« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2023-009364
Judge:
Blaney, Scott
File Date:
6/21/2023
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Howard Mechanic
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
NICHOLAS ANSEL
Party Name
Ralph Hess
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
NICHOLAS ANSEL
Party Name
State Of Arizona
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Hayleigh Crawford
Party Name
Kimberly Yee
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Kara Karlson
Party Name
Prescott Frontier Days Inc
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Attorney
Brian Bergin
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2025
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
3/30/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOMINAL DEFENDANT ARIZONA STATE TREASURER KIMBERLY YEE’S REQUEST TO HAVE THE COURT ACCEPT SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING
AND
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION TO STRIKE SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO COURT’S ORAL ARGUMENT QUESTIONS
Filing Date
3/20/2025
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/20/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION TO STRIKE “NOMINAL” DEFENDANT ARIZONA STATE TREASURER KIMBERLY YEE’S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO COURT’S ORAL ARGUMENT QUESTIONING
Filing Date
3/18/2025
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
3/18/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOMINAL DEFENDANT ARIZONA STATE TREASURER KIMBERLY YEE’S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO COURT’S ORAL ARGUMENT QUESTIONING
Filing Date
3/4/2025
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
3/4/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/2025
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
2/24/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2025
Description
095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset
Docket Date
2/7/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2025
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
1/24/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/23/2025
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/28/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESETTING DISPOSITIVE MOTION HEARING AND SETTING HEARING ON STATE OF ARIZONAS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Filing Date
1/17/2025
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue
Docket Date
1/21/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS (FIRST REQUEST) And REQUEST TO SET ARGUMENT ON THE STATE’S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Filing Date
1/15/2025
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
1/15/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/9/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE OF ARIZONA’S RESPONSE TO AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF OF THE GOLDWATER INSTITUTE
Filing Date
11/19/2024
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
11/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT STATE OF ARIZONA’S RESPONSE
Filing Date
11/19/2024
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
11/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND IN OPPOSITION TO INTERVENOR-DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE
Filing Date
11/19/2024
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
11/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY IN SUPPORT OF INTERVENORDEFENDANT’S
MOTION FOR
SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
11/14/2024
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
11/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
BRIEF AMICUS CURIAE OF GOLDWATER INSTITUTE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND IN OPPOSITION TO INTERVENOR-DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMEN
Filing Date
11/12/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
11/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE
TO BRIEF OF AMICUS
CURIAE SPEAKER OF
THE ARIZONA HOUSE OF
REPRESENTATIVES BEN
TOMA
Filing Date
10/30/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/31/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE OF ARIZONA’S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
10/30/2024
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
10/31/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT STATE OF ARIZONA’S STATEMENT OF FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
10/30/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/31/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Response to Intervenor-Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment
Filing Date
10/29/2024
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
10/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Intervenor-Defendant's Statement of Facts in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment
Filing Date
10/29/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
INTERVENOR-DEFENDANT’S
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO
PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR SUMMARY
JUDGMENT
Filing Date
10/21/2024
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
10/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
BRIEF OF AMICUS CURIAE SPEAKER OF THE ARIZONA HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES BEN TOMA
Filing Date
10/16/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION OF SPEAKER OF THE
ARIZONA HOUSE OF
REPRESENTATIVES BEN TOMA TO
FILE A BRIEF AS AMICUS CURIAE
Filing Date
9/25/2024
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
9/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
9/25/2024
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
9/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Intervenor-Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment
Filing Date
9/25/2024
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
9/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN
SUPPORT OF INTERVENORDEFENDANT’S
MOTION FOR
SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
9/17/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
9/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/16/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING PREIVILEGE AND PLAINTIFFS EXHIBITS 4 5 AND 7 ATTACHED TO PLAINITFFS EXPEDITED REQUEST TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD
Filing Date
9/4/2024
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
9/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING PRIVILEGE AND PLAINTIFFS’ EXHIBITS 4, 5, AND 7 ATTACHED TO PLAINTIFFS’ EXPEDITED REQUEST TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD
Filing Date
8/27/2024
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
8/27/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/26/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT ARIZONA STATE TREASURER KIMBERLY YEE’S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’ REQUEST TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD AND IN THE ALTERNATIVE REQUEST FOR RULE 56(D) RELIEF AND FOR EXPEDITED HEARING
Filing Date
8/25/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
INTERVENOR-DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’ EXPEDITED REQUEST TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD AND IN THE ALTERNATIVE REQUEST FOR RULE 56(D) RELIEF AND FOREXPEDITED HEARING
Filing Date
8/23/2024
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
8/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/23/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT ARIZONA STATE TREASURER KIMBERLY YEE’S NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
8/22/2024
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
8/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ EXPEDITED REQUEST TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD AND IN THE ALTERNATIVE REQUEST FOR RULE 56(D) RELIEF AND FOR EXPEDITED HEARING SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING SET FOR AUGUST 26, 2024 at 10 a.m.
Filing Date
7/8/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion is granted
Filing Date
6/26/2024
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
6/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
6/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ADDITIONAL COUNSEL WITHIN SAME FIRM
Filing Date
6/6/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINES (FIRST REQUEST) AND NOTICE REGARDING COUNSEL’S UNAVAILABILITY
Filing Date
5/3/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Disclosure of Areas of Expert Testimony
Filing Date
4/30/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
5/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
INTERVENOR-DEFENDANT PRESCOTT FRONTIER DAYS, INC.’S RESPONSE TO BRIEF AMICUS CURIAE OF GOLDWATER INSTITUTE
Filing Date
4/29/2024
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
4/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ REPLY IN
SUPPORT OF
PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION
FOR SUMMARY
JUDGMENT AND IN
OPPOSITION TO
DEFENDANT STATE OF
ARIZONA’S RESPONSE
Filing Date
4/29/2024
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
4/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ REPLY IN
SUPPORT OF
PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION
FOR SUMMARY
JUDGMENT AND IN
OPPOSITION TO
INTERVENORDEFENDANT’S
RESPONSE
Filing Date
4/29/2024
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
4/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE OF ARIZONA’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Filing Date
4/22/2024
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
4/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY IN SUPPORT OF INTERVENORDEFENDANT’S
MOTION FOR
SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
4/8/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
4/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
4/8/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE
IN OPPOSITION TO
DEFENDANT STATE OF
ARIZONA’S MOTION FOR
JUDGMENT ON THE
PLEADINGS
Filing Date
4/8/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE
TO INTERVENORDEFENDANT’S
MOTION
FOR SUMMARY
JUDGMENT
Filing Date
4/8/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
INTERVENOR-DEFENDANT’S
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO
PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR SUMMARY
JUDGMENT
Filing Date
4/8/2024
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
4/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
INTERVENOR-DEFENDANT’S
STATEMENT OF FACTS IN
OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS’
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
4/8/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE OF ARIZONA’S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
4/8/2024
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
4/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT STATE OF ARIZONA’S STATEMENT OF FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
4/5/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
BRIEF AMICUS CURIAE OF GOLDWATER INSTITUTE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Filing Date
4/4/2024
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
4/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Substitution of Counsel WITHIN A GOVERNMENTAL AGENCY
Filing Date
3/22/2024
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
3/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
GOLDWATER INSTITUTE SHALL FILE THE BRIEF AMICUS CURIAE WITHIN 10 DAYS OF THIS ORDER DATED MARCH 21 2024
Filing Date
3/19/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Filing Date
3/12/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FIRST
EXTENSION OF TIME
REGARDING
DEFENDANT STATE OF
ARIZONA’S MOTION FOR
JUDGMENT ON THE
PLEADINGS
Filing Date
2/29/2024
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
3/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Summary Judgment
Filing Date
2/29/2024
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
3/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN
SUPPORT OF INTERVENORDEFENDANT’S
MOTION FOR
SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
2/29/2024
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
3/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment
Filing Date
2/29/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant State of Arizona's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Filing Date
2/20/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference
Docket Date
2/20/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/16/2024
Description
SCO – Scheduling Order
Docket Date
2/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
2/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Lodging Proposed Scheduling Order
Filing Date
1/8/2024
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
1/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Prescott Frontier Days, Inc.'s Answer to Verified Complaint
Filing Date
1/5/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
1/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance of Additional Counsel within Same Firm
Filing Date
1/3/2024
Description
041 - ME: Scheduling Conference Set
Docket Date
1/3/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/27/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO
INTERVENE
Filing Date
12/15/2023
Description
JSR – Joint Scheduling Report
Docket Date
12/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Report Pursuant to Rule 16
Filing Date
12/1/2023
Description
MTI – Motion to Intervene
Docket Date
12/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Unopposed Motion to Intervene/ EFILE BILLING $333
Filing Date
11/3/2023
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
11/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE OF ARIZONA’S ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
10/2/2023
Description
OXS - Order To Extend Time For Service
Docket Date
10/2/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME
Filing Date
8/31/2023
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
9/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT
Filing Date
8/15/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
8/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant State of Arizona shall file an answer
or responsive pleading to Plaintiffs' Verified Complaint on or before September 4, 2023.
Filing Date
8/15/2023
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
8/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance of Counsel Within Same Firm
Filing Date
7/27/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER CONTINUING
DEADLINE FOR FILING
PROPOSED BRIEFING
SCHEDULE
Filing Date
7/21/2023
Description
JSR – Joint Scheduling Report
Docket Date
7/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Proposed Schedule
Filing Date
7/7/2023
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
First Joint Motion to Continue Deadline for Filing Proposed Order Re Briefing Schedule
Filing Date
6/28/2023
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
6/28/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/28/2023
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
6/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance and Recusal
Filing Date
6/27/2023
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
6/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
6/27/2023
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
6/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation
Filing Date
6/26/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
BEN TOMA SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Filing Date
6/23/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
KIMBERLY YEE
Filing Date
6/22/2023
Description
OSC - Order To Show Cause
Docket Date
7/5/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/21/2023
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
6/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Verified Complaint For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief
Filing Date
6/21/2023
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
6/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction
Filing Date
6/21/2023
Description
PSC - Petition For Order To Show Cause
Docket Date
6/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Application for Order to Show Cause
Filing Date
6/21/2023
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
6/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Civil Cover Sheet
Filing Date
6/21/2023
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
6/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Filing Date
6/21/2023
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
6/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
6/27/2023
Time
10:00
Event
Order To Show Cause
Date
2/16/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/26/2024
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
8/26/2024
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/26/2025
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
3/3/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
3/7/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.