« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2025-008537
Judge:
Coury, Christopher
File Date:
3/7/2025
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Icearizona Hockey Co L L C
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
David Williams
Party Name
Arizona Board Of Regents
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Jennifer Lee-Cota
Party Name
O V G Facilities L L C
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Cody Jess
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/2025
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
5/12/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
OVG Facilities, LLC's Answer and Counterclaim / EFILE BILLING $263.00
Filing Date
5/12/2025
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
5/13/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
OVG FACILITIES, LLC’S MOTION TO
DISMISS COUNT FOUR OF FIRST
AMENDED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
5/7/2025
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
5/7/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
ARIZONA BOARD OF REGENTS’
RULE 12(B)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
4/18/2025
Description
AMC - Amended Complaint
Docket Date
4/21/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
First Amended Complaint
Filing Date
4/18/2025
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
4/22/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING OF PROPOSED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
4/16/2025
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned
Docket Date
4/16/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/14/2025
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
4/14/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/9/2025
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/9/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE REQUESTING ASSIGNMENT TO COMMERCIAL COURT EFILE BILLING $263
Filing Date
3/13/2025
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/14/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
OVG FACILITIES LLC
Filing Date
3/13/2025
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/14/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
ARIZONA BOARD OF REGENTS
Filing Date
3/7/2025
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
3/8/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Complaint
Filing Date
3/7/2025
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
3/8/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Civil Cover Sheet
Filing Date
3/7/2025
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
3/8/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Not Subject To
Filing Date
3/7/2025
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
3/8/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Filing Date
3/7/2025
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
3/8/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.