« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2021-052893
Judge:
Arbitration 01 | Gordon
File Date:
8/11/2021
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Laura Owens
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Kyle O'Dwyer
Party Name
Gregory Gillespie
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Fabian Zazueta
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/16/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
2/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/16/2024
Description
JUD - Judgment
Docket Date
2/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JUDGMENT
Filing Date
2/14/2024
Description
SOC - Statement Of Costs
Docket Date
2/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
VERIFICATION OF WOODNICK LAW, PLLC IN SUPPORT OF SUPPLEMENTAL VERIFIED STATEMENT OF COSTS
Filing Date
2/13/2024
Description
SOC - Statement Of Costs
Docket Date
2/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL VERIFIED STATEMENT OF COSTS
Filing Date
1/31/2024
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
1/31/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2024
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
1/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT APPLICATION FOR COSTS
Filing Date
1/11/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
1/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to Defendant's Motion for Leave to Supplement Application for Costs
Filing Date
1/2/2024
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
1/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR COSTS
Filing Date
12/29/2023
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT APPLICATION FOR COSTS
Filing Date
12/19/2023
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S APPLICATION FOR COSTS
Filing Date
12/15/2023
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
12/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Lodging of Proposed Form of Judgment
Filing Date
12/15/2023
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
12/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Application for Costs
Filing Date
12/15/2023
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
12/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Lodging of Proposed Form of Judgment
Filing Date
12/6/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE PROPOSED FORM OF JUDGMENT AND APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
11/28/2023
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE FORM OF JUDGMENT
Filing Date
11/27/2023
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
11/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2023
Description
095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset
Docket Date
10/30/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/5/2023
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
10/5/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2023
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
9/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF’S REPLY TO DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
9/26/2023
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
9/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
9/25/2023
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
9/25/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2023
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
9/11/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONTROVERTING STATEMENT OF FACTS AND SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS
Filing Date
9/6/2023
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
9/11/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
9/6/2023
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
9/11/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
8/30/2023
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/31/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FIRST EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THE PARTIES TO FILE RESPONSES TO MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
8/14/2023
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Vacate Arbitration Hearing
Filing Date
7/26/2023
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
7/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS
Filing Date
7/26/2023
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
7/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Summary Judgment
Filing Date
7/26/2023
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
7/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of All Defendant's Counterclaims
Filing Date
7/21/2023
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
7/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
5/22/2023
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
5/23/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Arbitration Hearing
Filing Date
2/28/2023
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel
Docket Date
2/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER RE: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR DEFENDANT WITHOUT CONSENT
Filing Date
2/22/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
IT IS HEREBY ORDERED extending the compulsory arbitration deadline until June 20, 2023
Filing Date
2/16/2023
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel
Docket Date
2/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR DEFENDANT WITHOUT CONSENT
Filing Date
2/16/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
2/16/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2023
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
2/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation
Filing Date
2/10/2023
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel
Docket Date
2/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR DEFENDANT WITHOUT CONSENT
Filing Date
10/21/2022
Description
324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator
Docket Date
10/21/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2022
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling
Docket Date
10/13/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/22/2022
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
8/22/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/15/2022
Description
095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset
Docket Date
8/15/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/11/2022
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
8/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ON KAREN FANN
Filing Date
8/11/2022
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
8/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ON RUSTY BOWERS
Filing Date
8/11/2022
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
8/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ON AZ AG
Filing Date
8/10/2022
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL WITHIN SAME FIRM
Filing Date
8/9/2022
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
8/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
8/2/2022
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
8/2/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/27/2022
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel
Docket Date
7/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF
Filing Date
7/12/2022
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
7/12/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/7/2022
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
7/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE/OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR SIXTY DAY EXTENTION OF DEADLINES
Filing Date
7/7/2022
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO INCLUDE DEADLINES EXTENSION
Filing Date
7/6/2022
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Sixty Day Extension of Time on All Deadlines
Filing Date
7/1/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
7/1/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2022
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel
Docket Date
7/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Amended Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff
Filing Date
6/23/2022
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order
Docket Date
6/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/13/2022
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel
Docket Date
6/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff
Filing Date
6/8/2022
Description
047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal
Docket Date
6/8/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2022
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
4/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS/MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS OF PLAINTIFF?S ABORTION COERCION CLAIM
Filing Date
4/8/2022
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss
Filing Date
3/25/2022
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel
Docket Date
3/25/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/22/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
3/22/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2022
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
3/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE/OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF?S SECOND MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE
Filing Date
3/21/2022
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
3/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Filing Date
3/16/2022
Description
NPD - Notice Case on Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
3/16/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/11/2022
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/16/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE TO THE DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO DISMISS/PARTIAL MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Filing Date
3/10/2022
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel
Docket Date
3/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WITHDRAW WITH CLIENT CONSENT
Filing Date
3/4/2022
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
3/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
2/28/2022
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
3/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE/OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE
Filing Date
2/25/2022
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/1/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE TO THE DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO DISMISS/PARTIAL MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Filing Date
2/23/2022
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF’S TITLE 13 CLAIMS
Filing Date
2/15/2022
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
2/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS/MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS OF PLAINTIFF?S ABORTION COERCION CLAIM
Filing Date
2/15/2022
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
2/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE PURSUANT TO A.R.S. ? 12-1841
Filing Date
2/7/2022
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
2/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPORT OF EARLY MEETING
Filing Date
2/7/2022
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
2/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS TITLE 13 CLAIMS
Filing Date
1/22/2022
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
1/27/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF’S REPLY TO THE DEFENDANT’S ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS
Filing Date
1/4/2022
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM
Filing Date
1/4/2022
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
1/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CERTIFICATE OF COMPULSORY ARBITRATION
Filing Date
12/15/2021
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
12/15/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/2/2021
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
11/4/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
REPLY TO DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO MODIFY DATE OF SERVICE
Filing Date
10/22/2021
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO MODIFY DATE OF SERVICE
Filing Date
10/13/2021
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/14/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
Motion to Modify Service Date
Filing Date
10/11/2021
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
10/13/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF’S REPLY TO DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO SEAL
Filing Date
10/8/2021
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
10/8/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2021
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/9/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO STRIKE PETITIONER’S “DECLARATION OF FRAUD, PERJURY, IMPERSONATION, EXTORTION, AND ADDITIONAL ILLEGAL ACTIONS TAKEN BY THE DEFENDANT AND HIS COUNSEL”
Filing Date
10/6/2021
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/8/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO SEAL COURT RECORDS
Filing Date
10/4/2021
Description
DCL - Declaration
Docket Date
10/4/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
DECLARATION OF FRAUD, PERJURY, IMPERSONATION, EXTORTION, AND ADDITIONAL ILLEGAL ACTIONS TAKEN BY THE DEFENDANT AND HIS COUNSEL
Filing Date
10/1/2021
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/5/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
Response to Motion to Dismiss
Filing Date
9/27/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
9/27/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/24/2021
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
9/28/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
9/24/2021
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
9/29/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
Motion to Seal Case Records
Filing Date
9/16/2021
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
9/20/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
APPLICATION and AFFIDAVIT For DEFAULT
Filing Date
9/9/2021
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
9/9/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid
Filing Date
8/31/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
8/31/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/2021
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
9/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE
Filing Date
8/23/2021
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
8/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
8/21/2021
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/26/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
Motion for Alternative Service
Filing Date
8/17/2021
Description
NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trial
Docket Date
8/20/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF'S Demand for Jury Trial
Filing Date
8/17/2021
Description
AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service
Docket Date
8/23/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/11/2021
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
8/11/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
Complaint Form
Filing Date
8/11/2021
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
8/11/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
Civil Cover Sheet
Filing Date
8/11/2021
Description
CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Docket Date
8/11/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Subject To
Filing Date
8/11/2021
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
8/11/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
Summons
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
8/11/2022
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
8/17/2022
Time
14:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/27/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/9/2023
Time
11:00
Event
Oral Argument
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status