« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2023-018370
Judge:
Napper, John
File Date:
11/21/2023
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Robert Mroz
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
JESSICA ZINK
Party Name
Thomas Mroz
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
JESSICA ZINK
Party Name
Sarah Mroz
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
JESSICA ZINK
Party Name
Nancy Peng
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
JESSICA ZINK
Party Name
Grubhub Inc
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Jarred McBride
Party Name
Daniel Eagleburger
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/25/2024
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
6/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS' REPLY TO DEFENDANT GRUBHUB INC.'S OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
6/21/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS FOR SHAPIRO LAW TEAM
Filing Date
6/13/2024
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
6/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE JOINT REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER
Filing Date
6/11/2024
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
6/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRUBHUB’S OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF’S PROPOSED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Submittal of Proposed Amended Complaint
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
5/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SETTING ORAL ARGUMENT ON THE MOTION ON FRIDAY MAY 17 2024 AT 11 AM WITH ONE HOUR ALLOTTED
Filing Date
3/21/2024
Description
PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order
Docket Date
3/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER RE: MOTION AND CONSENT OF LOCAL COUNSEL FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ROBERT S GLASSMAN, ESQ.
Filing Date
3/4/2024
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
3/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT GRUBHUB INC.’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS RULE 12(B)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF’S PRODUCTS LIABILITY AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES CLAIMS
Filing Date
2/26/2024
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
2/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid
Filing Date
2/20/2024
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
2/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GRUBHUB INC.'S RULE 12(B)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' PRODUCTS LIABILITY AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES CLAIMS
Filing Date
2/20/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
2/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GRUBHUB INC.'S RULE 12(B)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' PRODUCTS LIABILITY AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES CLAIMS
Filing Date
2/8/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DANIEL EAGLEBURGER
Filing Date
2/7/2024
Description
APU - Affidavit Of Publication
Docket Date
2/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRUBHUB INC
Filing Date
1/31/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/2/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDERED THAT THE DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE HER RESPONSE TO FEBRUARY 20 2024
Filing Date
1/30/2024
Description
PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application
Docket Date
2/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion of Local Counsel for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Robert Glassman
Filing Date
1/25/2024
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
1/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO DEFENDAT GRUBHUB INC.’S RULE 12(B)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF’S PRODUCTS LIABILITY AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES CLAIMS
Filing Date
1/9/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER
Filing Date
12/27/2023
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
12/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO DEFENDAT GRUBHUB INC.’S RULE 12(B)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF’S PRODUCTS LIABILITY AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES CLAIMS
Filing Date
12/18/2023
Description
925 – ME: Visiting Judge/Out of County Judge Assignment
Docket Date
12/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/18/2023
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
12/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT GRUBHUB INC.’S RULE 12(B)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF’S PRODUCTS LIABILITY AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES CLAIMS
Filing Date
12/15/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
REASSIGNING CASE
Filing Date
12/13/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/18/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER
Filing Date
12/5/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
12/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRUBHUB INC
Filing Date
11/21/2023
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Complaint for Wrongful Death- Tier 3
Filing Date
11/21/2023
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Civil Cover Sheet
Filing Date
11/21/2023
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Not Subject To
Filing Date
11/21/2023
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Filing Date
11/21/2023
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Filing Date
11/21/2023
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
5/17/2024
Time
11:00
Event
Oral Argument
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.