« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
LEWIS, NANCY
Judge
Case #
Party Name
BRYAN JOHN DAVIS - (3
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Keppel
Case #
CR1989-008625-
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/1990
Description
DRE - Disposition - Party ()
Docket Date
4/30/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/1990
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party ()
Docket Date
4/12/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/1990
Description
NRA - Notice of Right to Appeal - Party ()
Docket Date
4/11/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/1990
Description
181 - ME: Sentencing - Party ()
Docket Date
4/17/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/1990
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party ()
Docket Date
3/14/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/1990
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change of Plea - Party ()
Docket Date
3/19/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/1990
Description
NDR - NOT DEFENSES/REQ REBUTTAL WITS - Party ()
Docket Date
3/12/1990
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
3/8/1990
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party ()
Docket Date
3/12/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/1/1990
Description
CSR - Case Status Report - Party ()
Docket Date
2/5/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
1/29/1990
Description
151 - ME: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Party ()
Docket Date
2/1/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/1990
Description
RFH - RFH - Party ()
Docket Date
1/26/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
VOLUNTARINESS
Filing Date
1/24/1990
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
1/25/1990
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF PRIORS/RELATED CASE #CR88-3682
Filing Date
1/24/1990
Description
NDP - NOT DISC/INTRVWS/PLEA Offer - Party ()
Docket Date
1/26/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
1/24/1990
Description
RFH - RFH - Party ()
Docket Date
1/26/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
RULE 609
Filing Date
1/24/1990
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party ()
Docket Date
1/26/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
1/24/1990
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
1/25/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/27/1989
Description
RQU - RELEASE QUESTIONNAIRE - Party ()
Docket Date
1/3/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/27/1989
Description
ROR - RELEASE ORDER - Party ()
Docket Date
1/3/1990
Filing Party
NOTE:
BOND $13,700
Filing Date
12/27/1989
Description
FIN - Financial Information - Party ()
Docket Date
1/3/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/27/1989
Description
ORC - Order Regarding Counsel - Party ()
Docket Date
1/3/1990
Filing Party
NOTE:
PUBLIC DEF
Filing Date
12/27/1989
Description
PRC - Pretrl Srvcs Agncy/Recommendtion - Party ()
Docket Date
1/3/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/27/1989
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party ()
Docket Date
12/28/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/27/1989
Description
PBA - PRETRIAL SRVCS AGENCY BACKGRND - Party ()
Docket Date
1/3/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/1989
Description
WAR - WARRANT FOR ARREST - Party ()
Docket Date
12/21/1989
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SERVED 12-19-89/APPEARANCE BOND $13,700
Filing Date
12/6/1989
Description
ORD - Order - Party ()
Docket Date
12/21/1989
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SECURING ATTENDANCE OF PRISONER
Filing Date
12/6/1989
Description
PET - Petition - Party ()
Docket Date
12/21/1989
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO SECURE THE ATTENDANCE OF PRISONER
Filing Date
8/25/1989
Description
DWL - Defendant/Witness List - Party ()
Docket Date
12/21/1989
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
8/24/1989
Description
IND - Indictment - Party ()
Docket Date
12/21/1989
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CT 1 SALE OF NARCOTIC DRUGS; CT 2 OFFER TO SELL NARCOTIC DRUGS CL 2 FELS/; DR89-108664, 89-109541 PPD/DOC CT 1 7-28-89, CT 2 7-29-89
Filing Date
8/24/1989
Description
145 - ME: G J True Bill/Warrant Iss - Party ()
Docket Date
12/21/1989
Filing Party
NOTE:
BOND SET $13700
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
12/27/1989
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Not Guilty