« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2019-007570
Judge:
Minder, Scott
File Date:
5/24/2019
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
State Of Arizona
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Kenneth Hughes
Party Name
Mark Brnovich
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Kenneth Hughes
Party Name
William Henry Grewell
Relationship
Claimant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Elizabeth Grewell
Relationship
Claimant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
$520.82 U S Currency
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/9/2023
Description
STJ - Stipulated Judgment
Docket Date
8/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED JUDGMENT
Filing Date
8/2/2023
Description
SFJ - Stipulation For Judgment
Docket Date
8/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation to Judgment
Filing Date
2/13/2023
Description
OCC - Order Continuing on Inactive/Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
2/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER CONTINUING THIS
MATTER ON THE DISMISSAL
CALENDAR WITHOUT DISMISSAL
AND STAYING DISCOVERY
Filing Date
2/6/2023
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel
Docket Date
2/6/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2023
Description
MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
2/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
State's Motion to Continue on Dismissal Calendar and Stay Discovery
Filing Date
1/25/2023
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel
Docket Date
1/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR CLAIMANTS WILLIAM H. GREWELL AND ELIZABETH GREWELL
Filing Date
8/25/2022
Description
OCC - Order Continuing on Inactive/Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
8/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER CONTINUING THIS
MATTER ON THE DISMISSAL
CALENDAR WITHOUT DISMISSAL
AND STAYING DISCOVERY
Filing Date
8/17/2022
Description
MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
8/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED MOTION TO CONTINUE ON DISMISSAL CALENDAR AND STAY DISCOVERY
Filing Date
4/14/2022
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
4/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED
MOTION TO DISMISS/RELEASE
ITEM 5.1 IN APPENDIX ONE TO
THE VERIFIED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
4/7/2022
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
4/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED MOTION TO DISMISS/RELEASE ITEM 5.1 IN APPENDIX ONE TO THE VERIFIED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
2/24/2022
Description
OCC - Order Continuing on Inactive/Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
2/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER CONTINUING THIS
MATTER ON THE DISMISSAL
CALENDAR WITHOUT DISMISSAL
AND STAYING DISCOVERY
Filing Date
2/14/2022
Description
MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
2/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulated Motion To Continue On Dismissal Calendar And Stay Discovery
Filing Date
9/8/2021
Description
OCC - Order Continuing on Inactive/Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
9/8/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONTINUING THIS
MATTER ON THE DISMISSAL
CALENDAR WITHOUT DISMISSAL
AND STAYING DISCOVERY
Filing Date
8/27/2021
Description
MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
9/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulated Motion to Continue on Dismissal Calendar and Stay Discovery
Filing Date
1/27/2021
Description
OCC - Order Continuing on Inactive/Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
1/27/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND STAYING DISCOVERY
Filing Date
1/20/2021
Description
MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
1/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulated Motion to Continue on Dismissal Calendar and Stay Discovery
Filing Date
7/31/2020
Description
OCC - Order Continuing on Inactive/Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
7/31/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITHOUT DISMISSAL
AND STAYING DISCOVERY
Filing Date
7/24/2020
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
7/24/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED MOTION TO CONTINUE ON DISMISSAL CALENDAR AND STAY DISCOVERY
Filing Date
2/25/2020
Description
OCC - Order Continuing on Inactive/Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
2/25/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/19/2020
Description
MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
2/21/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED MOTION TO CONTINUE ON DISMISSAL CALENDAR AND STAY DISCOVERY
Filing Date
1/16/2020
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
1/21/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Verified Answer
Filing Date
1/8/2020
Description
CER - Certificate
Docket Date
1/9/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Re: Verified Complaint
Filing Date
12/25/2019
Description
NPD - Notice Case on Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
12/26/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/23/2019
Description
SCM - Subsequent Complaint
Docket Date
7/25/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Verified Complaint
Filing Date
6/25/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
6/25/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/17/2019
Description
CLM - Claim
Docket Date
6/18/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Verified Claim of Claimants William And Elizabeth Grewell
Filing Date
5/29/2019
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
5/31/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
5/28/2019
Description
NPF - Notice/Pending Forfeiture
Docket Date
5/30/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Amended Notice of Pending Forfeiture
Filing Date
5/24/2019
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
5/28/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/24/2019
Description
NPF - Notice/Pending Forfeiture
Docket Date
5/28/2019
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status