« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2024-027778
Judge:
Blaney, Scott
File Date:
10/2/2024
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Strong Communities Foundation Of Arizona Incorporated
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
James Rogers
Party Name
Arizona Department Of State
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Craig Morgan
Party Name
Adrian Fontes
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Craig Morgan
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/2025
Description
049 - ME: Judgment Signed
Docket Date
1/27/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2025
Description
JUD - Judgment
Docket Date
1/27/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 54(C) FINAL JUDGMENT
Filing Date
12/11/2024
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal
Docket Date
12/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COURT OF APPEALS
Filing Date
12/11/2024
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order
Docket Date
12/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER ACCEPTING JURISDICTION DENYING RELIEF
Filing Date
11/26/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
11/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
The Secretary's Response to Plaintiff's Application for Attorneys' Fees and Costs
Filing Date
11/21/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF’S NOTICE OF LODGING FORM OF JUDGMENT
Filing Date
11/15/2024
Description
AAF - Application For Attorney Fees
Docket Date
11/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS’ FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
11/5/2024
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet
Docket Date
11/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DIGITAL EXHIBITS
Filing Date
11/4/2024
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order
Docket Date
11/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER ACCEPTING JURISDICTION DENYING RELIEF
Filing Date
11/4/2024
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
11/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/1/2024
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
11/1/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/1/2024
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
11/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING OF DECLARATION OF ADRIAN FONTES TO CORRECT THE RECORD
Filing Date
10/31/2024
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling
Docket Date
10/31/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
11/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING PLANNED SPECIAL ACTION, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR RELEASE OF DOCUMENTS
Filing Date
10/29/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING [PROPOSED] FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
Filing Date
10/29/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
Filing Date
10/25/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
The Secretary's Expert Disclosure
Filing Date
10/25/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
The Secretary's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike
Filing Date
10/24/2024
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
10/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
THE SECRETARY’S BENCH TRIAL MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
10/24/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Notice of Stipulation Regarding Evidence to be Used at October 28, 2024 Hearing
Filing Date
10/24/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
THE PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO STRIKE
Filing Date
10/23/2024
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
10/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR STATUTORY SPECIAL ACTION TO SECURE ACCESS TO PUBLIC RECORDS
Filing Date
10/23/2024
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence
Docket Date
10/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
THE SECRETARY’S LIST OF ANTICIPATED EXHIBITS
Filing Date
10/23/2024
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence
Docket Date
10/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
The Plaintiff's Trial Exhibit List
Filing Date
10/22/2024
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
10/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/2024
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
10/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY IN SUPPORT OF EMERGENCY MOTION TO ADD ONE HOUR TO EVIDENTIARY HEARING
Filing Date
10/21/2024
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
10/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF OUT OF STATE EXPERT WITNESS TO APPEAR REMOTELY AT THE EVIDENTIARY HEARING
Filing Date
10/18/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
10/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2024
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
10/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF’S COMBINED RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT’S EMERGENCY MOTION TO ADD ONE HOUR TO EVIDENTIARY HEARING AND OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR VIRTUAL APPEARANCE
Filing Date
10/17/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF OUT OF STATE EXPERT WITNESS TO APPEAR REMOTELY AT THE EVIDENTIARY HEARING
Filing Date
10/17/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Emergency Motion to Add One Hour to Evidentiary Hearing
Filing Date
10/17/2024
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
10/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response To Plaintiff's Notice Of Supplemental Authority
Filing Date
10/16/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority
Filing Date
10/16/2024
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling
Docket Date
10/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ADRIAN FONTES
Filing Date
10/7/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO APPEAR DATE OCTOBER 15 2024 TIME 1:30PM TYPE OF HEARING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RETURN HEARING
Filing Date
10/4/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Filing Date
10/4/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
10/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance / CO-CHG 29972895
Filing Date
10/2/2024
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
10/3/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/2/2024
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
10/3/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/2/2024
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
10/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Filing Date
10/2/2024
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
10/3/2024
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
10/15/2024
Time
13:30
Event
Order To Show Cause
Date
10/28/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
1/24/2025
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Strong Communities Foundation Of Arizona Incorporated
A: Arizona Department Of State
Amount
$577.51
Frequency
One Time
Type
Costs
Status
Date
1/24/2025
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Strong Communities Foundation Of Arizona Incorporated
A: Arizona Department Of State
Amount
$78,675.80
Frequency
One Time
Type
Attorney Fee
Status