« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Baumann, James
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Rosemary Velazco - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
F
Attorney
LEGAL DEFENDER'S OFFICE,
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2015-123744-001
Party Name
Carlos Tercero Cruz - (3)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Varcoe, Robyn
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2015-123744-002
Party Name
B Witness - (4)
Relationship
Witness
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2015-123744-002
Disposition Information
Party Name
Rosemary Velazco
Crime Date
5/23/2015
Date
6/4/2015
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-DURING CRIME
ARSCode
13-1105A2 (F1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Rosemary Velazco
Crime Date
5/23/2015
Date
6/4/2015
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Carlos Tercero Cruz
Crime Date
5/23/2015
Date
6/4/2015
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-DURING CRIME
ARSCode
13-1105A2 (F1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Carlos Tercero Cruz
Crime Date
5/23/2015
Date
6/4/2015
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Rosemary Velazco
Crime Date
5/23/2015
Date
12/19/2017
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-DURING CRIME
ARSCode
13-1105A2 (F1)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Rosemary Velazco
Crime Date
4/1/2015
Date
12/19/2017
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Rosemary Velazco
Crime Date
4/1/2015
Date
12/19/2017
Description
KIDNAP-DEATH/INJ/SEX/AID FEL
ARSCode
13-1304A3 (F2)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Rosemary Velazco
Crime Date
4/1/2015
Date
12/19/2017
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623B1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Rosemary Velazco
Crime Date
4/1/2015
Date
12/19/2017
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623B1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Rosemary Velazco
Crime Date
4/1/2015
Date
12/19/2017
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623B1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Rosemary Velazco
Crime Date
4/1/2015
Date
12/19/2017
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-RECKLESS
ARSCode
13-3623B2 (F5)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Carlos Tercero Cruz
Crime Date
5/23/2015
Date
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-DURING CRIME
ARSCode
13-1105A2 (F1)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Carlos Tercero Cruz
Crime Date
4/1/2015
Date
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Carlos Tercero Cruz
Crime Date
4/1/2015
Date
Description
KIDNAP-DEATH/INJ/SEX/AID FEL
ARSCode
13-1304A3 (F2)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Carlos Tercero Cruz
Crime Date
4/1/2015
Date
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623B1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Carlos Tercero Cruz
Crime Date
4/1/2015
Date
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623B1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Carlos Tercero Cruz
Crime Date
4/1/2015
Date
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623B1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Carlos Tercero Cruz
Crime Date
4/1/2015
Date
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-RECKLESS
ARSCode
13-3623B2 (F5)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2024
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Discovery Re: Draft Affidavits Related to Rosemary Velazcos Change of Plea
Filing Date
4/12/2024
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR
CLARIFICATION OF COURT
RULING
Filing Date
4/8/2024
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/8/2024
Description
081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF
CLARIFICATION OF PLEADING
Filing Date
4/4/2024
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
4/3/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
4/1/2024
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S ALLEGATION OF
DOMESTIC VIOLENCE OFFENSES
Filing Date
3/27/2024
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party ()
Docket Date
4/2/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR
EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
3/25/2024
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Motion to Continue Trial
Filing Date
3/22/2024
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/22/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO AMEND THE
INDICTMENT
Filing Date
3/22/2024
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SECOND MOTION TO
RECONSIDER RULING
REGARDING USE OF EVIDENCE
OF VIDEO AND TRANSCRIPT OF
CRUZ DENYING FOOD TO THE
VICTIM
Filing Date
3/18/2024
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE
OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
3/18/2024
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Reply to States Response and States Supplemental Response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss Prosecution for Pervasive Prosecutorial Misconduct
Filing Date
3/15/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT
REPORT
Filing Date
3/1/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REPLY TO DEFENDANT’S
RESPONSE TO THE STATE’S
MOTION IN LIMINE TO
PRECLUDE EVIDENCE WITHIN
INTEGRITY RECORDS OF DR.
MARK SHELLY
Filing Date
2/28/2024
Description
RMM - Response to Motion to Modify Sentencing - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO
STATE’S MOTION IN LIMINE TO
PRECLUDE EVIDENCE WITHIN
INTEGRITY RECORDS OF DR.
MARK SHELLY
Filing Date
2/16/2024
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE / TO DEFENDANT MOTION TO DISMISS PROSECUTION BASED ON PERVASIVE PROSECUTORIAL MISCONDUCT
Filing Date
2/15/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2024
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing Transcripts of Hearing
Filing Date
2/7/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT
REPORT
Filing Date
2/1/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
PRESERVE MCAO EMAILS UNDER
SEAL
Filing Date
2/1/2024
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENTAL
MOTION FOR DISCOVERY RE:
WADE INVESTIGATION AUDIO
RECORDINGS
Filing Date
1/31/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/31/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/30/2024
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENT TO
MOTION TO DISMISS
PROSECUTION BASED ON
PERVASIVE PROSECUTORIAL
MISCONDUCT
Filing Date
1/29/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/31/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
PRESERVE MCAO EMAILS
UNDER SEAL AND PROPOSED
ORDER
Filing Date
1/29/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/31/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Supplemental Motion for Discovery re Wade Investigation Audio Recordings
Filing Date
1/29/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXCEED PAGE LIMIT TO FILE RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS PROSECUTION BASED ON PERVASIVE PROSECUTORIAL MISCONDUCT
Filing Date
1/29/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS PROSECUTION BASED ON PERVASIVE PROSECUTORIAL MISCONDUCT
Filing Date
1/29/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND PAGE LIMIT FOR MOTION TO DISMISS PROSECUTION BASED ON PERVASIVE PROSECUTORIAL MISCONDUCT
Filing Date
1/26/2024
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENT TO
MOTION TO DISMISS
PROSECUTION BASED ON
PERVASIVE PROSECUTORIAL
MISCONDUCT
Filing Date
1/23/2024
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REPLY TO DEFENDANT’S
RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION
IN LIMINE TO LIMIT THE
TESTIMONY OF DR. GOMEZ TO
OBSERVATION EVIDENCE AND
BEHAVIORAL-TENDENCY
EVIDENCE OF A PERTINENT
CHARACTER TRAIT
Filing Date
1/22/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT
REPORT
Filing Date
1/19/2024
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO
STATE’S MOTION IN LIMINE TO
LIMIT THE TESTIMONY OF DR.
GOMEZ TO OBSERVATION
EVIDENCE AND BEHAVIORALTENDENCY
EVIDENCE OF A
PERTINENT CHARACTER TRAIT
Filing Date
1/18/2024
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE IN
OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO
FILE DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO
STATE’S MOTION IN LIMINE TO
PRECLUDE EVIDENCE WITHIN
INTEGRITY RECORDS OF DR.
MARK SHELLY
Filing Date
1/17/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
1/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN LIMINE TO IMPEACH
Filing Date
1/17/2024
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REPLY TO DEFENDANT’S
RESPONSE TO MOTION IN LIMINE
TO IMPEACH CRUZ WITH
STATEMENTS MADE TO THE
DEPARTMENT OF CHILD
SERVICES
Filing Date
1/12/2024
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Extend Time to File Defendants Response to States Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence Within Integrity Records of Dr. Mark Shelly
Filing Date
1/11/2024
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/11/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/11/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT
TO FILE RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
DISMISS PROSECUTION BASED
ON PERVASIVE PROSECUTORIAL
MISCONDUCT
Filing Date
1/11/2024
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE
TO FILE RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
DISMISS PROSECUTION BASED
ON PERVASIVE PROSECUTORIAL
MISCONDUCT
Filing Date
1/11/2024
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO
STATE’S MOTION IN LIMINE TO
IMPEACH CRUZ WITH
STATEMENTS MADE TO THE
DEPARTMENT OF CHILD
SERVICES
Filing Date
1/10/2024
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Motion to Dismiss Prosecution Based on Pervasive Prosecutorial Misconduct
Filing Date
1/10/2024
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REPLY TO DEFENDANT’S
RESPONSE TO MOTION TO
RECONSIDER RULING
REGARDING USE OF EVIDENCE
OF VIDEO AND TRANSCRIPT OF
CRUZ DENYING FOOD TO THE
VICTIM
Filing Date
1/10/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND PAGE
LIMIT FOR DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO DISMISS
PROSECUTION BASED ON
PERVASIVE PROSECUTORIAL
MISCONDUCT
Filing Date
1/10/2024
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REPLY TO DEFENDANT’S
RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION
IN LIMINE TO ADMIT REBUTTAL
EVIDENCE CRUZ DROVE A
VEHICLE
Filing Date
1/9/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT REQUIREMENT TO FILE MOTION IN LIMINE TO LIMIT THE TESTIMONY OF DR. GOMEZ TO OBSERVATION EVIDENCE AND BEHAVIORAL-TENDENCY EVIDENCE OF A PERTINENT CHARACTER TRAIT
Filing Date
1/5/2024
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Response to States Motion to Reconsider Ruling Regarding Use of Evidence of Video and Transcript of Cruz Denying Food to the Victim
Filing Date
1/5/2024
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO
STATE’S MOTION IN LIMINE TO
ADMIT REBUTTAL EVIDENCE
CRUZ DROVE A VEHICLE
Filing Date
1/4/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/3/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/3/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/21/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXCEEDING PAGE LIMIT TO FILE MOTION IN LIMINE TO LIMIT THE TESTIMONY OF DR. GOMEZ TO OBSERVATION EVIDENCE AND BEHAVIORAL-TENDENCY EVIDENCE OF A PERTINENT CHARACTER TRAIT
Filing Date
12/20/2023
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO
RECONSIDER RULING
REGARDING USE OF EVIDENCE
OF VIDEO AND TRANSCRIPT OF
CRUZ DENYING FOOD TO THE
VICTIM
Filing Date
12/20/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT REQUIREMENT TO FILE MOTION TO RECONSIDER RULING REGARDING USE OF EVIDENCE OF VIDEO AND TRANSCRIPT OF CRUZ DENYING FOOD TO THE VICTIM
Filing Date
12/19/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT REQUIREMENT TO FILE MOTION IN LIMINE TO LIMIT THE TESTIMONY OF DR. GOMEZ TO OBSERVATION EVIDENCE AND BEHAVIORAL-TENDENCY EVIDENCE OF A PERTINENT CHARACTER TRAIT
Filing Date
12/19/2023
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION IN LIMINE TO LIMIT
THE TESTIMONY OF DR. GOMEZ
TO OBSERVATION EVIDENCE
AND BEHAVIORAL-TENDENCY
EVIDENCE OF A PERTINENT
CHARACTER TRAIT
Filing Date
12/15/2023
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
12/15/2023
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION IN LIMINE TO
PRECLUDE EVIDENCE WITHIN
INTEGRITY RECORDS OF DR.
MARK SHELLY
Filing Date
12/15/2023
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION IN LIMINE TO ADMIT REBUTTAL EVIDENCE CRUZ DROVE A VEHICLE
Filing Date
12/14/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT
REPORT
Filing Date
12/14/2023
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/18/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE
TO DEFENDANT’S
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR
DISCOVERY RE: Witness
Information and Documentation
Filing Date
12/7/2023
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR DISCOVERY RE: DISCOVERY NOTICES IN STATE V. ROSEMARY VELAZCO, CR2015-123744-001
Filing Date
11/29/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/29/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/27/2023
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to States Response to Defendants Supplemental Request for Discovery re: Dr. Sergio Martinez
Filing Date
11/22/2023
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE
TO DEFENSE SUPPLEMENTAL
REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY RE:
TLO Reports
Filing Date
11/22/2023
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENTAL
NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
11/22/2023
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Supplemental Notice of Witnesses
Filing Date
11/22/2023
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE
TO DEFENDANT’S
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR
DISCOVERY RE: Additional
Investigative Documentation
Filing Date
11/20/2023
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENTAL
MOTION FOR DISCOVERY RE:
ADDITIONAL INVESTIGATIVE
DOCUMENTATION
Filing Date
11/20/2023
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR
DISCOVERY RE: Discovery Notices
in State v. Rosemary Velazco, CR
2015-123744-001
Filing Date
11/17/2023
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR
DISCOVERY RE: Additional
Investigative Documentation
Filing Date
11/15/2023
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENTAL
REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY
RE: TLO REPORTS
Filing Date
11/15/2023
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENTAL
REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY RE:
DR. SERGIO MARTINEZ
Filing Date
11/15/2023
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENTAL
REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY RE:
WITNESS INFORMATION AND
DOCUMENTATION
Filing Date
11/13/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REPLY TO DEFENDANT’S
RESPONSE TO STATE’S REQUEST
FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
11/13/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
11/10/2023
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Response to States Request for Disclosure
Filing Date
11/9/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
11/7/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR
DISCOVERY RE: Dr. Sergio
Martinez
Filing Date
10/25/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/25/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO WAIVE APPEARANCE
Filing Date
10/19/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Waive Appearance
Filing Date
10/19/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplemental Request for Discovery re: TLO Reports
Filing Date
10/13/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/18/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT
REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
9/15/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR
DISCOVERY RE: Requests to the
Maricopa County Sheriff’s Office
Filing Date
9/15/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR
DISCOVERY RE: Witness
Information and Documentation
Filing Date
9/14/2023
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/14/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT
REPORT
Filing Date
8/10/2023
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/2/2023
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE
Filing Date
8/1/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/27/2023
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplemental Request for Discovery
Filing Date
9/22/2022
Description
928 – ME: Stay of Proceedings - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/22/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/16/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REPLY TO
STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR
STAY OF PROCEEDINGS
PENDING RESOLUTION OF
SPECIAL ACTION BY THE
ARIZONA SUPREME COURT
Filing Date
9/13/2022
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS PENDING RESOLUTION OF SPECIAL ACTION BY THE ARIZONA SUPREME COURT
Filing Date
9/6/2022
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/31/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR
STAY OF PROCEEDINGS
PENDING RESOLUTION OF
SPECIAL ACTION BY THE
ARIZONA SUPREME COURT
Filing Date
8/29/2022
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/31/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
8/25/2022
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPREME COURT
Filing Date
8/22/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/22/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/4/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Notice of Acknowledgment of Trial Date
Filing Date
7/29/2022
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
7/29/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
7/28/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REPLY – STATE’S MOTION IN LIMINE #1 WITNESS PERSONNEL RECORDS
Filing Date
7/27/2022
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
7/25/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO
STATE’S MOTION IN LIMINE #1-
WITNESS PERSONNEL RECORDS
Filing Date
7/21/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
7/15/2022
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION IN LIMINE #1 – WITNESS PERSONNEL RECORDS
Filing Date
7/7/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2022
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/17/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT
REPORT
Filing Date
5/25/2022
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/25/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/2022
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2022
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/29/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2022
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 04/08/2022
Filing Date
4/25/2022
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 04/11/2022
Filing Date
4/21/2022
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT
REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
4/20/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/20/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2022
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO
STATE’S MOTION TO CONTINUE
EVIDENTIARY HEARING
Filing Date
4/12/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO CONTINUE
EVIDENTIARY HEARING SET FOR
4/22/2022
Filing Date
4/11/2022
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SETTING DATES, DIRECTING ELECTRONIC OR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE AND FIXING TIME FOR RESPONSE
Filing Date
4/11/2022
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/11/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REPLY TO
STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
DETERMINE MR. TERCERO
CRUZ’ COMPETENCY TO STAND
TRIAL
Filing Date
4/4/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO MOTION TO RULE 11
Filing Date
3/29/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/29/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2022
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/29/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ATTACHMENT TO MOTION TO DETERMINE MR. TERCERO CRUZ' COMPETENCY TO STAND TRIAL
Filing Date
3/25/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SEAL ATTACHMENT TO M OTION TO DETERMINE MR. TECERO CRUZ COMPETENCY TO STAN TRIAL
Filing Date
3/25/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/30/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO DETERMINE MR.
TERCERO CRUZ’ COMPETENCY
TO STAND TRIAL
Filing Date
3/25/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S NOTICE OF
WITNESSES FOR EVIDENTIARY
HEARING SCHEDULED ON
APRIL 22, 2022
Filing Date
3/25/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REQUEST TO
ALLOW WITNESSES TO TESTIFY
REMOTELY FOR EVIDENTIARY
HEARING SCHEDULED ON
APRIL 22, 2022
Filing Date
3/24/2022
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/31/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/16/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/16/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/11/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/11/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/4/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF STATE’S
WITNESSES FOR BIRTHDAY CAKE
EVIDENTIARY HEARING 4/22/2022
Filing Date
3/1/2022
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
2/15/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/17/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF STATE’S WITNESSES FOR
BIRTHDAY CAKE EVIDENTIARY HEARING
4/22/2022
Filing Date
2/8/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE
TO NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
AND REQUEST FOR STATE’S
CONTINUED COMPLIANCE
WITH BRADY OBLIGATIONS
Filing Date
2/4/2022
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE AND REQUEST FOR CONTINUING DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO BRADY
Filing Date
2/3/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/4/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE AND REQUEST FOR STATE'S CONTINUED COMPLIANCE WITH BRADY OBLIGATIONS
Filing Date
2/3/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REPLY TO
STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
CORRECT THE RECORD RE:
STATE’S FACTUAL
ALLEGATION
Filing Date
2/3/2022
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/3/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/1/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO CORRECT THE RECORD RE: STATE’S FACTUAL ALLEGATION
Filing Date
1/26/2022
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/26/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
CORRECT THE RECORD RE:
STATE’S FACTUAL ALLEGATION
Filing Date
1/18/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF CONFLICT
Filing Date
1/11/2022
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO RECONSIDER RULING REGARDING LAW ENFORCEMENT INTERROGATION TECHNIQUE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE CLARIFY RULING
Filing Date
1/11/2022
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF VOICE AND VISUAL
IDENTIFICATION WITNESSES FOR
BIRTHDAY CAKE EVIDENTIARY HEARING
Filing Date
1/11/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S UNDERSTANDING OF JANUARY
19, 2022 HEARING
Filing Date
1/3/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/4/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF UPDATED WITNESS ADDRESSES
Filing Date
12/27/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/27/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/27/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/27/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/23/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/27/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE
TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
ORDER PROSECUTORS TO
INVESTIGATE AND DISCLOSE
EXCULPATORY MATERIAL
REGARDING CIVILIAN WITNESS
EVA GONZALES AND TO
COMPLY WITH BRADY
OBLIGATIONS AS TO ALL
WITNESSES
Filing Date
12/21/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to States Response to Motion to Order Prosecutors to Investigate and Disclose Exculpatory Material and Impeachment Regarding Civilian Witness Ramon Velazco and to Comply with Brady Obligations as to All Witnesses
Filing Date
12/21/2021
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO ORDER PROSECUTORS TO INVESTIGATE AND DISCLOSE EXCULPATORY MATERIAL REGARDING CIVILIAN WITNESS EVA GONZALES AND TO COMPLY WITH BRADY OBLIGATION AS TO ALL WITNESSES
Filing Date
12/21/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND THE PAGE
LIMIT FOR DEFENDANT’S REPLY
TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION
TO ORDER PROSECUTORS TO
INVESTIGATE AND DISCLOSE
EXCULPATORY MATERIAL AND
IMPEACHMENT REGARDING
CIVILIAN WITNESS RAMON
VELAZCO AND TO COMPLY WITH
BRADY OBLIGATIONS AS TO ALL
WITNESSES
Filing Date
12/20/2021
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF UPDATED CIVILIAN WITNESS ADDRESSES
Filing Date
12/17/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REPLY TO
STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION in limine
re: FALSE/AND OR MISLEADING
TESTIMONY AND ARGUMENT
RELATING TO DEFENDANT’S
INVOLUNTARY ILLITERACY
Filing Date
12/15/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY-STATE’S NOTICE OF INTENT OT USE POTENTIAL 404(B) EVIDENCE OF CRUZ’S INTERACTIONS WITH CPS AND THE VICTIM’S CUSTODIAL TIMELINE AND DOCUMENTATION
Filing Date
12/15/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO
ORDER PROSECUTORS TO INVESTIGATE
AND DISCLOSE EXCULPATORY MATERIAL
AND IMPEACHMENT REGARDING
CIVILIAN WITNESS RAMON VELAZCO
AND TO COMPLY WITH BRADY
OBLIGATIONS AS TO ALL WITNESSES
Filing Date
12/15/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REPLY – MOTION TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY BY DEFENSE WITNESS ROBERT BOIES
Filing Date
12/14/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/15/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO ORDER
PROSECUTORS TO
Filing Date
12/13/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/14/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Motion to Correct Minute Entry
Filing Date
12/10/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REPLY TO
STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR
STATE TO CORRECT THE
RECORD RE: FACTUAL
ALLEGATION AND REQUEST
FOR SANCTIONS
Filing Date
12/10/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/14/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REPLY TO
STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION
FOR RECONSIDATION OF
COURT’S RULING
DENYING DEFENDANT’S
MOTION IN LIMINE RE:
ALLEGED
METHAMPHETAMINE USE
AND REQUEST FOR
SANCTIONS
Filing Date
12/9/2021
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/9/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/9/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/10/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO STATES MOTION TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY BY DEFENSE WITNESS BOIES
Filing Date
12/6/2021
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/7/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION IN LIMINE RE: FALSE AND/OR MISLEADING TESTIMONY AND ARGUMENT RELATED TO DEFENDANT’S “INVOLUNTARY” ILLITERACY
Filing Date
12/6/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/7/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Response to States Notice of Intent to Use Potential 404(b) Evidence of Defendants Interactions with CPS
Filing Date
12/6/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/7/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE
TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO
PRECLUDE STATE’S WITNESS
JAUREGUI
Filing Date
12/3/2021
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/7/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF COURT’S RULING DENYING
DEFENDANT’S MOTION IN LIMINE RE: ALLEGED METHAMPHETAMINE USE AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS
Filing Date
12/3/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REPLY TO DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO STATE’S NOTICE OF INTENT TO USE INTRINSIC
EVIDENCE/POTENTIAL 404(B) EVIDENCE OF VIDEO AND TRANSCRIPT OF DEFENDANT DENYING FOOD TO VICTIM
Filing Date
12/3/2021
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR STATE TO CORRECT THE RECORD RE: FACTUAL ALLEGATION AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS
Filing Date
11/30/2021
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/30/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE STATE’S WITNESS STEVEN JAUREGUI
Filing Date
11/30/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/30/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Motion to Order Prosecutors to Investigate and Disclose Exculpatory Material and Impeachment Regarding Civilian Witness Ramon Velazco and to Comply with Brady Obligations as to All Witnesses
Filing Date
11/30/2021
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND THE PAGE
LIMIT FOR DEFENDANT’S MOTION
TO ORDER PROSECUTORS TO
INVESTIGATE AND DISCLOSE
EXCULPATORY MATERIAL AND
IMPEACHMENT REGARDING
CIVILIAN WITNESS RAMON
VELAZCO AND TO COMPLY WITH
BRADY OBLIGATIONS AS TO ALL
WITNESSES
Filing Date
11/29/2021
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/2/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O.
NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
11/29/2021
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/29/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/24/2021
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
11/24/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/30/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY BY DEFENSE WITNESS ROBERT BOIES
Filing Date
11/23/2021
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/23/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENTAL
NOTICE OF WITNESSES
Filing Date
11/22/2021
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/23/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO
EXTEND PAGE LIMIT FOR DEFENSE REPLY
(DR. GOMEZ)
Filing Date
11/22/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/24/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Reply and Motion to Strike Portions of States Response to Defendants Motion to Reconsider Ruling Precluding Defense Witness Dr. Gomez
Filing Date
11/22/2021
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/24/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Motion in limine re False and or Misleading Testimony and Argument Relating to Defendants Involuntary Illiteracy
Filing Date
11/22/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/23/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO
PRECLUDE STATE’S WITNESS
JAUREGUI
Filing Date
11/22/2021
Description
NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/23/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF INTENT TO USE
POTENTIAL 404(B) EVIDENCE OF CRUZ’S
INTERACTIONS WITH CPS AND THE
VICTIM’S CUSTODIAL TIMELINE AND
DOCUMENTATION
Filing Date
11/22/2021
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND THE PAGE
LIMIT FOR DEFENDANT’S REPLY
TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
RECONSIDER RULING
PRECLUDING DEFENSE WITNESS
DR. GOMEZ
Filing Date
11/19/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR
STATE TO CORRECT RECORD
RE: FACTUAL ALLEGATION AND
REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS
Filing Date
11/19/2021
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
11/19/2021
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Motion for Reconsideration of Courts Ruling Denying Defendants Motion in limine re: Alleged Methamphetamine Use and Request for Sanctions
Filing Date
11/19/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REPLY TO
STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
RECONSIDER RULING
PRECLUDING DEFENSE WITNESS
DR. GOMEZ
Filing Date
11/17/2021
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/17/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO
STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENSE MOTION TO
CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
11/9/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
11/1/2021
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/2/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO CRUZ’S MOTION
TO RECONSIDER THE COURT’S RULING
RE: DR. GOMEZ
Filing Date
10/29/2021
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/29/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO SPECIFIC DISCLOSURE RE: DEFENDANT’S STATEMENTS
Filing Date
10/27/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/27/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/26/2021
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/27/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
10/26/2021
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/27/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S GOOD FAITH TRIAL WITNESS LIST AND REQUEST FOR DEFENSE GOOD FAITH TRIAL WITNESS LIST
Filing Date
10/26/2021
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/27/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
10/25/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/27/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2021
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/25/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND THE PAGE LIMIT FOR DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO STATES NOTICE
Filing Date
10/14/2021
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/14/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2021
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/13/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/13/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/2021
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
RECONSIDER RULING
PRECLUDING DEFENSE WITNESS
DR. GOMEZ
Filing Date
10/12/2021
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND THE PAGE
LIMIT FOR DEFENDANT’S MOTION
TO RECONSIDER RULING
PRECLUDING DEFENSE WITNESS
DR. GOMEZ
Filing Date
10/8/2021
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/8/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/8/2021
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/11/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR
SPECIFIC DISCLOSURE RE:
DEFENDANT’S STATEMENTS
Filing Date
10/5/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REPLY – MOTION TO PRECLUDE CHILDHOOD AND CULTURAL BACKGROUND
Filing Date
10/5/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/5/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/5/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REPLY ON STATE’S MOTION FOR
DEFENSE TO DISCLOSE TRANSCRIPTS
Filing Date
9/30/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO
STATE’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE
EVIDENCE RELATED TO
DEFENDANT’S CHILDHOOD OR
CULTURAL BACKGROUND
Filing Date
9/30/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Response to States Motion for Defense Disclosure of Transcripts
Filing Date
9/24/2021
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/24/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2021
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/24/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O.
NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
9/20/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR DEFENSE DISCLOSE
OF TRANSCRIPTS
Filing Date
9/20/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE RELATED TO DEFENDANT’S CHILDHOOD OR CULTURAL BACKGROUND
Filing Date
9/17/2021
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/23/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/16/2021
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/16/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/2021
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENTAL
NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
9/14/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REPLY - MOTION TO PRECLUDE DEFENSE EXPERT DR. LUGO
Filing Date
9/13/2021
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO
STATE’S NOTICE OF INTENT TO
USE VIDEO RECORDING AS
INTRINSIC EVIDENCE OR 404(B)
EVIDENCE
Filing Date
9/9/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/14/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION
TO PRECLUDE DEFENSE
EXPERT DR. LUGO
Filing Date
9/1/2021
Description
NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/2/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF INTENT TO USE
INTRINSIC EVIDENCE/POTENTIAL 404(B)
EVIDENCE OF VIDEO AND TRANSCRIPT OF
THE DEFENDANT DENYING FOOD TO THE
VICTIM
Filing Date
8/30/2021
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/30/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/30/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTON TO PRECLUDE DEFENSE
EXPERT DR. LUGO
Filing Date
8/26/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/27/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY – STATE’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE DEFENSE CIVILIAN WITNESSES
Filing Date
8/25/2021
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/25/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/24/2021
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/24/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/23/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO
STATE’S MOTION FOR
DEPOSITION OF WITNESS
GONZALES
Filing Date
8/23/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MODIFICATION
TO WITNESS LIST
Filing Date
8/23/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION
TO PRECLUDE DEFENSE
CIVILIAN WITNESSES
Filing Date
8/19/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/20/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REPLY TO DEFENDANT’S
RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION TO
PRECLUDE THIRD PARTY CULPABILITY
DEFENSE EVIDENCE WITHOUT PROPER
NOTICE
Filing Date
8/19/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/23/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY – STATE’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE MENTAL HEALTH EXPERTS SULLIVAN, GOMEZ, AND LLORENTE
Filing Date
8/19/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/23/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REPLY TO DEFENDANT’S
RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION TO
PRECLUDE REFERENCE TO CODEFENDANT
VELAZCO’S GUILTY PLEA,
CONVICTION, AND SENTENCING
Filing Date
8/19/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/23/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY – STATE’S MOTION TO UNSEAL CRUZ’S RULE 11 COMPETENCY REPORTS AND PROVIDE FULL UNREDACED COPIES TO THE STATE
Filing Date
8/16/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/18/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to States Motion to Unseal Cruzs Rule 11 Competency Reports and Provide Full Unredacted Copies to the State
Filing Date
8/16/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/18/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to States Motion to Preclude Reference to Co-Defendant Velazcos Guilty Plea, Conviction, and Sentencing
Filing Date
8/16/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/18/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION
TO PRECLUDE MENTAL
HEALTH EXPERTS SULLIVAN,
GOMEZ, AND LLORENTE
Filing Date
8/16/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/19/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to States Motion to Preclude Third Party Culpability Defense Evidence without Proper Notice
Filing Date
8/12/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR DEPOSITION OF WITNESS GONZALES
Filing Date
8/12/2021
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Supplemental Notice of Witnesses
Filing Date
8/12/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PRECLUDE DEFENSE CIVILIAN WITNESSES
Filing Date
8/10/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE THIRD PARTY CULPABILITY DEFENSE EVIDENCE WITHOUT PROPER NOTICE
Filing Date
8/9/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/11/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE REFERENCE TO CO-DEFENDANT VELAZCO’S GUILTY PLEA, CONVICTION, AND SENTENCING
Filing Date
8/9/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/11/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO UNSEAL CRUZ'S RULE 11 COMPETENCY REPORTS AND PROVIDE FULL UNREDACTED COPIES TO THE STATE
Filing Date
8/9/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/11/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE MENTAL HEALTH EXPERTS SULLIVAN, GOMEZ, AND LLORENT
Filing Date
8/5/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/5/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2021
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/30/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/3/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE
TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION in
limine RE: ALLEGED
METHAMPHETAMINE USE
Filing Date
7/23/2021
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING
METHAMPHETAMINE
Filing Date
7/13/2021
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/14/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Cruz - Motion in limine RE: Alleged Methamphetamine Use
Filing Date
7/12/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION IN
LIMINE RE: PRIOR MISDEMEANOR
RECKLESS DRIVING CONVICTION
Filing Date
7/12/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to States Response to Defendants Motion in limine re: Prior Misdemeanor Reckless Driving Conviction
Filing Date
7/8/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/8/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/25/2021
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/28/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion in limine re: Prior Misdemeanor Reckless Driving Conviction
Filing Date
6/25/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/28/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REPLY TO
STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
PRECLUDE STATEMENTS
REGARDING UNCHARGED ACTS
AND IMPROPER OPINION
TESTIMONY AND REFERENCE
TO POLYGRAPH EXAM
Filing Date
6/21/2021
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE STATEMENTS REGARDING UNCHARGED ACTS AND IMPROPER OPINION TESTIMONY AND REFERENCE TO POLYGRAPH EXAM
Filing Date
6/17/2021
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/17/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/2021
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
5/26/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/27/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REPLY RE: REQUEST FOR
INFORMATION REGARDING THE
MEXICAN NATIONAL DEFENSE WITNESS
INTERVIEWS
Filing Date
5/25/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Motion to Preclude Statements regarding Uncharged Acts and Improper Opinion Testimony and Reference to Polygraph Exam
Filing Date
5/21/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/24/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Response to States Request for Information Regarding the Mexican National Defense Witness Interviews
Filing Date
5/20/2021
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR INFORMATION REGARDING THE MEXICAN NATIONAL DEFENSE WITNESS INTERVIEWS
Filing Date
4/22/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/22/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2021
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Second Notice of Trial Preparation
Filing Date
3/30/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/31/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO
STATE’S AMENDED MOTION TO
PRESERVE WITNESS
STATEMENTS AND ASSOCIATED
DEFENSE TEAM WITNESS NOTES
Filing Date
3/26/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S AMENDED MOTION TO
PRESERVE ALL WRITTEN AND RECORDED
DEFENSE WITNESS STATEMENTS AND
ASSOCIATED DEFENSE TEAM WITNESS
NOTES
Filing Date
3/25/2021
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/25/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/24/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/25/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO PRESERVE ALL
WRITTEN AND RECORDED DEFENSE
WITNESS STATEMENTS AND ASSOCIATED
DEFENSE TEAM WITNESS NOTES
Filing Date
3/17/2021
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/17/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/12/2021
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
3/8/2021
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/17/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/26/2021
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
2/23/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/23/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2021
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/23/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/19/2021
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/19/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Closing Argument Re: Motions to Suppress Statements
Filing Date
1/29/2021
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CLOSING ARGUMENT (DEFENDANT’S STATEMENTS – OMNIBUS EVIDENTIARY HEARING)
Filing Date
1/26/2021
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/26/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/2021
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/26/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/2021
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
HEARING
Filing Date
1/5/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/7/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO
STATE’S MEMORANDUM OF
LAW: EXPERT TESTIMONY
REGARDING CRUZ’
STATEMENTS
Filing Date
12/21/2020
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/22/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY AMENDED MOTION TO SUPPRESS DCS STATEMENTS
Filing Date
12/18/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/21/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S NOTICE OF
REBUTTAL EXPERT WITNESS
AND REPORTS FOR
SUPPRESSION HEARING
SCHEDULED JANUARY 15, 2021
Filing Date
12/17/2020
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/18/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW: EXPERT TESTIMONY RGARDING CRUZ'S STATEMENTS
Filing Date
12/16/2020
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/17/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR VOLUNTARINESS HEARING
Filing Date
12/15/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/16/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
WITNESSES FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING
ON JANUARY 15, 2020
Filing Date
12/11/2020
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/11/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/10/2020
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/11/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES RESP TO AMENDED MOTION TO SUPPRESS DCS STATEMENTS
Filing Date
12/9/2020
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/9/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE FOR SUPPRESSION HEARING SCHEDULED JANUARY 15,2021
Filing Date
12/9/2020
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/9/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Request for Voluntariness Hearing
Filing Date
12/9/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/10/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S INITIAL NOTICE OF WITNESSES
FOR THE OMNIMUS EVIDENTIARY
HEARING SET FOR JANUARY 15, 2021
Filing Date
12/2/2020
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/2/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2020
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/1/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2020
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/1/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/1/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/27/2020
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/30/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY MOTION SUPPRESS CULTURAL BARRIER MIRANDA
Filing Date
11/25/2020
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/1/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXTENDING PAGE LIMIT FOR MOTION TO SUPPRESS STATEMENTS
Filing Date
11/25/2020
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/1/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE STATES RESPONSE TIME AND PAGE LIMITS
Filing Date
11/25/2020
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/1/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
REMOVING THE RECORD DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SUPPRESS DEFENDANTS STATEMENTS TO CHILD SERVICES
Filing Date
11/24/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/24/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/24/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/24/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED MOTION TO SUPPRESS DCS STATEMENTS
Filing Date
11/24/2020
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/24/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO EXTEND RESPONSE
DEADLINE AND PAGE LIMITS
Filing Date
11/23/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/24/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED MOTION SUPPRESS DCS STATEMENTS
Filing Date
11/23/2020
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/24/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND THE PAGE
LIMIT FOR DEFENDANT’S MOTION
TO SUPPRESS STATEMENTS TO
THE DEPARTMENT OF CHILD
SERVICES
Filing Date
11/23/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/24/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO REMOVE
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
SUPPRESS DEFENDANT’S
STATEMENTS TO THE
DEPARTMENT OF CHILD
SERVICES FROM THE RECORD
AND REPLACE WITH AMENDED
MOTION TO SUPPRESS
DEFENDANT’S STATEMENTS TO
THE DEPARTMENT OF CHILD
Filing Date
11/23/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/23/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO SUPPRESS DEF STATEMENTS TO DCS
Filing Date
11/19/2020
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/19/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/19/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2020
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/20/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE MOTION TO SUPPRESS CULTURAL BARRIER MIRANDA
Filing Date
11/18/2020
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/19/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES RESP TO SUPPRESS - TREATY VIOLATIONS
Filing Date
11/13/2020
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/13/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2020
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/13/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO SUPPRESS STATEMENTS BASED UPON INTELLECTUAL DISABILITY
Filing Date
11/13/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/16/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO SUPPRESS - TREATY VIOLATIONS
Filing Date
11/13/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/16/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO SUPPRESS CULTURAL BARRIER - MIRANDA
Filing Date
11/13/2020
Description
MFH - Motion For Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/16/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR A
CONSOLIDATED HEARING
REGARDING MOTIONS TO
SUPPRESS AND REQUEST FOR AN
EVIDENTIARY HEARING
Filing Date
11/13/2020
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/16/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFS REPLY RE MOTION FOR ACCOMODATIONS
Filing Date
11/10/2020
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/10/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR ACCOMODATIONS UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT
Filing Date
11/4/2020
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/4/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/3/2020
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/3/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/3/2020
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/3/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR A ONE WEEK EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE DEFENSE MOTION TO SUPPRESS DEFENDANT STATEMENTS
Filing Date
10/30/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/30/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR
ACCOMMODATIONS UNDER THE
AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES
ACT
Filing Date
10/30/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/30/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S FIRST NOTICE OF
TRIAL PREPARATION
Filing Date
10/29/2020
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/29/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/29/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/2020
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/28/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT
REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
10/27/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND THE PAGE
LIMIT FOR DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO SUPPRESS
STATEMENTS BASED UPON
INTELLECTUAL DISABILITY
Filing Date
10/27/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO SUPPRESS - INTELLECTUAL DISABILITY
Filing Date
10/26/2020
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REPLY RE: MOTION TO DETERMINE ADMISSIBILITY OF TESTIMONY OF DEFENSE WITNESSES OR ALTERNATIVELY MOTION TO PRECLUDE (ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED)
Filing Date
10/23/2020
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/23/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO
STATE’S MOTION TO
DETERMINE ADMISSIBILITY OF
TESTIMONY OF DEFENSE
WITNESSES OR ALTERNATIVELY
MOTION TO PRECLUDE
Filing Date
10/16/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/19/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO DETERMINE ADMISSIBILITY OF TESTIMONY OF DEFENSE WITNESSES OR ALTERNATIVELY MOTION TO PRECLUDE
Filing Date
10/2/2020
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/2/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2020
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/29/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
9/18/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/18/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENTAL
NOTICE OF WITNESSES
Filing Date
9/18/2020
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/21/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Second Motion to Continue Trial
Filing Date
9/16/2020
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/16/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/16/2020
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/16/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REPLY – MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENSE INTERVIEWS (Oral Argument Requested)
Filing Date
9/11/2020
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/11/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/10/2020
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/11/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO
STATE’S MOTION TO COMPEL
INTERVIEWS OF STATE’S
WITNESSES
Filing Date
9/10/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/11/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.6(b)
Filing Date
9/8/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/9/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO COMPEL INTERVIEWS OF STATE WITHESSES ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED
Filing Date
9/8/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/9/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO COMPEL INTERVIEWS OF STATE WITNESSES – ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED
Filing Date
9/8/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/9/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
REVISED STATE’S MOTION TO COMPEL INTERVIEWS OF STATE WITNESSES – ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED
Filing Date
9/8/2020
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/9/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
8/31/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/31/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/11/2020
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/11/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/11/2020
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/11/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEFENSE TO FILE A RULE 15.2 GUILT PHASE DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
8/7/2020
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/10/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT
TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
8/5/2020
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/5/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MEMORANDUM -- PROCEDURAL HISTORY OF THE CASE
Filing Date
7/15/2020
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/22/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/26/2020
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/26/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/25/2020
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/25/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2020
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/23/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
6/18/2020
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/19/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE
TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO
RETAIN JUDGE HANNAH FOR
ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
6/16/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/16/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/2020
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/17/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO
RETAIN JUDGE HANNAH FOR ALL
FURTHER PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
6/5/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/5/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO
RETAIN JUDGE HANNAH FOR
ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
5/19/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/19/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2020
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/19/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2020
Description
123 - ME: Mental Exam Def Competent - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/4/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2020
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/4/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/11/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/12/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL CLOSING
Filing Date
3/11/2020
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/12/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Memorandum to Court Re: Legal Standard of Competency
Filing Date
3/2/2020
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/2/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/19/2020
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/24/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2020
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/31/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/22/2019
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/25/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to Defendant’s Objections to
State’s Closing Reply
Filing Date
11/13/2019
Description
906 - ME: Response/Reply Times Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/13/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2019
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/18/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE MOTION TO DEFENSE
PLEADING FILED ON OCTOBER 15, 2019
Filing Date
10/15/2019
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/15/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
OBJECTIONS TO STATE’S CLOSING REPLY
Filing Date
10/9/2019
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/9/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S CLOSING REPLY
Filing Date
10/1/2019
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/2/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Closing Argument
Filing Date
9/10/2019
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/11/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
OBJECTION TO DEFENSE COUNSEL’S
NOTICE OF FILING SUPPLEMENTAL
STATEMENT
Filing Date
9/10/2019
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/11/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
CLOSUNG ARGUMENT
Filing Date
9/5/2019
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing Supplemental Statement
Filing Date
9/3/2019
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/3/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/28/2019
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/28/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/23/2019
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/26/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing STATEMENT
Filing Date
8/16/2019
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/16/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2019
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/16/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/15/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/15/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/15/2019
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/16/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S UNDERSTANDING OF
COMPETENCY HEARING SCHEDULE
AND NOTICE OF MATERIAL RELIANCE
Filing Date
8/15/2019
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/16/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING AMENDED MOTION ORDERING JUAN GONZALES TO BE TRANSPORTED FROM LOWER BUCKEYE JAIL TO MARICOPA SUPERIOR COURT
Filing Date
8/14/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/16/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTES EDITED BY DEFENSE COUNSEL
Filing Date
8/14/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/16/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNREDACTED NOTES
Filing Date
8/12/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/12/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/2019
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/13/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Tenth Supplemental Notice of Disclosure
Filing Date
8/10/2019
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/12/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Ninth Supplemental Notice of Disclosure
Filing Date
8/9/2019
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/12/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Eighth Supplemental Notice of Disclosure
Filing Date
8/9/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/14/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNREDACTED RTC RECORDS
Filing Date
8/9/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/14/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RTC RECORDS REDACTED BY DEFENSE
Filing Date
8/9/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/14/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RTC RECORDS REDACTED BY COURT
Filing Date
8/9/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/12/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Amended Motion to Transport and Order
Filing Date
8/9/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/12/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY
RELATED TO DEFENSE EXPERTS
Filing Date
8/9/2019
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/9/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/8/2019
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/9/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Seventh Notice of Disclosure for Rule 11 Hearing
Filing Date
8/8/2019
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/9/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Sixth Supplemental Notice of Disclosure
Filing Date
8/8/2019
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/9/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Sixth Notice of Disclosure for Rule 11 Hearing
Filing Date
8/7/2019
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/9/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplemental request for discovery
Filing Date
8/5/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/5/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/2/2019
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/5/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to States Response re Defense Motion to Compel RTC Expert to Review Defense Experts Supplemental Reports
Filing Date
8/2/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/7/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RTC STAFFING NOTE UNREDACTED
Filing Date
8/2/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/7/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RTC RECORDS - UNREDACTED
Filing Date
8/2/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/7/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RTC STAFFING NOTE - REDACTED BY DEFENSE
Filing Date
8/2/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/7/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RTC RECORDS - REDACTED BY DEFENSE
Filing Date
8/2/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/7/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RTC STAFFING NOTE
Filing Date
8/2/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/7/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RTC RECORDS
Filing Date
8/2/2019
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/2/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/2/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/2/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/2/2019
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/2/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/1/2019
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/1/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO MOTION TO LIMIT SCOPE
OF CROSS-EXAMINATION
Filing Date
8/1/2019
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/1/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO MOTION TO COMPEL RTC
EXPERT TO REVIEW DEFENSE EXPERT’S
SUPPLEMENTAL COMPETENCY REPORTS
Filing Date
8/1/2019
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/9/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXTENDING THE PAGE LIMIT
Filing Date
8/1/2019
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/9/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR TRANSPORT
Filing Date
7/30/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/31/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to allow witness Dr. Antolin Llorente to testify remotely at rule 11 evidentiary hearing
Filing Date
7/30/2019
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/31/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing Letter re Disclosure of Dr Llorente Raw Data
Filing Date
7/29/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/30/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Transport
Filing Date
7/29/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/30/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Preclude Testimony from Dr. Dana Kirby, or in the Alternative, to Limit such testimony, and request for daubert hearing
Filing Date
7/29/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/30/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Extend the Page Limit
Filing Date
7/26/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/29/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Transport
Filing Date
7/24/2019
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/24/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/23/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/24/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO COMPEL RESTORATION TO COMPETENCY WITNESS DR. LESLIE DANA-KIRBY TO REVIEW DEFENSE EXPERTS’ COMPETENCY REPORTS
Filing Date
7/22/2019
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/23/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S FOURTH SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO RULE 11.4
Filing Date
7/22/2019
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/23/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Fifth Supplemental Notice of Disclosure Pursuant to Rule 11.4
Filing Date
7/19/2019
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Third Supplemental Notice of Disclosure Pursuant to Rule 11.4
Filing Date
7/17/2019
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/25/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE DISCLOSURE OF THE EXPERT WITNESS MATERIAL
Filing Date
7/16/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/17/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Limit Scope of Cross Examination of Witnesses at Rule 11 Hearing
Filing Date
7/16/2019
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/17/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Supplemental Notice of Disclosure
Filing Date
7/15/2019
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/15/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Notice Pursuant to Rule 11.4(b)(1)
Filing Date
7/9/2019
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/10/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue Expert Report Disclosure Deadline
Filing Date
7/2/2019
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/3/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST TO EXCEED PAGE
LIMITATIONS FOR THE STATE’S
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S OBJECTION
TO DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT’S RAW DATA
TO NON-EXPERTS AND OBJECTION TO
PROPOSED ORDER
Filing Date
7/2/2019
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/3/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S
OBJECTION TO DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT’S
RAW DATA TO NON-EXPERTS AND
OBJECTION TO PROPOSED PROTECTIVE
ORDER
Filing Date
7/1/2019
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/1/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/28/2019
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/28/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Witnesses for Rule 11 Hearing
Filing Date
6/27/2019
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/27/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/24/2019
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/25/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Objection to Disclosure of Experts Raw Data to Non-Experts and Objection to Proposed Protective Order
Filing Date
6/4/2019
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/4/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2019
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/27/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2019
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/24/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2018
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/12/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2018
Description
124 - ME: Mental Exam Def Incompetent - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/6/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/5/2018
Description
OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/11/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/30/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/30/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/29/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/29/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/21/2018
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/21/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/20/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/30/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT TO RULE 11 COMPETENCY EVALUATION DATED 04/22/15
Filing Date
11/16/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/16/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/16/2018
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/19/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE
TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
APPOINT SPANISH SPEAKING
MENTAL HEALTH EXPERTS
Filing Date
11/14/2018
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/14/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO APPOINT SPANISH SPEAKING MENTAL HEALTH EXPERTS
Filing Date
11/9/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/9/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/13/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO APPOINT SPANISH SPEAKING MENTAL HEALTH EXPERTS
Filing Date
11/8/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/9/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SEAL SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO APPOINT SPANISH SPEAKING MENTAL HEALTH EXPERTS
Filing Date
11/8/2018
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/9/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2018
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/16/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/15/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Motion to Appoint Spanish Speaking Mental Health Experts
Filing Date
9/17/2018
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/17/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Reply to States Response to Defendants Motion for Order Designating Issues for Rule 11 Hearing and Response to States Motion to Transfer
Filing Date
9/11/2018
Description
MTT - Motion To Transfer - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/12/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES MOTION TO TRANSFER RULE 11 CASE BACK TO COMPREHENSIVE MENTAL HEALTH COURT AND RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR DESIGNATING ISSUES
Filing Date
9/7/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/10/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO TRANSFER RULE 11 CASE BACK TO COMPREHENSIVE MENTAL HEALTH COURT AND RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR DESIGNATING ISSUES
Filing Date
8/29/2018
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/29/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITHDRAWAL OF STATE’S NOTICE OF
INTENT TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY
Filing Date
8/22/2018
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/22/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/17/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
REDACTED MOTION FOR ORDER DESIGNATING ISSUES FOR RULE 11 COMPETENCY PROCEEDINGS AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Filing Date
8/16/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/16/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2018
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/16/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/15/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/16/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR ORDER DESIGNATION ISSUES FOR RULE 11 COMPETENCY PROCEEDINGS AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Filing Date
8/15/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/16/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROPOSED ORDER
Filing Date
8/15/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/17/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXTEND THE PAGE LIMIT FOR DEFENDANTS MOTION
Filing Date
8/15/2018
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/17/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SEAL DEFENDANTS MOTION
Filing Date
8/15/2018
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/17/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 11 COMPETENCY PROCEEDINGS AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Filing Date
7/12/2018
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/13/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER PROCEEDINGS AND MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
7/12/2018
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/12/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2018
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/12/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO TRANSFER PROCEEDINGS AND MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
7/9/2018
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/9/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/6/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/9/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO TRANSFER RULE 11 PROCEEDINGS FROM COMMISSIONER’S COURT TO CAPITAL CASE JUDGE AND MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
6/27/2018
Description
MTT - Motion To Transfer - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/28/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO TRANSFER RULE 11 PROCEEDINGS FROM COMMISSIONER’S COURT TO CAPITAL CASE JUDGE AND MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
6/27/2018
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/28/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND THE PAGE
LIMIT FOR DEFENDANT’S MOTION
TO TRANSFER RULE 11
PROCEEDINGS FROM
COMMISSIONER’S COURT TO
CAPITAL CASE JUDGE AND
MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
5/17/2018
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S NOTICE OF
COMPLIANCE WITH COURT’S
MAY 14, 2018 MINUTE ENTRY
Filing Date
5/15/2018
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/15/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/15/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2018
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/2/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/1/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2018
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/30/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/2018
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/25/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO CONTINUE RULE 11 HEARING
Filing Date
4/18/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/18/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 04/17/2018
Filing Date
4/17/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO TRANSPORT AND PROPOSED ORDER
Filing Date
4/17/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER TO TRANSPORT
Filing Date
4/17/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEAL DEFENDANTS MOTION AND PROPOSED ORDER
Filing Date
4/17/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER TO SEAL DEFENDANTS MOTION PROPOSED ORDER
Filing Date
4/17/2018
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/19/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2018
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/29/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPOINTING THE FOLLOWING PERSONS TO CONDUCT AN EVALUATION DR HERNANDEZ ,DR HURLEY AND THAT THE COUNSEL FOR THE DEFENDANT SHALL PROVIDE THE EXPERTS WITH ALL POLICE REPORTS,CHARGING DOCUMENTS ,COMPETENCY REPORSTAND ALL OTHER AVAILABLE MEDICAL,
Filing Date
3/8/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/12/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER
Filing Date
2/7/2018
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/7/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/1/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/7/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
PHOTOGRAPHS
Filing Date
1/31/2018
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2018
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/31/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/30/2018
Description
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration
Filing Date
1/29/2018
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/29/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIX SETS OF RECORDS FROM THE DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SAFETY(DCS)
Filing Date
1/29/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/7/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY RULING DATED 01/26/18
Filing Date
1/26/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/7/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO REDACT PORTIONS OF THE PRESENTENCE REPORT
Filing Date
1/26/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/26/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
1/26/2018
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/26/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Monetary Orders
Filing Date
1/26/2018
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/26/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Right of Review
Filing Date
1/26/2018
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/26/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
1/26/2018
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/26/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
1/19/2018
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/22/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Reply to States Response re: Defendants Objection to Rule 11 Proceedings at this time
Filing Date
1/10/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/9/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/9/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/5/2018
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/11/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
NON PARTY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SAFETYS THIRD / DCS RECORDS UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
1/5/2018
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/11/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
NON PARTY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SAFETYS FIRST / DCS RECORDS UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
1/5/2018
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/11/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
NON PARTY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SAFETYS FIFTH / DCS RECORDS UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
1/5/2018
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/11/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
NON PARTY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SAFETYS SECOND / DCS RECORDS UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
1/5/2018
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/11/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
NON PARTY DEPARTMENT OF CHILDS SAFETYS FOURTH / DCS RECORDS UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
1/3/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/28/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
NON-PARTY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SAFETY'S SUPPLEMENTAL STATUS UPDATE REGARDING SIXTH NOTICE OF FILING DCS RECORDS UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
12/27/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/28/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Non-Party Department of Child Safetys Status Update Regarding Sixth Notice of Filing DCS Records Under Seal
Filing Date
12/26/2017
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/26/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/26/2017
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
NON-PARTY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SAFETY'S SIXTH NOTICE OF FILING DCS RECORDS UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
12/20/2017
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/20/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION FILED
DECEMBER 8, 2017;
STATE’S REQUEST TO
DETERMINE DEFENDANT’S
COMPETENCY
Filing Date
12/19/2017
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/19/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/19/2017
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/3/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/19/2017
Description
OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/4/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNTS 1-7
Filing Date
12/13/2017
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/18/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXTENDING THE PAGE LIMIT FOR DEFENDANTS OBJECTION TO RULE 11 PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
12/11/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/11/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/8/2017
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/11/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Objection to Rule 11 Proceedings at this time
Filing Date
12/8/2017
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/12/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND THE PAGE
LIMIT FOR MOTION FOR
DEFENDANT’S OBJECTION TO
RULE 11 PROCEEDINGS AT THIS
TIME
Filing Date
12/6/2017
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/7/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Non-Party Department of Child Safetys Fifth Notice of Filing DCS Records Under Seal
Filing Date
11/28/2017
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/28/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/28/2017
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/28/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/21/2017
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/21/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/21/2017
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/27/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/15/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO STRIKE STATE’S
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL
INFORMATION RE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR
RULING ON THE SCOPE AND
CONDITIONS OF COURTORDERED
INTELLECTUAL
DISABILITY EVALUATIONS
Filing Date
11/15/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/15/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Strike States Notice of Supplemental Information re Defendants Motion for Video Recording of Court-Ordered Intellectual Disability Evaluations
Filing Date
11/13/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RULING ON THE SCOPE AND CONDITIONS OF COURT-ORDERED INTELLECTUAL DISABILITY EVALUATIONS
Filing Date
11/13/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR VIDEO RECORDING OF COURT-ORDERED INTELLECTIUAL DISABILITY EVALUATIONS
Filing Date
11/6/2017
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/7/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to States Response to Defendants Motion for Ruling on the Scope and Conditions of Court-Ordered Intellectual Disability Evaluations
Filing Date
11/6/2017
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/7/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE
TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR
VIDEO RECORDING OF COURTORDERED
INTELLECTUAL
DISABILITY EVALUATIONS
Filing Date
11/3/2017
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/6/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE STATE'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK DEATH PENALTY AND MOTION TO STRIKE DEATH PENALTY AS UNCONSTITUTIONAL
Filing Date
11/1/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/1/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S A.R.S. § 13-753(D)
NOMINATION
Filing Date
11/1/2017
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/1/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S REQUEST FOR
CLARIFICATION
Filing Date
11/1/2017
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/1/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR
EXPEDITED STATUS
CONFERENCE
Filing Date
10/30/2017
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/31/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION
Filing Date
10/30/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/31/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/27/2017
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/30/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR VIDEO RECORDING OF COURT-ORDERED INTELLECTUAL DISABILITY EVALUATIONS
Filing Date
10/27/2017
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/30/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RULING ON THE SCOPE AND CONDITIONS OF THE COURT ORDERED INTELLECTUAL DISABILITY EVALUATIONS
Filing Date
10/25/2017
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION
TO STRIKE INTENT TO SEEK DEATH
PENALTY AND MOTION TO STRIKE
THE DEATH PENALTY AS
UNCONSTITUTIONAL
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/31/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/31/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2017
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/19/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2017
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/19/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/18/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/18/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/18/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR RULING ON THE SCOPE AND CONDITIONS OF COURT-ORDERED INTELLECTUAL DISABILITY EVALUATIONS
Filing Date
10/18/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/18/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND THE PAGE LIMIT FOR MOTION FOR RULING ON THE SCOPE AND CONDITIONS OF COURT ORDERED INTELLECTUAL DISABILITY EVALUATIONS
Filing Date
10/18/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/18/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR VIDEO RECORDING OF COURT ORDERED INTELLECTUAL DISABILITY EVALUATIONS
Filing Date
10/18/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/18/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STRIKE STATES NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK DEATH PENALTY AND MOTION TO STRIKE DEATH PENALTY AS UNCONSTITUTIONAL
Filing Date
10/13/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/13/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Lodging Motion for Entry of Ex Parte Order and Motion to File this Pleading Under Seal
Filing Date
10/13/2017
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/13/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to States Response to Motion to Suppress Statements Per Miranda
Filing Date
10/5/2017
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/5/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2017
Description
NCJ - Notice Of Change Of Judge - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF JUDGE
Filing Date
9/28/2017
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/28/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT VELAZCO'S MOTION TO SUPPRESS STATEMENTS PER: MIRANDA
Filing Date
9/28/2017
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/28/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
NON-PARTY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SAFETY'S FOURTH NOTICE OF FILING DCS RECORDS UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
9/27/2017
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2017
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/27/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2017
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Non-Party Department of Child Safety Third Notice of Filing DCS Records Under Seal
Filing Date
9/27/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2017
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/26/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT
Filing Date
9/25/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/5/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/25/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/5/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/25/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/5/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/25/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/5/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/22/2017
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Non-Party Department of Child Safetys Second Notice of Filing DCS Records Under Seal
Filing Date
9/21/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/21/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEVER DEFENDANT’S RE: ANTAGONISTIC DEFENSES
Filing Date
9/19/2017
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/19/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Non-Party Department of Child Safetys First Notice of Filing DCS Records Under Seal
Filing Date
9/19/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/19/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING "MOTIONS FOR ENTRY OF EX PARTE ORDER" - AND - "MOTIONS TO FILE THIS PLEADING UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
9/15/2017
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/15/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT: HEARING ON 9/18/17
Filing Date
9/15/2017
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/15/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT: HEARING ON 9/18/17
Filing Date
9/14/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
NON-PARTY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SAFETY'S MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION OF THE COURT'S ORDER TO PRODUCE RECORDS
Filing Date
9/13/2017
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Non-Party Department of Child Safetys Motion for Extension of Time for the Production of Department of Child Safety Emails and Attachments
Filing Date
9/12/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/11/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/11/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Sever Defendants Per Bruton
Filing Date
9/11/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/11/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Suppress Per Miranda
Filing Date
9/6/2017
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/7/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE
FILED AUGUST 28, 2017 AND
STATE’S PROPOSED PROCESS
FOR MOVING FORWARD
Filing Date
9/5/2017
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PRODUCE RECORDS
Filing Date
8/31/2017
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/31/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/31/2017
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/31/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2017
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/30/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2017
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/30/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/28/2017
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/28/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FILED AUGUST 17, 2017, AND OTHER PLEADINGS1; AND
STATE’S PROPOSED PROCESS FOR MOVING FORWARD
Filing Date
8/28/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/25/2017
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/25/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/24/2017
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/30/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING NON-PARTY DEPT OF CHILD SAFETY MOTION TO RESPOND UNDER SEAL TO THE DEFENDANT MOTION FOR PRODUCTION OF RECORDS
Filing Date
8/23/2017
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/23/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/23/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/23/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/23/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/23/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Non-Party Department of Child Safetys Motion to File Documents Under Seal
Filing Date
8/22/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR PRODUCTION OF CPS/DCS RECORDS
Filing Date
8/22/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR ENTRY OF EX PARTE ORDER AND MOTION TO FILE THIS PLEADING UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
8/22/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
EX PARTE ORDER
Filing Date
8/22/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER TO PRODUCE RECORDS
Filing Date
8/22/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/25/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS MOT TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
8/22/2017
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT THE DOCUMENTS BATES STAMPED #6996-7008 TO BE DISCLOSED BY THE MARICOPA CUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE SHALL NOT BE DISSEMINATE DTO ANYONE OTHER THANT COUNSEL FOR THE DEFENDANT
Filing Date
8/22/2017
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/8/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT THE DOCUMENTS BATES-STAMPED#6996-7008 TO BE DISCLOSED BY THE MARICOPA COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE SHALLNOT BE DISSEMINATED TO ANYONE OTHER THAN COUNSEL FOR THE DEFENDANT
Filing Date
8/17/2017
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/17/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Objection to States Intelligence Testing and Adaptive Deficit Investigation
Filing Date
8/16/2017
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/16/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing Letter - Mutual Legal Assistance Treaty
Filing Date
8/10/2017
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REPLY RE:
MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
PURSUANT TO RULE 15
Filing Date
8/10/2017
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: OME RECORDS
Filing Date
8/9/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/9/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/9/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/9/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/7/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/8/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15 AND PROPOSED ORDER [OME PERSONNEL RECORDS]
Filing Date
8/7/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/8/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15 AND PROPOSED ORDER [OME PERSONNEL RECORDS]
Filing Date
8/2/2017
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/7/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 07/21/2017
Filing Date
8/1/2017
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/1/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/1/2017
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2017
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/28/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2017
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/28/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2017
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/8/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROPOSED ORDER
Filing Date
7/28/2017
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/8/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/8/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF FILING EXHIBITS RE: MOTION TO STRIKE INTELLIGENCE TESTING REPORT BY JOHN J TOMA PH.D.
Filing Date
7/27/2017
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/28/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Non-Party Department of Child Safetys Response to Motion for Order to show Cause Regarding Arizona Department of Child Safetys Failure to Comply with Court Order to Compel Unredacted Discovery
Filing Date
7/27/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/27/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS RE: RESPONSE TO STATE'S REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION OF COURT'S JUNE 22,2017 RULING AND OPPOSITION TO A.R.S. 13-753(D) PROCEDURES
Filing Date
7/27/2017
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/27/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION FOR DISCOVERY RE: FRANCISCO
GOMEZ JR., Ph.D.
Filing Date
7/27/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/27/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Notice of Disclosure re Francisco Gomez
Filing Date
7/27/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/27/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Disclose Raw Data
Filing Date
7/26/2017
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT:
HEARING ON 7/28/17
Filing Date
7/26/2017
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT: HEARING ON 7/28/17
Filing Date
7/26/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO STRIKE INTELLIGENCE TESTING REPORT BY JOHN J. TOMA, PH.D.
Filing Date
7/26/2017
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND THE PAGE
LIMIT FOR MOTION TO STRIKE
INTELLIGENCE TESTING REPORT
BY JOHN J. TOMA, Ph.D.
Filing Date
7/26/2017
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request to Unseal Defense Motion to Strike Intelligence Testing Report by Dr. John J. Toma, Ph.D
Filing Date
7/26/2017
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to States Request for Clarification of Courts June 22, 2017 Ruling and Opposition to A.R.S. 13-753(D) procedures
Filing Date
7/24/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/24/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Join in Co-Defendants Motion to Compel Disclosure of Documents Related to Scientific Testing of Autopsy Items
Filing Date
7/23/2017
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/8/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE DR FRANCIISCO GOMEZ JR
Filing Date
7/21/2017
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/21/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/21/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/21/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Order to Show Cause Regarding Arizona Department of Child Safetys Failure to Comply with Court Order to Compel Unredacted Discovery (Oral Argument and Evidentiary Hearing Requested)
Filing Date
7/20/2017
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/20/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO COMPEL DISCLOSURE OF
DOCUMENTS RELATED TO SCIENTIFIC
TESTING OF AUTOPSY ITEMS
Filing Date
7/19/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/19/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Compel Disclosure of Documents Related to Scientific Testing of Autopsy Items
Filing Date
7/17/2017
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION
TO COMPEL DISCLOSURE OF DNA
EVIDENCE
Filing Date
7/14/2017
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2017
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/12/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Extend Time
Filing Date
7/7/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/7/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/7/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/7/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/6/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/6/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Compel DNA Discovery
Filing Date
7/5/2017
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/5/2017
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/29/2017
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Reply to States Response to Defendants Motion to Continue Trial
Filing Date
6/28/2017
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15
Filing Date
6/28/2017
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING STATES MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15
Filing Date
6/27/2017
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/27/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT:
HEARING ON 6/28/17
Filing Date
6/27/2017
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/27/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT: HEARING ON 6/28/17
Filing Date
6/27/2017
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/27/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
6/27/2017
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/27/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
6/27/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/27/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15
Filing Date
6/27/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/27/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15
Filing Date
6/27/2017
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/27/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to States Response to Motion to Continue
Filing Date
6/26/2017
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION OF COURT’S JUNE 22, 2017 RULING AND OPPOSITION TO A.R.S. § 13-753(D) PROCEDURES
Filing Date
6/26/2017
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue
Filing Date
6/26/2017
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Motion to Continue Trial
Filing Date
6/26/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/26/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 06/22/2017
Filing Date
6/22/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO STRIKE INTELLIGENCE TESTING REPORT BY DR JOHN TOMA
Filing Date
6/22/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE EX PARTE AND UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
6/22/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 06/22/2017
Filing Date
6/22/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEAL DEFENDANTS MOTION AND PROPOSED ORDER
Filing Date
6/22/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER TO SEAL DEFENDANTS MOTION AND PROPOSED ORDER
Filing Date
6/22/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO TRANSPORT AND PROPOSED ORDER
Filing Date
6/22/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER TO TRANSPORT
Filing Date
6/22/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPORT OF INTELLIGENCE TESTING
Filing Date
6/7/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 06/07/17
Filing Date
6/7/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
EX PARTE MOTION
Filing Date
6/7/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER
Filing Date
6/1/2017
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/1/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/1/2017
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/1/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/31/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/31/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/31/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/25/2017
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/25/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUESTED ORDER RE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR DISCOVERY RE:
FRANCISCO GOMEZ JR., Ph.D.
Filing Date
5/22/2017
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/22/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT: HEARING ON 5/24/17
Filing Date
5/22/2017
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/22/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT: HEARING ON 5/24/17
Filing Date
5/16/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/16/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/2017
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/12/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2017
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/8/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO RECONSIDER ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENDANT’S WAIVER
Filing Date
5/4/2017
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/4/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/3/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEATH PENALTY AND TO WITHDRAW WAIVER OF ARS 13-753
Filing Date
5/2/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/3/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO SEAL MOTION DATED 04/26/2017
Filing Date
5/2/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/3/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER SEALING MOTION DATED 04/26/2017
Filing Date
4/27/2017
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/27/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DISCOVERY RE: FRANCISCO GOMEZ JR., Ph.D.
Filing Date
4/26/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/26/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/26/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/20/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER TO SEAL DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEATH PENALTY AND WITHDRAWAL OF WAIVER OF A.R.S.13-753 AND ATTACHMENTS
Filing Date
4/20/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEAL DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEATH PENALTY AND WITHDRAWAL OF WAIVER OF A.R.S. 13-753 AND ATTACHEMENTS
Filing Date
4/20/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO STRIKE DEATH PENALTY AND TO WITHDRAW WAIVER OF A.R.S 13-753
Filing Date
4/17/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2017
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND THE
MITIGATION DEADLINE AND JOIN
IN MS. VELAZCO’S NOTICE OF
IMPENDING MITIGATION
DISCLOSURE DEADLINE AND
DEFENDANT’S INABILIITY TO
COMPLY
Filing Date
3/24/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/24/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF IMPENDING
MITIGATION DISCLOSURE
DEADLINE AND DEFENDANT’S
INABILITY TO COMPLY
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/20/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/14/2017
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2017
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/9/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENTAL
REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
3/3/2017
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/3/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
3/1/2017
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF
COUNSEL
Filing Date
1/23/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/23/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/23/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2016
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF LODGING MOTIONS FOR ENTRY OF EX PARTE ORDER AND MOTIONS TO FILE THIS PLEADING UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
12/1/2016
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/1/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW REGARDING REVIEW OF IN CAMERA COMMUNICATIONS OR REQUESTS
Filing Date
12/1/2016
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW REGARDING REVIEW OF IN CAMERA COMMUNICATIONS OR REQUESTS
Filing Date
11/5/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF LODGING "MOTIONS FOR ENTRY OF EX PARTE ORDER" AND "MOTIONS TO FILE THIS PLEADING UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
11/5/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR ENTRY OF EX PARTE ORDER AND MOTION TO FILE THIS PLEADING UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
11/5/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
EX PARTE ORDER TO PRODUCE RECORDS
Filing Date
11/5/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR ENTRY OF EX PARTE ORDER AND MOTION TO FILE THIS PLEADING UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
11/5/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
EX PARTE ORDER TO PRODUCE RECORDS
Filing Date
11/5/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR ENTRY OF EX PARTE ORDER AND MOTION TO FILE THIS PLEADING UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
11/5/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
EX PARTE ORDER TO PRODUCE RECORDS
Filing Date
11/5/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR ENTRY OF EX PARTE ORDER AND MOTION TO FILE THIS PLEADING UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
11/5/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
EX PARTE ORDER TO PROCUCE RECORDS
Filing Date
11/3/2016
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/3/2016
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/3/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/27/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/28/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT: HEARING ON 11/1/16
Filing Date
10/27/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/28/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT: HEARING ON 11/1/16
Filing Date
10/25/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/27/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 10/25/16
Filing Date
10/25/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/27/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
EX PARTE MOTION
Filing Date
10/25/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/27/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
EX PARTE ORDER
Filing Date
10/20/2016
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/20/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF LODGING "MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CITS FOR TRANSLATION AND TRANSCRIPTION SERVICES" - AND - "MOTIONS TO FILE THE PLEADING UNDER SEAL"
Filing Date
9/2/2016
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/2/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/2/2016
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/2/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/2/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS EXPARTE MOTION AND ORDER
Filing Date
9/2/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS EXPARTE MOTION AND ORDER
Filing Date
9/2/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS EXPARTE MOTION AND ORDER
Filing Date
9/2/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS EXPARTE MOTION AND ORDER
Filing Date
9/2/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS EXPARTE MOTION AND ORDER.
Filing Date
9/2/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS EXPARTE MOTION AND ORDER
Filing Date
9/2/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS EXPARTE MOTION AND ORDER
Filing Date
9/2/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS EXPARTE MOTION AND ORDER
Filing Date
8/30/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/31/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT: HEARING ON 9/1/16
Filing Date
8/30/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/31/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT: HEARING ON 9/1/16
Filing Date
8/23/2016
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/23/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF LODGING “MOTIONS FOR ENTRY OF EX PARTE ORDER” - AND - “MOTIONS TO FILE THIS PLEADING UNDER SEAL”
Filing Date
8/3/2016
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/3/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/3/2016
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/3/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/1/2016
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/3/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DOCUMENTS/CD'S
Filing Date
7/28/2016
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/28/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2016
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/28/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/18/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT: HEARING ON 7/21/16
Filing Date
7/18/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/18/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT: HEARING ON 7/21/16
Filing Date
7/18/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/18/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO JOIN IN CODEFENDANT VELAZCO’S MOTION TO STRIKE STATE’S AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY, NOTICE OF AGGRAVATING FACTORS AND WITNESSES
Filing Date
7/11/2016
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/11/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO STRIKE
STATE’S AMENDED NOTICE OF
INTENT TO SEEK THE DEATH
PENALTY, NOTICE OF AGGRAVATING
FACTORS AND WITNESSES
Filing Date
7/7/2016
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/7/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/21/2016
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/21/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO STRIKE THE STATE’S AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK DEATH PENALTY, NOTICE OF AGGRAVATING FACTORS AND WITNESSES
Filing Date
6/16/2016
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/16/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO STRIKE
STATE’S AMENDED NOTICE OF
INTENT TO SEEK THE DEATH
PENALTY, NOTICE OF AGGRAVATING
FACTORS AND WITNESSES
Filing Date
6/15/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/15/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO STRIKE STATE'S AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY, NOTICE OF AGGRAVATING FACTORS AND WITNESSES
Filing Date
6/2/2016
Description
NID - Notice of Intent to Seek the Death Penalty - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY, NOTICE OF AGGRAVATING FACTORS AND WITNESSES
Filing Date
6/2/2016
Description
NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/2/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY, NOTICE OF AGGRAVATING FACTORS ANDWITNESSES
Filing Date
5/23/2016
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/23/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2016
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/23/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2016
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2016
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/3/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/28/2016
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
4/28/2016
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/28/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
4/27/2016
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/27/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
4/27/2016
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/27/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
4/13/2016
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2016
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/16/2016
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/16/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/16/2016
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/16/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/16/2016
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/16/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/16/2016
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/16/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/8/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT: HEARING ON 2/11/16
Filing Date
2/8/2016
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/8/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT: HEARING ON 2/11/16
Filing Date
2/1/2016
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/1/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR STAY OF
PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
1/21/2016
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/21/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2016
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/21/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/20/2016
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/20/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED 1-20-16
Filing Date
1/20/2016
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/15/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/20/2016
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/15/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/20/2016
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/6/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/11/2016
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/11/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/11/2016
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/11/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/7/2016
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/13/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DOCUMENTS DISCLOSED BY MCAO SHALL NOT BE DISSEMINATED TO ANYONE OTHER THAN COUNSEL
Filing Date
1/7/2016
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/7/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
1/7/2016
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/7/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
1/6/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/6/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15
AND PROPOSED ORDER
Filing Date
1/6/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/6/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15
AND PROPOSED ORDER
Filing Date
1/4/2016
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR COURT TO ASSIGN INDEPENDENT JUDGE TO REVIEW IN CAMERA DOCUMENTS PRIOR TO DISSEMINATION TO PARTIES
Filing Date
12/29/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/29/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR COURT TO ASSIGN
INDEPENDENT JUDGE TO
REVIEW IN CAMERA
DOCUMENTS PRIOR TO
DISSEMINATION TO PARTIES
Filing Date
12/15/2015
Description
095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/15/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2015
Description
095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/15/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/11/2015
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/15/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT THE WITNESS M B DOCUMENT BATE STAMPED 2259 2267 BE DISCLOSED TO DEFENSE COUNSEL IN ITS ENTIRETY OR REDACTED AS DIRECTED BY THIS COURT
Filing Date
12/11/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
M.B. AKA M.V. DOCUMENTS
Filing Date
12/9/2015
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/10/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT:
HEARING ON 12/11/15
Filing Date
12/9/2015
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/10/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT: HEARING ON 12/11/15
Filing Date
12/8/2015
Description
095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/8/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/8/2015
Description
095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/24/2015
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATUS UPDATE REGARDING PRODUCTIN OF DCS RECORDS
Filing Date
11/19/2015
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/19/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2015
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/17/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2015
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/17/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2015
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/13/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2015
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/13/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/2/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/2/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CORRECT THE RECORD
Filing Date
10/26/2015
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/26/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/26/2015
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/26/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/20/2015
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/21/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT: HEARING ON 10/29/15
Filing Date
10/20/2015
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/21/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT:
HEARING ON 10/29/15
Filing Date
10/9/2015
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/9/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2015
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/7/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2015
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/7/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2015
Description
OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/15/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2015
Description
OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/6/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/7/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SEAL DEFENDANTS REQUEST TO PRESERVE BIOLOGICAL SAMPLES OF VICTIM
Filing Date
10/6/2015
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/7/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST TO PRESERVE BIOLOGICAL SAMPLES OF VICTIM PURSUANT TO ARCP 15.1(G)
Filing Date
10/6/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/8/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER
Filing Date
10/5/2015
Description
CER - Certificate - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/7/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF SERVICE
Filing Date
10/5/2015
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/5/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO
PRESCREENING IQ TESTS AND
PRESCREENING COMPETENCY
AND SANITY EVALUATIONS
Filing Date
10/1/2015
Description
960 ME: Capital Case Assignment and Scheduling Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/1/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/1/2015
Description
960 ME: Capital Case Assignment and Scheduling Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/1/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/1/2015
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/1/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to States Response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Remand to the Grand Jury for New Determination of Probable Cause
Filing Date
9/23/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO HOLD DEFENDANT
WITHOUT BOND
Filing Date
9/23/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO HOLD DEFENDANT
WITHOUT BOND
Filing Date
9/22/2015
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/22/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RULE 15.1 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR SPECIFIC DISCOVERY
Filing Date
9/22/2015
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/22/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO DISMISS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO REMAND TO THE GRAND JURY FOR NEW DETERMINATION OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Filing Date
9/18/2015
Description
NID - Notice of Intent to Seek the Death Penalty - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/18/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY, NOTICE OF AGGRAVATING FACTORS AND WITNESSES
Filing Date
9/18/2015
Description
NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/18/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK
THE DEATH PENALTY, NOTICE OF
AGGRAVATING FACTORS AND
WITNESSES
Filing Date
9/17/2015
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/17/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/17/2015
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/17/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/15/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/16/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND THE PAGE
LIMIT FOR MOTION TO DISMISS
OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO
REMAND FOR A NEW FINDING OF
PROBABLE CAUSE
Filing Date
9/15/2015
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/16/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Remand to the Grand Jury for New Determination of Probable Cause
Filing Date
9/14/2015
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/14/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S REQUEST TO
PRESERVE BIOLOGICAL SAMPLES OF
VICTIM PURSUANT TO ARCP 15.1(G)
AND STATE’S PROPOSED ORDER
Filing Date
9/11/2015
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/11/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2, ARIZ. R. CRIM. PRO.
Filing Date
9/9/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/9/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO
PRESERVE BIOLOGICAL
SAMPLES OF VICTIM
PURSUANT TO ARCP 15.1(G) AND
PROPOSED ORDER
Filing Date
9/4/2015
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/4/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/28/2015
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/28/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND RULE 35.1
TIME FOR FILING
Filing Date
8/26/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/26/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW OF M.B. AKA M.V. DOCUMENTS BSN 2259–2267 AND PROPOSED ORDER
Filing Date
8/26/2015
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/26/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR PRODUCTION OF CPS/DCS RECORDS
Filing Date
8/26/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/26/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR IN CAMERA
REVIEW OF M.B. AKA M.V. DOCUMENTS
BSN 2259–2267 AND PROPOSED ORDER
Filing Date
8/18/2015
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM/SERVED 08/14/2015
Filing Date
8/13/2015
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/13/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/2015
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/13/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/11/2015
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THE DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SAFETY TO PRODUCE RECORDS
Filing Date
7/31/2015
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/31/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR THE DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SAFETY TO PRODUCE RECORDS
Filing Date
7/30/2015
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/30/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND RULE 15.2 TIME LIMIT
Filing Date
7/30/2015
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/3/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
OR TAPES PURSUANT TO MARICOPA COUNTY LOCAL RULE 2.8E
Filing Date
7/29/2015
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/29/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/2015
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/29/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/2015
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/29/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND
REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF
REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
7/28/2015
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/30/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT DEFENDANT SUBMIT TO THE TAKING OF BUCCAL SWABS
Filing Date
7/28/2015
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/30/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT DEFENDANT SUBMIT TO THE TAKING OF BUCCAL SWABS
Filing Date
7/24/2015
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/24/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/24/2015
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/24/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/24/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S AMENDED MOTION FOR TAKING PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND PROPOSED ORDER
Filing Date
7/24/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S AMENDED MOTION FOR TAKING PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND PROPOSED ORDER
Filing Date
7/23/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/23/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/23/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/23/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/23/2015
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/23/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/23/2015
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/27/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPOINTING INTERPRETATION TRANSLATION SERVICES TO THIS CAUSE NUMBER FOR ASSISTANCE WITH TRANSCRIPTION AND TRANSLATION OF INTERVIEW TAPES AND DOCUMENTS
Filing Date
7/23/2015
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/27/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPOINTING A SPANISH INTERPRETER TO THIS CAUSE NUMBER FOR ASSISTANCE WITH TRANSCRIPTION/TRANSLATION OF AUDIO RECORDINGS AND/OR INTERVIEWS OF THE DEFENDANT AND WITNESSES
Filing Date
7/22/2015
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/27/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/22/2015
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/24/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/22/2015
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/27/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2015
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/16/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR COURT INTERPRETER
Filing Date
7/15/2015
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/16/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR COURT INTERPRETER
Filing Date
7/14/2015
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/14/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
7/14/2015
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/14/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIORS
Filing Date
7/14/2015
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/14/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
7/14/2015
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/14/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 609
Filing Date
7/14/2015
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/14/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
7/14/2015
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/14/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING
CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
7/10/2015
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/10/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/8/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/9/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR PRODUCTION OF CPS/DCS RECORDS
Filing Date
7/8/2015
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/9/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER TO PRODUCE RECORDS
Filing Date
7/2/2015
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/2/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/2/2015
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/9/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/29/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION FOR TAKING PHYSICAL
EVIDENCE AND PROPOSED ORDER
Filing Date
6/29/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION FOR TAKING PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND PROPOSED ORDER
Filing Date
6/26/2015
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/1/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/26/2015
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/1/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/26/2015
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/1/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/24/2015
Description
RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR
EXTENSION OF TIME TO
CHALLENGE THE GRAND
JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
6/24/2015
Description
RAD - Request For Automatic Additional Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR AUTOMATIC DISCLOSURE REQUIRED BY RULE 15.1 (A) AND (B) AND REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DISCLOSURE REQUIRED BY RULE 15.1 (C)
Filing Date
6/22/2015
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/22/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2015
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/22/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2015
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/22/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
6/22/2015
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/25/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/17/2015
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/19/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/17/2015
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/19/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/17/2015
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/19/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY/
Filing Date
6/15/2015
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/15/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND RULE 12.9 DEADLINE
Filing Date
6/11/2015
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/12/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1(I) TO EXTEND STATES TIME TO FILE NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK DEATH PENALTY
Filing Date
6/11/2015
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/12/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXTEND THE DATE OF FILING A NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK DEATH
Filing Date
6/11/2015
Description
ORC - Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/15/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2015
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/11/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
$500,000
Filing Date
6/11/2015
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/11/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
$500,000
Filing Date
6/8/2015
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/12/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/8/2015
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/12/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2015
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/4/2015
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/4/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/2015
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/4/2015
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/3/2015
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/4/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/2015
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/4/2015
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/3/2015
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/4/2015
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/3/2015
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/4/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/2015
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/4/2015
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/3/2015
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/4/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM
Filing Date
6/3/2015
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/4/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION
Filing Date
6/3/2015
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/4/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO VACATE PRELIMINARY HEARING
Filing Date
6/3/2015
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/5/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO VACATE PRELIMINARY HEARING
Filing Date
5/27/2015
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/27/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/2015
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/27/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/2015
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/27/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
5/27/2015
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/28/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
5/27/2015
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/28/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
5/27/2015
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/28/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
5/27/2015
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/1/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM
Filing Date
5/27/2015
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/1/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
5/24/2015
Time
17:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
5/24/2015
Time
17:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
6/1/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/1/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/3/2015
Time
8:45
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
6/3/2015
Time
8:45
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
6/11/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
6/11/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
7/28/2015
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
7/28/2015
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
8/17/2015
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/30/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/30/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/7/2015
Time
8:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/7/2015
Time
8:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/7/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/7/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/29/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/29/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/4/2015
Time
14:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
12/4/2015
Time
14:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/4/2015
Time
14:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/4/2015
Time
14:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
12/11/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/11/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/7/2016
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
1/7/2016
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
1/12/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/12/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/11/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/11/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/10/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/10/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/12/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/12/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/18/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/18/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/21/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/21/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/1/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/1/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/1/2016
Time
8:29
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/1/2016
Time
8:29
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/12/2017
Time
8:28
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/12/2017
Time
8:28
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/13/2017
Time
8:29
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/13/2017
Time
8:29
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/13/2017
Time
9:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/18/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/18/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/19/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/19/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/20/2017
Time
8:29
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/20/2017
Time
8:29
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/24/2017
Time
8:29
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/24/2017
Time
8:29
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/28/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/28/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/28/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/28/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/14/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/14/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/14/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/14/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/26/2017
Time
14:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
7/26/2017
Time
14:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
7/28/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/28/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/17/2017
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
8/17/2017
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
8/17/2017
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
8/17/2017
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
8/29/2017
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/29/2017
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/7/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/19/2017
Time
8:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/19/2017
Time
8:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/29/2017
Time
8:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/29/2017
Time
8:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/16/2017
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/16/2017
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/1/2017
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/1/2017
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/8/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/8/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/19/2017
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/26/2018
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/26/2018
Time
11:00
Event
Sentencing
Date
3/7/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/26/2018
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
5/10/2018
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
6/28/2018
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
7/30/2018
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
8/3/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/3/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/3/2018
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/3/2018
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/15/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/16/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
8/16/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
8/16/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
8/16/2018
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/10/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/14/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/20/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/20/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
12/5/2018
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/23/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/27/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/14/2019
Time
11:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/26/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/17/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/5/2019
Time
16:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/12/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Hearing Pending Motion
Date
8/19/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Hearing Pending Motion
Date
8/20/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Hearing Pending Motion
Date
2/19/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/13/2020
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/10/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/9/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/30/2020
Time
14:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/14/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/2/2020
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
11/2/2020
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/12/2020
Time
11:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/1/2020
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/9/2020
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
12/9/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
1/8/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
1/15/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
1/22/2021
Time
15:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
2/22/2021
Time
10:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/24/2021
Time
10:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/1/2021
Time
11:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/16/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/14/2021
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
9/22/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/13/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/27/2021
Time
11:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/17/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/30/2021
Time
11:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
12/7/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/19/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
3/4/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/6/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/22/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
5/20/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
6/17/2022
Time
8:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/3/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/16/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/12/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/25/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
8/15/2023
Time
8:45
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/12/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/16/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/16/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/19/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/25/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/9/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/9/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
3/19/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/1/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/29/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/14/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/14/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
5/28/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/28/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/3/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial