Probate Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: PB2020-091282 Judge: Williams, Paula
Plaintiff Alexander L  Cox Location: Southeast
Case Type: Probate  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Alexander L Cox   Decedent Male  Pro Per
Zulema  Pastenes-Porter   Petitioner Female  Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
10/13/2020  CAE - Claims Against Estate  10/15/2020   
NOTE: WELLS FARGO BANK 
2/12/2020  OPA - Order To Personal Representative & Acknowledgement  2/13/2020   
2/12/2020  WAV - Waiver  2/13/2020  Petitioner 
NOTE: ZULEMA RUTH PASTENES-PORTER / RIGHT TO APPOINTMENT AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE 
2/12/2020  WOB - Waiver Of Bond  2/13/2020  Petitioner 
NOTE: ZULEMA RUTH PASTENES-PORTER 
2/12/2020  PAC - PROBATE REGISTRAR ACCEPTANCE  2/13/2020   
2/12/2020  SIP - Statement Of Informal Probate  2/13/2020  Petitioner 
2/12/2020  LTA - Letter Of Appointment  2/13/2020  Petitioner 
NOTE: ZULEMA PASTENES-PORTER / WITHOUT RESTRICTION 
2/12/2020  NIP - Notice Of Informal Probate  2/14/2020  Petitioner 
2/12/2020  NIP - Notice Of Informal Probate  2/14/2020  Petitioner 
2/7/2020  PAC - PROBATE REGISTRAR ACCEPTANCE  2/11/2020   
NOTE: DENIAL 
2/7/2020  022 - ME: Order Signed  2/7/2020   
2/6/2020  ORD - Order  2/10/2020   
NOTE: REQUEST FOR PROTECTED ADDRESS IS DENIED RULE 8 RULES OF PROBATE PROCEDURE REQUIRES THE COURT TO MAINTAIN THE PROBATE INFORMATION FORM AS A CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENT NO FURTHER PROTECTION IS NEEDED AT THIS TIME HOWEVER THE PROBATE INFORMATION FORM 
2/5/2020  PAC - PROBATE REGISTRAR ACCEPTANCE  2/7/2020   
NOTE: DENIED 
2/4/2020  REQ - Request  2/7/2020  Petitioner 
NOTE: FOR PROTECTED ADDRESS 
2/4/2020  APE - Application/Petition  2/5/2020  Petitioner 
2/4/2020  CSH - Coversheet  2/5/2020  Petitioner 
2/4/2020  PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access  2/5/2020  Petitioner 
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file