« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2017-006975
Judge:
Fox, Dewain
File Date:
5/1/2017
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil

Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Glendale Elementary School District
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Mary O'Grady
Party Name
Chino Valley Unified School District
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Mary O'Grady
Party Name
Elfrida Elementary School District
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Mary O'Grady
Party Name
Crane Elementary School District
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Mary O'Grady
Party Name
Jill Barragan
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Mary O'Grady
Party Name
Kathy Knecht
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Mary O'Grady
Party Name
Arizona School Boards Association
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Mary O'Grady
Party Name
Arizona Education Association
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Mary O'Grady
Party Name
Arizona Association Of School Business Officials
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Mary O'Grady
Party Name
Arizona School Administrators Inc
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Mary O'Grady
Party Name
State Of Arizona
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
JOSEPH CADA
Party Name
School Facilities Board
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Arizona School Facilities Board
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Steven Yarbrough
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Male
Attorney
JESSE RITCHEY
Party Name
J D Mesnard
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Unknown
Attorney
JESSE RITCHEY
Party Name
Sean McCarthy
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Vern Crow
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Brett Johnson
Party Name
Edward E Boot
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Brett Johnson
Party Name
Bryan E Peltzer
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Brett Johnson
Party Name
Thomas D Rushin
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Brett Johnson
Party Name
Traci L Sawyer- Sinkbeil
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Ward Simpson
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Jeffrey J Smith
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Brett Johnson
Party Name
Sandy Williams
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Brett Johnson
Party Name
Bob Rice
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Brett Johnson
Party Name
Gila County
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Jefferson Dalton
Party Name
Karen Fann
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Female
Attorney
GIDEON ESAKOFF
Party Name
Russell Bowers
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Male
Attorney
GIDEON ESAKOFF
Party Name
Jim Chang
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Colin Ahler
Party Name
Halleh Landon
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Unknown
Attorney
Louis Caputo
Party Name
Scott Thompson
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Louis Caputo
Party Name
Carmen Wyckoff
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Unknown
Attorney
Louis Caputo
Party Name
Warren Petersen
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Male
Attorney
William Richards
Party Name
Ben Toma
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/26/2025
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
2/27/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL WITHIN GOVERNMENT LAW OFFICE
Filing Date
2/18/2025
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
2/20/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs Rebuttal Brief
Filing Date
2/7/2025
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/7/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING
STIPULATION TO EXTEND
DEADLINE FOR FILING
PLAINTIFFS' REBUTTAL BRIEF
Filing Date
2/4/2025
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
2/5/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR FILING PLAINTIFFS’ REBUTTAL BRIEF
Filing Date
12/20/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
12/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SPECIAL INTERVENOR ARIZONA SENATE PRESIDENT WARREN PETERSEN AND ARIZONA HOUSE SPEAKER BEN TOMA’S PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
Filing Date
12/20/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
12/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
WRITTEN CLOSING OF SPECIAL INTERVENORS ARIZONA SENATE PRESIDENT PETERSEN AND ARIZONA HOUSE SPEAKER TOMA
Filing Date
11/15/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
11/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
IT IS ORDERED granting the parties' Stipulation.
Filing Date
11/8/2024
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
11/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION REGARDING EXTENSION FOR SPECIAL INTERVENORS AND DEFENDANTS’ PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, AND CLOSING BRIEFS
Filing Date
10/9/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING JOINT
STIPULATION TO FILE COLOR
COPIES OF BRUCE BAKER'S
EXPERT REPORTS
Filing Date
10/7/2024
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
10/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Stipulation to File Color Copies of Bruce Baker's Expert Reports
Filing Date
10/7/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
Filing Date
10/7/2024
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
10/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ CLOSING
STATEMENT
Filing Date
9/18/2024
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order
Docket Date
9/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/16/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
9/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Correction of Bar Number of Savanna J. Wright
Filing Date
8/28/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial
Docket Date
8/28/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/2024
Description
WSH - Worksheet
Docket Date
8/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL / HEARING WORKSHEET
Filing Date
8/26/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
8/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/22/2024
Description
EXH - Exhibit
Docket Date
8/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
THUMBDRIVE OF JESSE ROSENTEIN'S TESTIMONY
Filing Date
8/20/2024
Description
EXH - Exhibit
Docket Date
8/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
THUMBDRIVE OF JESSE ROTHSTEINS TESTIMONY
Filing Date
8/14/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
8/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER ACCEPTING TRIAL
TRANSCRIPTS AS THE OFFICIAL
RECORD
Filing Date
8/14/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
8/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER TO FILE THUMBDRIVE OF
JESSE ROTHSTEIN'S TESTIMONY
Filing Date
8/9/2024
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
8/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Request for Trial Transcripts to Be Adopted as the Official Record
Filing Date
8/9/2024
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
8/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Thumbdrive of Jesse Rothstein's Testimony
Filing Date
7/26/2024
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
7/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PARTIES’ FINAL REQUESTS REGARDING ADMISSION OF TRIAL EXHIBITS
Filing Date
7/23/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE RE
ADMISSION OF TRIAL EXHIBITS
Filing Date
7/18/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE RE
ADMISSION OF TRIAL EXHIBITS
Filing Date
7/18/2024
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
7/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION EXTENDING DEADLINE RE ADMISSION OF TRIAL EXHIBITS
(SECOND REQUEST)
Filing Date
7/12/2024
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
7/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION EXTENDING
DEADLINE RE ADMISSION OF
TRIAL EXHIBITS
Filing Date
7/5/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial
Docket Date
7/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/5/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER EXTENDING DEPOSITION
DESIGNATIONS DEADLINE
Filing Date
7/5/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, granting the stipulation
Filing Date
7/1/2024
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
7/2/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION EXTENDING
DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS
DEADLINE
Filing Date
7/1/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial
Docket Date
7/1/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/28/2024
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
7/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL WITHIN GOVERNMENT LAW OFFICE
Filing Date
6/27/2024
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
6/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION REGARDING ADMISSION OF TRIAL EXHIBITS
AND
NOTICE REGARDING FUTURE EXHIBIT RELATED FILINGS
Filing Date
6/26/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial
Docket Date
6/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial
Docket Date
6/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/17/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial
Docket Date
6/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/17/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial
Docket Date
6/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/13/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial
Docket Date
6/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial
Docket Date
6/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial
Docket Date
6/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2024
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel
Docket Date
6/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE
MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Filing Date
6/11/2024
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
6/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING EXPERT REPORTS
Filing Date
6/10/2024
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel
Docket Date
6/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order
Filing Date
6/7/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial
Docket Date
6/7/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/6/2024
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel
Docket Date
6/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
EX PARTE MOTION TO WITHDRAW
AS COUNSEL FOR PRESIDENT
PETERSEN
Filing Date
6/6/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial
Docket Date
6/6/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2024
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel
Docket Date
6/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
EX PARTE MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR SPEAKER TOMA
Filing Date
6/5/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial
Docket Date
6/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial
Docket Date
6/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/31/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial
Docket Date
5/31/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/31/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial
Docket Date
5/31/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
BRUCE D BAKER FEBRUARY 7 2020
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
BLAINE EUGENE YOUNG DECEMBER 15 2022
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MICHAEL LEWIS WRIGHT APRIL 25 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SARAVANAN SUBRAMANIAN BALA JANUARY 13 2020
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DAVID BAKER JULY 23 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARK HAROLD JORAANSTAD APRIL 2 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
APRIL WHITNEY MARCH 5 2021
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JUDY MCEWEN RICHARDSON JANUARY 31 2020
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
LANA ELIZABETH BERRY MAY 17 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
LARRY WEEKS APRIL 10 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOHN DOUGLAS MUIR APRIL 10 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ANABEL APORTELA APRIL 11 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STEPHANIE VASSAR DECEMBER 19 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JESSE ROTHSTEIN FEBRUARY 24 2020
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
7/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ROBERT KOERPERICH DECEMBER 20 2022
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
7/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
WILLIAMS MASSEY JOHNSON AUGUST 16, 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
VICKI HANSON / DECEMBER 20 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JEROME MARK MCCAUGHEY / JULY 22 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
THOMAS D RUSHIN FEBRUARY 21 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
CARLOS MONREAL FEBRUARY 14 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PATRICK MORAN FEBRUARY 23 2024
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEAN MICHAEL MCCARTHY FEBRUARY 28 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARK AARON DAVENPORT FEBRUARY 19 2020
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SHANNA JOHNSON AUGUST 13 2021
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ANGELA PHILPOT NOVEMBER 17 2022
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PRESCOTT UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT BY JOSEPH WILLIAM HOWARD / AUGUST 14 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
LISA GRAHAM KEEGAN / FEBRUARY 4 2020
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
TIME LEEDY / JULY 11 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
KENNETH WILLIAM HICKS / MARCH 27 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
KERRY CAMPBELL / MAY 3 2024
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
KERRY CAMPBELL / MARCH 20 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ABHI GANDHI / FEBRUARY 13 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JACK RONALD SMITH / NOVEMBER 4 2022
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
THOMAS D RUSHIN / FEBRUARY 21 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DAVID HENRY KENNON JR / FEBRUARY 14 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
EWARD HARLAND LEES / DECEMBER 28 2022
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAUL BAKALIS / FEBRUARY 27 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
HERMAN ORCUTT / JANUARY 29 2020
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOHN EDWARD SCHOLL / MARCH 26 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JANET THORNTON / FEBRUARY 5 2021
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
TIMOTHY L OGLE / APRIL 8 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
KERRY LYNN CAMPBELL / OCTOBER 4, 2018
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
LYLE FRIESEN / FEBRUARY 15 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHARLES RICHARD ESSIGS / NOVEMBER 5 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
HOWARD CARLSON / AUGUST 21 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMBER PETERSON / MARCH 28 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
LAURA L NOEL / OCTOBER 28 2020
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MATT GRESS / DECEMBER 4 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEBORA LYNN NORRIS / FEBRUARY 19 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JUIS MIGUEL BARRAGAN / FEBRUARY 20 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CHANDLER UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT BY FRANCIS X FLETCHER / MAY 17 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SCOTT WILLIAM THOMPSON / MARCH 20 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
CRISTAN CABLE / DECEMBER 20 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
GREGORY JAMES GILLIAM / FEBRUARY 20 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
THE SCHOOL FACILITIES DIVISION ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF ADMINISTRATION BY AMBER PETERSON / APRIL 25 2024
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOHN PENCZAR / JANUARY 25 201
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOE THOMAS / FEBRUARY 15 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
TUCSON UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT BY ROBERT DOOLEY / APRIL 18 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DALE PONDER / FEBRUARY 28 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DANIEL DEMLAND / FEBRUARY 21 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEPSOSITION OF THE SCHOOL FACILITIES DIVISION ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF ADMINISTRATRION BY KERRY CAMPBELL / APRIL 25 2024
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JACK BROWN / FEBRUARY 23 2024
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SHAUN BROWN / DECEMBER 14 2023
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMBER PETERSON / MARCH 28 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JACK RONALD SMITH / NOVEMBER 4 2022
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARK THOMAS SWENSON / OCTOBER 30 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RICHARD STAVNEAK / APRIL 15 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF ARIZONA DPARTMENT OF ADMINISTRATION BY CALLIE TYLER / APRIL 16 2024
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
KATHERINE KNECHT / FEBRUARY 19 2019
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
CALLIE TYLER / FEBRUARY 9 2024
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF SCHOOL FACILITIES BORARD BY PAUL GEORGE BAKALIS / OCTOBER 4 2018
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
CALLIE TYLER / FEBRUARY 9 2024
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SHAWN HEATHER MASEL / OCTOBER 18 2022
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SHAUN BROWN VOLUME 2 / JANUARY 19 2024
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
VICTORIA LEE BRAND / APRIL 5 2019
Filing Date
5/27/2024
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
5/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION REGARDING ADMISSION OF TRIAL EXHIBITS
Filing Date
5/27/2024
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
5/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION REGARDING ADMISSION OF TRIAL EXHIBITS WITH PRESERVED OBJECTIONS PURSUANT TO RULES 401 AND 403, ARIZ.R.EVID.
Filing Date
5/22/2024
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
5/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Special Intervenors' Trial Memorandum
Filing Date
5/22/2024
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
5/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Opening Statement
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF INTENT TO PROVIDE CERTIFIED REPORTER TO MAKE THE OFFICIAL RECORD
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
5/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs Opening Statement
Filing Date
5/17/2024
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
5/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING EXPERT REPORTSVVVV
Filing Date
5/17/2024
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
5/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SPECIAL INTERVENORS’ NOTICE OF FILING EXPERT REPORTS
Filing Date
5/16/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
5/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/14/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference
Docket Date
5/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/13/2024
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
5/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR COURT
REPORTER AT TRIAL
Filing Date
5/10/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED
MOTION TO CONSIDER SPECIAL
INTERVENORS' RESPONSE TO
PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO.
2 RE JACK BROWN AND PATRICK
MORAN DISCLOSURES AS FILED
TIMELY
Filing Date
5/7/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
5/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SPECIAL INTERVENORS’ RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 RE JACK BROWN AND PATRICK MORAN DISCLOSURES
Filing Date
5/7/2024
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
5/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED MOTION TO CONSIDER SPECIAL INTERVENORS’ RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 RE JACK BROWN AND PATRICK MORAN DISCLOSURES AS FILED TIMELY
Filing Date
5/6/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
5/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO
SPECIAL INTERVENORS’ MOTION
IN LIMINE – RE PLAINTIFFS’
UNDISCLOSED EVIDENCE
Filing Date
5/6/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
5/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Special Intervenors' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 3
Filing Date
5/6/2024
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
5/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Special Intervenors' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 1 re: Callie Tyler Testimony
Filing Date
5/3/2024
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
5/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Pretrial Statement
Filing Date
4/26/2024
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
4/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Request For Rule 52 Findings Of Fact And Conclusions Of Law
Filing Date
4/24/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
4/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance of Counsel Within Firm
Filing Date
4/24/2024
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
4/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Rule 52 Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
Filing Date
4/19/2024
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine
Docket Date
4/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Special Intervenors' Motion in Limine Regarding Plaintiffs' Undisclosed Evidence
Filing Date
4/19/2024
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine
Docket Date
4/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs Motion in Limine No. 2 Re: Jack Brown and Patrick Moran Disclosures
Filing Date
4/19/2024
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine
Docket Date
4/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs Motion in Limine No. 3 Re: Special Intervenors' Disclosure Statement
Filing Date
4/19/2024
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine
Docket Date
4/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 RE CALLIE TYLER WITNESS TESTIMONY
Filing Date
3/22/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING JOINT
STIPULATION TO AMEND
DEADLINES FROM JOINT REPORT
AND MARCH 22, 2023 MINUTE
ENTRY
Filing Date
3/15/2024
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
3/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Stipulation to Amend Deadlines From Joint Report and March 22, 2023 Minute Entry
Filing Date
3/15/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
3/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
2/27/2024
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont
Docket Date
2/27/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/21/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
2/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance of Counsel Within Firm
Filing Date
11/7/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
11/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING JOINT
STIPULATION TO
AMEND DEADLINES FROM
JOINT REPORT
Filing Date
11/3/2023
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
11/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Stipulation to Amend Deadlines from Joint Report
Filing Date
10/30/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING JOINT
STIPULATION TO
LIFT STAY OF DISCOVERY
Filing Date
10/26/2023
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
10/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT STIPULATION TO LIFT ANY EXISTING STAY OF DISCOVERY
Filing Date
9/15/2023
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
9/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
9/13/2023
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset
Docket Date
9/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/15/2023
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
8/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance of Counsel Within Same Firm
Filing Date
8/1/2023
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference
Docket Date
8/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/26/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO
EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE
JOINT REPORT
Filing Date
7/24/2023
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
7/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Report
Filing Date
7/21/2023
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
7/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT STIPULATION TO
EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE
JOINT REPORT
Filing Date
5/9/2023
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Disassociation of Counsel Within Firm
Filing Date
5/9/2023
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Rule 25(d) Notice of Party Substitution
Filing Date
3/29/2023
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/31/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Disassociation of Counsel Within Firm
Filing Date
3/22/2023
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/16/2023
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont
Docket Date
2/16/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/10/2023
Description
081 - ME: Trial Vacated
Docket Date
1/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/10/2023
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel
Docket Date
1/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
IT IS ORDERED THAT The withdrawal of Snell & Wilmer L.L.P. and its attorneys
Filing Date
1/10/2023
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
1/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF
DEFENDANTS HALLEH LANDON,
SCOTT THOMPSON, CARMEN
WYCKOFF, ED JIMINEZ,
MICHAEL ELLEGOOD, AND
CHAD HEINRICH WITHOUT
PREJUDICE
Filing Date
1/9/2023
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Disassociation of Counsel Within Same Firm
Filing Date
1/9/2023
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXPEDITED MOTION TO VACATE
Filing Date
1/9/2023
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
1/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
1/6/2023
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
1/6/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/5/2023
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
1/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Amended Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
1/5/2023
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
1/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE IN SUPPORT OF STATE DEFENDANTS’ EXPEDITED MOTION TO VACATE
Filing Date
1/5/2023
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
1/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SPECIAL INTERVENORS’ RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’ EXPEDITED MOTION TO VACATE
Filing Date
1/5/2023
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel
Docket Date
1/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Application to Withdraw as Counsel (With Client Consent)
Filing Date
1/4/2023
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
1/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation For Dismissal of DEFENDANTS HALLEH LANDON, SCOTT THOMPSON, CARMEN WYCKOFF, ED JIMINEZ, MICHAEL ELLEGOOD, AND CHAD HEINRICH WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Filing Date
1/4/2023
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
1/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SPECIAL INTERVENORS’ TRIAL MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
1/4/2023
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
1/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Opening Statement
Filing Date
1/2/2023
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Withdrawal of Opening Statement
Filing Date
12/30/2022
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
12/31/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Opening Statement
Filing Date
12/22/2022
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
12/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Substitution of Counsel Within Firm
Filing Date
12/20/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference
Docket Date
12/20/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2022
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING SECOND
STIPULATION RE DEADLINE
FOR DEPOSITION
DESIGNATIONS
Filing Date
12/15/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
12/15/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2022
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
12/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Second Stipulation Re Deadline for Deposition Designations
Filing Date
12/12/2022
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 1 Re: Outdated Evidence
Filing Date
12/12/2022
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Response to Motion in Limine No. 1 Re: Executive Privilege
Filing Date
12/12/2022
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ RESPONSE TO
MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 RE:
EVIDENCE ABOUT
IRRELEVANT SCHOOL
DISTRICTS
Filing Date
12/12/2022
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 2 Re Minimum Adequacy Guidelines
Filing Date
12/9/2022
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
12/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ REQUEST FOR
COURT REPORTER
Filing Date
12/9/2022
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
12/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ NOTICE OF
ISSUES FOR THE FINAL TRIAL
MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Filing Date
12/9/2022
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
12/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Pretrial Statement
Filing Date
12/7/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
12/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2022
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling
Docket Date
12/2/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2022
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine
Docket Date
12/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 1 Re: Plaintiffs' Outdated Evidence
Filing Date
12/2/2022
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine
Docket Date
12/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 2 Re: Minimum Adequacy Guidelines
Filing Date
12/2/2022
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine
Docket Date
12/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 2 Re Evidence About Irrelevant School Districts
Filing Date
12/2/2022
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine
Docket Date
12/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION IN LIMINE
NO. 1 RE: EXECUTIVE
PRIVILEGE
Filing Date
12/1/2022
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
12/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY IN SUPPORT OF
MOTION TO VACATE TRIAL
Filing Date
11/30/2022
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
12/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Special Intervenors' Objection to Motion to Vacate Trial
Filing Date
11/30/2022
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Response to Motion to Vacate Trial
Filing Date
11/30/2022
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
12/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Request for Court Reporter
Filing Date
11/29/2022
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
11/29/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/29/2022
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
11/30/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Vacate Trial
Filing Date
11/23/2022
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
11/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation Re Deadline for Motions In Limine and Deposition Designations
Filing Date
11/10/2022
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
11/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Rule 52 Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
Filing Date
11/9/2022
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
11/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Request for Rule 52 Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
Filing Date
11/8/2022
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling
Docket Date
11/8/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/2022
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ LAW FIRM
SNELL & WILMER L.L.P.’S
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF
ADDRESS
Filing Date
9/29/2022
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
10/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
9/19/2022
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
9/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Response to Special Intervenors' Motion in Limine No. 1
Filing Date
9/12/2022
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
9/12/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2022
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
9/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Substitution of Attorney
Filing Date
9/6/2022
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING SPECIAL
INTERVENORS’ MOTION TO
EXCEED THE PAGE LIMIT ON
MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 RE:
RELEVANCE OF EVIDENCE
CONCERNING STUDENT
ACADEMIC ACHIEVEMENT AND
SCHOOL DISTRICT SPENDING ON
NON-MINIMUM GUIDELINES
ISSUES
Filing Date
9/6/2022
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
9/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: DEFENDANTS AND SPECIAL INTERVENORS JOINT REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY BY ANABEL APORTELA
Filing Date
9/6/2022
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
9/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: DEFENDANTS’ AND SPECIAL INTERVENORS’ JOINT REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY BY ANABEL APORTELA
Filing Date
8/29/2022
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
9/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS' Reply in Support of Daubert Motion No. 3 to Exclude Certain Testimony of Lisa Graham Keegan
Filing Date
8/29/2022
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
9/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply in Support of Daubert Motion No. 1 to Exclude Certain Testimony of Herman Orcutt
Filing Date
8/29/2022
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
9/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ AND SPECIAL INTERVENORS’ REPLY IN SUPPORT OF JOINT MOTION TO LIMIT EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. JESSE ROTHSTEIN
Filing Date
8/29/2022
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
9/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ AND SPECIAL
INTERVENORS’ REPLY IN
SUPPORT OF THEIR JOINT
MOTION TO LIMIT EXPERT
TESTIMONY OF DR. JUDY
RICHARDSON
Filing Date
8/29/2022
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
9/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ AND SPECIAL
INTERVENORS’ REPLY IN
SUPPORT OF THEIR JOINT
MOTION TO LIMIT EXPERT
TESTIMONY OF DR. BRUCE
BAKER
Filing Date
8/29/2022
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
9/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DAUBERT MOTION NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF ERIC HANUSHEK AND DAVID ARMOR
Filing Date
8/29/2022
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
9/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ AND SPECIAL INTERVENORS’ REPLY IN SUPPORT OF JOINT MOTION TO LIMIT EXPERT TESTIMONY OF MARK DAVENPORT
Filing Date
8/29/2022
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
9/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ AND SPECIAL
INTERVENORS’ JOINT REPLY IN
SUPPORT OF MOTION TO
EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY
BY DR. ANABEL APORTELA
Filing Date
8/29/2022
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
9/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SPECIAL INTERVENORS’ MOTION TO EXCEED THE PAGE LIMIT ON MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 RE: RELEVANCE OF EVIDENCE CONCERNING STUDENT ACADEMIC ACHIEVEMENT AND SCHOOL DISTRICT SPENDING ON NON-MINIMUM GUIDELINES ISSUES
Filing Date
8/29/2022
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine
Docket Date
9/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SPECIAL INTERVENORS’ MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 - REGARDING RELEVANCE OF EVIDENCE CONCERNING STUDENT ACADEMIC ACHIEVEMENT AND SCHOOL DISTRICT SPENDING ON NON-MINIMUM GUIDELINES ISSUES
Filing Date
8/19/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
8/19/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/18/2022
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Special Intervenors' Notice of Joinder
Filing Date
8/17/2022
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’ AND SPECIAL INTERVENORS’ JOINT MOTION TO LIMIT EXPERT TESTIMONY BY DR. JESSE ROTHSTEIN
Filing Date
8/17/2022
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’ AND SPECIAL INTERVENORS’ JOINT MOTION TO LIMIT EXPERT TESTIMONY BY MARK DAVENPORT
Filing Date
8/17/2022
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO
PLAINTIFFS DAUBERT MOTION
NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN
TESTIMONY OF LISA GRAHAM
KEEGAN
Filing Date
8/17/2022
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ RESPONSE TO
PLAINTIFFS’ DAUBERT MOTION
NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN
TESTIMONY OF HERMAN L.
ORCUTT
Filing Date
8/17/2022
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ RESPONSE TO
PLAINTIFFS’ DAUBERT MOTION
NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE THE
TESTIMONY OF ERIC
HANUSHEK AND DAVID ARMOR
Filing Date
8/17/2022
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’ AND SPECIAL INTERVENORS’ JOINT MOTION TO LIMIT EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. BRUCE BAKER
Filing Date
8/17/2022
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’ AND SPECIAL INTERVENORS’ JOINT MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY BY DR. ANABEL APORTELA
Filing Date
8/17/2022
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’ AND SPECIAL INTERVENORS’ JOINT MOTION TO LIMIT EXPERT TESTIMONY BY JUDY RICHARDSON, PH.D.
Filing Date
8/9/2022
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
8/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Request for Court Reporter
Filing Date
8/8/2022
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
8/8/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/4/2022
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Second Extension of Time to Respond to Daubert Motions
Filing Date
8/2/2022
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/4/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FIRST EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DAUBERT MOTIONS
Filing Date
8/1/2022
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
8/4/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’AND SPECIAL INTERVENORS’ JOINT REPLY IN SUPPORT OF SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF ISSUES FOR CASE STATUS CONFERENCE
Filing Date
8/1/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
8/1/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/2022
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Supplemental Notice of Issues
Filing Date
7/27/2022
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING PARTIES’
JOINT STIPULATION TO
VACATE DEADLINES
Filing Date
7/21/2022
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
7/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Request for Court Reporter
Filing Date
7/15/2022
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
7/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Stipulation to Vacate Deadlines
Filing Date
7/15/2022
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' and Special Intervenors' Joint Motion to Limit Expert Testimony by Mark Davenport
Filing Date
7/15/2022
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ AND SPECIAL
INTERVENORS’ JOINT MOTION
TO EXCLUDE EXPERT
TESTIMONY BY DR. ANABEL
APORTELA
Filing Date
7/15/2022
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ AND SPECIAL
INTERVENORS’ JOINT MOTION
TO LIMIT EXPERT TESTIMONY
OF DR. JESSE ROTHSTEIN
Filing Date
7/15/2022
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ AND SPECIAL
INTERVENORS’ JOINT MOTION
TO LIMIT EXPERT TESTIMONY
OF DR. JUDY RICHARDSON
Filing Date
7/15/2022
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ AND SPECIAL
INTERVENORS’ JOINT MOTION
TO LIMIT EXPERT TESTIMONY
OF DR. BRUCE BAKER
Filing Date
7/15/2022
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ DAUBERT MOTION NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF ERIC HANUSHEK AND DAVID ARMOR
Filing Date
7/15/2022
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Daubert Motion No. 3 to Exclude Certain Testimony of Lisa Graham Keegan
Filing Date
7/15/2022
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine
Docket Date
7/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Daubert Motion No. 1 to Exclude Certain Testimony of Herman L. Orcutt
Filing Date
7/12/2022
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
7/12/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2022
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
7/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance of Counsel WITHIN SAME FIRM
Filing Date
7/11/2022
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplemental Notice of Issues for Case Status Conference
Filing Date
7/6/2022
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Rule 25 Notice
Filing Date
6/22/2022
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
6/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Request for Case Status Conference
Filing Date
6/15/2022
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling
Docket Date
6/15/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2022
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
4/18/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2022
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
4/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing of Demonstrative Exhibits
Filing Date
4/11/2022
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Supplemental Authority
Filing Date
4/6/2022
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF ERRATA RE
DEFENDANTS’ STATEMENT OF
FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT;
AND
DEFENDANTS’ AND SPECIAL
INTERVENORS’ OPPOSING
STATEMENT OF FACTS IN
RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’
STATEMENT OF FACTS IN
SUPPORT OF MOTIONS FOR
SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
3/25/2022
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/31/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Errata Re Plaintiffs' Statement of Facts in Support of Motions for Summary Judgment
Filing Date
3/21/2022
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
3/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’ AND SPECIAL INTERVENORS’ MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS’ CONTROVERTING STATEMENT OF FACTS IN RESPONSE TO OPPOSING STATEMENT OF FACTS
Filing Date
3/21/2022
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
3/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Court Reporter at April 13, 2022 Oral Argument
Filing Date
3/11/2022
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
3/11/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2022
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
3/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants and Special Intervenors Rule 7.1 Evidentiary Objections
Filing Date
3/7/2022
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ AND SPECIAL INTERVENORS’ MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS’ CONTROVERTING STATEMENT OF FACTS IN RESPONSE TO OPPOSING STATEMENT OF FACTS
Filing Date
2/23/2022
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
2/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Special Intervenors' Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment
Filing Date
2/23/2022
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
2/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment
Filing Date
2/23/2022
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
2/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT NO. 1
RE EDUCATION CLAIMS
Filing Date
2/23/2022
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
2/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT NO. 2 RE TAX CLAIMS
Filing Date
2/23/2022
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
2/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ CONTROVERTING STATEMENT OF FACTS IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’ AND SPECIAL INTERVENORS’ OPPOSING STATEMENT OF FACTS
Filing Date
2/3/2022
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
2/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Fourth Extension of Time Regarding Replies on Dispositive Motions
Filing Date
1/24/2022
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
1/24/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/11/2022
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF THIRD EXTENSION OF TIME REGARDING REPLIES ON DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS
Filing Date
12/22/2021
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/23/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SPECIAL INTERVENORS’ JOINDER AND SUPPLEMENTAL ARGUMENT IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT NO. 1 RE: EDUCATION CLAIMS
Filing Date
12/22/2021
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' and Special Intervenors Joint Response to Motion for Summary Judgment No. 2 RE: TAX CLAIMS
Filing Date
12/22/2021
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment No. 1 RE EDUCATION CLAIMS
Filing Date
12/22/2021
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment
Filing Date
12/22/2021
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
12/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ CONTROVERTING STATEMENT OF FACTS IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’ SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
12/22/2021
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
12/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ AND SPECIAL INTERVENORS’ RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’ STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
- AND -
OPPOSING STATEMENT OF FACTS
Filing Date
12/22/2021
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO SPECIAL INTERVENORS’ MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
12/22/2021
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
12/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ CONTROVERTING STATEMENT OF FACTS IN RESPONSE TO SPECIAL INTERVENORS’ SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
12/16/2021
Description
NWA - Notice Withdrawal Of Attorney
Docket Date
12/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Disassociation of Counsel Within Same Firm
Filing Date
12/16/2021
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
12/18/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Errata Re Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment No. 1 Re Education Claims
Filing Date
12/13/2021
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/15/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Strike
Filing Date
12/9/2021
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
12/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Second Extension of Time Regarding Responses and Replies on Dispositive Motions
Filing Date
12/3/2021
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
12/7/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Rule 25 Notice
Filing Date
11/29/2021
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
12/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO STRIKE PARAGRAPHS 4-11, 14, 16-19, 21-22, 24-79, 81-84, 86-88, 91-101, 104-105 OF PLAINTIFS' STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
10/29/2021
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
11/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs Statement of Facts in Support of Motions For Summary Judgment
Filing Date
10/29/2021
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of First Extension of Time REGARDING RESPONSES AND REPLIES ON Dispositive Motions
Filing Date
10/21/2021
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting
Docket Date
10/21/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/20/2021
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
10/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment
Filing Date
10/20/2021
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
10/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ SEPARATE
STATEMENT OF MATERIAL
FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS
MOTION FOR SUMMARY
JUDGMENT
Filing Date
10/20/2021
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
10/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs Motion For Summary Judgment No 1 Re Education Claims
Filing Date
10/20/2021
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
10/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Special Intervenors' Motion for Summary Judgment
Filing Date
10/20/2021
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
10/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Special Intervenors' Separate Statement of Facts in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment
Filing Date
10/20/2021
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
10/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs Motion For Summary Judgment No 2 Re Tax Claims
Filing Date
10/20/2021
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference
Docket Date
10/20/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2021
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/20/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING JOINT MOTION REGARDING PAGE LIMITS FOR DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS
Filing Date
10/15/2021
Description
JSR – Joint Scheduling Report
Docket Date
10/18/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Report Regarding Settlement Conference and Private Mediation
Filing Date
10/14/2021
Description
EMF - Email Filed
Docket Date
10/19/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2021
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/11/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Motion Regarding Page Limits for Dispositive Motions
Filing Date
8/26/2021
Description
SCO – Scheduling Order
Docket Date
8/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
NINTH AMENDED SCHEDULING
ORDER
Filing Date
8/17/2021
Description
MTA - Motion To Amend
Docket Date
8/20/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
NINTH JOINT MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER
Filing Date
8/3/2021
Description
SCO – Scheduling Order
Docket Date
8/3/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
EIGHTH AMENDED SCHEDULING
ORDER
Filing Date
7/28/2021
Description
MTA - Motion To Amend
Docket Date
7/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
EIGHTH JOINT MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER
Filing Date
7/27/2021
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/28/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Rule 25 Notice
Filing Date
7/9/2021
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
7/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Substitution of Counsel Within Same Firm
Filing Date
7/1/2021
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated
Docket Date
7/1/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2021
Description
SCO – Scheduling Order
Docket Date
7/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEVENTH AMENDED
Filing Date
6/23/2021
Description
MTA - Motion To Amend
Docket Date
6/25/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Seventh Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order
Filing Date
6/18/2021
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont
Docket Date
6/18/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/2021
Description
EMF - Email Filed
Docket Date
6/23/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/7/2021
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
6/7/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/2021
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING FOURTH
STIPULATION TO EXTEND
SPECIAL INTERVENORS’
DOCUMENT REVIEW DEADLINE
TO COMPLETE PRIVILEGE
LOGS
Filing Date
4/8/2021
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
4/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Fourth Stipulation to Extend Special Intervenors' Document Review Deadline to Complete Privilege LogS
Filing Date
3/18/2021
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/18/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING THIRD
STIPULATION TO EXTEND
SPECIAL INTERVENORS’
DOCUMENT REVIEW DEADLINE
Filing Date
3/12/2021
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
3/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Third Stipulation to Extend Special Intervenors' Document Review Deadline
Filing Date
3/1/2021
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING SECOND
STIPULATION TO EXTEND
SPECIAL INTERVENORS’
DOCUMENT REVIEW DEADLINE
Filing Date
2/23/2021
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/23/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING JOINT
MOTION RE SPECIAL MASTERS
REPORT
Filing Date
2/23/2021
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/23/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING
STIPULATION TO EXTEND
SPECIAL INTERVENORS
DOCUMENT REVIEW DEADLINE
Filing Date
2/23/2021
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
2/25/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Second Stipulation to Extend Special Intervenors' Document Review Deadline
Filing Date
2/10/2021
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
2/11/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation to Extend Special Intervenors' Document Review Deadline
Filing Date
2/10/2021
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
2/11/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Motion Re Special Master's Report
Filing Date
2/1/2021
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
2/2/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Special Master's Final Report
Filing Date
1/29/2021
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SECOND PROTECTIVE
Filing Date
1/22/2021
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Motion for Entry of Second Protective Order
Filing Date
12/16/2020
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/16/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDING
APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL
MASTER
Filing Date
12/9/2020
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
12/9/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Errata Regarding Joint Motion to Amend Order Appointing a Special Master
Filing Date
12/8/2020
Description
MTA - Motion To Amend
Docket Date
12/9/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Motion to Amend Order Appointing a Special Master
Filing Date
11/24/2020
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling
Docket Date
11/24/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/27/2020
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Change of Address
Filing Date
10/27/2020
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/28/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE DEFENDANTS’ NOTICE
OF REQUEST FOR
CLARIFICATION WITHDRAWAL
Filing Date
10/23/2020
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/26/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel Deposition of Superintendent Kathy Hoffman
Filing Date
10/21/2020
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/22/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs Response to Request for Clarification
Filing Date
10/16/2020
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
10/16/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2020
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/19/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPOINTING A SPECIAL MASTER
Filing Date
10/14/2020
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
10/15/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE DEFENDNATS' REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION OF AUGUST 17, 2020 ORDER
Filing Date
10/12/2020
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/13/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE DEFENDANTS’ RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF SUPERINTENDENT KATHY HOFFMAN
Filing Date
10/12/2020
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
10/13/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Report re Special Master Appointment
Filing Date
10/9/2020
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/9/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING
STIPULATION RE BRIEFING ON
MOTION TO COMPEL
DEPOSITION OF
KATHY HOFFMAN
Filing Date
10/9/2020
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/12/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
NON-PARTY SUPERINTENDENT
HOFFMAN’S RESPONSE TO
PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO
COMPEL DEPOSITION OF KATHY
HOFFMAN AND JOINDER IN
SUPPORT OF STATE AND
SPECIAL INTERVENORS’
RESPONSES
Filing Date
10/9/2020
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
10/13/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Limited Appearance
Filing Date
9/30/2020
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
10/2/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation re Briefing on Motion to Compel Deposition of Kathy Hoffman
Filing Date
9/30/2020
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
10/2/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
9/25/2020
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
9/25/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/18/2020
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
9/22/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
SPECIAL INTERVENORS’
RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’
MOTION TO COMPEL
DEPOSITION OF
SUPERINTENDENT KATHY
HOFFMAN
Filing Date
9/17/2020
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/17/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING
STIPULATION REGARDING
SPECIAL MASTER
APPOINTMENT
Filing Date
9/9/2020
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
9/11/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT REPORT AND STIPULATION REGARDING SPECIAL MASTER APPOINTMENT
Filing Date
9/4/2020
Description
CER - Certificate
Docket Date
9/9/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Certification of Good Faith Consultation Pursuant to Rule 7.1(H)
Filing Date
9/4/2020
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
9/9/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Change of Law Firm Name, Address, Email Address, Telephone and Facsimile Numbers
Filing Date
9/4/2020
Description
MTC - Motion To Compel
Docket Date
9/9/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Compel Deposition of Superintendent Kathy Hoffman
Filing Date
8/31/2020
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling
Docket Date
8/31/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/26/2020
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
8/26/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/2020
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling
Docket Date
8/19/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/3/2020
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
8/4/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Substitution of Counsel Within Law Firm
Filing Date
7/31/2020
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
8/3/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Special Intervenors to Comply With Discovery Obligations and Produce Documents Withheld Based on Legislative Privilege
Filing Date
7/24/2020
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
7/24/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’
MOTION TO COMPEL SPECIAL
INTERVENORS TO COMPLY
WITH DISCOVERY
OBLIGATIONS AND PRODUCE
DOCUMENTS WITHHELD BASED
ON LEGISLATIVE PRIVILEGE
Filing Date
7/24/2020
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
7/24/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Special Intervenors' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Special Intervenors to Comply with Discovery Obligations and Produce Documents Withheld Based on Legislative Privilege
Filing Date
7/16/2020
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/20/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Rule 7.1 (g) Notice of Agreement of First Extension of Time Regarding Briefing Deadlines
Filing Date
7/10/2020
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/10/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING
STIPULATION RE BRIEFING ON
SPECIAL INTERVENORS
PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
AND LEGISLATIVE PRIVILEGE
Filing Date
7/6/2020
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
7/7/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation Re Briefing on Special Intervenors' Production of Documents and Legislative Privilege
Filing Date
7/6/2020
Description
MTC - Motion To Compel
Docket Date
7/7/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Special Intervenors to Comply With Discovery Obligations and Produce Documents Withheld Based on Legislative Privilege
Filing Date
6/23/2020
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
6/23/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING
STIPULATION RE BRIEFING ON
IN CAMERA REVIEW BY COURT
OR APPOINTMENT OF A
SPECIAL MASTER
Filing Date
6/23/2020
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/23/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Special Intervenors' Joinder in Defendants' Reply Brief Re Appropriateness of In Camera Review or Special Master to Conduct Privilege Review
Filing Date
6/23/2020
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
6/24/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF RE IN CAMERA REVIEW AND EXECUTIVE PRIVILEGE
Filing Date
6/23/2020
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
6/24/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY BRIEF RE IN CAMERA REVIEW AND EXECUTIVE PRIVILEGE
Filing Date
6/17/2020
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
6/18/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief Re In Camera Review and Executive Privilege
Filing Date
6/17/2020
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
6/18/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF REGARDING IN CAMERA/SPECIAL MASTER REVIEW OF EXECUTIVE PRIVILEGE DOCUMENTS
Filing Date
6/17/2020
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
6/18/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
SPECIAL INTERVENORS’ JOINDER IN DEFENDANTS’ SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF REGARDING IN CAMERA/SPECIAL MASTER REVIEW OF EXECUTIVE PRIVILEGE DOCUMENTS
Filing Date
6/12/2020
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
6/12/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation Re Briefing on In Camera Review by Court or Appointment of a Special Master
Filing Date
6/3/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
6/3/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/1/2020
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
6/1/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/13/2020
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
5/13/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ REQUEST FOR COURT REPORTER AT MAY 28, 2020 HEARING
Filing Date
5/12/2020
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
5/12/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2020
Description
JSR – Joint Scheduling Report
Docket Date
5/1/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT REPORT REGARDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND PRIVATE MEDIATION
Filing Date
4/29/2020
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
5/1/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Documents Based on Executive Privilege
Filing Date
4/27/2020
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/28/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Motion to Strike Exhibits E, F, G, H, I And J of Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Documents Withheld Based on Executive Privilege
Filing Date
4/20/2020
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/21/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of One-Week Extension of Time to File (1) Response to Defendants' Motion to Strike Exhibits E-J and (2) Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel
Filing Date
4/10/2020
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/15/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Special Intervenors' Joinder in Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Documents WITHHELD Based on Executive Privilege
Filing Date
4/10/2020
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/15/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS WITHHELD BASED ON EXECUTIVE PRIVILEGE
Filing Date
4/6/2020
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/9/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO STRIKE EXHIBITS E, F, G, H, I AND J OF PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS WITHHELD BASED ON EXECUTIVE PRIVILEGE
Filing Date
4/1/2020
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated
Docket Date
4/1/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/2020
Description
JSR – Joint Scheduling Report
Docket Date
3/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT REPORT REGARDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND PRIVATE MEDIATION
Filing Date
3/24/2020
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/26/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF SECOND EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS AND SUBSEQUENT REPLY
Filing Date
3/20/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document
Docket Date
3/23/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXHIBITS TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS WITHHELD BASED ON EXECUTIVE PRIVILEGE TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL EXHIBITS #E THROUGH J
Filing Date
3/19/2020
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
3/19/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/17/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document
Docket Date
3/20/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXHIBIT E through J
Filing Date
3/17/2020
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents
Docket Date
3/20/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
3/16/2020
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/18/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Intent to File Motion to Strike Related to Plaintiffs' Filing of ClawbackED Document Under Seal
Filing Date
3/16/2020
Description
MTC - Motion To Compel
Docket Date
3/18/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Documents Withheld Based on Executive Privilege
Filing Date
3/16/2020
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/18/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion For Leave to File Under Seal (Not Opposed)
Filing Date
3/13/2020
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/13/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND BRIEFING DEADLINES
Filing Date
3/11/2020
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
3/12/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation to Extend Briefing Deadlines
Filing Date
3/2/2020
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference
Docket Date
3/2/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/26/2020
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
2/28/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Notice of Issues for February 28, 2020 Status Conference
Filing Date
2/24/2020
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
2/26/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Notice of Issues for February 28, 2020, Case Status Conference
Filing Date
1/27/2020
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated
Docket Date
1/27/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2020
Description
EMF - Email Filed
Docket Date
2/4/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/23/2020
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
1/23/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/15/2020
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
1/21/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Fourth Joint Report Regarding Settlement Conference and Private Mediation
Filing Date
12/23/2019
Description
SCO – Scheduling Order
Docket Date
12/23/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIXTH AMENDED
Filing Date
12/16/2019
Description
MTA - Motion To Amend
Docket Date
12/18/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Sixth Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order
Filing Date
11/8/2019
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
11/12/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Report Regarding Settlement Conference and Private Mediation
Filing Date
10/22/2019
Description
SCO – Scheduling Order
Docket Date
10/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
FIFTH AMENDED
Filing Date
10/10/2019
Description
MTA - Motion To Amend
Docket Date
10/14/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Fifth Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order
Filing Date
9/5/2019
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
9/5/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/3/2019
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/5/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROTECTIVE
Filing Date
8/30/2019
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
9/3/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Motion for Entry of Protective Order
Filing Date
8/29/2019
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
8/30/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Report Regarding Settlement Conference and Private Mediation
Filing Date
8/12/2019
Description
SCO – Scheduling Order
Docket Date
8/12/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOURTH AMENDED
Filing Date
8/8/2019
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
8/9/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation to Extend Expert Disclosure Deadline
Filing Date
6/19/2019
Description
SCO – Scheduling Order
Docket Date
6/19/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
THIRD AMENDED
Filing Date
6/14/2019
Description
MTA - Motion To Amend
Docket Date
6/17/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Third Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order
Filing Date
5/29/2019
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
5/31/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Report Regarding Settlement Conference and Private Mediation
Filing Date
5/20/2019
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice Regarding Mootness of Motion to Quash
Filing Date
5/6/2019
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/7/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Second Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum
Filing Date
4/16/2019
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/17/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of First Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum
Filing Date
4/3/2019
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/4/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion To Quash Subpoena DUCES TECUM SERVED ON LAKE HAVASU UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT NO 1 BY DEFENDANTS STATE OF ARIZONA, SEAN MCCARTHY, VERN CROW, JIM CHANGE, HALLEH LANDON, BOB RICE, THOMAS RUSHIN, SCOTT THOMPSON, SANDY WILLIAMS, AND CARMEN WYCKOFF
Filing Date
3/11/2019
Description
SCO – Scheduling Order
Docket Date
3/11/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SECOND AMENDED/
Filing Date
3/5/2019
Description
MTA - Motion To Amend
Docket Date
3/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Second Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order
Filing Date
2/15/2019
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
2/15/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Proper Party Substitution
Filing Date
2/14/2019
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
2/20/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid
Filing Date
2/12/2019
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
2/13/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF MAILING
Filing Date
12/18/2018
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
12/19/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Substitution of Counsel Within Law Firm
Filing Date
10/17/2018
Description
SCO – Scheduling Order
Docket Date
10/17/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
FIRST AMENDED
Filing Date
10/12/2018
Description
MTA - Motion To Amend
Docket Date
10/15/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
First Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order
Filing Date
10/10/2018
Description
NWA - Notice Withdrawal Of Attorney
Docket Date
10/10/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Within Firm
Filing Date
6/29/2018
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont
Docket Date
6/29/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/31/2018
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order
Docket Date
6/4/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/31/2018
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal
Docket Date
6/4/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/30/2018
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/31/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Second Notice of Automatic Substitution
Filing Date
5/21/2018
Description
085 - ME: Conference
Docket Date
5/21/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2018
Description
SCO – Scheduling Order
Docket Date
5/21/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2018
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
5/16/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT MEMORANDUM
REGARDING RULE 16.3
CONFERENCE
Filing Date
4/24/2018
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order
Docket Date
4/25/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/20/2018
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/20/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE STIPULATION
REGARDING RULE 16
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
Filing Date
4/17/2018
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
4/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation Regarding Rule 16 Scheduling Conference
Filing Date
4/16/2018
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
4/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' and Special Intervenors' Joint Answer to First Amended Complaint
Filing Date
4/12/2018
Description
041 - ME: Scheduling Conference Set
Docket Date
4/12/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/9/2018
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/9/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER RE STIPULATION
REGARDING ANSWER DEADLINE
Filing Date
4/6/2018
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
4/10/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Request for Rule 16 Scheduling Conference
Filing Date
4/4/2018
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
4/5/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation Regarding Answer Deadline
Filing Date
3/14/2018
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling
Docket Date
3/14/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/21/2018
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
2/21/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2018
Description
NWA - Notice Withdrawal Of Attorney
Docket Date
2/7/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel
Filing Date
1/31/2018
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
2/1/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' and Special Intervenors' Reply in Support of Joint Motion for Stay of Proceedings
Filing Date
1/24/2018
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
1/25/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANTS’ AND SPECIAL
INTERVENORS’ MOTION FOR
STAY
Filing Date
1/22/2018
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
1/23/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Court Reporter
Filing Date
1/18/2018
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
1/18/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/10/2018
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
1/11/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Second Request for Judicial Notice
Filing Date
1/10/2018
Description
NDI - Notice Of Dismissal
Docket Date
1/11/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Plaintiff Arizona Association of School Business Officials
Filing Date
1/10/2018
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/11/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND DECISION REGARDING:
DEFENDANTS’ AND SPECIAL INTERVENORS’ JOINT MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
1/10/2018
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/11/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS' AND SPECIAL INTERVENORS' JOINT MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
1/9/2018
Description
NDI - Notice Of Dismissal
Docket Date
1/10/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF JILL BARRAGAN
Filing Date
1/3/2018
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
1/4/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Reply in Support of Request for Judicial Notice Regarding Administrative Appeal
Filing Date
12/21/2017
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/22/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Request for Judicial Notice Regarding Administrative Appeal
Filing Date
12/14/2017
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
12/15/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice Regarding Administrative Appeal
Filing Date
12/12/2017
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
12/12/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Court Reporter
Filing Date
12/6/2017
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
12/6/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/27/2017
Description
JSR – Joint Scheduling Report
Docket Date
11/28/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Memorandum Regarding Rule 16.3 Conference
Filing Date
10/13/2017
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated
Docket Date
10/13/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/2017
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
10/12/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2017
Description
325 ME: Case Reassignment / Complex Designation
Docket Date
10/11/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2017
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
10/4/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/25/2017
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
9/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint
Filing Date
9/25/2017
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
9/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Special Intervenors' Reply in Support of Joinder in Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint
Filing Date
9/25/2017
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
9/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Designate Case as Complex Civil Action
Filing Date
9/25/2017
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
9/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Special Intervenors' Reply in Support of Joinder in Defendants' Motion to Designate Case as Complex Civil Action
Filing Date
9/12/2017
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
9/13/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Special Intervenors' First Extension Of Time To File Replies To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss And Motion For Complex Case Designation
Filing Date
8/31/2017
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
9/1/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS’ FIRST
EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE
REPLIES TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION
TO DISMISS AND MOTION FOR
COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION
Filing Date
8/28/2017
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint
Filing Date
8/28/2017
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Response to Motion to Designate Case as Complex Civil Action
Filing Date
8/25/2017
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/28/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant's Notice Regarding Governor Approval of Formal Rulemaking
Filing Date
8/2/2017
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/3/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Notice of Outstanding Motions
Filing Date
7/25/2017
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/27/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Plaintiffs' First Extension of Time to File Responses to Defendants' and Special Intervenors' Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Designate Case as Complex Civil Action
Filing Date
7/20/2017
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned
Docket Date
7/20/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/2017
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
7/21/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid
Filing Date
7/19/2017
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/20/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Special Intervenors' Joinder in Defendants' Motion to Designate Case As Complex Civil Action
Filing Date
7/19/2017
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/20/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Special Intervenors' Joinder in Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint
Filing Date
7/18/2017
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
7/19/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint
Filing Date
7/18/2017
Description
NJR - Notice of change of Judge for right
Docket Date
7/19/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Notice of Change of Judge as a Matter of Right
Filing Date
7/18/2017
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/19/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Notice of Automatic Substitution
Filing Date
7/18/2017
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
7/19/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration
Filing Date
7/18/2017
Description
CER - Certificate
Docket Date
7/19/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Certification of Complexity
Filing Date
7/18/2017
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/19/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Motion to Designate Case as Complex Civil Action
Filing Date
7/14/2017
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
7/17/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Acceptance of Service re Bryan E. Peltzer
Filing Date
7/14/2017
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
7/17/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Acceptance of Service re Edward E. Boot
Filing Date
7/14/2017
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
7/17/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Acceptance of Service re Ward Simpson
Filing Date
7/14/2017
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
7/17/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Acceptance of Service re Sandy Williams
Filing Date
7/14/2017
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
7/17/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Acceptance of Service re Sean McCarthy
Filing Date
7/14/2017
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
7/17/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Acceptance of Service re Vern Crow
Filing Date
7/14/2017
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
7/17/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Acceptance of Service re Traci L. Sawyer-Sinkbeil
Filing Date
7/14/2017
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
7/17/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Acceptance of Service re Thomas D. Rushin
Filing Date
7/14/2017
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
7/17/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Acceptance of Service re Jeffrey J. Smith
Filing Date
6/30/2017
Description
CME - Credit Memo
Docket Date
7/3/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Credit Memo
Filing Date
6/28/2017
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance and Intervention
Filing Date
6/28/2017
Description
AMC - Amended Complaint
Docket Date
6/29/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
First Amended Complaint
Filing Date
5/10/2017
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/12/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
ARIZONA SCHOOL FACILITIES BOARD
Filing Date
5/10/2017
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/12/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE OF ARIZONA
Filing Date
5/10/2017
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
5/12/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2017
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
5/12/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2017
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
5/2/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2017
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
5/2/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2017
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
5/2/2017
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
12/13/2017
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
1/12/2018
Time
14:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/16/2018
Time
15:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
5/1/2018
Time
9:15
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/16/2018
Time
10:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
6/24/2019
Time
8:45
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/2/2019
Time
8:45
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/18/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/13/2020
Time
8:45
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/13/2020
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/27/2020
Time
8:45
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/28/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/28/2020
Time
8:45
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/28/2020
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
8/27/2020
Time
10:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/22/2020
Time
11:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
7/20/2021
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/22/2021
Time
9:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/15/2021
Time
11:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/19/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
4/13/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
8/4/2022
Time
11:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/19/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/9/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
9/12/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/13/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/14/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/15/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/19/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/20/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/21/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/22/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/26/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/27/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/28/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/29/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/3/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/4/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/5/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/6/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
12/1/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/16/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/6/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/9/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/10/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/11/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/12/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/17/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/18/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/19/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/23/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/24/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/25/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/26/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/30/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/31/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/1/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/16/2023
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/17/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/28/2023
Time
11:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/3/2024
Time
13:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/10/2024
Time
13:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/28/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
5/29/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/30/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/3/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/4/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/5/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/6/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/10/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/11/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/12/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/13/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/17/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/18/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/19/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/24/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/25/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.