« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
ST2011-000323
Judge:
Albrecht, Richard
File Date:
9/21/2011
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Small Claims Tax
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
William H Grewell
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Elizabeth A Grewell
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
(3)Maricopa County
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/29/2011
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
12/7/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/2011
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
10/31/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2011
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting
Docket Date
10/18/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2011
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
9/22/2011
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
1/6/2012
Time
14:30
Event
Trial
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.