« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Southeast
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Cook, N
Judge
Case #
Party Name
B Grand Jury - (2)
Relationship
Deft Grand Jury
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Lamont Payne - (3)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
ISRAEL, CHRISTINE
Judge
Superior Court
Case #
CR1997-090177-A
Disposition Information
Party Name
Lamont Payne
Crime Date
1/11/1997
Date
5/2/1997
Description
ARMED ROBBERY
ARSCode
13-1904 (F2)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Lamont Payne
Crime Date
1/11/1997
Date
6/19/1997
Description
BURGLARY 1ST DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1508 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Lamont Payne
Crime Date
1/11/1997
Date
5/2/1997
Description
AGGRAVATED ASSAULT
ARSCode
13-1204A (F3)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Lamont Payne
Crime Date
1/11/1997
Date
6/19/1997
Description
AGGRAVATED ASSAULT
ARSCode
13-1204A (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/7/2000
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/13/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/7/2000
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/13/2000
Filing Party
NOTE:
DENYING REVIEW
Filing Date
3/29/2000
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/29/2000
Filing Party
NOTE:
DENYING REVIEW
Filing Date
6/16/1999
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/17/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/1999
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/17/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/1999
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/18/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/1999
Description
AIX - Appeals Index - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/18/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/9/1999
Description
PTT - Petition - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/11/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
TO APPLY FOR COUNSEL
Filing Date
4/22/1999
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/27/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/1999
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/27/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/13/1999
Description
LET - Letter - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/21/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/1999
Description
PTT - Petition - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/8/1999
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR REVIEW OF TRIAL
Filing Date
3/23/1999
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/26/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/1999
Description
LET - Letter - Party (A)
Docket Date
1/28/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/1998
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/24/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/3/1998
Description
REQ - Request - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/9/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
FOR EXTENSION TO FILE REPLY TO POST-CONVICTION RELIEF
Filing Date
6/8/1998
Description
LET - Letter - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/12/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/28/1998
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/30/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/1998
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/31/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/26/1997
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (A)
Docket Date
12/2/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/14/1997
Description
129 – ME: PCR: Initiated/Atty Retained re: plea - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/24/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/18/1997
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/25/1997
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF PCR
Filing Date
9/18/1997
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/25/1997
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF FILING NOT OF PCR
Filing Date
9/18/1997
Description
REQ - Request - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/25/1997
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR PREP OF PCR RECORD
Filing Date
8/1/1997
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/4/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/1997
Description
193 - ME: Sentence-Imprisonment (monetary Orders Entered) - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/14/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/24/1997
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/30/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/1997
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/1/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/1997
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/11/1997
Filing Party
NOTE:
RIGHT TO PCR
Filing Date
5/21/1997
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/23/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/14/1997
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/16/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/14/1997
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/19/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/1997
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/9/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/1997
Description
SMO - Stip/Mot/Ord Removal Court Files - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/9/1997
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
TRANS OR EXHIBITS
Filing Date
4/22/1997
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/24/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/1997
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/25/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/12/1997
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/14/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF DEFENSES AND REQ FOR NOT OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
3/6/1997
Description
RES - Response - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/10/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANTS MRD
Filing Date
2/26/1997
Description
MRD - Motion to Release Defendant on Own Recognizance, Reduce Bond and/or Release to a Third Party - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/3/1997
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
2/21/1997
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/25/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF DISCVRY INTERVWS & EVIDENCE
Filing Date
2/7/1997
Description
SMO - Stip/Mot/Ord Removal Court Files - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/12/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/1997
Description
ORD - Order - Party (A)
Docket Date
1/31/1997
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE COUNSEL
Filing Date
1/29/1997
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/3/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/1997
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/3/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/1997
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (A)
Docket Date
1/31/1997
Filing Party
NOTE:
SECURED BOND $8800 012797
Filing Date
1/27/1997
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (A)
Docket Date
1/31/1997
Filing Party
NOTE:
NO BOND 011297
Filing Date
1/16/1997
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (A)
Docket Date
1/21/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CT 1-2: AGGRAVATED ASSAULT CL 3 DANGEROUS FEL; CT 3: BURGLARY IN THE 1ST DEG CL 3 DANGEROUS FEL; CT 4: ARMED ROBBERY CL 2 DANGEROUS FEL; DR# 97-011059 MESA PD DOC: ON OR ABT 1-11-97
Filing Date
1/16/1997
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (A)
Docket Date
1/21/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/1997
Description
DWL - Defendant/Witness List - Party (A)
Docket Date
1/21/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/1997
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (A)
Docket Date
1/21/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CT 1,2,4: N/I; CT 3: NO BAIL
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
No records found.