Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Case Type: | Criminal | Location: | Downtown |
Party Information | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name - Number | Relationship | Sex | Attorney | Judge | Case # |
State Of Arizona - (1) |
Plaintiff | N/A | County Attorney, Maricopa | ||
Amanda Jean Schlief - (2) |
Defendant | F | Defender, Public | Master Calendar | CR2011-111235-001 |
Clerk Of The Court - (3) |
In The Matter Of | N/A | To Be Determined |
Disposition Information | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name | ARSCode | Description | Crime Date | Disposition Code | Disposition | Date |
Amanda Jean Schlief | 13-2008 (F4) | TAKING IDENTITY OF ANOTHER | 1/1/2011 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 3/14/2011 |
Amanda Jean Schlief | 13-2002 (F4) | FORGERY | 1/1/2011 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 3/14/2011 |
Amanda Jean Schlief | 13-2006 (F6) | CRIMINAL IMPERSONATION | 1/1/2011 | Pled to Reduced Charge | Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge | 7/21/2011 |
Amanda Jean Schlief | 13-2002 (F4) | FORGERY | 1/1/2011 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 9/21/2011 |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
10/7/2011 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001) | 10/12/2011 | |
9/30/2011 | 193 - ME: Sentence-Imprisonment (monetary Orders Entered) - Party (001) | 9/30/2011 | |
9/21/2011 | OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001) | 10/6/2011 | |
9/21/2011 | NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001) | 9/30/2011 | |
9/21/2011 | PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001) | 10/4/2011 | |
7/25/2011 | 070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set - Party (001) | 7/25/2011 | |
7/22/2011 | 105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001) | 7/22/2011 | |
7/21/2011 | 070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set - Party (001) | 7/21/2011 | |
7/21/2011 | PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001) | 7/26/2011 | |
6/14/2011 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 6/14/2011 | |
6/3/2011 | STA - Statement - Party (001) | 6/10/2011 | |
NOTE: COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE | |||
5/12/2011 | 194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 5/12/2011 | |
5/4/2011 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001) | 5/4/2011 | |
5/3/2011 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 5/10/2011 | |
NOTE: TO PRESERVE AND PRODUCE ANY/ALL RECORDED RADIO TRANSMISSIONS 911 CALLS AND/OR TAPES REFERRED TO IN GLENDALE POLICE REPORT | |||
4/29/2011 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 5/3/2011 | |
4/26/2011 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001) | 4/27/2011 | |
4/26/2011 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 4/27/2011 | |
4/26/2011 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 4/27/2011 | |
4/25/2011 | AOC - Allegation of Offenses Committed While Released From Confinement - Party (001) | 4/26/2011 | |
NOTE: | |||
4/25/2011 | ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (001) | 4/26/2011 | |
NOTE: | |||
4/25/2011 | RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001) | 4/26/2011 | |
NOTE: RULE 609 | |||
4/25/2011 | ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001) | 4/26/2011 | |
NOTE: | |||
4/25/2011 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001) | 4/26/2011 | |
NOTE: | |||
4/21/2011 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 4/21/2011 | |
4/19/2011 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 4/20/2011 | |
NOTE: FOR TEMPORARY REMOVAL OF OFFICIAL COURT FILES,TRANSCRIPTS, OR EXHIBITS | |||
4/19/2011 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 4/20/2011 | |
4/19/2011 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 4/20/2011 | |
4/7/2011 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 4/8/2011 | |
NOTE: Request for Specific Disclosure | |||
4/7/2011 | NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001) | 4/8/2011 | |
NOTE: Notice of Defenses | |||
4/7/2011 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 4/8/2011 | |
NOTE: Motion to Preserve and Produce | |||
3/28/2011 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001) | 3/28/2011 | |
3/21/2011 | UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name - Party (001) | 3/28/2011 | Defendant (2) |
3/21/2011 | BON - Bond - Party (001) | 3/22/2011 | |
NOTE: PAPER/SURETY $3600 INTERNATIONAL CREDIT OF NORTH AMERICA REINSURANCE, INC | |||
3/21/2011 | DRO - Indigent Defense Reimbursement Order - Party (001) | 3/24/2011 | |
3/15/2011 | 002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001) | 3/15/2011 | |
3/15/2011 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001) | 3/15/2011 | |
3/14/2011 | 025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (001) | 3/14/2011 | |
3/11/2011 | NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001) | 3/14/2011 | Plaintiff (1) |
3/11/2011 | 606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001) | 3/14/2011 | |
3/11/2011 | IND - Indictment - Party (001) | 3/14/2011 | Plaintiff (1) |
3/11/2011 | NDP - Notice of Discovery - Party (001) | 3/14/2011 | |
NOTE: INITIAL | |||
3/10/2011 | NPH - Notice of Affirmation of Preliminary Hearing - Party (001) | 3/14/2011 | |
3/7/2011 | DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001) | 3/7/2011 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
3/10/2011 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
3/14/2011 | 8:30 | Preliminary Hearing |
3/21/2011 | 8:30 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
5/9/2011 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
6/3/2011 | 8:30 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
7/21/2011 | 8:1 | Settlement Conference |
7/21/2011 | 13:30 | Settlement Conference |
7/25/2011 | 8:00 | Settlement Conference |
8/10/2011 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
8/17/2011 | 8:00 | Trial |
9/21/2011 | 8:30 | Sentencing |