« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
CRUM, PAUL
Judge
Case #
Party Name
HERBERT FRANKLIN COMPTON - (2
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Hauser
Case #
CR1991-006815-
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/20/1992
Description
ORD - Order - Party ()
Docket Date
8/21/1992
Filing Party
NOTE:
& MANDATE/AFFIRMED
Filing Date
8/20/1992
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter of Transmittal - Party ()
Docket Date
8/21/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/1992
Description
ECR - Exhibits/Classified/Receipt - Party ()
Docket Date
8/21/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/1992
Description
ECR - Exhibits/Classified/Receipt - Party ()
Docket Date
8/21/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/1992
Description
NCR - Notice of Completion of Record - Party ()
Docket Date
3/3/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/1992
Description
CAR - Court of Appeals Receipt - Party ()
Docket Date
2/20/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/1992
Description
TSP - TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - Party ()
Docket Date
2/19/1992
Filing Party
NOTE:
112691
Filing Date
2/7/1992
Description
ATR - Appeals Transmittal Receipt - Party ()
Docket Date
2/11/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/1992
Description
DRE - Disposition - Party ()
Docket Date
2/7/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/5/1992
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
2/13/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/5/1992
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered by Court - Party ()
Docket Date
2/7/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/4/1992
Description
TSP - TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - Party ()
Docket Date
2/11/1992
Filing Party
NOTE:
PHX AZ 12/24/91
Filing Date
2/4/1992
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
2/7/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/1992
Description
CAR - Court of Appeals Receipt - Party ()
Docket Date
1/28/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/1992
Description
REC - RECEIPT - Party ()
Docket Date
1/28/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/1992
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
1/27/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/1992
Description
DCR - Defense Counsel Receipt - Party ()
Docket Date
1/27/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/1992
Description
ATR - Appeals Transmittal Receipt - Party ()
Docket Date
1/27/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/1992
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
1/27/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/1992
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
1/27/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/7/1992
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
1/10/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/31/1991
Description
NAP - Notice of Appeal - Party ()
Docket Date
1/3/1992
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
12/24/1991
Description
181 - ME: Sentencing - Party ()
Docket Date
12/30/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/24/1991
Description
NRA - Notice of Right to Appeal - Party ()
Docket Date
12/27/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/26/1991
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change of Plea - Party ()
Docket Date
12/5/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/26/1991
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party ()
Docket Date
12/5/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/1991
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
11/25/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/1991
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
11/8/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/1991
Description
NDP - NOT DISC/INTRVWS/PLEA Offer - Party ()
Docket Date
10/30/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/22/1991
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
10/25/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/1991
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
10/18/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/1991
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party ()
Docket Date
10/18/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/17/1991
Description
NDP - NOT DISC/INTRVWS/PLEA Offer - Party ()
Docket Date
10/18/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/17/1991
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
10/18/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF DISCOVERY
Filing Date
10/17/1991
Description
REQ - Request - Party ()
Docket Date
10/18/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
FOR RULE 609 HEARING
Filing Date
10/7/1991
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
10/15/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/1991
Description
RFH - RFH - Party ()
Docket Date
9/24/1991
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
OMINBUS
Filing Date
9/17/1991
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
9/24/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/1991
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party ()
Docket Date
9/3/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/22/1991
Description
INF - Information - Party ()
Docket Date
8/26/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CT I: BURGLARY IN THE 2ND DEGREE A CL 3 FEL; CTS II & III: THEFT CL 3 FELONIES
Filing Date
8/20/1991
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
8/22/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/1991
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
8/19/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/1991
Description
COM - Complaint/Petition - Party ()
Docket Date
8/19/1991
Filing Party
NOTE:
CT I: BURGLARY IN THE SECOND DEGREE A CL 3 FEL; CT II, III: THEFT CL 3 FELONIES; DR 90-0183 WICKENBURG PD - CR90-056 - DOC: 2/15/90
Filing Date
8/19/1991
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
8/19/1991
Filing Party
NOTE:
ARREST WARRANT: 8/6/91 REL ORDER: BOND $7000.00 - 8/6/91; WPH-ARR: 8/27/91 @ 8:30AM - 8/15/91 TRANSMITTAL CERTIFICATION
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
8/27/1991
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Not Guilty