« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
STALZER, LOUIS
Judge
Case #
Party Name
DENNIS JAMES COMPTON - (2
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
JACOBSON, BRAM
Judge
Hauser
Case #
CR1987-008544-
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/1987
Description
ORD - Order - Party ()
Docket Date
12/10/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXONERATE BOND - RELEASE TO CLYDE KNIPPLE
Filing Date
12/7/1987
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
12/10/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
COPY CHECK EXONERATED BOND
Filing Date
11/3/1987
Description
DRE - Disposition - Party ()
Docket Date
11/6/1987
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/1987
Description
MDI - Motion to Dismiss - Party ()
Docket Date
11/4/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
& ORDER - WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Filing Date
10/27/1987
Description
309 - ME: CASE DISMISSED - Party ()
Docket Date
11/5/1987
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/1987
Description
MAO - Motion and Order - Party ()
Docket Date
10/28/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMP REMOVAL OFFICIAL CT FILES/TRANSCRIPTS/EXHIBITS
Filing Date
10/7/1987
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
10/14/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
10/7/1987
Description
TSP - TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - Party ()
Docket Date
10/9/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
9-16-87
Filing Date
10/2/1987
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
10/7/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO REVIEW PRELIMINARY HEARING
Filing Date
9/29/1987
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
10/1/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
WAIVE DEF'S PRESENCE AT PRETRIAL CONF
Filing Date
9/29/1987
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party ()
Docket Date
10/7/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDERS: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET 10/27/87]TRIAL SET 11/17/87
Filing Date
9/28/1987
Description
INF - Information - Party ()
Docket Date
9/30/1987
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CT 1: AGGRAVATED ASSAULT CL 6 FEL; CT 2: CRIMINAL TRESPASS 1 DEG CL 6 FEL; CT 3: CRIMINAL DAMAGE CL 6 FEL; CT 4: AGGRAVATED ASSAULT CL 3 FEL
Filing Date
9/23/1987
Description
COM - Complaint/Petition - Party ()
Docket Date
9/24/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
CT 1: AGGRAVATED ASSAULT CL 6 FEL; CT 2: CRIMINAL TRESPASS 1ST DEG CL 6 FEL; CT 3: CRIMINAL DAMAGE CL 6 FEL; CT 4: AGGRAVATED ASSAULT CL 3 FEL; PPD DR 87-115057
Filing Date
9/23/1987
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
9/24/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEF WITNESS LIST PSA RECOMMENDATION; POLICE COMPLAINT/ARREST/BOOKING RECORD ORDER RE/COUNSEL; RELEASE QUESTIONNAIRE RELEASE ORDER: BOND SET $1,370; PSA FINANCIAL INFO NOTICE/APPEARANCE; PSA BACKGROUND INFO ORDER HOLDING DEFENDANT
Filing Date
9/23/1987
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
9/24/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
**BEGIN SUEPERIOR COURT PLEADINGS**
Filing Date
9/23/1987
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
9/24/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
JUSTICE COURT DOCKET TRANSMITTAL CERTIFICATION
Filing Date
9/23/1987
Description
NDC - Notice of Deposit with Court - Party ()
Docket Date
9/28/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASH BOND / PEORIA JC / P2 / $1,370
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
9/29/1987
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Not Guilty