« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2024-003889
Judge:
McCoy, M. Scott
File Date:
2/28/2024
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
State Of Arizona
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Laura Dilweg
Party Name
Kristin K Mayes
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Jayme Weber
Party Name
Realpage Inc
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
ROBERT SCHAFFER
Party Name
Avenue5 Residential L L C
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Ian Fischer
Party Name
B H Management Services L L C
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
BRADLEY JOHNSTON
Party Name
Camden Property Trust
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Joshua Grabel
Party Name
Crow Holdings L P
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
David Gaona
Party Name
Trammell Crow Residential Company
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
David Gaona
Party Name
Greystar Management Services L P
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Robert McKirgan
Party Name
H S L Properties Inc
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
ANDREW HAYNES
Party Name
H S L Asset Management L L C
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
ANDREW HAYNES
Party Name
R P M Living L L C
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Matthew Sloan
Party Name
Weidner Property Management L L C
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
HAL CLYDE
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/2025
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
4/22/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF
DEFENDANT APARTMENT
MANAGEMENT CONSULTANTS,
LLC, WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Filing Date
4/17/2025
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
4/18/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT APARTMENT MANAGEMENT CONSULTANTS, LLC, WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Filing Date
4/16/2025
Description
PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order
Docket Date
4/16/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER RE: MOTION TO
ASSOCIATE JOHN F. GUILD
AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE
Filing Date
4/11/2025
Description
PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application
Docket Date
4/14/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO ASSOCIATE JOHN
F. GUILD AS COUNSEL PRO
HAC VICE
Filing Date
3/18/2025
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
3/18/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/2025
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/18/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER REGARDING SEARCH
AND PRODUCTION OF
ELECTRONICALLY STORED
INFORMATION AND PAPER
DOCUMENTS
Filing Date
3/18/2025
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/18/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER
Filing Date
3/17/2025
Description
SCO – Scheduling Order
Docket Date
3/20/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED /
Filing Date
3/14/2025
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
3/14/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER REGARDING SEARCH AND PRODUCTION OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION AND PAPER DOCUMENTS
Filing Date
3/14/2025
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
3/14/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER
Filing Date
3/11/2025
Description
085 - ME: Conference
Docket Date
3/11/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2025
Description
NWA - Notice Withdrawal Of Attorney
Docket Date
2/28/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel
Filing Date
2/21/2025
Description
JSR – Joint Scheduling Report
Docket Date
2/24/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Report
Filing Date
2/20/2025
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
2/20/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
2/6/2025
Description
OFS - Order for Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
2/6/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER APPROVING SUBSTITUTION OF
COUNSEL WITH CLIENT CONSENT
Filing Date
1/29/2025
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
1/30/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Application for Substitution of Counsel with Client Consent
Filing Date
1/23/2025
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set
Docket Date
1/23/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/1/2024
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
11/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant RPM Livings, LLC's Answer to First Amended Complaint
Filing Date
10/28/2024
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
10/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Answer to First Amended Complaint
Filing Date
10/28/2024
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
10/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT AVENUE5 RESIDENTIAL LLC’s ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
10/28/2024
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
10/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS CROW HOLDINGS, LP AND TRAMMELL CROW RESIDENTIAL COMPANY’S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
JURY TRIAL DEMANDED
Filing Date
10/28/2024
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
10/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
HSL Properties, Inc. and HSL Asset Management, LLC's Answer to First Amended Complaint
Filing Date
10/28/2024
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
10/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT BH MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC’S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF’S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
10/28/2024
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
10/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT REALPAGE, INC.’S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
10/28/2024
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
10/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT CAMDEN PROPERTY TRUST’S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
10/28/2024
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
10/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
GREP Southwest, LLCs Answer and Affirmative Defenses
Filing Date
10/23/2024
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
10/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Weidner Property Management LLC - Answer and Affirmative Defenses to First Amended Complaint
Filing Date
10/15/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
10/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ADDITIONAL COUNSEL WITHIN SAME FIRM
Filing Date
10/8/2024
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
10/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing First Amended Complaint
Filing Date
10/8/2024
Description
AMC - Amended Complaint
Docket Date
10/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
First Amended Complaint
Filing Date
9/17/2024
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling
Docket Date
9/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2024
Description
PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order
Docket Date
9/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER RE: MOTION TO ASSOCIATE
PRO HAC VICE
Filing Date
9/4/2024
Description
PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application
Docket Date
9/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Associate Pro Hac Vice
Filing Date
8/23/2024
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
8/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/23/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF STATE OF ARIZONA’S NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
Filing Date
8/19/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
8/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF
LOCAL COUNSEL FOR PRO HAC
VICE ADMISSION OF DAVID A.
WALTON
Filing Date
8/19/2024
Description
PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order
Docket Date
8/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF
LOCAL COUNSEL FOR PRO HAC
VICE ADMISSION OF TROY L.
HAYES
Filing Date
8/13/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION AND CONSENT OF LOCAL
COUNSEL FOR PRO HAC VICE
ADMISSION OF DAVID A. WALTON
Filing Date
8/13/2024
Description
PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application
Docket Date
8/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION AND CONSENT OF LOCAL COUNSEL FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF TROY L. HAYES
Filing Date
7/29/2024
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
7/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Court Reporter
Filing Date
7/26/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED ORDER GRANTING
JOINT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO
EXCEED PAGE LIMITS
Filing Date
7/23/2024
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
7/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2024
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
7/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Reply in support of their Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint
Filing Date
7/12/2024
Description
PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order
Docket Date
7/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF
LOCAL COUNSEL FOR PRO HAC
VICE ADMISSION OF STEPHEN
J. MCINTYRE
Filing Date
7/10/2024
Description
PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application
Docket Date
7/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION AND CONSENT OF
LOCAL COUNSEL FOR PRO HAC
VICE ADMISSION OF STEPHEN
J. MCINTYRE
Filing Date
7/9/2024
Description
PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order
Docket Date
7/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER RE: MOTION TO
ASSOCIATE COUNSEL JAMES G.
KRESS PRO HAC VICE
Filing Date
7/3/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION
TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR JOINT
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
7/1/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/2/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for Joint Case Management Report
Filing Date
6/27/2024
Description
PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO ASSOCIATE COUNSEL JAMES G. KRESS PRO HAC VICE
Filing Date
6/25/2024
Description
PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order
Docket Date
6/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER RE: MOTION TO
ASSOCIATE COUNSEL PRO HAC
VICE
Filing Date
6/25/2024
Description
PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order
Docket Date
6/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER RE: MOTION TO
ASSOCIATE PRO HAC VICE
Filing Date
6/24/2024
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
6/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
THE STATE'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Filing Date
6/18/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
6/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED
MOTION FOR COMPLEX CASE
DESIGNATION
Filing Date
6/18/2024
Description
PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application
Docket Date
6/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Associate Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Filing Date
6/18/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Lodging Amended Order Granting Joint Motion for LeAVE to Exceed Page Limits
Filing Date
6/14/2024
Description
PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order
Docket Date
6/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF
LOCAL COUNSEL FOR PRO HAC
VICE ADMISSION OF IAN T.
SIMMONS AND PATRICK J.
JONES
Filing Date
6/14/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF LODGING PROPOSED
ORDER
Filing Date
6/14/2024
Description
PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application
Docket Date
6/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Associate Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Filing Date
6/11/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME
Filing Date
6/11/2024
Description
PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application
Docket Date
6/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION AND CONSENT OF
LOCAL COUNSEL FOR PRO HAC
VICE ADMISSION OF IAN T.
SIMMONS AND PATRICK J.
JONES
Filing Date
6/7/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED NOTICE OF SECOND EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE AND REPLY REGARDING DEFENDANTS’ PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF’S COMPLAINT
Filing Date
6/6/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulated Motion for Complex Case Designation
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order
Docket Date
5/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF
LOCAL COUNSEL FOR PRO HAC
VICE ADMISSION OF EDWIN
BUFFMIRE
Filing Date
5/23/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED NOTICE OF FIRST EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE AND REPLY REGARDING DEFENDANTS’ PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF’S COMPLAINT
Filing Date
5/22/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
5/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/2024
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
5/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT AVENUE5 RESIDENTIAL LLC’S JOINDER IN DEFENDANTS’ PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF’S COMPLAINT EFILE BILLING $245
Filing Date
5/15/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO
ASSOCIATE COUNSEL PRO HAC
VICE
Filing Date
5/13/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
5/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance / EFILE BILLING $245
Filing Date
5/13/2024
Description
PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application
Docket Date
5/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion of Local Counsel for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Edwin Buffmire
Filing Date
5/13/2024
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
5/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff"s Complaint WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
5/13/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
5/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance / efile billing $245.00
Filing Date
5/13/2024
Description
CER - Certificate
Docket Date
5/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Certificate of Good Faith Consultation
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application
Docket Date
5/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion and Consent of Local Counsel for Pro Hac Vice Admissions
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
5/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
5/8/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION
FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE
LIMITS
Filing Date
5/7/2024
Description
PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order
Docket Date
5/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER RE: MOTION TO ASSOCIATE
PRO HAC VICE
Filing Date
5/6/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits
Filing Date
5/2/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/2/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Notice Regarding Outstanding Motions
Filing Date
5/1/2024
Description
PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application
Docket Date
5/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Associate Pro Hac Vice
Filing Date
4/29/2024
Description
001 - ME: Disqualification
Docket Date
4/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2024
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned
Docket Date
4/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
4/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance / EFILE BILLING $245.00
Filing Date
4/23/2024
Description
PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order
Docket Date
4/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING MOTION
AND CONSENT OF LOCAL
COUNSEL FOR PRO HAC
VICE OF STEPHANIE
VERDOIA
Filing Date
4/23/2024
Description
PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order
Docket Date
4/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING MOTION
AND CONSENT OF LOCAL
COUNSEL FOR PRO HAC
VICE OF BREANNA VAN
ENGELEN
Filing Date
4/23/2024
Description
PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order
Docket Date
4/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING MOTION
AND CONSENT OF LOCAL
COUNSEL FOR PRO HAC
VICE OF STEVE W. BERMAN
Filing Date
4/23/2024
Description
PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order
Docket Date
4/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER RE: MOTION TO
ASSOCIATE COUNSEL PRO HAC
VICE
Filing Date
4/18/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
4/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance / EFILE BILLING $245.00
Filing Date
4/18/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
4/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
4/17/2024
Description
PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application
Docket Date
4/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Associate Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Filing Date
4/17/2024
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
4/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE OF ARIZONA’S “OBJECTION” TO NOTICE REQUESTING ASSIGNMENT TO THE COMMERCIAL COURT
Filing Date
4/16/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF SECOND EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT
Filing Date
4/16/2024
Description
PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application
Docket Date
4/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion and Consent of Local Counsel for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Steve W. Berman
Filing Date
4/16/2024
Description
PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application
Docket Date
4/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion and Consent of Local Counsel for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Breanna Van Engelen
Filing Date
4/16/2024
Description
PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application
Docket Date
4/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion and Consent of Local Counsel for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Stephanie Verdoia
Filing Date
4/15/2024
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
4/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE OF ARIZONA’S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT APARTMENT MANAGEMENT CONSULTANTS, LLC’S REQUEST FOR ASSIGNMENT TO COMMERICAL COURT
Filing Date
4/12/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joinder in Notice Requesting Assignment to Commercial Court
Filing Date
4/8/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice Requesting Assignment to the Commercial Court
Filing Date
4/4/2024
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
4/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Acceptance of Service of Summons / HSL PROPERTIES INC
Filing Date
4/2/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joinder in Notice of First Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint / EFILE BILLING $245.00
Filing Date
4/2/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
4/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
CAMDEN PROPERTY TRUST
Filing Date
3/28/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
4/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance / EFILE BILLING $245.00
Filing Date
3/27/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of First Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint / EFILE BILLING $245.00
Filing Date
3/25/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
WELDNER PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC
Filing Date
3/19/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
H S L Asset Management L L C
Filing Date
3/18/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RPM LIVING LLC
Filing Date
3/18/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
3/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance / EFILE BILLING $245.00
Filing Date
3/14/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Affidavit of Service TRAMMELL CROW RESIDENTIAL COMPANY
Filing Date
3/14/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Affidavit of Service
Filing Date
3/13/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
BH MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC
Filing Date
3/13/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
APARTMENT MANAGEMENT CONSULTANTS LLC
Filing Date
3/13/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
GREYSTAR MANAGEMENT SERVICES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Filing Date
3/13/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REALPAGE INC
Filing Date
3/13/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
AVENUE5 RESIDENTIAL LLC
Filing Date
2/28/2024
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
2/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Complaint
Filing Date
2/28/2024
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
2/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Civil Cover Sheet
Filing Date
2/28/2024
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
2/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Not Subject To
Filing Date
2/28/2024
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Filing Date
2/28/2024
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Filing Date
2/28/2024
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Filing Date
2/28/2024
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Filing Date
2/28/2024
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Filing Date
2/28/2024
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Filing Date
2/28/2024
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Filing Date
2/28/2024
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Filing Date
2/28/2024
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Filing Date
2/28/2024
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Filing Date
2/28/2024
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Filing Date
2/28/2024
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
8/20/2024
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/28/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.