« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2025-002719
Judge:
Gordon, Michael
File Date:
1/23/2025
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Cecilia Moreno
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
James Barton
Party Name
Lydia Hernandez
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Thomas Basile
Party Name
Cassandra Hernandez
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Thomas Basile
Party Name
Shelli Boggs
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Joseph La Rue
Party Name
Cartwright School District #83
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2025
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/6/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2025
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
4/25/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/2025
Description
CLM - Claim
Docket Date
4/22/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF CLAIM OF UNCONSTITUTIONALITY / efile billing $263.00
Filing Date
4/22/2025
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
4/22/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Prehearing Statement
Filing Date
4/18/2025
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
4/18/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2025
Description
AMS - Affidavit Alternative Method of Service
Docket Date
4/18/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Affidavit of Alternative Service
Filing Date
4/16/2025
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
4/21/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2025
Description
AMS - Affidavit Alternative Method of Service
Docket Date
4/17/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASSANDRA HERNANDEZ
Filing Date
4/15/2025
Description
AMS - Affidavit Alternative Method of Service
Docket Date
4/17/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
LYDIA HERNANDEZ
Filing Date
4/15/2025
Description
AMS - Affidavit Alternative Method of Service
Docket Date
4/17/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASSANDRA HERNANDEZ
Filing Date
4/14/2025
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
4/15/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Limited Appearance
Filing Date
4/11/2025
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/14/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF SERVICE EFFORTS WITH RESPECT TO THE COURT’S ORDER TO APPEAR ON APRIL 8, 2025
Filing Date
4/9/2025
Description
087 - ME: Order To Show Cause Issued
Docket Date
4/9/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/8/2025
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/8/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER TO APPEAR
Filing Date
3/19/2025
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/19/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER TO APPEAR
Filing Date
3/17/2025
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
3/17/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF’S APPLICATION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Filing Date
3/17/2025
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
3/17/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Application for Order to Show Cause
Filing Date
3/10/2025
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
3/10/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY SCHOOL SUPERINTENDENT SHELLI BOGGS’ ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF’S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT / CO-CHRG $263.00 R# 30180935
Filing Date
3/10/2025
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
3/10/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY SCHOOL SUPERINTENDENT SHELLI BOGGS’ ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF’S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
2/27/2025
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/4/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
CARTWRIGHT SCHOOL DISTRICT # 83 C/O LYDIA HERNANDEZ
Filing Date
2/27/2025
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/4/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
CARTWRIGHT SCHOOL DISTRICT #83 C/O DENICE GARCIA
Filing Date
2/27/2025
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/4/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
CARTWRIGHT SCHOOL DISTRICT #83 GOVERNING BOARD
Filing Date
2/27/2025
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/4/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
CARTWRIGHT SCHOOL DISTRICT # 83
Filing Date
2/27/2025
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/4/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
CARTWRIGHT SCHOOL DISTRICT # 83
Filing Date
2/24/2025
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/28/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/2025
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/28/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/2025
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/28/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASSANDRA HERNANDEZ
Filing Date
2/24/2025
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/28/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
SHELLI BOGGS
Filing Date
2/24/2025
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/28/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
LYDIA HERNANDEZ
Filing Date
2/14/2025
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
2/18/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration
Filing Date
2/13/2025
Description
AMC - Amended Complaint
Docket Date
2/13/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
First Amended Complaint
Filing Date
1/31/2025
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
2/3/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
1/23/2025
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
1/23/2025
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
1/23/2025
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
1/23/2025
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
4/8/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Order To Show Cause
Date
4/16/2025
Time
9:30
Event
Order To Show Cause
Date
4/22/2025
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
7/11/2025
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.