« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2024-005840
Judge:
Driggs, Adam
File Date:
3/19/2024
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
City Of Peoria
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Jessica Post
Party Name
Vanessa Hickman
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Colin Campbell
Party Name
Joseph Windham
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Colin Campbell
Party Name
Cathy Carlat
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
DANIEL MAYNARD
Party Name
Dennis Carlat
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
DANIEL MAYNARD
Party Name
Jason Beck
Relationship
Counter Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Adam Merrill
Party Name
Henry Darwin
Relationship
Counter Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Jessica Post
Party Name
Rick Buss
Relationship
Counter Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Jessica Post
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/2025
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
4/22/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/21/2025
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/24/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
REGARDING COLLECTION PROCESSING AND PRODUCTION OF ESI
Filing Date
3/27/2025
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/27/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING
CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION
Filing Date
3/25/2025
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
3/25/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF
PROTECTIVE ORDER AND ORDER
REGARDING ELECTRONICALLY
STORED INFORMATION
Filing Date
3/25/2025
Description
NOL - Notice of Lodging
Docket Date
3/25/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF LODGING ORDER
REGARDING ELECTRONICALLY
STORED INFORMATION
Filing Date
2/19/2025
Description
SCO – Scheduling Order
Docket Date
2/19/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
SCHEDULING ORDER
Filing Date
2/13/2025
Description
JSR – Joint Scheduling Report
Docket Date
2/14/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT REPORT
Filing Date
2/7/2025
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
2/10/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS HICKMAN AND WINDHAM’S NOTICE OF FILING OF AMENDED ANSWER
Filing Date
2/7/2025
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
2/10/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Hickman and Windham's Amended Answer
Filing Date
1/8/2025
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling
Docket Date
1/8/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2024
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
11/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE JOINT REPORT
Filing Date
10/15/2024
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
10/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO
FILE JOINT REPORT AND PROPOSED
SCHEDULING ORDER
Filing Date
9/11/2024
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
9/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
9/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
7/23/2024
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
7/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JASON BECK’S JOINDER IN
COUNTERDEFENDANTS’ REPLY IN
SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS
VANESSA HICKMAN’S
COUNTERCLAIM WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
7/23/2024
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
7/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNTERDEFENDANTS’ REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS VANESSA HICKMAN’S COUNTERCLAIM WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
7/10/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FIRST EXTENSION OF
TIME TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF
COUNTERDEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO
DISMISS
Filing Date
7/3/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
7/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNTERCLAIMANT VANESSA
HICKMAN’S RESPONSE TO
MOTION TO DISMISS
COUNTERCLAIM
Filing Date
6/14/2024
Description
CER - Certificate
Docket Date
6/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNTERDEFENDANTS CITY OF
PEORIA, JASON BECK, HENRY
DARWIN AND RICK BUSS’S GOOD
FAITH CONSULTATION
CERTIFICATE
Filing Date
6/14/2024
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
6/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNTERDEFENDANTS’ MOTION
TO DISMISS VANESSA HICKMAN’S
COUNTERCLAIM WITH
PREJUDICE
Filing Date
6/14/2024
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
6/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JASON BECKS JOINDER IN COUNTERDEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS VANESSA HICKMANS COUNTERCLAIM W PREJUDICE/ EFILE BILLING $245
Filing Date
6/14/2024
Description
CER - Certificate
Docket Date
6/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
GOOD FAITH CONSULTATION CERTIFICATE
Filing Date
6/3/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
6/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNTERDEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO COUNTERCLAIM IS DUE ON JUNE 15 2024
Filing Date
5/24/2024
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
5/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR COUNTERDEFENDANTS’ RESPONSE TO COUNTERCLAIM
Filing Date
5/3/2024
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
5/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Answer and Counterclaim / EFILE BILLING $245.00
Filing Date
5/3/2024
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
5/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Answer / EFILE BILLING $245.00
Filing Date
5/3/2024
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
5/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Cathy and Dennis Carlat's Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration
Filing Date
5/3/2024
Description
CAA - Cert Of Agreement/Arbitration
Docket Date
5/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Certificate of Agreement re Arbitration
Filing Date
4/5/2024
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
4/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Acceptance of Service cathy and dennis carlat
Filing Date
4/3/2024
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
4/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE FOR VANESSA HICKMAN AND JOSEPH WINDHAM
Filing Date
3/19/2024
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
3/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Complaint
Filing Date
3/19/2024
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
3/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Civil Cover Sheet
Filing Date
3/19/2024
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
3/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Not Subject To
Filing Date
3/19/2024
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
3/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Filing Date
3/19/2024
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
3/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Filing Date
3/19/2024
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
3/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Filing Date
3/19/2024
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
3/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
11/8/2024
Time
15:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
3/13/2026
Time
9:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.