« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2024-010291
Judge:
Gordon, Michael
File Date:
4/29/2024
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Nexa Mortgage L L C
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
JAMES VALLETTA
Party Name
Mathew L Grella
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Daniel Mestaz
Party Name
Sheridan Murray-Grella
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Daniel Mestaz
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/23/2024
Description
053 - ME: Case Consolidation
Docket Date
7/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/22/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER CONSOLIDATING
CASES
Filing Date
7/16/2024
Description
MCD - Motion To Consolidate
Docket Date
7/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES
Filing Date
7/8/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FIRST EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
6/24/2024
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
6/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants’ Motion to Dismiss First
Amended Complaint for Failure to State
a Claim [Ariz. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)] / EFILE BILLING $245.00
Filing Date
6/12/2024
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
6/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Acceptance of Service
Filing Date
6/4/2024
Description
AMC - Amended Complaint
Docket Date
6/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
First Amended Complaint
Filing Date
5/6/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MATHEW L GRELLA
Filing Date
5/6/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SHERIDAN MURRAY GRELLA
Filing Date
4/29/2024
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
4/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Complaint
Filing Date
4/29/2024
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
4/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Civil Cover Sheet
Filing Date
4/29/2024
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
4/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Not Subject To
Filing Date
4/29/2024
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
4/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Filing Date
4/29/2024
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
4/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.