Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Case Type: | Criminal | Location: | Downtown |
Party Information | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name - Number | Relationship | Sex | Attorney | Judge | Case # |
State Of Arizona - (1) |
Plaintiff | N/A | Diekelman, Jason | ||
Amanda Jean Schlief - (2) |
Defendant | F | Apfel, Seth | Phillips | CR2014-101795-001 |
Clerk Of The Court - (3) |
In The Matter Of | N/A | To Be Determined |
Disposition Information | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name | ARSCode | Description | Crime Date | Disposition Code | Disposition | Date |
Amanda Jean Schlief | 13-1819 (F4) | ORGANIZED RETAIL THEFT | 1/6/2014 | Pled Guilty As Charged | Pled Guilty As Charged | 3/26/2014 |
Amanda Jean Schlief | 13-1805 (F4) | SHOPLIFTING | 1/6/2014 | Pled Guilty As Charged | Pled Guilty As Charged | 5/15/2014 |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
3/10/2021 | ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001) | 3/10/2021 | |
NOTE: APD Forms COUNT 2 | |||
7/24/2019 | DHR - Dispo: Reinstate probation - Party (001) | 7/24/2019 | |
NOTE: DHR - Disposition Order - Reinstated | |||
7/23/2019 | MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001) | 7/24/2019 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD | |||
7/23/2019 | NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001) | 7/23/2019 | |
NOTE: Notice of Right of Review | |||
7/23/2019 | TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001) | 7/23/2019 | |
NOTE: Terms and Conditions of Probation | |||
7/23/2019 | TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001) | 7/23/2019 | |
NOTE: Terms and Conditions of Probation | |||
7/23/2019 | ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001) | 7/23/2019 | |
NOTE: Bond Exoneration | |||
6/18/2019 | 117 - ME: Guilt New Chg/Prob Violation - Party (001) | 6/18/2019 | |
5/2/2019 | 176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001) | 5/2/2019 | |
2/28/2019 | 176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001) | 2/28/2019 | |
12/20/2018 | 176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001) | 12/20/2018 | |
10/16/2018 | 176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001) | 10/16/2018 | |
9/25/2018 | 176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001) | 9/25/2018 | |
8/28/2018 | 176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001) | 8/28/2018 | |
7/31/2018 | 112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party (001) | 7/31/2018 | |
7/27/2018 | BON - Bond - Party (001) | 7/30/2018 | |
NOTE: PAPER/SURETY $2700 BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY | |||
7/23/2018 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001) | 7/24/2018 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
7/17/2018 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001) | 7/18/2018 | |
NOTE: IA Release Order | |||
7/17/2018 | PRW = Petition To Revoke Probation - Warrantless Arrest - Party (001) | 7/18/2018 | |
NOTE: COUNT 2: | |||
7/17/2018 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001) | 7/18/2018 | |
NOTE: IA Packet | |||
4/18/2017 | RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (001) | 4/18/2017 | |
NOTE: Request to Establish Start Date | |||
9/2/2015 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001) | 9/4/2015 | |
5/20/2014 | 189 - ME: Sentence - Imprisonment And Probation - Party (001) | 5/20/2014 | |
5/15/2014 | TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001) | 5/20/2014 | |
5/15/2014 | NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001) | 5/19/2014 | |
5/1/2014 | 169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001) | 5/1/2014 | |
4/29/2014 | OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001) | 5/29/2014 | |
3/28/2014 | 105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001) | 3/28/2014 | |
3/28/2014 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001) | 3/28/2014 | |
3/27/2014 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001) | 3/27/2014 | |
3/27/2014 | INF - Information - Party (001) | 4/1/2014 | |
NOTE: AMENDED | |||
3/26/2014 | PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001) | 4/2/2014 | |
3/26/2014 | RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (001) | 4/1/2014 | |
3/26/2014 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 4/1/2014 | |
NOTE: AMEND INFORMATION | |||
3/26/2014 | WPH - Waiver Of Preliminary Hearing - Party (001) | 3/31/2014 | |
3/12/2014 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001) | 3/12/2014 | |
3/7/2014 | INF - Information - Party (001) | 3/11/2014 | |
2/19/2014 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001) | 2/19/2014 | |
2/14/2014 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 2/14/2014 | |
2/12/2014 | 085 - ME: Conference - Party (001) | 2/12/2014 | |
2/11/2014 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 2/12/2014 | |
NOTE: Substitution of Counsel | |||
2/11/2014 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 2/12/2014 | |
NOTE: Motion To Continue | |||
2/10/2014 | 070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set - Party (001) | 2/10/2014 | |
1/21/2014 | 102 - ME: Waiver Prelim Hrg/Plea - Party (001) | 1/21/2014 | |
1/17/2014 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 1/23/2014 | |
NOTE: AND WAIVER OF PROBABLE CAUSE HEARING CONTINUANCE | |||
1/14/2014 | DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001) | 1/14/2014 | |
1/14/2014 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001) | 1/14/2014 | |
NOTE: IA Packet | |||
1/14/2014 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001) | 1/14/2014 | |
NOTE: IA Release Order |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
1/12/2014 | 2:00 | Initial Appearance |
1/17/2014 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
1/22/2014 | 8:30 | Preliminary Hearing |
2/5/2014 | 8:1 | Settlement Conference |
2/5/2014 | 13:30 | Settlement Conference |
2/14/2014 | 8:15 | Arraignment Hearing |
3/7/2014 | 8:15 | Arraignment Hearing |
3/20/2014 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
3/20/2014 | 8:15 | Change Of Plea |
3/26/2014 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
3/26/2014 | 8:15 | Change Of Plea |
4/29/2014 | 8:30 | Sentencing |
5/15/2014 | 8:30 | Sentencing |
7/17/2018 | 8:00 | Initial Appearance |
7/24/2018 | 10:30 | Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing |
7/24/2018 | 10:31 | Disposition Hearing |
8/23/2018 | 8:30 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
8/23/2018 | 8:32 | Disposition Hearing |
8/30/2018 | 8:30 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
9/13/2018 | 8:15 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
10/15/2018 | 8:31 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
12/12/2018 | 8:30 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
2/21/2019 | 8:30 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
2/28/2019 | 8:00 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
4/23/2019 | 8:30 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
4/30/2019 | 8:00 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
6/12/2019 | 9:00 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
6/24/2019 | 8:00 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
7/23/2019 | 8:29 | Disposition Hearing |
12/19/2019 | 8:00 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |