« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FN2024-000399
Judge:
Brooks, Robert
File Date:
1/26/2024
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Family Court Without Children
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Allegra Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Mark Lynch
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2025
Description
CDS - Consent Decree
Docket Date
2/4/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing
Filing Date
1/16/2025
Description
NOL - Notice of Lodging
Docket Date
1/22/2025
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
CONSENT DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITHOUT MINOR CHILDREN
Filing Date
10/2/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
10/2/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/2024
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
9/3/2024
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
OF CHANGE OF FIDUCIARYS CONTACT INFORMATION
Filing Date
8/27/2024
Description
NOS - Notice Of Settlement
Docket Date
9/4/2024
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
JOINT
Filing Date
8/22/2024
Description
OLP - Order Dismiss Lack Prosecution
Docket Date
8/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/29/2024
Description
NIC - Notice Of Placement Of The Case On Inactive Calendar And Of Intent To Dismiss Your Court Case
Docket Date
5/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2024
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
5/3/2024
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid
Filing Date
1/26/2024
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
1/31/2024
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
1/26/2024
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
1/31/2024
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
1/26/2024
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
1/31/2024
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
1/26/2024
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
1/31/2024
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
1/26/2024
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
1/31/2024
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
1/26/2024
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
1/31/2024
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file