« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
COUNTY ATTORNEY CRIMINAL -CCC,
Judge
Case #
Party Name
LESLIE COMPTON - (2
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Jarrett
Case #
CR1987-008679-
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/1993
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
6/22/1993
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT OF GUILT,DISMISSING CHGS AND RESTORING CIVIL RIGHTS
Filing Date
6/22/1993
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
6/22/1993
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT OF GUILT,DISMISSING CHGS AND RESTORING CIVIL RIGHTS; AND UNSIGNED ORDER
Filing Date
10/30/1987
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party ()
Docket Date
11/4/1987
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/1987
Description
NRA - Notice of Right to Appeal - Party ()
Docket Date
11/4/1987
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/5/1987
Description
102 - ME: Waiver Prelim HRG/PLEA - Party ()
Docket Date
10/21/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
GUILTY-CT1 RESISTING ARREST CL6 UNDESIGNATED; PLEA ACCEPTED-SETTING TIME FOR ENTRY O/JUDGM & SENTENCING; AMENDING CHRG TO READ RESISTING ARREST CL6 OPEN END; DEF GRANTED PERMISSION TO LEAVE AZ TO GO TO JACKSONVILLE NC FOR MILTARY
Filing Date
10/1/1987
Description
INF - Information - Party ()
Docket Date
10/6/1987
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CNT 1: UNLAWFUL FLIGHT FROM LAW ENFORCEMENT VEHICLE CL 5 FEL
Filing Date
9/28/1987
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
9/29/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEF WITNESS LIST ORDER HOLDING DEF; WAIVER PRELIM HEARING JUSTICE COURT DOCKET; ORDER RE COUSEL/REIM TRANSMITTAL CERTIFICATION; RELEASE ORDER/OR; WARRANT/QUASHED
Filing Date
9/28/1987
Description
COM - Complaint/Petition - Party ()
Docket Date
9/29/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNLAWFUL FLIGHT FROM LAW ENFORCEMENT VEHICLE CL 5 FEL; DPS DR 87-19995
Filing Date
9/28/1987
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
9/29/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
BEGIN SUPERIOR COURT PLEADINGS
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
10/5/1987
Time
9:30
Event
Original Guilty Plea Arraignment