« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
HEILMAN, JOSEPH
Judge
Case #
Party Name
EDWARD ELLIOT COMPTON - (5
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
KENNEDY, MARK
Judge
Willett
Case #
CR1993-003432-
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/5/1995
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered by Court - Party ()
Docket Date
10/10/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/1995
Description
REL - Reply - Party ()
Docket Date
10/16/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF MOT TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
9/22/1995
Description
RES - Response - Party ()
Docket Date
10/6/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEF MOT TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
9/14/1995
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
9/27/1995
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO CONT ORAL ARGUMENT ON DEF MOT TO DISMISS W/PREJUDICE
Filing Date
8/17/1995
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party ()
Docket Date
8/21/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/9/1995
Description
MTD - Motion to Dismiss - Party ()
Docket Date
8/21/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
W/PREJUDICE
Filing Date
3/1/1995
Description
ORD - Order - Party ()
Docket Date
3/24/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXONERATING BOND
Filing Date
3/1/1995
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
3/24/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
O/RELEASE O/DEPOSIT W/CRT $6280
Filing Date
2/27/1995
Description
DRE - Disposition - Party ()
Docket Date
3/7/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/1995
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party ()
Docket Date
2/14/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/1995
Description
ORD - Order - Party ()
Docket Date
2/16/1995
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
DISMISSING AGAINST P5 W/OUT PREJUDICE
Filing Date
2/6/1995
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
2/16/1995
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO DISMISS & PROPOSED ORDER
Filing Date
2/3/1995
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party ()
Docket Date
2/13/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/1/1995
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
2/14/1995
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
NOTE:
DEF'S ACKNOWLEDGEMENT & AFF RE CONTINUANCE
Filing Date
1/25/1995
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
2/6/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
1/19/1995
Description
LWE - List of Witnesses/Exhibits - Party ()
Docket Date
1/24/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
5TH SUPPLEMENTAL
Filing Date
1/18/1995
Description
LWE - List of Witnesses/Exhibits - Party ()
Docket Date
1/24/1995
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
Filing Date
1/17/1995
Description
LWE - List of Witnesses/Exhibits - Party ()
Docket Date
1/23/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
3RD SUPPLEMENTAL
Filing Date
1/12/1995
Description
PRA - Praecipe - Party ()
Docket Date
1/17/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBPOENA
Filing Date
1/11/1995
Description
NDC - Notice of Deposit with Court - Party ()
Docket Date
1/23/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
$6280
Filing Date
12/27/1994
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party ()
Docket Date
12/29/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/27/1994
Description
PRA - Praecipe - Party ()
Docket Date
1/4/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/21/1994
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
12/28/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO RECONSIDER CONDITIONS OF RELEASE
Filing Date
12/16/1994
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
12/22/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/16/1994
Description
LWE - List of Witnesses/Exhibits - Party ()
Docket Date
12/29/1994
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
NOTE:
2ND SUPPLEMENTAL
Filing Date
12/14/1994
Description
ORD - Order - Party ()
Docket Date
12/21/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE TAKING DEPOSITIONS
Filing Date
12/12/1994
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
12/20/1994
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
NOTE:
FOR TAKING DEPOSITIONS
Filing Date
12/8/1994
Description
LWE - List of Witnesses/Exhibits - Party ()
Docket Date
12/14/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/1994
Description
PRA - Praecipe - Party ()
Docket Date
12/12/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
1/SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM
Filing Date
12/2/1994
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party ()
Docket Date
12/14/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSA
Filing Date
11/29/1994
Description
PRA - Praecipe - Party ()
Docket Date
12/7/1994
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
Filing Date
11/14/1994
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
11/18/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/1994
Description
LWE - List of Witnesses/Exhibits - Party ()
Docket Date
11/21/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
11/14/1994
Description
PRA - Praecipe - Party ()
Docket Date
11/21/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
2/2 SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM
Filing Date
11/10/1994
Description
RES - Response - Party ()
Docket Date
11/15/1994
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
NOTE:
TO MOT TO VACATE ORD REQUIRING DISCLOSURE OF RECORDS OF THE AZ DEPT OF; ECONOMIC SECURITY
Filing Date
11/3/1994
Description
PRA - Praecipe - Party ()
Docket Date
11/9/1994
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
Filing Date
11/2/1994
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
11/3/1994
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF WITNESSES (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Filing Date
10/31/1994
Description
PRA - Praecipe - Party ()
Docket Date
11/3/1994
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
Filing Date
10/26/1994
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
10/28/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO VACATE ORDER RE: DISCLOSURE OF RECORDS OF THE AZ DEPT OF ECONOMIC SECURITY; & ORDER
Filing Date
10/14/1994
Description
PRA - Praecipe - Party ()
Docket Date
10/18/1994
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/13/1994
Description
ORD - Order - Party ()
Docket Date
10/19/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: DISCLOSURE OF RECORDS OF THE AZ DEPT OF ECONOMIC RECORDS
Filing Date
10/7/1994
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party ()
Docket Date
10/13/1994
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
NOTE:
& ORDER RE: DISCLOSURE OF RECORDS OF THE AZ DEPT OF ECONOMIC SECURITY
Filing Date
10/6/1994
Description
PRA - Praecipe - Party ()
Docket Date
10/13/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM
Filing Date
10/6/1994
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party ()
Docket Date
10/18/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/1994
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
10/4/1994
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
NOTE:
RE: DISCOVERY SCHEDULE
Filing Date
9/21/1994
Description
PRA - Praecipe - Party ()
Docket Date
9/27/1994
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
Filing Date
8/31/1994
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
9/9/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/9/1994
Description
TRF - Mot/Ord Temp Removal File Etc - Party ()
Docket Date
8/15/1994
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
Filing Date
7/6/1994
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
7/15/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/29/1994
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
7/7/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/1994
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
6/29/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/1994
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
6/22/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/13/1994
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
6/16/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/1994
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party ()
Docket Date
6/8/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/25/1994
Description
MFW - Motion for Withdraw - Party ()
Docket Date
6/2/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/24/1994
Description
FST - Financial Statement - Party ()
Docket Date
5/31/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/1994
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
5/27/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/1994
Description
998 - ME: Multiple Events - Party ()
Docket Date
5/20/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/11/1994
Description
RES - Response - Party ()
Docket Date
5/16/1994
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO DEF'S MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
5/4/1994
Description
MRD - Mot Rel Def O.R./Rde Bnd/3 Pty - Party ()
Docket Date
5/9/1994
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
Filing Date
4/29/1994
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered by Court - Party ()
Docket Date
5/13/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/1994
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
5/6/1994
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
NOTE:
OF DEFENSES & DISCLOSURE (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Filing Date
4/22/1994
Description
MFW - Motion for Withdraw - Party ()
Docket Date
4/27/1994
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
NOTE:
AS ATTY
Filing Date
4/13/1994
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
4/19/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/13/1994
Description
ROR - RELEASE ORDER - Party ()
Docket Date
4/19/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
BOND $56,000 4/12/94
Filing Date
4/13/1994
Description
INA - Initial Appearance on Bench Warrant - Party ()
Docket Date
4/19/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/13/1994
Description
RQU - RELEASE QUESTIONNAIRE - Party ()
Docket Date
4/19/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/13/1994
Description
BWA - Bench Warrant - Party ()
Docket Date
4/19/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
COPY-SERVED 3/30/94
Filing Date
4/12/1994
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party ()
Docket Date
4/25/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/1994
Description
BWA - Bench Warrant - Party ()
Docket Date
4/7/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
SRV 3/30/94
Filing Date
4/5/1994
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party ()
Docket Date
4/18/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/1994
Description
AFF - Affidavit - Party ()
Docket Date
4/6/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR EXONERATION OF BOND
Filing Date
3/23/1994
Description
133 - ME: BW Issued Hrg/Trl Vacate - Party ()
Docket Date
4/4/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/9/1994
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
2/14/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/10/1994
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
1/14/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/9/1993
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
12/14/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/1993
Description
MCO - Motion to Continue - Party ()
Docket Date
12/7/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL
Filing Date
10/12/1993
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
10/14/1993
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
NOTE:
OF DEFENSES AND DISCLOSURES
Filing Date
10/7/1993
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
10/15/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/7/1993
Description
CSR - Case Status Report - Party ()
Docket Date
9/13/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/7/1993
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
9/14/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/19/1993
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
7/26/1993
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF DISCOVERY DISCLOSURE; LIST OF WINTESSSES & EXHIBITS INCLUDING REBUTTAL WITNES; NOTICE OF INTENT TO SCHEDULE INTERVIEWS; NOTICE OF INTENT TO ALLEGE PRIOR FEL; CONVICTIONS; NOTICE OF INTENT TO USE OTHER CRIMES, WRONGS OR ACTS PURSUANT TO; RULE 404(B);NOTICE OF INTENT TO UTILIZE STATEMENT GIVEN IN FURTHERANCE OF MED; NOTICE OF INTENT TO INTRODUCE STATEMENTS UNDER RUESL 803(24),804(B)(5)
Filing Date
7/6/1993
Description
316 - ME: CASE ASSIGNED/REASSIGNED - Party ()
Docket Date
7/9/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/2/1993
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
7/2/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF APPEARANCE BY VICTIM TIARA ASHLEY
Filing Date
6/24/1993
Description
NCJ - Notice of Change of Judge - Party ()
Docket Date
6/25/1993
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
Filing Date
6/22/1993
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party ()
Docket Date
6/22/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/21/1993
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
6/22/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
BOND $56,000 6/14/93
Filing Date
6/21/1993
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
6/22/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
PRIVATE ATTY
Filing Date
6/21/1993
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
6/22/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/21/1993
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
6/22/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/21/1993
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
6/22/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/21/1993
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
6/22/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/21/1993
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party ()
Docket Date
6/23/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/17/1993
Description
BAB - Bail Bond - Party ()
Docket Date
6/21/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMERICAN BONDING CO $56,000.00
Filing Date
6/15/1993
Description
WAR - WARRANT FOR ARREST - Party ()
Docket Date
6/16/1993
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CT I,II,IV,V,XV,XVI & XVII,III,VI & VII,VII,IX & X,XI,XII,XIII & XIV; BOND $140,000 SERVED 6/14/93
Filing Date
4/29/1993
Description
DWL - Defendant/Witness List - Party ()
Docket Date
6/16/1993
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/28/1993
Description
145 - ME: G J True Bill/Warrant Iss - Party ()
Docket Date
6/16/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
BOND $140,000
Filing Date
4/28/1993
Description
IND - Indictment - Party ()
Docket Date
6/16/1993
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
DOC ON OR ABOUT 9/26/90, 5/31/91, 6/26/91, 6/226/92, 9/11/92, 8/30/90, 6/28/91; & 9/14/92
Filing Date
4/28/1993
Description
IND - Indictment - Party ()
Docket Date
6/16/1993
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CT I,III,IV,VI,VII,VIII IX & XI MOLESTATION OF CHILD CL 2 FEL & DANG CRIMES; AGAINST CHILDREN/CT II, X, & XIII SEXUAL CONDUCT W/MINOR CL 2 FEL & DANG CRIMES; AGAINST CHILDREN/CT V SEXUAL ABUSE CL 3 FEL DANG CRIME AGAINST CHILDREN/CT XII; ATTEMPTED MOLESTATION OF CHILD CL 3 FEL DANG CRIME AGAINST CHILDREN/CT XIV-XVIIPUBLIC SEXUAL INDECENCY CL 5 FEL/DR 92-71378 GPD/DOC ON OR ABOUT 3/6/92, 9/14/92
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
10/7/1993
Time
10:30
Event
Firm Trial Date
Date
12/9/1993
Time
10:30
Event
Firm Trial Date
Date
1/10/1994
Time
10:30
Event
Firm Trial Date
Date
2/9/1994
Time
10:30
Event
Firm Trial Date
Date
3/23/1994
Time
10:30
Event
Firm Trial Date
Date
4/12/1994
Time
8:45
Event
Non-Firm Trial Date
Date
5/12/1994
Time
10:30
Event
Firm Trial Date
Date
5/20/1994
Time
8:45
Event
Motion to Modify Release
Date
6/3/1994
Time
8:45
Event
Motion to Modify Release
Date
6/13/1994
Time
10:30
Event
Firm Trial Date
Date
6/15/1994
Time
8:45
Event
Non-Firm Trial Date
Date
6/22/1994
Time
8:45
Event
Non-Firm Trial Date
Date
6/29/1994
Time
8:45
Event
Non-Firm Trial Date
Date
7/6/1994
Time
8:45
Event
Non-Firm Trial Date
Date
8/31/1994
Time
8:45
Event
Non-Firm Trial Date
Date
11/14/1994
Time
10:30
Event
Firm Trial Date
Date
2/2/1995
Time
10:45
Event
Trial.
Date
9/29/1995
Time
8:45
Event
Hearing Pending Motion