« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
MARICLE, KEVIN
Judge
Case #
Party Name
RONALD LEE COMPTON - (3
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
BASSETT, NEAL
Judge
Superior Court
Case #
CR1991-005399-
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (4)
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR1991-005399-
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2001
Description
ORD - Order - Party ()
Docket Date
10/30/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESTORING CIVIL RIGHTS GRANTED/DENIED VACATING JUDGMENT/DISMISS CHARGES/DENIED; GUN RIGHTS
Filing Date
9/10/2001
Description
AVJ - Appl Vacate Judg/Dismiss Chgs - Party ()
Docket Date
9/12/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND RESTORE CIVIL RIGHTS/AND GUN RIGHTS
Filing Date
9/4/1996
Description
RNL - RELEASE NOTIFICATION LETTER - Party ()
Docket Date
9/18/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/29/1996
Description
RTM - Returned Mail - Party ()
Docket Date
6/6/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/14/1996
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party ()
Docket Date
5/15/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/8/1996
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party ()
Docket Date
4/11/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/1996
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
3/14/1996
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
TO FILE DELAYED REPLY
Filing Date
2/12/1996
Description
RES - Response - Party ()
Docket Date
2/23/1996
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Filing Date
2/7/1996
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
2/15/1996
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
FOR EXTENS OF TIME
Filing Date
2/1/1996
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered by Court - Party ()
Docket Date
2/6/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/1996
Description
RES - Response - Party ()
Docket Date
2/7/1996
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO PET/POST CONVICTION RELIEF
Filing Date
12/19/1995
Description
REL - Reply - Party ()
Docket Date
12/28/1995
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
& SUPPORT FOR REQ FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
Filing Date
12/11/1995
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
12/20/1995
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
FOR CHANGE OF JUDGE
Filing Date
12/5/1995
Description
RES - Response - Party ()
Docket Date
12/12/1995
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO REQ FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND REQ FOR CLARIFICATION OF DUE DATE OF; STATE RESPONSE
Filing Date
12/1/1995
Description
REQ - Request - Party ()
Docket Date
12/4/1995
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
FOR PREPARATION OF PCR RECORD
Filing Date
12/1/1995
Description
REQ - Request - Party ()
Docket Date
12/8/1995
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
Filing Date
10/30/1995
Description
PCR - Post Conviction Relief - Party ()
Docket Date
10/30/1995
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
10/25/1995
Description
REQ - Request - Party ()
Docket Date
10/26/1995
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
FOR PREPARATION OF PCR RECORD
Filing Date
10/12/1995
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party ()
Docket Date
10/13/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/6/1995
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party ()
Docket Date
10/10/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/6/1995
Description
RES - Response - Party ()
Docket Date
10/10/1995
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO NOTICE OF COMPLETED REVIEW & REQUEST FOR EXTENSION/TIME TO FILE PROPER PCR
Filing Date
10/3/1995
Description
REQ - Request - Party ()
Docket Date
10/18/1995
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
FOR CHANGE OF COUNSEL AND EXTENSION OF TIME
Filing Date
9/19/1995
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
10/2/1995
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
OF COMPLETED REVIEW; REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PRO-PER PETITION
Filing Date
8/18/1995
Description
TSP - TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - Party ()
Docket Date
8/31/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
7/13/94
Filing Date
8/18/1995
Description
TSP - TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - Party ()
Docket Date
8/31/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
7/20/94
Filing Date
8/18/1995
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter of Transmittal - Party ()
Docket Date
8/18/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/18/1995
Description
CAO - Court of Appeals Order - Party ()
Docket Date
8/18/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
& MANDATE/IN CONFORMITY W/MEMORANDUM DECISION ATTACHED
Filing Date
8/18/1995
Description
UER - EXHIBIT RECEIPT - Party ()
Docket Date
8/31/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/18/1995
Description
TSP - TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - Party ()
Docket Date
8/31/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
6/23/94
Filing Date
7/31/1995
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
8/2/1995
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF OPPOSITION FOR PREPARATION OF POST-CONVICTION RELIEF RECORDS
Filing Date
7/18/1995
Description
129 - ME: Assign/PCR Atty Apptd - Party ()
Docket Date
7/21/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/26/1995
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
6/26/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF FILING NOTICE OF PCR
Filing Date
6/23/1995
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
6/26/1995
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
OF POST CONVICTION RELIEF
Filing Date
2/9/1995
Description
CAR - Court of Appeals Receipt - Party ()
Docket Date
2/15/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/1995
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
2/17/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLETION RECORD
Filing Date
2/3/1995
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party ()
Docket Date
2/13/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/1995
Description
RES - Response - Party ()
Docket Date
2/1/1995
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO DISMISS PETITION FOR PCR
Filing Date
1/18/1995
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
1/23/1995
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
TO DISMISS PET/POST-CONVTN RELIEF
Filing Date
1/11/1995
Description
ORD - Order - Party ()
Docket Date
1/17/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/1994
Description
CAO - Court of Appeals Order - Party ()
Docket Date
12/20/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
CERT COPY FOR CT REPORTER TO PREPARE AND FILE TRANSCRIPT
Filing Date
12/12/1994
Description
CAO - Court of Appeals Order - Party ()
Docket Date
12/20/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
CERT COPY FOR CT REPORTER TO PREPARE AND FILE TRANSCRIPT
Filing Date
12/12/1994
Description
TSP - TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - Party ()
Docket Date
12/20/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/2/1994
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party ()
Docket Date
11/17/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/27/1994
Description
CAO - Court of Appeals Order - Party ()
Docket Date
11/2/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
CERT COPY RE PAYMENT TO COURT REPORTER
Filing Date
10/19/1994
Description
RES - Response - Party ()
Docket Date
10/20/1994
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
REQ PREPARATION PCR RECORD
Filing Date
10/7/1994
Description
REQ - Request - Party ()
Docket Date
10/12/1994
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
FOR PREPARATION OF POST-CONVICTION RELIEF RECORD
Filing Date
10/6/1994
Description
DRE - Disposition - Party ()
Docket Date
10/12/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/1994
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter of Transmittal - Party ()
Docket Date
10/12/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/1994
Description
129 - ME: Assign/PCR Atty Apptd - Party ()
Docket Date
10/4/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/1994
Description
REC - RECEIPT - Party ()
Docket Date
9/26/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXHIBIT
Filing Date
9/22/1994
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party ()
Docket Date
10/4/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/16/1994
Description
REC - RECEIPT - Party ()
Docket Date
9/20/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
ATTY GENERAL
Filing Date
9/16/1994
Description
CAR - Court of Appeals Receipt - Party ()
Docket Date
9/20/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/15/1994
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
9/19/1994
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
RENEWAL OF MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL
Filing Date
9/13/1994
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
9/13/1994
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
FOR CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Filing Date
9/13/1994
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party ()
Docket Date
9/19/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/1994
Description
NAP - Notice of Appeal - Party ()
Docket Date
9/19/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/1994
Description
CER - Certificate - Party ()
Docket Date
9/19/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
CT OF APPEAL
Filing Date
9/13/1994
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
9/19/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
CT OF APPEALS INDEX
Filing Date
8/29/1994
Description
CAR - Court of Appeals Receipt - Party ()
Docket Date
9/1/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/25/1994
Description
REC - RECEIPT - Party ()
Docket Date
9/1/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
8/10/1994
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
8/12/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF FILING/NOTICE OF POST-CONVICTION RELIEF
Filing Date
8/4/1994
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
8/5/1994
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
OF POST-CONVICTION RELIEF
Filing Date
8/3/1994
Description
MAO - Motion and Order - Party ()
Docket Date
8/4/1994
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL; CONSENT TO DISCHARGE; ORDER
Filing Date
8/3/1994
Description
PRO - Petition to Revoke Prob/Order - Party ()
Docket Date
8/4/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/3/1994
Description
REQ - Request - Party ()
Docket Date
8/5/1994
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
FOR PREPARATION OF POST-CONVICTION RELIEF RECORD
Filing Date
8/3/1994
Description
NRA - Notice of Right to Appeal - Party ()
Docket Date
8/5/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/1994
Description
NAP - Notice of Appeal - Party ()
Docket Date
7/29/1994
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
7/20/1994
Description
PVR - PROBATION VIOLATION REPORT - Party ()
Docket Date
7/28/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/1994
Description
115 - ME: Dispo-Revoke/Prison (monetary Orders Entered) - Party ()
Docket Date
8/2/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/1994
Description
NRA - Notice of Right to Appeal - Party ()
Docket Date
8/4/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/1994
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party ()
Docket Date
7/19/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/24/1994
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party ()
Docket Date
6/29/1994
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
6/23/1994
Description
009 - ME: VIOLATION HEARING - Party ()
Docket Date
6/30/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/6/1994
Description
SUM - Summons - Party ()
Docket Date
6/7/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/1994
Description
112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party ()
Docket Date
6/7/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/1993
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter of Transmittal - Party ()
Docket Date
8/19/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/1993
Description
CAO - Court of Appeals Order - Party ()
Docket Date
8/19/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
CERT COPY DECLINING JURISDICTION
Filing Date
8/18/1993
Description
ECR - Exhibits/Classified/Receipt - Party ()
Docket Date
8/19/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/11/1993
Description
NCR - Notice of Completion of Record - Party ()
Docket Date
1/12/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/5/1993
Description
CAR - Court of Appeals Receipt - Party ()
Docket Date
1/6/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/29/1992
Description
CAR - Court of Appeals Receipt - Party ()
Docket Date
12/31/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/28/1992
Description
CAR - Court of Appeals Receipt - Party ()
Docket Date
12/31/1992
Filing Party
NOTE:
DELAYED APPEAL
Filing Date
12/24/1992
Description
CAR - Court of Appeals Receipt - Party ()
Docket Date
12/31/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/23/1992
Description
CAR - Court of Appeals Receipt - Party ()
Docket Date
12/28/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/23/1992
Description
AIX - Appeals Index - Party ()
Docket Date
12/28/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/23/1992
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter of Transmittal - Party ()
Docket Date
12/28/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/23/1992
Description
NAP - Notice of Appeal - Party ()
Docket Date
12/28/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/22/1992
Description
ECR - Exhibits/Classified/Receipt - Party ()
Docket Date
1/4/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
MATERIALS TEMP
Filing Date
12/18/1992
Description
TSP - TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - Party ()
Docket Date
1/4/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/18/1992
Description
TSP - TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - Party ()
Docket Date
1/4/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/9/1992
Description
NAP - Notice of Appeal - Party ()
Docket Date
12/14/1992
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
DELAYED
Filing Date
11/24/1992
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party ()
Docket Date
12/8/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/23/1992
Description
RES - Response - Party ()
Docket Date
11/24/1992
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PET FOR POST CONVICT RELEASE
Filing Date
11/9/1992
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
11/10/1992
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO FILE PCR NOTICE
Filing Date
11/6/1992
Description
PCR - Post Conviction Relief - Party ()
Docket Date
11/12/1992
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
10/26/1992
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party ()
Docket Date
10/29/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/1992
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
10/28/1992
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
FOR EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL PLEADINGS
Filing Date
9/30/1992
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party ()
Docket Date
10/5/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/24/1992
Description
MET - Motion/Extension of Time - Party ()
Docket Date
9/30/1992
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
8/25/1992
Description
129 - ME: Assign/PCR Atty Apptd - Party ()
Docket Date
8/26/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/20/1992
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
8/21/1992
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO FILE PCR NOTIFICATION
Filing Date
8/19/1992
Description
PCR - Post Conviction Relief - Party ()
Docket Date
8/24/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/1992
Description
MFW - Motion for Withdraw - Party ()
Docket Date
8/14/1992
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
8/12/1992
Description
214 - ME: WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL - Party ()
Docket Date
8/17/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/1992
Description
PMP - PET: Modify Cond Prob/Order - Party ()
Docket Date
6/29/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/1992
Description
DRE - Disposition - Party ()
Docket Date
6/19/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/1992
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
6/15/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/4/1992
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party ()
Docket Date
6/8/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/1992
Description
181 - ME: Sentencing - Party ()
Docket Date
6/8/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/1992
Description
NRA - Notice of Right to Appeal - Party ()
Docket Date
6/12/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/1992
Description
JUD - Judgment - Party ()
Docket Date
6/3/1992
Filing Party
NOTE:
Bond Forfeiture - This docket was added by the conversion for a judgment
Filing Date
5/22/1992
Description
MCO - Motion to Continue - Party ()
Docket Date
6/3/1992
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
5/22/1992
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
5/28/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/20/1992
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
4/24/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/1992
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
3/26/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/1992
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party ()
Docket Date
3/27/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/1992
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change of Plea - Party ()
Docket Date
3/25/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/1992
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party ()
Docket Date
3/25/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/1992
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party ()
Docket Date
3/23/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/1992
Description
JUL - Jury List - Party ()
Docket Date
3/30/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/17/1992
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party ()
Docket Date
3/20/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/16/1992
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
3/19/1992
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/16/1992
Description
316 - ME: CASE ASSIGNED/REASSIGNED - Party ()
Docket Date
3/20/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/16/1992
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
3/19/1992
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/16/1992
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
3/19/1992
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/13/1992
Description
SDT - SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM - Party ()
Docket Date
3/19/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/1992
Description
052 - ME: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE - Party ()
Docket Date
3/20/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/1992
Description
SDT - SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM - Party ()
Docket Date
3/19/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/12/1992
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
3/17/1992
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SERVED 3/11/92
Filing Date
3/12/1992
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
3/17/1992
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SERVED 3/11/92
Filing Date
3/12/1992
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party ()
Docket Date
3/17/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/11/1992
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
3/17/1992
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SERVED 3/10/92
Filing Date
3/11/1992
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
3/17/1992
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SERVED 3/10/92
Filing Date
3/11/1992
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
3/17/1992
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
3/9/1992
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
3/12/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/1992
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
3/12/1992
Filing Party
NOTE:
QUESTIONS
Filing Date
3/6/1992
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
3/13/1992
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
3/6/1992
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
3/13/1992
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
3/6/1992
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
3/13/1992
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
3/6/1992
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
3/13/1992
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
3/4/1992
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
3/12/1992
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
PURS TO RULE 35.1
Filing Date
3/3/1992
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
3/11/1992
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITNESSES
Filing Date
3/2/1992
Description
PRA - Praecipe - Party ()
Docket Date
3/9/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/1992
Description
MCO - Motion to Continue - Party ()
Docket Date
3/10/1992
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
2/27/1992
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
3/4/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/26/1992
Description
REQ - Request - Party ()
Docket Date
3/2/1992
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
TO PRODUCE
Filing Date
2/25/1992
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
2/27/1992
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
KIDNAPPING SEXUAL ASSAULT
Filing Date
2/25/1992
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
2/27/1992
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
KIDNAPPING SEXUAL ASSAULT
Filing Date
2/25/1992
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
2/27/1992
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
KIDNAPPING SEXUAL ASSAULT
Filing Date
2/24/1992
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
2/27/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/20/1992
Description
MCO - Motion to Continue - Party ()
Docket Date
1/21/1992
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
1/20/1992
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
1/22/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/16/1991
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
12/20/1991
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
FOR EXCLUSION OF OTHER CRIMES OR OTHER ACTS
Filing Date
12/16/1991
Description
LWI - List of Witnesses - Party ()
Docket Date
12/20/1991
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
& NOT OF DEFENSES
Filing Date
12/4/1991
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
12/27/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/21/1991
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
12/2/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/1991
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
11/15/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
11/14/1991
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
11/15/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
11/14/1991
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
11/15/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
11/12/1991
Description
MCO - Motion to Continue - Party ()
Docket Date
11/14/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/23/1991
Description
151 - ME: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Party ()
Docket Date
10/29/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/1991
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
10/22/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/8/1991
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
10/16/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/1991
Description
MCO - Motion to Continue - Party ()
Docket Date
10/1/1991
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
8/1/1991
Description
151 - ME: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Party ()
Docket Date
8/9/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/26/1991
Description
RFH - RFH - Party ()
Docket Date
7/30/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
RULE 609
Filing Date
7/26/1991
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
7/30/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF DISCOVERY
Filing Date
7/12/1991
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party ()
Docket Date
7/16/1991
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
7/12/1991
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party ()
Docket Date
7/16/1991
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
7/11/1991
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party ()
Docket Date
7/17/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/1991
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
7/15/1991
Filing Party
NOTE:
REL QUESTIONNAIRE PSA FINAN INFO; PRIOR CONVICTION PSA BACKGROUND INFO; PSA RECOMMENDATION ORDER RE: COUNSEL; REL ORDER-SEC/BOND $8400 6/24/91
Filing Date
7/8/1991
Description
ASI - Amended Not Supervening Indict - Party ()
Docket Date
7/10/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CTS 1-3/ROR
Filing Date
7/3/1991
Description
DWL - Defendant/Witness List - Party ()
Docket Date
7/5/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/3/1991
Description
NSI - NSI - Party ()
Docket Date
7/5/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CTS 1-3 BOND $8400-NOT POSTED
Filing Date
7/2/1991
Description
IND - Indictment - Party ()
Docket Date
7/5/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CT1 KIDNAPPING CL 2 FEL; CTS 2,3 SEXUAL ASSAULT CL 2 FELONIES/DR10359522 PPD/ DOC 070291
Filing Date
7/2/1991
Description
143 - ME: G J Not/Supervening Indict - Party ()
Docket Date
7/5/1991
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
7/11/1991
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Not Guilty