CR2017-146942-009
Disposition Information
Party Name
Casimiro Sanchez-Cruz
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
10/24/2017
Description
CONSPIRACY
ARSCode
13-1003 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Casimiro Sanchez-Cruz
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
10/24/2017
Description
ILLEGAL CONTROL OF ENTERPRISE
ARSCode
13-2312B (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Casimiro Sanchez-Cruz
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
10/24/2017
Description
MARIJUANA VIOLATION
ARSCode
13-3405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Luis Miguel Madrid-Suazo
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
10/24/2017
Description
CONSPIRACY
ARSCode
13-1003 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Luis Miguel Madrid-Suazo
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
10/24/2017
Description
ILLEGAL CONTROL OF ENTERPRISE
ARSCode
13-2312B (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Luis Miguel Madrid-Suazo
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
10/24/2017
Description
MARIJUANA VIOLATION
ARSCode
13-3405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Isauro Abraham Quinones-Quinones
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
10/24/2017
Description
CONSPIRACY
ARSCode
13-1003 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Isauro Abraham Quinones-Quinones
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
10/24/2017
Description
ILLEGAL CONTROL OF ENTERPRISE
ARSCode
13-2312B (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Isauro Abraham Quinones-Quinones
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
10/24/2017
Description
MARIJUANA VIOLATION
ARSCode
13-3405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Jose Renieri Anariba-Perez
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
10/24/2017
Description
CONSPIRACY
ARSCode
13-1003 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Jose Renieri Anariba-Perez
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
10/24/2017
Description
ILLEGAL CONTROL OF ENTERPRISE
ARSCode
13-2312B (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Jose Renieri Anariba-Perez
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
10/24/2017
Description
MARIJUANA VIOLATION
ARSCode
13-3405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Carlos Mauricio Sierra-Rodriguez
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
10/24/2017
Description
CONSPIRACY
ARSCode
13-1003 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Carlos Mauricio Sierra-Rodriguez
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
10/24/2017
Description
ILLEGAL CONTROL OF ENTERPRISE
ARSCode
13-2312B (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Carlos Mauricio Sierra-Rodriguez
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
10/24/2017
Description
MARIJUANA VIOLATION
ARSCode
13-3405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Erik Bermudez-Lopez
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
10/24/2017
Description
CONSPIRACY
ARSCode
13-1003 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Erik Bermudez-Lopez
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
10/24/2017
Description
ILLEGAL CONTROL OF ENTERPRISE
ARSCode
13-2312B (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Erik Bermudez-Lopez
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
10/24/2017
Description
MARIJUANA VIOLATION
ARSCode
13-3405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Mario Humberto Acosta-Portillo
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
10/24/2017
Description
CONSPIRACY
ARSCode
13-1003 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Mario Humberto Acosta-Portillo
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
10/24/2017
Description
ILLEGAL CONTROL OF ENTERPRISE
ARSCode
13-2312B (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Mario Humberto Acosta-Portillo
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
10/24/2017
Description
MARIJUANA VIOLATION
ARSCode
13-3405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Jose Ramon Bacasegua-Valenzuela
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
10/24/2017
Description
CONSPIRACY
ARSCode
13-1003 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Jose Ramon Bacasegua-Valenzuela
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
10/24/2017
Description
ILLEGAL CONTROL OF ENTERPRISE
ARSCode
13-2312B (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Jose Ramon Bacasegua-Valenzuela
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
10/24/2017
Description
MARIJUANA VIOLATION
ARSCode
13-3405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Jose Raudales-Avila
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
10/24/2017
Description
CONSPIRACY
ARSCode
13-1003 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Jose Raudales-Avila
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
10/24/2017
Description
ILLEGAL CONTROL OF ENTERPRISE
ARSCode
13-2312B (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Jose Raudales-Avila
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
10/24/2017
Description
MARIJUANA VIOLATION
ARSCode
13-3405 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Casimiro Sanchez-Cruz
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
1/11/2018
Description
CONSPIRACY
ARSCode
13-1003 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Casimiro Sanchez-Cruz
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
1/11/2018
Description
ILLEGAL CONTROL OF ENTERPRISE
ARSCode
13-2312B (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Casimiro Sanchez-Cruz
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
1/11/2018
Description
MARIJUANA-POSSESS FOR SALE
ARSCode
13-3405A2 (F6)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Luis Miguel Madrid-Suazo
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
12/13/2017
Description
CONSPIRACY
ARSCode
13-1003 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Luis Miguel Madrid-Suazo
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
12/13/2017
Description
ILLEGAL CONTROL OF ENTERPRISE
ARSCode
13-2312B (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Luis Miguel Madrid-Suazo
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
12/13/2017
Description
MARIJUANA-POSSESS FOR SALE
ARSCode
13-3405A2 (F6)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Isauro Abraham Quinones-Quinones
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
12/27/2017
Description
CONSPIRACY
ARSCode
13-1003 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Isauro Abraham Quinones-Quinones
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
12/27/2017
Description
ILLEGAL CONTROL OF ENTERPRISE
ARSCode
13-2312B (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Isauro Abraham Quinones-Quinones
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
12/27/2017
Description
MARIJUANA-POSSESS FOR SALE
ARSCode
13-3405A2 (F6)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Jose Renieri Anariba-Perez
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
1/11/2018
Description
CONSPIRACY
ARSCode
13-1003 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Jose Renieri Anariba-Perez
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
1/11/2018
Description
ILLEGAL CONTROL OF ENTERPRISE
ARSCode
13-2312B (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Jose Renieri Anariba-Perez
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
1/11/2018
Description
MARIJUANA-POSSESS FOR SALE
ARSCode
13-3405A2 (F6)
Disposition Code
Pled No Contest
Disposition
Pled No Contest
Party Name
Carlos Mauricio Sierra-Rodriguez
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
1/25/2018
Description
CONSPIRACY
ARSCode
13-1003 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Carlos Mauricio Sierra-Rodriguez
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
1/25/2018
Description
ILLEGAL CONTROL OF ENTERPRISE
ARSCode
13-2312B (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Carlos Mauricio Sierra-Rodriguez
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
1/25/2018
Description
MARIJ-TRANSPORT AND/OR SELL
ARSCode
13-3405A4 (F6)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Erik Bermudez-Lopez
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
12/13/2017
Description
CONSPIRACY
ARSCode
13-1003 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Erik Bermudez-Lopez
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
12/13/2017
Description
ILLEGAL CONTROL OF ENTERPRISE
ARSCode
13-2312B (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Erik Bermudez-Lopez
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
12/13/2017
Description
MARIJUANA-POSSESS FOR SALE
ARSCode
13-3405A2 (F6)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Mario Humberto Acosta-Portillo
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
1/17/2018
Description
CONSPIRACY
ARSCode
13-1003 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Mario Humberto Acosta-Portillo
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
1/17/2018
Description
ILLEGAL CONTROL OF ENTERPRISE
ARSCode
13-2312B (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Mario Humberto Acosta-Portillo
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
1/17/2018
Description
MARIJUANA-POSSESS FOR SALE
ARSCode
13-3405A2 (F6)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Jose Ramon Bacasegua-Valenzuela
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
1/25/2018
Description
CONSPIRACY
ARSCode
13-1003 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Jose Ramon Bacasegua-Valenzuela
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
1/25/2018
Description
ILLEGAL CONTROL OF ENTERPRISE
ARSCode
13-2312B (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Jose Ramon Bacasegua-Valenzuela
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
1/25/2018
Description
MARIJ-TRANSPORT AND/OR SELL
ARSCode
13-3405A4 (F6)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Jose Raudales-Avila
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
12/13/2017
Description
CONSPIRACY
ARSCode
13-1003 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Jose Raudales-Avila
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
12/13/2017
Description
ILLEGAL CONTROL OF ENTERPRISE
ARSCode
13-2312B (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Jose Raudales-Avila
Crime Date
10/10/2017
Date
12/13/2017
Description
MARIJUANA-POSSESS FOR SALE
ARSCode
13-3405A2 (F6)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/23/2020
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (007)
Docket Date
7/24/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/8/2019
Description
049 - ME: Judgment Signed - Party (007)
Docket Date
8/8/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/7/2019
Description
CRR - Criminal Restitution Order - Party (007)
Docket Date
8/30/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2018
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/27/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2018
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/27/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/2018
Description
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/12/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration
Filing Date
2/12/2018
Description
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/12/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration
Filing Date
2/8/2018
Description
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/8/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration
Filing Date
2/8/2018
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/9/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 3/Monetary Orders
Filing Date
2/8/2018
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/9/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
2/8/2018
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/9/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Right of Review
Filing Date
2/8/2018
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (008)
Docket Date
2/9/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Right of Review
Filing Date
2/8/2018
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/9/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
2/8/2018
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (005)
Docket Date
2/9/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Monetary Orders
Filing Date
2/8/2018
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (004)
Docket Date
2/9/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2018
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/9/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2018
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/7/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Monetary Orders
Filing Date
2/7/2018
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/7/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Right of Review
Filing Date
2/7/2018
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (007)
Docket Date
2/8/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
1/30/2018
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (006)
Docket Date
1/30/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2018
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel - Party (006)
Docket Date
1/31/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2018
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/29/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2018
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/29/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2018
Description
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration - Party (004)
Docket Date
1/29/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration
Filing Date
1/29/2018
Description
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/29/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration
Filing Date
1/26/2018
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/29/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/2018
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/26/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/2018
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/26/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/2018
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/25/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
1/25/2018
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/25/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Right of Review
Filing Date
1/25/2018
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/25/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Monetary Orders
Filing Date
1/25/2018
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/25/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Not Bailable As A Matter of Right
Filing Date
1/25/2018
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/25/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Not Bailable As A Matter of Right
Filing Date
1/25/2018
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (004)
Docket Date
1/25/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
1/25/2018
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/25/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
1/25/2018
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (004)
Docket Date
1/25/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Right of Review
Filing Date
1/25/2018
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/25/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
1/25/2018
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/25/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
1/25/2018
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (004)
Docket Date
1/25/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Monetary Orders
Filing Date
1/24/2018
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (006)
Docket Date
1/25/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/23/2018
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (006)
Docket Date
1/23/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record
Filing Date
1/23/2018
Description
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/23/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration
Filing Date
1/22/2018
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (009)
Docket Date
1/23/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/2018
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/24/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/2018
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/23/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Monetary Orders
Filing Date
1/22/2018
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/23/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF RIGHTS OF REVIEW AFTER CONVICTION AND PROCEDURE RIGHT TO APPEAL
Filing Date
1/22/2018
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/23/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
1/19/2018
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/19/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (009)
Docket Date
1/18/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/2018
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
1/17/2018
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/19/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2018
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/16/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2018
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (004)
Docket Date
1/16/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2018
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (005)
Docket Date
1/16/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2018
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (008)
Docket Date
1/16/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2018
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (007)
Docket Date
1/16/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2018
Description
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration - Party (006)
Docket Date
1/16/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration
Filing Date
1/16/2018
Description
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/16/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration
Filing Date
1/12/2018
Description
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration - Party (009)
Docket Date
1/12/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration
Filing Date
1/11/2018
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (004)
Docket Date
1/17/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/11/2018
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/17/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/11/2018
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/11/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
1/11/2018
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/11/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Monetary Orders
Filing Date
1/11/2018
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/11/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Right of Review
Filing Date
1/11/2018
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (006)
Docket Date
1/11/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
1/11/2018
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/11/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Not Bailable As A Matter of Right
Filing Date
1/11/2018
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/11/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
1/11/2018
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (004)
Docket Date
1/11/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
1/11/2018
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (006)
Docket Date
1/11/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Right of Review
Filing Date
1/11/2018
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (006)
Docket Date
1/11/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Monetary Orders
Filing Date
1/10/2018
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (009)
Docket Date
1/10/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Monetary Orders
Filing Date
1/10/2018
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (009)
Docket Date
1/10/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
1/10/2018
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (009)
Docket Date
1/11/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Right of Review
Filing Date
1/5/2018
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (006)
Docket Date
1/11/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/29/2017
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/29/2017
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (006)
Docket Date
1/5/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/29/2017
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (006)
Docket Date
1/5/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
OFFICIAL
Filing Date
12/29/2017
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (006)
Docket Date
1/8/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/27/2017
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/27/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/27/2017
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/28/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
12/15/2017
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (009)
Docket Date
12/15/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2017
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (007)
Docket Date
12/15/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2017
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (008)
Docket Date
12/15/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2017
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (006)
Docket Date
12/15/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/2017
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (006)
Docket Date
12/15/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
12/14/2017
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/2017
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/2017
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/2017
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/2017
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (004)
Docket Date
12/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/13/2017
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (009)
Docket Date
12/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
12/13/2017
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (005)
Docket Date
12/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
12/13/2017
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (009)
Docket Date
12/15/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/13/2017
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (006)
Docket Date
12/15/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/13/2017
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/15/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/13/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (004)
Docket Date
12/13/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSES
Filing Date
12/5/2017
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/6/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
12/5/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/6/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE OF SPECIFIC ITEMS OF EVIDENCE
Filing Date
12/5/2017
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/6/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
12/4/2017
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/6/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2017
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/5/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2017
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/5/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2017
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/6/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/21/2017
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/27/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2017
Description
RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (006)
Docket Date
11/17/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR
EXTENSION OF TIME TO
CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY
PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
11/17/2017
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/20/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1 (a), (b), (d), (e)
Filing Date
11/17/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/20/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
INVOCATION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS
Filing Date
11/17/2017
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/20/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
11/17/2017
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/20/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS SPECIFIC DISCOVERY REQUEST PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1 (b), (c), (e) OF THE ARIZONA RULES OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE
Filing Date
11/17/2017
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/20/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST TO PRESERVE AND PRODUCE POLICE RECORDINGS
Filing Date
11/17/2017
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/21/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2017
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/21/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2017
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/21/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
11/14/2017
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (009)
Docket Date
11/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2017
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (008)
Docket Date
11/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2017
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2017
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (006)
Docket Date
11/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2017
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2017
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (004)
Docket Date
11/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2017
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2017
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2017
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2017
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (009)
Docket Date
11/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND
REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF
REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
11/13/2017
Description
RAD - Request For Automatic Additional Disclosure - Party (009)
Docket Date
11/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR AUTOMATIC
DISCLOSURE REQUIRED BY
RULE 15.1(a) and (b) AND
REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL
DISCLOSURE
REQUIRED BY RULE 15.1(e)
Filing Date
11/7/2017
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/7/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2017
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/7/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2017
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/7/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2017
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (004)
Docket Date
11/7/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2017
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/7/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2017
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (006)
Docket Date
11/7/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2017
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/7/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2017
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (008)
Docket Date
11/7/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2017
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (009)
Docket Date
11/7/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2017
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/7/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Disclosure Notice
Filing Date
11/2/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S DISCLOSURE NOTICE PURSUANT TO RULE 15, ARIZONA RULES OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
11/1/2017
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/1/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S DISCLOSURE NOTICE PURSUANT TO RULE 15, ARIZONA RULES OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
11/1/2017
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (007)
Docket Date
11/1/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S DISCLOSURE NOTICE PURSUANT TO RULE 15, ARIZONA RULES OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
11/1/2017
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (008)
Docket Date
11/1/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S DISCLOSURE NOTICE PURSUANT TO RULE 15, ARIZONA RULES OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
11/1/2017
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (004)
Docket Date
11/1/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S DISCLOSURE NOTICE PURSUANT TO RULE 15, ARIZONA RULES OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
11/1/2017
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (005)
Docket Date
11/1/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S DISCLOSURE NOTICE PURSUANT TO RULE 15, ARIZONA RULES OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
11/1/2017
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (006)
Docket Date
11/1/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S DISCLOSURE NOTICE PURSUANT TO RULE 15, ARIZONA RULES OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
11/1/2017
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (009)
Docket Date
11/1/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S DISCLOSURE NOTICE PURSUANT TO RULE 15, ARIZONA RULES OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
10/31/2017
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (009)
Docket Date
10/31/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order $10,000.00
Filing Date
10/31/2017
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (006)
Docket Date
10/31/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Secured Appearance Bond $ 10,000.00
Filing Date
10/31/2017
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/31/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Secured Appearance Bond $ 10,000.00
Filing Date
10/31/2017
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/31/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Secured Appearance Bond $ 10,000.00
Filing Date
10/31/2017
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (009)
Docket Date
10/31/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Secured Appearance Bond $ 10,000.00
Filing Date
10/31/2017
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/31/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
$10,000
Filing Date
10/31/2017
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (004)
Docket Date
10/31/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
$10,000
Filing Date
10/31/2017
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/31/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
$10,000
Filing Date
10/31/2017
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/31/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
$10,000
Filing Date
10/31/2017
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/31/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
$10,000
Filing Date
10/31/2017
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (006)
Docket Date
10/31/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
$10,000
Filing Date
10/31/2017
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (006)
Docket Date
10/31/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order/$10,000
Filing Date
10/24/2017
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2017
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2017
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (006)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2017
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (004)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (004)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (004)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (004)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (004)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (006)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (006)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (006)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (006)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (009)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (009)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (009)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (009)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO VACATE PRELIMINARY HEARING
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (004)
Docket Date
10/25/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO VACATE PRELIMINARY HEARING
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (006)
Docket Date
10/25/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO VACATE PRELIMINARY HEARING
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/25/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO VACATE PRELIMINARY HEARING
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (009)
Docket Date
10/25/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO VACATE PRELIMINARY HEARING
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
ORD - Order - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/25/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION TO VACATE THE PRELIMINARY HEARING
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/25/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO VACATE PRELIMINARY HEARING
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/25/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO VACATE PRELIMINARY HERING
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/25/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO VACATE PRELIMINARY HEARING
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/25/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO VACATE PRELIMINARY HEARING
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING THE STATE'S MOTION TO VACATE THE PRELIMINARY HEARING
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
ORD - Order - Party (004)
Docket Date
10/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTED
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
ORD - Order - Party (006)
Docket Date
10/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTED
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
ORD - Order - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTED
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
ORD - Order - Party (009)
Docket Date
10/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTED
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTED
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTED
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
ORD - Order - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTED
Filing Date
10/16/2017
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2017
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/16/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2017
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/16/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2017
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (004)
Docket Date
10/16/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2017
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/16/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2017
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (006)
Docket Date
10/16/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2017
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/16/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2017
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/16/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2017
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (009)
Docket Date
10/16/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2017
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (004)
Docket Date
10/16/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
10/16/2017
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/16/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
10/16/2017
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/16/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
10/16/2017
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (009)
Docket Date
10/16/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
10/16/2017
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (009)
Docket Date
10/16/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
10/16/2017
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/16/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
10/16/2017
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
10/16/2017
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/16/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
10/16/2017
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/16/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
10/16/2017
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/16/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
10/16/2017
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
10/16/2017
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/16/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
10/16/2017
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/16/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
10/16/2017
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/16/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
10/16/2017
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/16/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
10/16/2017
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (004)
Docket Date
10/16/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
10/16/2017
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (006)
Docket Date
10/16/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
10/16/2017
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (006)
Docket Date
10/16/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
10/16/2017
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (009)
Docket Date
10/17/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2017
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (008)
Docket Date
10/17/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2017
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (007)
Docket Date
10/17/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2017
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (006)
Docket Date
10/17/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2017
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (005)
Docket Date
10/17/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2017
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (004)
Docket Date
10/17/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2017
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/17/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2017
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/17/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2017
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/17/2017
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
10/19/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/19/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/19/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/19/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/19/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/19/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/19/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/19/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/19/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/23/2017
Time
8:45
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
10/23/2017
Time
8:45
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
10/23/2017
Time
8:45
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
10/23/2017
Time
8:45
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
10/23/2017
Time
8:45
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
10/23/2017
Time
8:45
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
10/23/2017
Time
8:45
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
10/23/2017
Time
8:45
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
10/23/2017
Time
8:45
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
10/31/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
10/31/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
10/31/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
10/31/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
10/31/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
10/31/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
10/31/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
10/31/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
10/31/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
12/13/2017
Time
8:33
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
12/13/2017
Time
8:33
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
12/13/2017
Time
8:33
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
12/13/2017
Time
8:33
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
12/13/2017
Time
8:33
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
12/13/2017
Time
8:33
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
12/13/2017
Time
8:33
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
12/13/2017
Time
8:33
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
12/13/2017
Time
8:33
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
12/27/2017
Time
8:20
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/10/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
1/11/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
1/11/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
1/11/2018
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
1/11/2018
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
1/11/2018
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
1/11/2018
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
1/11/2018
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
1/11/2018
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
1/11/2018
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
1/11/2018
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
1/11/2018
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
1/11/2018
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
1/17/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Change Of Plea
Date
1/22/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
1/25/2018
Time
8:20
Event
Change Of Plea
Date
1/25/2018
Time
8:20
Event
Change Of Plea
Date
1/25/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
1/25/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
2/7/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
2/8/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
2/8/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
2/22/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/22/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/22/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/28/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/28/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/28/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Trial