« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2023-000397
Judge:
Whitten, Christopher
File Date:
1/9/2023
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Power Ranch Community Association
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Chad Miesen
Party Name
Woodcrest East L L C
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
F Connelly
Party Name
Woodcrest Village East Condominium Association
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
ERICA MORTENSON
Party Name
K D L Investments L L C
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Karl N Huish
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2024
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
12/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH
PREJUDICE
Filing Date
11/25/2024
Description
NOL - Notice of Lodging
Docket Date
11/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF LODGING ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
10/29/2024
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
10/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation to Dismiss With Prejudice
Filing Date
9/10/2024
Description
375 - Case on Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
9/10/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2024
Description
NOS - Notice Of Settlement
Docket Date
9/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Settlement
Filing Date
8/29/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO
PLAINTIFF’S SUPPLEMENTAL
BRIEF
Filing Date
8/21/2024
Description
095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset
Docket Date
8/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2024
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
8/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation to Reset Oral Argument
Filing Date
8/12/2024
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
8/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF / COUNTERDEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
8/7/2024
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
8/7/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/2/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/2/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplemental Brief in Response to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Filed March 15, 2024
Filing Date
8/2/2024
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
8/2/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ASSOCIATION’S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED ON MARCH 15, 2024
Filing Date
8/2/2024
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
8/2/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS 3-8 TO THE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ASSOCIATION’S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED ON MARCH 15, 2024
Filing Date
8/2/2024
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
8/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS 9-19 TO THE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ASSOCIATION’S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED ON MARCH 15, 2024
Filing Date
7/26/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
[PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING
STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE
TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF
PLAINTIFF/COUNTERDEFENDANT'S
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
7/19/2024
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
7/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Status Report
Filing Date
7/18/2024
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
7/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF/COUNTERDEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
7/16/2024
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
7/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNTERCLAIMANT’S NOTICE OF
ERRATA TO SEPARATE AND
CONTROVERTING STATEMENT OF
FACTS IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE TO
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
6/28/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
6/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Counterclaimant's Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment
Filing Date
6/28/2024
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
6/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNTERCLAIMANT’S SEPARATE
AND CONTROVERTING STATEMENT
OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE
TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY
JUDGMENT
Filing Date
6/12/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
6/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING THE
ASSOCIATION'S MOTION FOR LEAVE
TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY
JUDGMENT
Filing Date
6/11/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
6/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO
EXTEND DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT
WOODCREST EAST, LLC TO FILE
RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR
SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
6/6/2024
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
6/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE
FOR DEFENDANT WOODCREST EAST,
LLC TO FILE RESPONSE TO MOTION
FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
5/24/2024
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting
Docket Date
5/24/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2024
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
5/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF
MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY
JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF’S
IMPROPER RECORDING OF
WOODCREST DECLARATION
WITHOUT APPROVAL
Filing Date
5/14/2024
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont
Docket Date
5/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/13/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO
EXTEND DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT
WOODCREST EAST, LLC TO FILE
REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR
PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON
PLAINTIFF'S IMPROPER RECORDING
OF WOODCREST DECLARATION
WITHOUT APPROVAL
Filing Date
5/8/2024
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
5/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE
FOR DEFENDANT WOODCREST EAST,
LLC TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF
MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY
JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF’S
IMPROPER RECORDING OF
WOODCREST DECLARATION
WITHOUT APPROVAL
Filing Date
5/8/2024
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
5/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
CLARIFICATION AS TO MOTION FOR
LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR
SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
5/8/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER CONTINUING
EVIDENTIARY HEARING
REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S
REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY
AND PERMANENT INJUNCTIONS
AND SETTING A STATUS
CONFERENCE
Filing Date
5/7/2024
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
5/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF / COUNTERDEFENDANT’S STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
5/7/2024
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
5/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
AsPLAINTIFF / COUNTERDEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
5/7/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ASSOCIATION'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
5/3/2024
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
5/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO CONTINUE EVIDENTIARY HEARING REGARDING PLAINTIFF’S REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTIONS AND REQUEST TO SET A STATUS CONFERENCE
Filing Date
4/18/2024
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
4/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATEMENT OF DISPUTED FACTS
AND CONTROVERTING STATEMENT
OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF
PLAINTIFF’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR PARTIAL
SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING
IMPROPER RECORDING OF
WOODCREST DECLARATION
WITHOUT APPROVAL
Filing Date
4/18/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING IMPROPER RECORDING OF WOODCREST DECLARATION WITHOUT APPROVAL
Filing Date
4/12/2024
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
4/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL WITHIN THE SAME FIRM AND NOTICE OF LAW FIRM NAME CHANGE
Filing Date
3/22/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE EVIDENTIARY HEARING REGARDING PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTIONS
Filing Date
3/20/2024
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
3/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO CONTINUE
EVIDENTIARY HEARING REGARDING
PLAINTIFF’S REQUEST FOR
PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT
INJUNCTIONS
Filing Date
3/15/2024
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
3/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR
PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON
PLAINTIFF’S IMPROPER RECORDING
OF WOODCREST DECLARATION
WITHOUT APPROVAL
Filing Date
3/15/2024
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
3/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S STATEMENT OF
FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR
PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON
PLAINTIFF’S IMPROPER RECORDING
OF WOODCREST DECLARATION
WITHOUT APPROVAL
Filing Date
3/12/2024
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
3/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/12/2024
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont
Docket Date
3/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/12/2024
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
3/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulated Exhibit List for THE Evidentiary Hearing
Filing Date
1/24/2024
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
1/24/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/2024
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
1/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
reply in support of plaintiff's request for preliminary and permanent injunction
Filing Date
1/19/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
1/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs response to Defendants request for Rule 56(d) relief
Filing Date
1/18/2024
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
1/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING DEFEDANTS REQUEST FOR RULE 56 RELIEF AND FOR EXPEDITED HEARING
Filing Date
1/11/2024
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
1/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Request for Rule 56(D) Relief and for Expedited Hearing
Filing Date
1/8/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
1/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Response to Request for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction
Filing Date
12/26/2023
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
12/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Substitution of Counsel Within Firm
Filing Date
12/15/2023
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
12/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Filing Date
12/15/2023
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
12/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF PARTIAL MOTION FOR
SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
12/15/2023
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
12/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Preliminary and Permanent Injunctions
Filing Date
12/15/2023
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
12/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF’S REQUEST TO SCHEDULE HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Filing Date
12/5/2023
Description
SCO – Scheduling Order
Docket Date
12/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER
Filing Date
11/21/2023
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
11/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation To Amend Scheduling Order
Filing Date
11/7/2023
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
11/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Substitution of Counsel WIthin The Same Firm
Filing Date
9/20/2023
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
9/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance of In-Firm Counsel
Filing Date
8/10/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
8/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
8/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER TO STIPULATED MOTION
TO VACATE ORDER TO
ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE
RESOLUTION
Filing Date
7/31/2023
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulated Motion To Vacate Order To alternative Dispute Resolution
Filing Date
7/20/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
7/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/2023
Description
SCO – Scheduling Order
Docket Date
7/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SCHEDULING ORDER
Filing Date
7/14/2023
Description
JSR – Joint Scheduling Report
Docket Date
7/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Report
Filing Date
6/26/2023
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
6/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT WOODCREST EAST, LLC’S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
5/23/2023
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
5/23/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Wood East Condominium Associations Answer To First Amended Complaint
Filing Date
5/23/2023
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
5/23/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Substitution of Counsel WIthin The Same Firm
Filing Date
5/9/2023
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
5/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Substitution of Counsel with Firm
Filing Date
4/20/2023
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
4/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid
Filing Date
4/3/2023
Description
OFS - Order for Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
4/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION
OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
4/3/2023
Description
WSS - Waiver Of Service Of Summons
Docket Date
4/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Waiver of Service Woodcrest Village East Condominium Association
Filing Date
3/30/2023
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
3/31/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice Of Appearance
Filing Date
3/27/2023
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
3/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Application for Substitution of Counsel
Filing Date
3/24/2023
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
3/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid
Filing Date
3/21/2023
Description
NDI - Notice Of Dismissal
Docket Date
3/23/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Dismissal
Filing Date
3/15/2023
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
3/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIMS
Filing Date
3/14/2023
Description
AMC - Amended Complaint
Docket Date
3/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
2/17/2023
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
2/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
2/17/2023
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
2/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant's Answer and Counterclaims
Filing Date
2/14/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
2/14/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/9/2023
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
2/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Application and Affidavit for Entry of Default for Defendant
Filing Date
1/23/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
1/31/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
WOODCREST EAST LLC
Filing Date
1/9/2023
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
1/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Verified Complaint
Filing Date
1/9/2023
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
1/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Civil Cover Sheet
Filing Date
1/9/2023
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
1/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Not Subject To
Filing Date
1/9/2023
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
1/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
1/19/2024
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/7/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/22/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
3/29/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
4/12/2024
Time
10:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
5/22/2024
Time
8:45
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/22/2024
Time
9:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/29/2024
Time
10:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
5/30/2024
Time
10:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
6/4/2024
Time
9:15
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
6/28/2024
Time
11:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/26/2024
Time
11:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/26/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
8/30/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
9/10/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/7/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/24/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/25/2025
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/26/2025
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/27/2025
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/3/2025
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.