Probate Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | PB2011-000036 | Judge: | Fink, Dean |
Plaintiff | Mark Allen Taylor | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Probate |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Mark Allen Taylor | Ward | Male | Paul Theut |
Maricopa County Public Fiduciary | Petitioner | Roberto Pulver | |
Donna Taylor | Objector | Female | Candess Hunter |
Todd E Taylor | GRD (Temporary) | Male | Pro Per |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
11/1/2011 | 022 - ME: Order Signed | 11/1/2011 | |
10/31/2011 | ORD - Order | 11/1/2011 | |
NOTE: RE MOTION FOR OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENSE SERVICES TO ISSUE PAYMENT TO UNDERSIGNED COUNSEL | |||
10/3/2011 | MOT - Motion | 10/4/2011 | |
NOTE: FOR OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENSE SERVICES TO ISSUE PAYMENT TO UNDERSIGNED COUNSEL | |||
7/25/2011 | 434 - Case Administratively Closed | 7/25/2011 | |
7/21/2011 | ORD - Order | 7/26/2011 | |
NOTE: DISMISSING ARIZONA GUARDIANSHIP | |||
7/13/2011 | REQ - Request | 7/15/2011 | |
NOTE: FOR DISSMISSAL OF ARIZONA GUARDIANSHIP WITH PREJUDICE | |||
4/22/2011 | RAC - Request for Change Of Address/Name | 4/27/2011 | |
4/8/2011 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 4/8/2011 | |
4/6/2011 | ORD - Order | 4/8/2011 | |
NOTE: STIPULATED / TO UNSEAL MINUTE ENTRY AND HEARING RECORD OF JANUARY 13 2011 HEARING | |||
4/4/2011 | RAC - Request for Change Of Address/Name | 4/7/2011 | |
4/1/2011 | NOF - Notice Of Filing | 4/4/2011 | |
NOTE: STATE BAR OF ARIZONA LETTER | |||
3/29/2011 | IRE - Investigative Report | 3/31/2011 | |
3/25/2011 | IRE - Investigative Report | 3/28/2011 | |
NOTE: ADDENDUM | |||
3/24/2011 | NOT - Notice | 3/28/2011 | |
NOTE: OF COMPLIANCE | |||
3/23/2011 | 430 - Appt Temp Guard/Conserv | 3/23/2011 | |
3/21/2011 | ORD - Order | 3/22/2011 | |
NOTE: FOR EXPEDITED STATUS CONFERENCE | |||
3/18/2011 | OGA - Order To Guardian(s) & Acknowledgement | 3/23/2011 | |
3/18/2011 | ORD - Order | 3/23/2011 | |
NOTE: STIPULATED/ RE SUBSTITUTION OF TEMPORARY GUARDAIAN AND DISMISSAL OF TEMPORARY CONSERVATORSHIP | |||
3/18/2011 | AAR - Accpt Appoint Personal Rep/Guard/Conservator | 3/21/2011 | |
3/18/2011 | AFP - Affidavit of Proposed Appointee | 3/21/2011 | |
3/18/2011 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 3/18/2011 | |
3/18/2011 | LTA - Letter Of Appointment | 3/21/2011 | |
NOTE: OF TEMPORARY GUARDIAN / TODD E TAYLOR | |||
3/15/2011 | MEM - Memorandum | 3/16/2011 | |
NOTE: STATUS CONFERENCE | |||
3/15/2011 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 3/17/2011 | |
3/15/2011 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 3/17/2011 | |
3/15/2011 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 3/17/2011 | |
3/11/2011 | MOT - Motion | 3/14/2011 | |
NOTE: FOR EXPEDITED STATUS CONFERENCE | |||
3/9/2011 | NOH - Notice Of Hearing | 3/11/2011 | |
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL | |||
3/9/2011 | PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing | 3/11/2011 | |
NOTE: AMENDED/ | |||
3/4/2011 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 3/9/2011 | |
3/4/2011 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 3/9/2011 | |
3/1/2011 | 056 - ME: Hearing Set | 3/1/2011 | |
2/28/2011 | NOF - Notice Of Filing | 3/16/2011 | |
NOTE: VERIFICATION | |||
2/25/2011 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 3/1/2011 | |
NOTE: TO PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PERMANENT GUARDIAN CROSS PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY GUARDIAN AND PERMANENT GUARDIAN | |||
2/17/2011 | LTA - Letter Of Appointment | 2/18/2011 | |
NOTE: AMENDED & ACCEPTANCE TEMP GUARDIAN & TEMP CONSERVATOR | |||
2/14/2011 | CIR – Court Investigator Reports - Confidential | 2/14/2011 | |
2/11/2011 | IRE - Investigative Report | 2/14/2011 | |
2/10/2011 | 022 - ME: Order Signed | 2/10/2011 | |
2/9/2011 | ORD - Order | 2/14/2011 | |
NOTE: TO AMEND CAPTION AND FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED LETTERS OF TEMPORARY GUARDIANSHIP AND TEMPORARY CONSERVATORSHIP | |||
2/8/2011 | APU - Affidavit Of Publication | 2/10/2011 | |
2/4/2011 | MOT - Motion | 2/7/2011 | |
NOTE: FOR AMENDMENT OF CAPTION TO CORRECT NAME AND TO INCLUDE ALIAS AND FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED ORDERS AND LETTERS OF APPOINTMENT | |||
1/19/2011 | OGC - Order Appointing Guardian And Conservator | 1/20/2011 | |
NOTE: AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT | |||
1/19/2011 | OGA - Order To Guardian(s) & Acknowledgement | 1/20/2011 | |
1/14/2011 | 401 - ME: Order: Appt Atty/Invest/Phys | 1/14/2011 | |
1/14/2011 | 430 - Appt Temp Guard/Conserv | 1/14/2011 | |
1/14/2011 | LTA - Letter Of Appointment | 1/18/2011 | |
NOTE: TEMPORARY/ MARICOPA COUNTY PUBLIC FIDUCIARY | |||
1/14/2011 | MDR – Medical Report – Confidential | 1/18/2011 | |
NOTE: PHYSICIAN | |||
1/14/2011 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 1/21/2011 | |
1/14/2011 | NOF - Notice Of Filing | 1/18/2011 | |
NOTE: PHSYCIANS REPORT | |||
1/13/2011 | OGC - Order Appointing Guardian And Conservator | 1/20/2011 | |
NOTE: TEMPORARY | |||
1/12/2011 | PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing | 1/13/2011 | |
1/12/2011 | OPC - Order Appt Att/Phy/Visitor | 1/20/2011 | |
NOTE: PAUL THEUT ATTORNEY/ | |||
1/12/2011 | NOH - Notice Of Hearing | 1/13/2011 | |
1/10/2011 | APE - Application/Petition | 1/11/2011 | |
1/10/2011 | PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access | 1/11/2011 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
1/13/2011 | 15:00 | Emergency Hearing |
2/11/2011 | 9:00 | Compliance Hearing |
2/28/2011 | 10:00 | Status Conference |
2/28/2011 | 10:00 | Guardian/Conservator - Adult |
3/15/2011 | 14:00 | Emergency Hearing |
3/29/2011 | 10:00 | Trial |
3/29/2011 | 15:00 | Evidentiary Hearing |