« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2024-021952
Judge:
Moskowitz, Frank
File Date:
8/13/2024
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Carrie Cox
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Timothy Lasota
Party Name
Susan Wood
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Craig Stephan
Party Name
Bob Gomez
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
CHARLES JOHNSON
Party Name
Michelle Rugloski
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
CHARLES JOHNSON
Party Name
David Genge
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
CHARLES JOHNSON
Party Name
Kevin Maldonado
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
CHARLES JOHNSON
Party Name
Carol Torkko
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
CHARLES JOHNSON
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2025
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
2/21/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED APPELLATE CLERK / COURT OF APPEALS
Filing Date
2/13/2025
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
2/21/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPELLATE CLERK / COURT OF APPEALS
Filing Date
2/13/2025
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt
Docket Date
2/18/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT
Filing Date
2/3/2025
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
2/3/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Transcript Order and Statement of Issues on Appeal
Filing Date
1/22/2025
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
1/28/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEAL
Filing Date
1/15/2025
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal
Docket Date
1/16/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEAL EFILE BILLING $118
Filing Date
1/15/2025
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
1/17/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
12/17/2024
Description
JUD - Judgment
Docket Date
12/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JUDGMENT
Filing Date
12/3/2024
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet
Docket Date
12/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DIGITAL EXHIBITS
Filing Date
11/18/2024
Description
SOC - Statement Of Costs
Docket Date
11/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ STATEMENT OF COSTS
Filing Date
11/18/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF LODGING PROPOSED FORM OF JUDGMENT
Filing Date
11/15/2024
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling
Docket Date
11/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2024
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
11/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2024
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
11/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2024
Description
NTF - Notice to the File
Docket Date
11/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice To The File
Filing Date
11/11/2024
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
11/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Trial Memo
Filing Date
11/11/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
11/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS’ TRIAL MEMO
Filing Date
11/11/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
11/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO MOTION TO STRIKE TRIAL MEMO
Filing Date
11/9/2024
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
11/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMICUS BRIEF BY JIM O’CONNOR
Filing Date
11/8/2024
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence
Docket Date
11/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS' LIST OF EXHIBITS
Filing Date
11/8/2024
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
11/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT
Filing Date
10/29/2024
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
10/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2024
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
10/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/2024
Description
095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset
Docket Date
10/28/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/2024
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
10/28/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2024
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration
Docket Date
10/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
Filing Date
10/25/2024
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration
Docket Date
10/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF MOTION TO POSTPONE TRIAL
Filing Date
10/25/2024
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset
Docket Date
10/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ RULE 7.1(h) COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE RE MOTION & AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
10/23/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
10/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
10/22/2024
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
10/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ REPLY IN SUPPORT SUSAN WOOD OF THEIR AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS & REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO POSTPONE TRIAL
Filing Date
10/21/2024
Description
095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset
Docket Date
10/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to Motion to Postpone
Filing Date
10/21/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ MOTION REQUESTING VIRTUAL HEARING FOR MOTION TO DISMISS & MOTION TO POSTPONE TRIAL
Filing Date
10/21/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION REQUESTING VIRTUAL HEARING FOR MOTION TO DISMISS & MOTION TO POSTPONE TRIAL
Filing Date
10/17/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS MOTION TO POSTPONE TRIAL
Filing Date
10/16/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
10/10/2024
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
10/10/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/9/2024
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
10/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS: ISSUE PRECLUSION; COLLATERAL ESTOPPEL; CLAIM PRECLUSION; RES JUDICATA; NON-JUSTICIABLE CLAIMS FOR RELIEF
Filing Date
10/8/2024
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
10/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO DISMISS FOR COLLATERAL ESTOPPEL AND NONJUSTICIABLE
Filing Date
10/5/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
10/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF APPEARANCE EFILE BILLING $245
Filing Date
10/1/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DAVID GENGE
Filing Date
10/1/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
CAROL TORKKO
Filing Date
10/1/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
KEVIN MALDONADO
Filing Date
10/1/2024
Description
AMS - Affidavit Alternative Method of Service
Docket Date
10/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MICHELLE RUGLOSKI
Filing Date
10/1/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ROBERT JOHN GOMEZ
Filing Date
9/20/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
9/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Errata
Filing Date
9/13/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER AUTHORIZING ALTERNATIVE MEANS OF SERVICE OF PROCESS
Filing Date
9/13/2024
Description
OSC - Order To Show Cause
Docket Date
9/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Filing Date
9/12/2024
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
9/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Filing Date
9/12/2024
Description
AMC - Amended Complaint
Docket Date
9/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
9/12/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
9/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION THAT THE COURT AUTHORIZE ALTERNATIVE SERVICE
Filing Date
9/5/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
9/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
CAROL TARKKO
Filing Date
9/5/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
9/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DAVID WILLIAM GANGE
Filing Date
9/4/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
9/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
CAROL TORKKO
Filing Date
9/4/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
9/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DAVID WILLIAM GENGE
Filing Date
9/4/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
9/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
KEVIN ANTHONY MALDONADO
Filing Date
9/4/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
9/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DAVID WILLIAM GENGE
Filing Date
8/13/2024
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
8/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Verified Complaint
Filing Date
8/13/2024
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
8/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Civil Cover Sheet
Filing Date
8/13/2024
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
8/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Filing Date
8/13/2024
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
8/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Filing Date
8/13/2024
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
8/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Filing Date
8/13/2024
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
8/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Filing Date
8/13/2024
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
8/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
10/9/2024
Time
9:15
Event
Order To Show Cause
Date
10/23/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/23/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
10/24/2024
Time
15:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/28/2024
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/28/2024
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/29/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
10/30/2024
Time
10:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
10/31/2024
Time
9:15
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
11/12/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
11/13/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
12/17/2024
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Bob Gomez, Michelle Rugloski, David Genge, Kevin Maldonado, Carol Torkko
A: Carrie Cox
Amount
$736.21
Frequency
One Time
Type
Costs
Status