« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2023-054291
Judge:
Kaiser, Brian
File Date:
11/7/2023
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Laura Owens
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
5/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/16/2024
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
MOTION TO WITHDRAW NAME CHANGE PETITION AND REQUEST FOR REFUND OF FEES
Filing Date
12/1/2023
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
12/5/2023
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
Motion to Withdraw Name Change
Filing Date
11/7/2023
Description
APE - Application/Petition
Docket Date
11/7/2023
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
11/7/2023
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
11/7/2023
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.