« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2024-035961
Judge:
Herrod, Michael
File Date:
12/12/2024
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Suewong McFadden
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Unknown
Attorney
Ross Meyer
Party Name
Suewong McFadden Academy
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Ross Meyer
Party Name
June Reynolds
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Benjamin Gottlieb
Party Name
Jerome Green
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Benjamin Gottlieb
Party Name
Proverb Group Homes L L C
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Benjamin Gottlieb
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/1/2025
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
4/1/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
4/1/2025
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
4/1/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
3/28/2025
Description
AMC - Amended Complaint
Docket Date
3/31/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
First Amended Complaint
Filing Date
3/19/2025
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
3/19/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE EFILE BILLING $263
Filing Date
3/10/2025
Description
375 - Case on Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
3/10/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/3/2025
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont
Docket Date
3/3/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2025
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence
Docket Date
2/12/2025
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF’S LIST OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF COMPLAINT
Filing Date
1/30/2025
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
1/30/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
1/27/2025
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
1/28/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL / GOTTLIEB LAW, PLC, JESSICA REEVES
Filing Date
1/17/2025
Description
WAV - Waiver
Docket Date
1/21/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Waiver of Service
Filing Date
1/10/2025
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
1/13/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Special Limited Appearance / efile billing $263
Filing Date
1/9/2025
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
1/9/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/9/2025
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/10/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER TO APPEAR
Filing Date
12/17/2024
Description
087 - ME: Order To Show Cause Issued
Docket Date
12/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/13/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER TO APPEAR
Filing Date
12/12/2024
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
12/12/2024
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
Civil Complaint
Filing Date
12/12/2024
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
12/12/2024
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration
Filing Date
12/12/2024
Description
ASA - Affidavit in Support of Application for Deferral or Waiver of Service Process Costs
Docket Date
12/12/2024
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFFEREAL OR WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS FEES
Filing Date
12/12/2024
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
12/12/2024
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR DEFERRAL OR WAIVER OF COURT FEES OR COSTS AND CONSENT TO ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Filing Date
12/12/2024
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
12/12/2024
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
Civil Cover Sheet
Filing Date
12/12/2024
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
12/12/2024
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
Summons
Filing Date
12/12/2024
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
12/12/2024
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
Summons
Filing Date
12/12/2024
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
12/12/2024
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
Summons
Filing Date
12/12/2024
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
12/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER REGARDING DEFERRAL OR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS AND NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT JUDGMENT
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
1/8/2025
Time
9:30
Event
Order To Show Cause
Date
3/7/2025
Time
11:15
Event
Order To Show Cause
Date
3/7/2025
Time
11:15
Event
Status Conference
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.