« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2024-030770
Judge:
Minder, Scott
File Date:
10/29/2024
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Maricopa County Republican Committee
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Dennis Wilenchik
Party Name
Blaine Griffin
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Dennis Wilenchik
Party Name
Maricopa County Arizona
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Maricopa County Board Of Supervisors
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Jack Sellers
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Clint Hickman
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Thomas Galvin
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Bill Gates
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Steve Gallardo
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/5/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
11/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/5/2024
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
11/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/5/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
11/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/5/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document
Docket Date
11/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DOCUMENTS PROPOSED FOR FILING UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
11/4/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
11/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY DEFENDANTS??? MOTION TO DECLINE SPECIAL ACTION JURISDICTION
Filing Date
11/4/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF RE: SPECIAL ACTION JURISDICTION
Filing Date
11/4/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
11/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PERMITTING THE FILING OF DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
11/4/2024
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
11/7/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/1/2024
Description
504: Me: Record Appeal Assignment
Docket Date
11/1/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/1/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
11/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO FILE UNREDACTED VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR SPECIAL ACTION AND ACCOMPANYING UNREDACTED EXHIBITS UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
10/31/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
11/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY ARIZONA
Filing Date
10/31/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
11/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JACK SELLERS
Filing Date
10/31/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
11/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STEVE GALLARDO
Filing Date
10/31/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
11/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
CLINT HICKMAN
Filing Date
10/31/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
11/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
BILL GATES
Filing Date
10/31/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
11/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
THOMAS GALVIN
Filing Date
10/31/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
11/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY BOARD OF SUPERVISORS
Filing Date
10/31/2024
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
11/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2024
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
11/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2024
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
11/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
11/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO APPEAR
Filing Date
10/31/2024
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
11/7/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2024
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
10/31/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2024
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
10/31/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2024
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
10/31/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Filing Date
10/29/2024
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
10/31/2024
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
11/1/2024
Time
13:30
Event
Order To Show Cause
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.