Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2017-007457 | Judge: | Moskowitz, Frank |
File Date: | 5/8/2017 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Pilatus Bank P L C | Plaintiff | Tracy Miller | |
Ali Sadr | Plaintiff | Male | Tracy Miller |
Daphne Caruana Galizia | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
10/23/2017 | 042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full | 10/23/2017 | |
10/17/2017 | NDI - Notice Of Dismissal | 10/18/2017 | |
NOTE: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice | |||
10/11/2017 | 311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry | 10/11/2017 | |
7/26/2017 | NOT - Notice | 7/27/2017 | |
NOTE: Notice of Service to a Foreign Individual | |||
7/12/2017 | 322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss | 7/12/2017 | |
5/8/2017 | COM - Complaint | 5/10/2017 | |
5/8/2017 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 5/10/2017 | |
5/8/2017 | CSH - Coversheet | 5/10/2017 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
There are no calendar events on file |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
There are no judgments on file |