« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
BAKER, MICHAEL
Judge
Case #
Party Name
FRANK ALLEN COMPTON - (2
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR1989-005647-
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/1998
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party ()
Docket Date
11/12/1998
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISPOSITION OF EXHIBITS
Filing Date
9/2/1998
Description
LED - 2.8 (d) Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
9/21/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/30/1990
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
3/26/1990
Filing Party
NOTE:
(NOT/OF RELEASE ON WORK FURLOUGH)
Filing Date
9/29/1989
Description
DRE - Disposition - Party ()
Docket Date
10/3/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/1989
Description
NRA - Notice of Right to Appeal - Party ()
Docket Date
9/27/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/1989
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party ()
Docket Date
9/27/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/22/1989
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change of Plea - Party ()
Docket Date
8/28/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/22/1989
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party ()
Docket Date
8/24/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/1989
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party ()
Docket Date
9/2/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/1989
Description
008 - ME: HEARING ON MOTION - Party ()
Docket Date
8/25/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/15/1989
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
8/21/1989
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT MOTION TO SUPPRESS EVIDENCE OR; EVIDENTIARY HEARING
Filing Date
8/10/1989
Description
015 - ME: Trial Reset Date - Party ()
Docket Date
8/16/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/9/1989
Description
MCO - Motion to Continue - Party ()
Docket Date
8/14/1989
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
8/8/1989
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
8/15/1989
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR SANCTIONS
Filing Date
8/8/1989
Description
RES - Response - Party ()
Docket Date
8/16/1989
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO SUPPRESS OR EVIDENTIARY HEARING
Filing Date
8/3/1989
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
8/4/1989
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 15.7 SANCTIONS
Filing Date
7/28/1989
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
8/3/1989
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO IMPOSE RULE 15.7 SANCTIONS
Filing Date
7/21/1989
Description
RFH - RFH - Party ()
Docket Date
7/25/1989
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
RULE 609
Filing Date
7/19/1989
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
7/24/1989
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN THE ALTERN/FOR AN EVIDENTIARY HEARING
Filing Date
7/12/1989
Description
151 - ME: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Party ()
Docket Date
7/17/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/1989
Description
CSR - Case Status Report - Party ()
Docket Date
7/17/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/1989
Description
NDP - NOT DISC/INTRVWS/PLEA Offer - Party ()
Docket Date
7/12/1989
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
7/11/1989
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party ()
Docket Date
7/14/1989
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/30/1989
Description
001 - ME: Disqualification - Party ()
Docket Date
7/5/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/1989
Description
001 - ME: Disqualification - Party ()
Docket Date
6/26/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/1989
Description
NCJ - Notice of Change of Judge - Party ()
Docket Date
6/15/1989
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
6/9/1989
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party ()
Docket Date
6/13/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/7/1989
Description
INF - Information - Party ()
Docket Date
6/9/1989
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
POSSESSION OF DANGEROUS DRUGS CL 4 FEL
Filing Date
6/2/1989
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
6/2/1989
Filing Party
NOTE:
ARREST WARRANT: 5/12/89 REL ORDER: BOND $685.00 - 5/12/89; WPH-ARR: 6/9/89 @ 8:30AM 5/30/89 IA: 5/12/89; CO ATTY: LOUIS STALZER TRANSMITTAL CERTIFICATION
Filing Date
6/2/1989
Description
COM - Complaint/Petition - Party ()
Docket Date
6/2/1989
Filing Party
NOTE:
POSSESSION OF DANGEROUS DRUGS CL 4 FEL; DDR 89-062998 PPD / CR89-01004 FE / CRIME DATE: 5/3/89
Filing Date
6/2/1989
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
6/2/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/2/1908
Description
NDR - NOT DEFENSES/REQ REBUTTAL WITS - Party ()
Docket Date
8/9/1989
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
REQUEST F/DISCOVERY/DISCLOSURE
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
6/9/1989
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Not Guilty