« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
COOK, N
Judge
Case #
Party Name
RICHARD ANTHONY COMPTON - (2
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
HOFFMAN, JOEL
Judge
Jarrett
Case #
CR1987-006455-
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/1991
Description
ORD - Order - Party ()
Docket Date
5/15/1991
Filing Party
NOTE:
DENYING APPLICATION
Filing Date
4/9/1991
Description
RES - Response - Party ()
Docket Date
4/16/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO DEF'S MOTION FOR APPL/TO VACATE JUDGMENT OF GUILT & DISMISS CHARGES & RESTORE; CIVIL RIGHTS
Filing Date
4/3/1991
Description
AVJ - Appl Vacate Judg/Dismiss Chgs - Party ()
Docket Date
4/3/1991
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND ORDER
Filing Date
3/14/1991
Description
DRE - Disposition - Party ()
Docket Date
3/18/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/1991
Description
ODP - Ord: Discharge from Probation - Party ()
Docket Date
3/6/1991
Filing Party
NOTE:
IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THE OFFENSE IS DESIGNATED A MISDEMEANOR
Filing Date
9/11/1990
Description
PMC - Petition Mod Cond/Reg of Prob - Party ()
Docket Date
9/14/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/1988
Description
118 - ME: Modifica/Terms Probation - Party ()
Docket Date
9/23/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/1988
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered by Court - Party ()
Docket Date
9/22/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/2/1988
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party ()
Docket Date
9/12/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/22/1988
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party ()
Docket Date
8/25/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/18/1988
Description
PMP - PET: Modify Cond Prob/Order - Party ()
Docket Date
8/24/1988
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
3/2/1988
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
3/8/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/1988
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
2/10/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEF ACCEPTED FOR WORK FURLOUGH PROGRAM
Filing Date
2/1/1988
Description
DRE - Disposition - Party ()
Docket Date
2/4/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/1988
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
1/29/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/1988
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
1/29/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/1988
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
1/29/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/1988
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
1/29/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/1988
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
1/29/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/1988
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
1/29/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/1988
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
1/29/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/1988
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
1/29/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/1988
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
1/29/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/1988
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
1/29/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/1988
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
1/29/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/1988
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
1/29/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/1988
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
1/29/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/1988
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party ()
Docket Date
1/29/1988
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
COPY
Filing Date
1/26/1988
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
1/29/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/1988
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
1/29/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL MITIGATION MATERIAL
Filing Date
1/26/1988
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
1/29/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/1988
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
1/29/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/1988
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
1/29/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/1988
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party ()
Docket Date
1/29/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT
Filing Date
1/26/1988
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party ()
Docket Date
1/29/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/1988
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
1/29/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/1988
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
1/29/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/1988
Description
109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party ()
Docket Date
2/2/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
WAIVER/TRIAL NO CONTEST SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH A MINOR 15 YRS OR OVER CL 6 UNDESIGN; CT 2 SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR 15 YRS OR OVER CL 6 UNDESIGNATED; PROB 3 YRS ASSESSMENT $200 @ $20 PER MO; 1 YR COUNTY JAIL BEGIN ALL PAYMENTS 2/1/89; PROB FEE $30 PER MO BOND EXONERATED
Filing Date
1/26/1988
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
1/29/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/1988
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
1/29/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/1988
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
1/29/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/1988
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
1/29/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/1988
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
1/29/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/1988
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
1/29/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/1988
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
1/29/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/1988
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
1/29/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/1988
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
1/29/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/1988
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
1/29/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/1988
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
1/29/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/1988
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
1/29/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/1988
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
1/29/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/1988
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
1/29/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/1988
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
1/27/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATEMENT FACTS
Filing Date
1/25/1988
Description
NRA - Notice of Right to Appeal - Party ()
Docket Date
1/28/1988
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
1/25/1988
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions of Probation - Party ()
Docket Date
1/25/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
This docket was added by the conversion for a judgment
Filing Date
1/21/1988
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
1/29/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL MITIGATION MATERIAL
Filing Date
1/18/1988
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party ()
Docket Date
1/26/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
& PRESENTENCE HEARING 1/25/88
Filing Date
1/4/1988
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party ()
Docket Date
1/8/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDERED: VACATE SENT 1/4/88 - SET PRE-SENT HRNG 1/18/88
Filing Date
12/4/1987
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party ()
Docket Date
12/9/1987
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
12/4/1987
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change of Plea - Party ()
Docket Date
12/14/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
NO CONTEST - CTS 1-2: SEXUAL CONDUCT W/MINOR 15 YRS OR OVER CL 6 UNDESIGNATED; SENTENCING 1/4/88; VACATE PRETRIAL CONF & TRIAL
Filing Date
11/16/1987
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party ()
Docket Date
11/19/1987
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
11/13/1987
Description
151 - ME: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Party ()
Docket Date
11/20/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONTINUING P-TRIAL CONFERENCE; EXTENDING TIME FOR FILING P-TRIAL MOTIONS; VACATING TRIAL DATE; EXCLUDING ALL TIME FROM THIS DATE TO 120487
Filing Date
10/29/1987
Description
151 - ME: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Party ()
Docket Date
11/10/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORAL ARGUMENT SET; CONTINUING; EXTENDING TIME FOR FILING P-TRIAL MOTIONS; VACATING TRIAL DATE; EXCLUDING ALL TIME FROM THIS DATE
Filing Date
10/28/1987
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
10/30/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES RESPONSE TO DEF MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
10/15/1987
Description
MDI - Motion to Dismiss - Party ()
Docket Date
10/20/1987
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/1987
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set - Party ()
Docket Date
10/22/1987
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/1/1987
Description
151 - ME: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Party ()
Docket Date
10/19/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONTINUED
Filing Date
9/10/1987
Description
151 - ME: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Party ()
Docket Date
9/17/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONTINUED
Filing Date
8/19/1987
Description
151 - ME: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Party ()
Docket Date
8/25/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONTINUED
Filing Date
8/17/1987
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
8/18/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
404 NOTICE
Filing Date
8/6/1987
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
8/7/1987
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/1987
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
8/3/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 15 DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
7/23/1987
Description
100 - ME: Plea Arraignment - Party ()
Docket Date
7/30/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOT GUILTY
Filing Date
7/20/1987
Description
INF - Information - Party ()
Docket Date
7/22/1987
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CTS 1 & 2 SEXUAL CONDUCT W/MINOR CL 6 FEL
Filing Date
7/16/1987
Description
BAB - Bail Bond - Party ()
Docket Date
1/9/1992
Filing Party
NOTE:
INDIANA LUMBERMENS MUTUAL INS CO $2500
Filing Date
7/16/1987
Description
NDC - Notice of Deposit with Court - Party ()
Docket Date
1/9/1992
Filing Party
NOTE:
$2500
Filing Date
7/15/1987
Description
TCE - TRANSMITTAL CERTIFICATION - Party ()
Docket Date
7/16/1987
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/1987
Description
RQU - RELEASE QUESTIONNAIRE - Party ()
Docket Date
7/16/1987
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/1987
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
7/16/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
BEGIN SUPERIOR COURT PLEADINGS
Filing Date
7/15/1987
Description
RQU - RELEASE QUESTIONNAIRE - Party ()
Docket Date
7/16/1987
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/1987
Description
FIN - Financial Information - Party ()
Docket Date
7/16/1987
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/1987
Description
TCE - TRANSMITTAL CERTIFICATION - Party ()
Docket Date
7/16/1987
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/1987
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
7/16/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
ARREST/BOOKING RECORD
Filing Date
7/15/1987
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party ()
Docket Date
7/16/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLEA/NOT GUILTY & REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Filing Date
7/15/1987
Description
ROR - RELEASE ORDER - Party ()
Docket Date
7/16/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
BOND $25,000.
Filing Date
7/15/1987
Description
OHD - ORDER HOLDING DEFENDANT - Party ()
Docket Date
7/16/1987
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/1987
Description
JP Docket - Party ()
Docket Date
7/16/1987
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/1987
Description
WPH - WAIVER OF PRELIMINARY HEARING - Party ()
Docket Date
7/16/1987
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/1987
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
7/16/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEF/WITNESS LIST
Filing Date
7/15/1987
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
7/16/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION/DOCUMENTS & INFORMATION
Filing Date
7/15/1987
Description
COM - Complaint/Petition - Party ()
Docket Date
7/16/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
CT 1-2: SEXUAL CONDUCT W/MINOR CL 6 FELS
Filing Date
7/15/1987
Description
ORD - Order - Party ()
Docket Date
7/16/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
REGARDING COUNSEL
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
7/23/1987
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Not Guilty