« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2023-017231
Judge:
Fox, Dewain
File Date:
11/1/2023
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
eFile
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Legacy Cares Acquisition Of A Z, L L C
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Joshua Grabel
Party Name
B C Ziegler And Company Inc
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
John O'Neal
Party Name
Legacy Sports L L C
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Legacy Sports U S A, L L C
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Randy J Miller
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Chad Miller
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Gust Rosenfeld P L C
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
DONALD WILSON
Party Name
Bondfholder Group, The
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Ben Himmelstein
Party Name
Vanguard Municiple Bond Funds
Relationship
Consolidated
Sex
Attorney
Ben Himmelstein
Party Name
Vanguard Tax Managed Funds
Relationship
Consolidated
Sex
Attorney
Ben Himmelstein
Party Name
A B Bond Fund Inc
Relationship
Consolidated
Sex
Attorney
Ben Himmelstein
Party Name
A B Corporate Shares
Relationship
Consolidated
Sex
Attorney
Ben Himmelstein
Party Name
A B Municipal Income Fund I I
Relationship
Consolidated
Sex
Attorney
Ben Himmelstein
Party Name
Ab Municipal Income Fund I I
Relationship
Consolidated
Sex
Attorney
Ben Himmelstein
Party Name
Sanford C Bernstein Fund Inc
Relationship
Consolidated
Sex
Attorney
Ben Himmelstein
Party Name
Voyageur Mutual Funds
Relationship
Consolidated
Sex
Attorney
Ben Himmelstein
Party Name
Delaware Group Tax-Free Fund
Relationship
Consolidated
Sex
Attorney
Ben Himmelstein
Party Name
Voyageur Insured Funds
Relationship
Consolidated
Sex
Attorney
Ben Himmelstein
Party Name
P I M C O New York Municipal Income Fund I I
Relationship
Consolidated
Sex
Attorney
Ben Himmelstein
Party Name
P I M C O New York Municipal Income Fund I I I
Relationship
Consolidated
Sex
Attorney
Ben Himmelstein
Party Name
P I M C O California Municipal Income Fundp
Relationship
Consolidated
Sex
Attorney
Ben Himmelstein
Party Name
P I M C O California Municipal Income Fund I Ip
Relationship
Consolidated
Sex
Attorney
Ben Himmelstein
Party Name
P I M C O Californai Municipal Income Fund I I I
Relationship
Consolidated
Sex
Attorney
Ben Himmelstein
Party Name
P I M C O Municipal Income Fund
Relationship
Consolidated
Sex
Attorney
Ben Himmelstein
Party Name
P I M C O Municipa Income Fund I I
Relationship
Consolidated
Sex
Attorney
Ben Himmelstein
Party Name
P I M C O Municipal Income Fund I I I
Relationship
Consolidated
Sex
Attorney
Ben Himmelstein
Party Name
P I M C O High Yield Municipal Bond Fund
Relationship
Consolidated
Sex
Attorney
Ben Himmelstein
Party Name
P I M C O Flexible Municipal Income Fund
Relationship
Consolidated
Sex
Attorney
Ben Himmelstein
Party Name
J P A S-Credit L L C
Relationship
Consolidated
Sex
Attorney
Ben Himmelstein
Party Name
Jessica J Kokal
Relationship
Endorsement Case
Sex
Female
Attorney
Jessica Kokal
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2025
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
4/28/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT B.C. ZIEGLER AND COMPANY, INC. TO SUPPLEMENT ITS RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF’S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION
Filing Date
4/24/2025
Description
PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application
Docket Date
4/24/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Associate Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Filing Date
4/24/2025
Description
PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application
Docket Date
4/25/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO ASSOCIATE COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE
Filing Date
4/22/2025
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/22/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF NEAL GERBER & EISENBERG LLP, COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT B.C. ZIEGLER AND COMPANY, INC. (NO. CV2024-024600)
Filing Date
4/22/2025
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/23/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF NEAL, GERBER & EISENBERG LLP, COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT B.C. ZIEGLER AND COMPANY, INC.
Filing Date
4/18/2025
Description
NNF - Not Of Non-Parties At Fault
Docket Date
4/18/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT GUST ROSENFELD, P.L.C. NOTICE OF NONPARTIES AT FAULT
Filing Date
4/18/2025
Description
NNF - Not Of Non-Parties At Fault
Docket Date
4/21/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT GUST ROSENFELD, P.L.C.’S THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF NON-PARTIES AT FAULT
Filing Date
4/18/2025
Description
NNF - Not Of Non-Parties At Fault
Docket Date
4/21/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT B.C. ZIEGLER AND COMPANY, INC.’S NOTICE OF NON-PARTIES AT FAULT
Filing Date
4/18/2025
Description
NNF - Not Of Non-Parties At Fault
Docket Date
4/21/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT B.C. ZIEGLER AND COMPANY, INC.’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF NON-PARTIES AT FAULT (NO. CV2023-017231)
Filing Date
4/11/2025
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/14/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT B. C. ZIEGLER AND COMPANY’S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO COMPEL SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION
Filing Date
4/2/2025
Description
NWA - Notice Withdrawal Of Attorney
Docket Date
4/4/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
3/21/2025
Description
MTC - Motion To Compel
Docket Date
3/24/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT B.C. ZIEGLER AND COMPANY, INC. TO SUPPLEMENT ITS RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF’S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION
Filing Date
3/11/2025
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
3/11/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/5/2025
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/5/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Errata re Joint Statement of Discovery Dispute
Filing Date
3/3/2025
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
3/4/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT STATEMENT OF DISCOVERY DISPUTE
Filing Date
2/18/2025
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
2/19/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response and Objection to Subpoena Duces Tecum (Records Only)
Filing Date
2/7/2025
Description
053 - ME: Case Consolidation
Docket Date
2/7/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/4/2025
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
2/10/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR COMMISSION TO ISSUE SUBPEONA FOR APPEARANCE AT DEPOSITION
Filing Date
2/4/2025
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
2/10/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR COMMISSION TO ISSUE SUBPOENA FOR APPEARANCE AT DEPOSITION
Filing Date
2/3/2025
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
2/4/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT GUST ROSENFELD P.L.C. TO DISCLOSE DOCUMENTS REQUIRED BY RULE 26.1
Filing Date
1/24/2025
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
1/24/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS B. C. ZIEGLER AND COMPANY AND GUST ROSENFELD, P.L.C.’S REPLY IN SUPPORT MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES UNDER RULE 42
Filing Date
1/24/2025
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
1/24/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Limited Appearance / EFILE BILLING $263.00
Filing Date
1/24/2025
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
1/24/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
BONDHOLDER GROUP PLAINTIFFS’ REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE UNDER RULE 42
Filing Date
1/17/2025
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
1/21/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT GUST ROSENFELD’S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO COMPEL
Filing Date
1/16/2025
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/16/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall have until January 17, 2025, to file its response
Filing Date
1/9/2025
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/10/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT GUST ROSENFELD, P.L.C.’S MOTION TO EXTEND DUE DATES FOR MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSE AND REPLY
Filing Date
1/3/2025
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
1/6/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Consolidate Under Rule 42
Filing Date
12/27/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT GUST ROSENFELD P.L.C. TO DISCLOSE DOCUMENTS REQUIRED BY RULE 26.1 UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
12/27/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document
Docket Date
12/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
LEGACY CARES ACQUISITION OF AZ, LLC MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT GUST ROSENFELD P.L.C TO DISCLOSE DOCUMENTS REQUIRED BY RULE 26.1 EXHIBIT 5, 10, 11, 12, 13 AND 14.
Filing Date
12/26/2024
Description
PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order
Docket Date
12/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING MOTION AND CONSENT OF LOCAL COUNSEL FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF KEVIN C. MAY
Filing Date
12/23/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
12/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF SECOND EXTENSION OF RESPONSE AND REPLY DEADLINES REGARDING DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES UNDER RULE 42
Filing Date
12/20/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
12/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT GUST ROSENFELD P.L.C. TO DISCLOSE DOCMENTS REQUIRED BY RULE 26.1 UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
12/20/2024
Description
MTC - Motion To Compel
Docket Date
12/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Compel DEFENDANT Gust Rosenfeld P L C to Disclose Documents Required by Rule 26.1
Filing Date
12/16/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEGACY CARES ACQUISITION OF AZ, LLC'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND BRIEFING DEADLINES REGARDING THE PARTIES' JOINT STATEMENT OF DISCOVERY DISPUTE
Filing Date
12/16/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
12/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FIRST EXTENSION OF RESPONSE AND REPLY DEADLINES REGARDING DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES UNDER RULE 42
Filing Date
12/16/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
12/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION AND CONSENT OF LOCAL COUNSEL FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF KEVIN C. MAY
Filing Date
12/12/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
12/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE REGARDING ISSUES RAISED IN THE PARTIES’ JOINT STATEMENT OF DISCOVERY DISPUTE
Filing Date
11/26/2024
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
11/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/26/2024
Description
MCD - Motion To Consolidate
Docket Date
11/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Consolidate Cases Under Rule 42
Filing Date
11/25/2024
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
11/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/20/2024
Description
095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset
Docket Date
11/20/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/2024
Description
MCD - Motion To Consolidate
Docket Date
11/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS B.C. ZIEGLER AND COMPANY INC.’S AND GUST ROSENFELD, P.L.C.’S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE HEARINGS ON NOVEMBER 25, 2024
Filing Date
11/12/2024
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
11/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Statement of Discovery Dispute
Filing Date
11/4/2024
Description
095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset
Docket Date
11/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/2024
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
10/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing Under Seal
Filing Date
10/28/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document
Docket Date
10/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY DIRECTED AT BOND PURCHASER ASSIGNORS
Filing Date
10/21/2024
Description
NNF - Not Of Non-Parties At Fault
Docket Date
10/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT GUST ROSENFELD, P.L.C.’S 2nd SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF NON-PARTIES AT FAULT
Filing Date
10/18/2024
Description
NNF - Not Of Non-Parties At Fault
Docket Date
10/18/2024
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
Defendant B. C. Ziegler and Company, Inc.'s Notice of Non-Parties at Fault
Filing Date
10/16/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FIRST EXTENSION OF REPLY DEADLINE REGARDING DEFENDANTS’ MOTION REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY DIRECTED AT BOND PURCHASER ASSIGNORS
Filing Date
10/8/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF’S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY DIRECTED AT BOND PURCHASER ASSIGNORS
Filing Date
10/7/2024
Description
NNF - Not Of Non-Parties At Fault
Docket Date
10/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT GUST ROSENFELD, P.L.C.’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF NON-PARTIES AT FAULT
Filing Date
10/4/2024
Description
NNF - Not Of Non-Parties At Fault
Docket Date
10/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT GUST ROSENFELD, P.L.C.’S NOTICE OF NON-PARTIES AT FAULT
Filing Date
10/1/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF SECOND EXTENSION OF RESPONSE DEADLINE REGARDING DEFENDANTS’ MOTION REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY DIRECTED AT BOND PURCHASER ASSIGNORS
Filing Date
9/26/2024
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
9/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/2024
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
9/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GUST ROSENFELD’S MOTION FOR AN ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO DISCLOSE PRELIMINARY EXPERT OPINION AFFIDAVIT
Filing Date
9/23/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
9/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FIRST EXTENSION OF RESPONSE DEADLINE REGARDING DEFENDANTS’ MOTION REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY DIRECTED AT BOND PURCHASER ASSIGNORS
Filing Date
9/16/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
9/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF EXTENSION
Filing Date
9/6/2024
Description
PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order
Docket Date
9/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ASSOCIATE COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE OF JUSTIN J. BUSTOS
Filing Date
9/5/2024
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
9/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing Under Seal
Filing Date
9/5/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document
Docket Date
9/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S MOTION REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY DIRECTED AT BOND PURCHASER ASSIGNORS
Filing Date
9/5/2024
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
9/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
9/4/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
9/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF’S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO GUST ROSENFELD, P.L.C.’S MOTION FOR AN ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO DISCLOSE PRELIMINARY EXPERT OPINION AFFIDAVIT
Filing Date
9/4/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
9/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO ASSOCIATE COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE
Filing Date
8/30/2024
Description
SCO – Scheduling Order
Docket Date
8/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER
Filing Date
8/28/2024
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
9/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR COMMISSION TO ISSUE SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
Filing Date
8/28/2024
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
9/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR COMMISSION TO ISSUE SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
Filing Date
8/28/2024
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
8/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing Revised Proposed Scheduling Order
Filing Date
8/23/2024
Description
085 - ME: Conference
Docket Date
8/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/20/2024
Description
041 - ME: Scheduling Conference Set
Docket Date
8/20/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT GUST ROSENFELD’S MOTION FOR AN ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO DISCLOSE PRELIMINARY EXPERT OPINION AFFIDAVIT
Filing Date
8/15/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document
Docket Date
8/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS B.C. ZIEGLER AND COMPANY, INC.'S AND GUST ROSENFELD, P.L.C.'S SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION FOR RULE 16(d) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
Filing Date
8/15/2024
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
8/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing Under Seal
Filing Date
8/14/2024
Description
NWA - Notice Withdrawal Of Attorney
Docket Date
8/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL WITHIN FIRM
Filing Date
8/9/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS B.C. ZIEGLER AND COMPANY, INC.’S AND GUST ROSENFELD, P.L.C.’S MOTION FOR RULE 16(d) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
Filing Date
8/9/2024
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
8/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
LEGACY CARES ACQUISITION OF AZ, LLC’S REPORT TO COURT RELATED TO DISCOVERY LIMITATIONS AND PROPOSED SCHEDULE
Filing Date
7/31/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference
Docket Date
7/31/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/18/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM ON C.H. JOHNSON CONSULTING
Filing Date
7/18/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM ON SPORTS FACILITIES ADVISORY, LLC
Filing Date
7/18/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DECLARATION OF SERVICE
Filing Date
7/15/2024
Description
041 - ME: Scheduling Conference Set
Docket Date
7/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2024
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
7/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR COMMISSION TO ISSUE SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
Filing Date
7/3/2024
Description
JSR – Joint Scheduling Report
Docket Date
7/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Report Filed Pursuant to Rule 16(c) and Request for Scheduling Hearing
Filing Date
7/1/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
6/25/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION AND JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
6/4/2024
Description
325 ME: Case Reassignment / Complex Designation
Docket Date
6/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/31/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/31/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SECOND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR B.C. ZIEGLER AND COMPANY INC. TO FILE AN ANSWER
Filing Date
5/31/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/31/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FOR B.C. ZIEGLER AND COMPANY INC. TO FILE AN ANSWER
Filing Date
5/31/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/31/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER DESIGNATING CASE AS COMPLEX CIVIL ACTION
Filing Date
5/31/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/31/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
THIRD ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR B.C. ZIEGLER AND COMPANY INC. TO FILE AN ANSWER
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT MOTION FOR COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
5/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
B.C. ZIEGLER AND COMPANY, INC.’S ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COMPLAINT
Filing Date
5/15/2024
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
5/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Stipulation for the Third Extension of Time for B.C. Ziegler and Company Inc. to File an Answer
Filing Date
5/14/2024
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
5/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Stipulation for the Second Extension of Time for B.C. Ziegler and Company Inc. to File an ANSWER
Filing Date
5/8/2024
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
5/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR B.C. ZIEGLER AND COMPANY INC. TO FILE AN ANSWER
Filing Date
5/7/2024
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
5/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Separate Answer of Defendant Gust Rosenfeld
Filing Date
5/2/2024
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
5/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid
Filing Date
4/23/2024
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
4/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF LEGACY CARES ACQUISITION OF AZ, LLC’S: 1) RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT GUST ROSENFELD’S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A BELATED OPPOSITION; AND 2) NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GUST ROSENFELD’S REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION OF ITS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A BELATED OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO CONDUCT LIMITED, EXPEDITED DISCOVERY
Filing Date
4/12/2024
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
4/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF LEGACY CARES ACQUISITION OF AZ, LLC’S [CONDITIONAL] REPLY TO DEFENDANT GUST ROSENFELD’S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO CONDUCT LIMITED, EXPEDITED DISCOVERY
Filing Date
4/4/2024
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
4/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANT GUST ROSENFELD’S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A BELATED OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO CONDUCT LIMITED, EXPEDITED DISCOVERY
Filing Date
4/3/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT GUST ROSENFELD’S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A BELATED OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO CONDUCT LIMITED, EXPEDITED DISCOVERY
Filing Date
4/1/2024
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
4/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF LEGACY CARES ACQUISITION OF AZ, LLC’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO CONDUCT LIMITED, EXPEDITED DISCOVERY
Filing Date
3/18/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
3/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
B.C. ZIEGLER AND COMPANY INC.’S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT LIMITED, EXPEDITED DISCOVERY
Filing Date
3/7/2024
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
3/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid
Filing Date
3/6/2024
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
3/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid
Filing Date
2/29/2024
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
3/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GUST ROSENFELD’S MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
2/27/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
2/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF LEGACY CARES ACQUISITION OF AZ, LLC’S MOTION TO CONDUCT LIMITED, EXPEDITED DISCOVERY
Filing Date
2/21/2024
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
2/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
B.C. Ziegler and Company, Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss the Complaint
Filing Date
2/16/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
2/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
notice of extension
Filing Date
2/16/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
2/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT NOTICE OF EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF B.C. ZIEGLER AND COMPANY, INC.’S MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
2/9/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
2/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF LEGACY CARES ACQUISITION OF AZ, LLC’S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO GUST ROSENFELD, P.L.C.’S MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
2/2/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
2/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF LEGACY CARES ACQUISITION OF AZ, LLC’S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO B.C. ZIEGLER AND COMPANY, INC.’S MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT
Filing Date
1/31/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/31/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING MOTION AND CONSENT OF LOCAL COUNSEL FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF H. NICHOLAS BERBERIAN, ANDREW G. MAY, and KYLE D. RETTBERG
Filing Date
1/25/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FIRST EXTENSION OF RESPONSE AND REPLY DEADLINES REGARDING B.C. ZIEGLER AND COMPANY, INC.’S MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT
Filing Date
1/23/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Notice of Outstanding Motions
Filing Date
1/22/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING
Filing Date
1/18/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION AND CONSENT OF LOCAL COUNSEL FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF H. NICHOLAS BERBERIAN, ANDREW G. MAY, and KYLE D. RETTBERG
Filing Date
1/12/2024
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned
Docket Date
1/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/11/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
1/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/9/2024
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
1/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Gust Rosenfeld's Motion to Dismiss
Filing Date
12/22/2023
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
12/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Notice Requesting Assignment to the Commercial Court
Filing Date
12/22/2023
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
12/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Motion for Complex Case Designation
Filing Date
12/22/2023
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
12/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
B.C. ZIEGLER AND COMPANY, INC.’S MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT
Filing Date
12/22/2023
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
12/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING
Filing Date
11/17/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
GUST ROSENFELD P L C
Filing Date
11/17/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
BC ZIEGLER AND COMPANY INC
Filing Date
11/16/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
11/18/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Proof of Service / B C Ziegler And Company Inc
Filing Date
11/16/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
11/18/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Proof of Service / Gust Rosenfeld PLC
Filing Date
11/1/2023
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Complaint
Filing Date
11/1/2023
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Civil Cover Sheet
Filing Date
11/1/2023
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Not Subject To
Filing Date
11/1/2023
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Filing Date
11/1/2023
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Filing Date
11/1/2023
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Filing Date
11/1/2023
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Filing Date
11/1/2023
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Filing Date
11/1/2023
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
7/25/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/21/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/14/2024
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/21/2024
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/25/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
1/15/2025
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
3/7/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
5/15/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
1/13/2026
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.