« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2024-003021
Judge:
Pineda, Susanna
File Date:
2/14/2024
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Brandon B Rafi
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Raeesabbas Mohamed
Party Name
Rafi Law Group P L L C
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Raeesabbas Mohamed
Party Name
Gil Negrete
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
GEOFFREY STURR
Party Name
G N Enterprise P C
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
GEOFFREY STURR
Party Name
Valley Injury Lawyers P C
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
GEOFFREY STURR
Party Name
Trina Marie Negrete
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Valley Boyz L L C
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2025
Description
OSC - Order To Show Cause
Docket Date
5/2/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS'
MOTION TO COMPEL
PRODUCTION OF SUBPOENAED
DOCUMENTS FROM THIRD
PARTY JESUS SOTO AND
REQUEST FOR ORDER TO SHOW
CAUSE
Filing Date
4/30/2025
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/1/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Errata
Filing Date
4/29/2025
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/30/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT GIL NEGRETE’S
RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’
“MOTION FOR RELIEF
FROM DEFENDANT GIL
NEGRETE’S WITNESS
INTIMIDATION AND ABUSIVE
CONDUCT”
Filing Date
4/28/2025
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/29/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Motion to Set for Decision RE: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Subpoenaed Documents from Third-Party Jesus Soto and Request for Order to Show Cause
Filing Date
4/18/2025
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/21/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DECLARATIONS UNDER SEAL IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM DEFENDANT GIL NEGRETES INTIMIDATION AND ABUSE CONDUCT
Filing Date
4/16/2025
Description
SCO – Scheduling Order
Docket Date
4/16/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING
ORDER
Filing Date
4/11/2025
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/14/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM DEFENDANT GIL NEGRETE’S WITNESS INTIMIDATION AND ABUSIVE CONDUCT
Filing Date
4/10/2025
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
4/10/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER
Filing Date
4/10/2025
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
4/11/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 26(d) JOINT STATEMENT OF DISCOVERY DISPUTE
Filing Date
4/2/2025
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/2/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
3/28/2025
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
3/31/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
3/20/2025
Description
MTC - Motion To Compel
Docket Date
3/21/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF SUBPOENAED DOCUMENTS FROM THIRD-PARTY JESUS SOTO AND REQUEST FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Filing Date
1/9/2025
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/9/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS'
EX-PARTE MOTION TO EXTEND
DEADLINE TO FILE MOTION TO
QUASH DEFENDANTS'
SUBPOENAS
Filing Date
1/6/2025
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/7/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ EX-PARTE MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE MOTION TO QUASH DEFENDANTS’ SUBPOENAS
Filing Date
10/18/2024
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
10/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Amended Answer to Second Amended Complaint
Filing Date
10/14/2024
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
10/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Answer to Second Amended Complaint
Filing Date
10/9/2024
Description
SCO – Scheduling Order
Docket Date
10/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SCHEDULING ORDER
Filing Date
10/4/2024
Description
JSR – Joint Scheduling Report
Docket Date
10/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT REPORT
Filing Date
9/26/2024
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
9/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Acceptance of Service AND WAIVER OF PROCESS / Valley Boyz LLC
Filing Date
9/26/2024
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
9/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE AND WAIVER OF PROCESS TO TRINA MARIE NEGRETE
Filing Date
9/6/2024
Description
AMC - Amended Complaint
Docket Date
9/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
2024-09-04 Second Amended Complaint
Filing Date
9/5/2024
Description
375 - Case on Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
9/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/24/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
7/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
7/5/2024
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
7/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Answer to First Amended Complaint / EFILE BILLING $245.00
Filing Date
6/18/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
6/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
GN ENTERPRISE PC
Filing Date
6/18/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
6/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
GIL NEGRETE
Filing Date
6/18/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
6/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
VALLEY INJURY LAWYERS PC
Filing Date
5/30/2024
Description
AMC - Amended Complaint
Docket Date
5/31/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
First Amended Complaint
Filing Date
5/16/2024
Description
OXS - Order To Extend Time For Service
Docket Date
5/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR SERVICE
Filing Date
5/13/2024
Description
MXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service
Docket Date
5/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS
(FIRST REQUEST)
Filing Date
4/24/2024
Description
322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2024
Description
NWA - Notice Withdrawal Of Attorney
Docket Date
4/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
3/25/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING
PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE
MOTION FOR EARLY
DISCOVERY
Filing Date
2/23/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
2/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ EX PARTE MOTION FOR EARLY DISCOVERY EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION REQUESTED
Filing Date
2/14/2024
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
2/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLAINT
Filing Date
2/14/2024
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
2/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Civil Cover Sheet
Filing Date
2/14/2024
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
2/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Not Subject To
Filing Date
2/14/2024
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
8/25/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/30/2025
Time
9:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.