Probate Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | PB2006-002143 | Judge: | Palmer, Brian |
Plaintiff | Minor Minor Minor | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Probate |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Party is a minor: name not published | Minor | Female | Pro Per |
Todd Jostes | Petitioner | Male | Jeffrey Ostreicher |
Cami Jostes | Petitioner | Female | Jeffrey Ostreicher |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
8/21/2019 | RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail | 8/21/2019 | |
8/15/2019 | RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail | 8/15/2019 | |
7/30/2019 | 434 - Case Administratively Closed | 7/30/2019 | |
4/12/2019 | RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail | 4/12/2019 | |
3/26/2019 | RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail | 3/26/2019 | |
3/26/2019 | RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail | 3/26/2019 | |
3/26/2019 | RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail | 3/26/2019 | |
3/4/2019 | 431- Review For Compliance | 3/7/2019 | |
11/1/2006 | PRD - Proof Of Restricted Account | 11/6/2006 | |
NOTE: FROM DEPOSITORY OR FINANCIAL INSTITUTION | |||
10/6/2006 | 421- Appoint Guardian/Consev | 10/6/2006 | |
10/3/2006 | LTA - Letter Of Appointment | 10/10/2006 | |
NOTE: AS PERMANENT CO CONSERVATOR AND ACCEPTANCE OF LETTERS TODD JOSTES AND CAMI JOSTES WITH RESTRICTIONS | |||
10/3/2006 | OCM - Order Appt Conservator Of Minor Child | 10/10/2006 | |
NOTE: / PERMANENT TODD JOSTES AND CAMI JOSTES | |||
10/3/2006 | OCA - Order To Conservator(s) & Acknowledgement | 10/10/2006 | |
10/3/2006 | PIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access | 10/10/2006 | |
10/2/2006 | ORD - Order | 10/10/2006 | |
NOTE: / GRANTING PETITIONERS MOTION TO RESCHEDULE SEPTEMBER 18 2006 CONSERVATORSHIP HEARING | |||
9/19/2006 | 003 - ME: Hearing Reset | 9/19/2006 | |
9/6/2006 | MOT - Motion | 9/8/2006 | |
NOTE: TO RESCHEDULE 09/18/06 CONSERVATORSHIP HEARING | |||
8/15/2006 | ORD - Order | 8/22/2006 | |
NOTE: / GRANTING PETITIONERS MOTION TO CONTINUE AUGUST 21 2006 CONSERVATORSHIP HEARING | |||
8/7/2006 | MCO - Motion To Continue | 8/10/2006 | |
NOTE: / AUGUST 21 2006 CONSERVATORSHIP HEARING | |||
7/27/2006 | APE - Application/Petition | 7/31/2006 | |
7/27/2006 | ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees | 7/31/2006 | |
7/27/2006 | AFF - Affidavit | 7/31/2006 | |
NOTE: OF PERSON TO BE APPOINTED CONSERVATOR | |||
7/27/2006 | AFF - Affidavit | 7/31/2006 | |
NOTE: OF PERSON TO BE APPOINTED CONSERVATOR |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
8/21/2006 | 10:00 | Guardian/Conservator - Minor |
9/18/2006 | 10:00 | Guardian/Conservator - Minor |
10/3/2006 | 9:00 | Guardian/Conservator - Minor |