« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2021-053242
Judge:
Julian, Melissa
File Date:
9/8/2021
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Laura Owens
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Jason Venditti
Party Name
Elizabeth Naylor
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Jason Venditti
Party Name
Shawn Roanhorse
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Lone Cactus Construction L L C
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
P N C Bank N A
Relationship
Garnishee Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Pinal County Federal Credit Union
Relationship
Garnishee Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2023
Description
049 - ME: Judgment Signed
Docket Date
7/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2023
Description
JAG - Judgment Against Garnishee
Docket Date
7/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/28/2023
Description
NTF - Notice to the File
Docket Date
6/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice To The File
Filing Date
6/21/2023
Description
ANG - Answer Of Garnishee
Docket Date
7/3/2023
Filing Party
Garnishee Defendant(6)
Filing Date
6/19/2023
Description
NTF - Notice to the File
Docket Date
6/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice To The File
Filing Date
6/15/2023
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
6/21/2023
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/6/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
6/23/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2023
Description
ANG - Answer Of Garnishee
Docket Date
5/6/2023
Filing Party
Garnishee Defendant(5)
Filing Date
4/28/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/3/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2023
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
5/1/2023
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/29/2023
Description
JUD - Judgment
Docket Date
3/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
JUDGMENT
Filing Date
2/22/2023
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
2/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement
Filing Date
2/22/2023
Description
AAF - Application For Attorney Fees
Docket Date
2/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Application for Attorneys Fees
Filing Date
1/19/2023
Description
376 – Case Continued on Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
1/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2022
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
10/24/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2022
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont
Docket Date
9/30/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/2022
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
9/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Status Report
Filing Date
9/19/2022
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
9/19/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2022
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel
Docket Date
9/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER ALLOWING COUNSEL FOR
DEFENDANTS SHAWN ROANHORSE
AND LONE CACTUS CONSTRUCTION
LLC TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF
RECORD WITHOUT CLIENTS
CONSENT
Filing Date
8/10/2022
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel
Docket Date
8/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Withdraw As Counsel of Record Without Clients' Consent
Filing Date
8/5/2022
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR
PLACEMENT OF THE CASE BACK
ON THE ACTIVE CALENDAR
Filing Date
6/21/2022
Description
375 - Case on Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
6/21/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2022
Description
SPM - SPECIAL MASTER ORDER
Docket Date
5/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order Setting Settlement Conference
Filing Date
4/27/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
4/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2022
Description
SCO – Scheduling Order
Docket Date
4/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
FIRST AMENDED
SCHEDULING ORDER
Filing Date
4/27/2022
Description
070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set
Docket Date
4/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/15/2022
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
3/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
3/15/2022
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
3/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO AMEND THE
SCHEDULING ORDER AND EXTEND
ALL REMAINING CASE DEADLINES
Filing Date
2/16/2022
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
2/16/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2022
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
2/11/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/9/2022
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
2/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2022
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
2/8/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2022
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
2/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
2/7/2022
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
2/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ CONTROVERTING STATEMENT OF FACTS
TIER 2
Filing Date
2/4/2022
Description
MTC - Motion To Compel
Docket Date
2/10/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
Motion to Compel & for Sanctions
Filing Date
2/2/2022
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
2/8/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
2/1/2022
Description
MTC - Motion To Compel
Docket Date
2/7/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
Motion to Compel & for Sanctions
Filing Date
2/1/2022
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
2/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and for Sanctions
Filing Date
1/28/2022
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
2/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
1/20/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
1/20/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2022
Description
SCO – Scheduling Order
Docket Date
1/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SCHEDULING ORDER
Filing Date
1/6/2022
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
1/8/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
Motion for Summary Judgment
Filing Date
12/22/2021
Description
JSR – Joint Scheduling Report
Docket Date
12/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Report
Filing Date
12/14/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
12/14/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/8/2021
Description
MTC - Motion To Compel
Docket Date
12/11/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
URGENT! MOTION TO COMPEL DUE TO ANIMAL SAFETY AT RISK & FOR SANCTIONS
Filing Date
11/2/2021
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
11/2/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/2/2021
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
11/3/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid
Filing Date
11/2/2021
Description
NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trial
Docket Date
11/3/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
Plaintiffs Demand for Jury Trial
Filing Date
10/25/2021
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
10/27/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED 09/27/2021
Filing Date
10/25/2021
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
10/27/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Certificate of Arbitration
Filing Date
10/22/2021
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
10/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Entry of Appearance
Filing Date
10/19/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
10/19/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2021
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
10/14/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
APPLICATION and AFFIDAVIT For DEFAULT
Filing Date
9/27/2021
Description
AMC - Amended Complaint
Docket Date
9/29/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
Amended complaint
Filing Date
9/24/2021
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
9/29/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
Motion to Include Promissory Note
Filing Date
9/13/2021
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
9/16/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
Proof of Service/SHAWN ROANHORSE, LONE CACTUS LLC
Filing Date
9/9/2021
Description
AMC - Amended Complaint
Docket Date
9/13/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CIVIL COMPLAINT
Filing Date
9/8/2021
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
9/9/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
Owens Civil Complaint
Filing Date
9/8/2021
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
9/9/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
Civil Cover Sheet System Generated
Filing Date
9/8/2021
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
9/9/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
Summons Shawn Clancey Roanhorse System Generated
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
6/15/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Civil Settlement Conference
Date
9/30/2022
Time
11:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/7/2022
Time
10:45
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/20/2022
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/2/2022
Time
10:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/17/2023
Time
8:45
Event
Status Conference
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
3/29/2023
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Laura Owens, Elizabeth Naylor
A: Shawn Roanhorse
A: Shawn Roanhorse
Amount
$2,691.50
Frequency
One Time
Type
Attorney Fee
Status
Date
3/29/2023
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Laura Owens, Elizabeth Naylor
A: Shawn Roanhorse
A: Shawn Roanhorse
Amount
$26,000.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status