« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Southeast
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
COUNTY ATTORNEY CRIMINAL -SE,
Judge
Case #
Party Name
ALLEN COMPTON - (2
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Willrich
Case #
CR1987-090036-
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/1996
Description
RNL - RELEASE NOTIFICATION LETTER - Party ()
Docket Date
3/26/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/29/1992
Description
DRE - Disposition - Party ()
Docket Date
6/3/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/1992
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
6/2/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/1992
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party ()
Docket Date
5/27/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/1992
Description
NRA - Notice of Right to Appeal - Party ()
Docket Date
5/27/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/1992
Description
181 - ME: Sentencing - Party ()
Docket Date
5/27/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/1992
Description
308 - ME: CASE TRAN FOR REASSIGNMENT - Party ()
Docket Date
4/29/1992
Filing Party
NOTE:
CC # CR87-09388
Filing Date
4/27/1992
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
4/29/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/1992
Description
IAP - Initail Appear Prob Revocation - Party ()
Docket Date
5/4/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/1992
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change of Plea - Party ()
Docket Date
5/6/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/1992
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party ()
Docket Date
5/4/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/1992
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
5/4/1992
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
10/29/1987
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Not Guilty