« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Turken, Seth
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Lamont Payne - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Morrison, Albert
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2016-127530-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Lamont Payne
Crime Date
3/4/2016
Date
6/23/2016
Description
AGG ASLT-CORREC EMPLOYEE
ARSCode
13-1204A10 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Lamont Payne
Crime Date
3/4/2016
Date
5/16/2019
Description
AGGRAVATED ASSAULT
ARSCode
13-1204 (F5)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2020
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/3/2019
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/4/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/18/2019
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/19/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/13/2019
Description
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration
Filing Date
6/12/2019
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Monetary Orders
Filing Date
6/12/2019
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
6/12/2019
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
6/12/2019
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/12/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
6/12/2019
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Right of Review
Filing Date
5/21/2019
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/21/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/2019
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/20/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2019
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2019
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
5/10/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/14/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO WAIVE COUNSEL
Filing Date
5/7/2019
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/8/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO WAIVE COUNSEL DATED MAY 3, 2019
Filing Date
4/16/2019
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/16/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/9/2019
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/9/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO
WAIVE COUNSEL
Filing Date
4/9/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO WAIVE COUNSEL
Filing Date
4/8/2019
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/1/2019
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/2/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANT'S PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS
Filing Date
3/25/2019
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2019
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2019
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/25/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/20/2019
Description
123 - ME: Mental Exam Def Competent - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/20/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/19/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR WAIVER OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
2/14/2019
Description
SDC - Stipulation For Determination Of Competency On Basis Of Expert's Reports - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/20/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/20/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT DR JOHN WALKER DATED 01/18/2019
Filing Date
2/14/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/20/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT DR M. DAVID MCGADY DATED 01/15/2019
Filing Date
2/11/2019
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/11/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
PETITON FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS
Filing Date
2/11/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO WAIVE COUNSEL
Filing Date
2/11/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE FO RIGHT TO COUNSEL AND WAIVER
Filing Date
2/4/2019
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/4/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2019
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/29/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR WAIVER OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
1/4/2019
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/8/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 11/OF APPOINTMENT
Filing Date
12/20/2018
Description
120 - ME: Hrg/Motion/Rule 11 Exam - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/13/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION
Filing Date
12/12/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/13/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF DEFENDANT'S MENTAL CONDITION TO STAND TRIAL
Filing Date
12/11/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/13/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
WAIVER OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
11/26/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/29/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR WAIVER OF COUNSEL PURSUANT TO RULE 6 13 C AND U S CONST 6TH AND
Filing Date
11/21/2018
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/20/2018
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
11/15/2018
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/9/2018
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2018
Description
098 - ME: Substitution Of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/7/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/7/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR WAIVER OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
11/6/2018
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/6/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/2018
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/6/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/2/2018
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/1/2018
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Withdraw counsel
Filing Date
10/31/2018
Description
JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2018
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL/HEARING
Filing Date
10/29/2018
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/29/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/10/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR REMOVAL OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
7/16/2018
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/16/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2018
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/10/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/28/2018
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2018
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
11-16-17 JOVANNA ROMAN
Filing Date
6/20/2018
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/20/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/15/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO WAIVE COUNSEL
Filing Date
6/8/2018
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/31/2018
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT
Filing Date
5/30/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/1/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR REMOVED OF COUNSEL REGINALD COOK
Filing Date
5/17/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/18/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR REMOVAL OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
5/16/2018
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTIO TO CONTINUE 05/31/2018 FIRM TRIAL DATE
Filing Date
5/9/2018
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/10/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD
Filing Date
4/26/2018
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/26/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
4/18/2018
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2018
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DISCHARGE OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
3/6/2018
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/6/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2018
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/6/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/26/2018
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/26/2018
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Reply
Filing Date
2/22/2018
Description
331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/22/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/3/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/3/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/27/2017
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/26/2017
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/26/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2017
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/26/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2017
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/27/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
12/20/2017
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/27/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
OFFICIAL
Filing Date
12/13/2017
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
12/12/2017
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/12/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/29/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/30/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR REMOVAL OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
11/28/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/28/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/22/2017
Description
RNM - Returned Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
11/20/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR SUPERIOR COURT WARRANT/COMPLAINT
Filing Date
11/20/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR COMPEL DISCLOSURE SANCTION
Filing Date
11/14/2017
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION FOR CONTEMPT OF COURT AND
PERPOSAL OF CRIMINAL CHARGES
Filing Date
11/14/2017
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION FOR DISQUALIFICATION AND
REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING
Filing Date
11/14/2017
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR
DISCLOSURE VIOLATION
Filing Date
11/14/2017
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF PROSECUTION
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
11/14/2017
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AN TO COMPEL
OR PRECLUDE
Filing Date
11/14/2017
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION FOR HARASSMENT INJUNCTION
Filing Date
11/8/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/9/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOITON FOR SACTIONS AN TO COMPEL OR PRECLUDE
Filing Date
11/6/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/13/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR REMOVAL OF JAMES BUESING AS ADVISORY COUNSEL
Filing Date
11/6/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR CONTEMPT OF COURT
Filing Date
11/6/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR HARASSMENT IN INDUCTION ON JAMES BUESING
Filing Date
11/6/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DISQUALIFICATION AND REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING
Filing Date
11/6/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR HARASSMENT INJUCTION
Filing Date
11/6/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR CONTEMPT OF COURT
Filing Date
11/6/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF PROSECUTION WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
11/6/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR DISCLOSURE VIOLATION
Filing Date
11/6/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR CONTEMPT OF COURT AND PURPOSAL OF CRIMINAL CHARGES
Filing Date
10/18/2017
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/18/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/2/2017
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2017
Description
RNM - Returned Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
9/20/2017
Description
RNM - Returned Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/21/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
9/15/2017
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/18/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/2017
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/2017
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/7/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR COURT ORDER AND CONTEMPT OF COURT
Filing Date
9/5/2017
Description
RNM - Returned Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
8/31/2017
Description
331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/31/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/29/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/22/2017
Description
AOC - Allegation of Offenses Committed While Released From Confinement - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/23/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S AMENDED ALLEGATION OF OFFENSES COMMITTED WHILE RELEASED FROM CONFINEMENT PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-708(C)
Filing Date
8/18/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/18/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/18/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR REMOVAL OF ADVISORY COUNSEL
Filing Date
8/17/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/18/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION FOR ALL STATES WITNESSES PERSONAL FILES & INTERNAL AFFAIRS REPORT
Filing Date
8/11/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/11/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH COURT’S ORDER FROM JULY 24, 2017
Filing Date
8/10/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/9/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR COURT ORDER
Filing Date
8/9/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR COURT ORDER
Filing Date
8/9/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR SANCTION FOR DISCOVERY VIOLATION
Filing Date
8/1/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/3/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO REMOVE ADVISORY COUNSEL
Filing Date
8/1/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/3/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR FEES FOR ADVISORY COUNSEL TO DISCONTINUE
Filing Date
8/1/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/3/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR SANCTION/CONTEMPT OF COURT
Filing Date
7/26/2017
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/12/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2017
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/12/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/29/2017
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/26/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/27/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR SANCTION FOR STAT'S DISCOVERY VIOLATION
Filing Date
6/26/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/27/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR SANCTION FOR STATE'S DICOVERY VIOLATION
Filing Date
6/23/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/26/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR SANCTIONS
Filing Date
6/20/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/21/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR REMOVAL OF ADVISORY COUNSEL
Filing Date
6/16/2017
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/19/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE REGARDING IT’S INTENT TO USE EXPERT TESTIMONY IN IT’S CASE-IN-CHIEF
Filing Date
6/16/2017
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/19/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND RESPONSE DEADLINE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.6
Filing Date
6/9/2017
Description
906 - ME: Response/Reply Times Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/9/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2017
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/22/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/23/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR REPLY TO STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PERSONAL FILE OFFICERS INTERNAL AFFAIRS REPORT FILES AND MEDICAL FILES
Filing Date
5/22/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/23/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO REMOVE ADVISORY COUNSEL
Filing Date
5/22/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/23/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RULE 8.5 RULES OF CRIM PROC
Filing Date
5/19/2017
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/23/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR COURT ORDER
Filing Date
5/16/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR SANCTION
Filing Date
5/16/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR SANCTION
Filing Date
5/10/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/12/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO UNSEAL PHOTOS OF ALLEGED VICTIM BITEMARK
Filing Date
5/9/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/9/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2017
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/9/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTIONS FOR PRODUCTION FOR
DISCLOSURE BY STATE
Filing Date
5/9/2017
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/10/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION FOR STATE WITNESSES AND REBUTTAL WITNESSES MEDICAL FILES
Filing Date
5/8/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/8/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE TO THE COURT
Filing Date
5/5/2017
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/8/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTIONS FOR INTERNAL AFFAIRS RECORDS AND FOR RECONSIDERATION FOR STATE WITNESSES AND ALLEGED VICTIM’S PERSONNEL FILES
Filing Date
5/5/2017
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/8/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTIONS FOR PRODUCTION FOR DISCLOSURE BY STATE
Filing Date
5/3/2017
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
4/28/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR REMOVAL OF ADVISORY COUNSEL
Filing Date
4/17/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DISSMISSAL OF PROSECUTION
Filing Date
4/13/2017
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/13/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE INTERNAL AFFAIRS RECORD
Filing Date
4/13/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION FOR STATE WITNESSES FOR ALLEGED VICTIM PERSONAL FILE
Filing Date
4/13/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION FOR STATE DISCLOSURE FOR STATES WITNESSES AND ALLEGED VICTIM CRIMINAL RECORD
Filing Date
4/10/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/11/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION FOR STATE WITNESSES AND REBUTTAL WITNESSES MEDICAL FILES
Filing Date
4/5/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS FOR IN CAMERA INSPECTION
Filing Date
4/3/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/3/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/3/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/4/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF BITEMARK/DENTAL EXPERT
Filing Date
3/17/2017
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/17/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Sheriff Penzones Response Regarding Defendants Notice of Specific Policies and Procedures
Filing Date
3/17/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR: PRODUCTION OF DISCLOSURE BY STATE. RULE 15.1
Filing Date
3/17/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
NOTICE FOR ADDITIONAL DENTAL RECORDS AND X-RAYS
Filing Date
3/17/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES DISCLOSURE LIST 3/23/17
Filing Date
3/11/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Compliance
Filing Date
3/9/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/10/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
NOTICE: FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDER
Filing Date
3/8/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/9/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR REMOVEL OF INVESTIGATOR/APPOINTMENT OF A NEW INVESTIGATOR
Filing Date
3/2/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/3/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
NOTICE OF SPECIFIC POLICIES AND PROCEDURES
Filing Date
2/28/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDER PROPOSAL
Filing Date
2/28/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR REMOVAL OF ADVISORY COUNSEL/RE EXAMINATION
Filing Date
2/17/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/17/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2017
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/15/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2017
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/3/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Sheriffs Office Response Pursuant to Court Order Re: Defendants Request for Discovery
Filing Date
2/3/2017
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing
Filing Date
1/24/2017
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/23/2017
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/20/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR COURT ORDER
Filing Date
1/19/2017
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/20/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO REMOVE ADVISORY COUNSEL
Filing Date
1/6/2017
Description
RNM - Returned Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/6/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
1/4/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/4/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/4/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/4/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
THREE PHOTOGRAPHS OF VICTIM'S INJURIES
Filing Date
1/3/2017
Description
RNM - Returned Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/3/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
12/22/2016
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/22/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/19/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR REVIEW REEXAMINATION OF RECONSIDERATION OF MOTION 10.2 CHANGE OF JUDGE UPON REQUEST
Filing Date
12/14/2016
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/2016
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/15/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/8/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/9/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR A COURT ORDER TO RETAIN A BITE EXPERT
Filing Date
12/1/2016
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/30/2016
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/30/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/28/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/29/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR : COURT ORDER
Filing Date
11/28/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/29/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR CHANGE OF JUDGE FOR CAUSE UNDER RULE 10.1
Filing Date
11/22/2016
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/22/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/23/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DISCLOSURE BY ORDER OF THE COURT RULES 15.1(g) OF RULES OF CRIM PROC
Filing Date
11/1/2016
Description
081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2016
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2016
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/31/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
10/25/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/26/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR REEXAMINATION OF CONDITION OF RELEASE UNDER RULE 7.3 b OF RULES OF CRIM PROC
Filing Date
10/21/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR SANCTIONS UNDER RULE 15.7(B) OF RULE OF CRIM PROC
Filing Date
10/21/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE BY ORDER OF THE COURT UNDER RULE 15.11 (G) OF RULE OF CRIM PROC
Filing Date
10/21/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL DISCLOSURE UPON REQUEST AND SPECIFICATION UNDER RULE 15.1 DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
10/21/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF PROSECUTION UNDER RULE 16.6
Filing Date
10/21/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR NOTICE OF CHANGE OF JUDGE UNDER RULE 10.2 A.B.
Filing Date
10/14/2016
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/14/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/14/2016
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/14/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/2016
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/6/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/7/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF INVESTIGATOR AND EXPERT WITNESSES FOR INDIGENT RULE 15.9 RULES OF CRM PRO
Filing Date
10/6/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/7/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR APPEARANCE OF PERSON UNDER INVESTIGATION UNDER RULE 12.6 RULES OF CRIM PROC
Filing Date
10/6/2016
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/7/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE'S RESPONES JON DEFENDENT MOTION 12.9. CHALLENGE TO GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS. RULE 12.9 A
Filing Date
9/26/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
REPY TO STATES RESPONCE ON MOTION FOR DEMAND FOR PRELIMINERY HEARING RULE OF CRIM PROC 5.I.D.
Filing Date
9/19/2016
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/19/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY HEARING
Filing Date
9/19/2016
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENT TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTIONS TO REMAND
Filing Date
9/19/2016
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTIONS TO REMAND TO GRAND JURY
Filing Date
9/15/2016
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/21/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
9/14/2016
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/16/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/2016
Description
172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/14/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2016
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S FIRST MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT’S MOTIONS TO REMAND AND MOTIONS FOR PRELIMINARY HEARING
Filing Date
9/9/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
LIST OF WITNESSES
Filing Date
9/9/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSES UNDER RULE 15.2 (B) OF ARS RULE OF CRIM PROC R 15
Filing Date
9/9/2016
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/14/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
9/9/2016
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/14/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2016
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/14/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/8/2016
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/25/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/26/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR NEW FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Filing Date
8/25/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/26/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DEMAND FOR PRELIMINARY HEARING
Filing Date
8/25/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/26/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR A NEW FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE UNDER RULE 12.9 CHALLENGE TO GRAND JURY PROCEEDING
Filing Date
8/25/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR A NEW FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Filing Date
8/25/2016
Description
WAV - Waiver - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/31/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
8/22/2016
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/22/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2016
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
(1) Request for Disclosure; (2) Notice of Defenses, Witnesses and Objects; and (3) Request for notice of rebuttal witnesses
Filing Date
8/10/2016
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
8/10/2016
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING
Filing Date
8/10/2016
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
8/10/2016
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S ALLEGATION OF VIOLENT
CRIME PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-901.03
Filing Date
8/10/2016
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIORS
Filing Date
8/10/2016
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF STATE'S RULE 15.2
REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EVIDENCE
AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE OF COURT
TO TAKE PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AT THE
NEXT COURT SETTING
Filing Date
8/10/2016
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
8/10/2016
Description
AOC - Allegation of Offenses Committed While Released From Confinement - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF OFFENSES COMMITTED WHILE RELEASED FROM CONFINEMENT PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-708(A), (B) or (C)
Filing Date
8/9/2016
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/11/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/4/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/5/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR CHANGE OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
7/29/2016
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/29/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2016
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2016
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2016
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/2016
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/20/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
7/15/2016
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/12/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO CHANGE COUNSEL
Filing Date
7/5/2016
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2016
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/27/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2016
Description
WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/24/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2016
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/22/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2016
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/23/2016
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/22/2016
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/23/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2016
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/23/2016
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/22/2016
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/23/2016
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/21/2016
Description
NPH - Notice of Affirmation of Preliminary Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/23/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/2016
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/24/2016
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO REMOVE COUNSEL
Filing Date
6/15/2016
Description
IWA – Issuance of Warrant - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/15/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/2016
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/15/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
6/15/2016
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/15/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
6/14/2016
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/15/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/2016
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/14/2016
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
6/15/2016
Time
2:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
6/21/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/24/2016
Time
8:45
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
6/30/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
8/11/2016
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
8/25/2016
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
9/12/2016
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
10/7/2016
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/26/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
11/3/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/10/2016
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
11/28/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/8/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/16/2016
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
1/17/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/9/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/17/2017
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/21/2017
Time
11:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/19/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/19/2017
Time
11:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/16/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/30/2017
Time
11:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/18/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/25/2017
Time
11:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
9/8/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/16/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/17/2017
Time
9:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/5/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/18/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/6/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/20/2018
Time
13:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
2/20/2018
Time
13:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
2/28/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/2/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/22/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/31/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/25/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/10/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/1/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/23/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/30/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/30/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/31/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/1/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/5/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/13/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/3/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
12/19/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/9/2019
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/24/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
1/31/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
2/7/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
2/14/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
2/21/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/21/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/14/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/16/2019
Time
13:45
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
5/21/2019
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/12/2019
Time
8:29
Event
Sentencing