« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FN2023-092095
Judge:
Jackson, Charlene
File Date:
7/12/2023
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Family Court Without Children
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
John Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Brem Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2023
Description
NWA - Notice Of Withdrawal Of Attorney
Docket Date
11/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel for Respondent
Filing Date
10/13/2023
Description
CDS - Consent Decree
Docket Date
10/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing
Filing Date
10/12/2023
Description
NOL - Notice of Lodging
Docket Date
10/16/2023
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
Notice of Lodging
Filing Date
10/12/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO VACATE RESOLUTION MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Filing Date
10/6/2023
Description
NOS - Notice Of Settlement
Docket Date
10/11/2023
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
Notice of Settlement and Request to Vacate Resolution Management Conference
Filing Date
8/24/2023
Description
700 - ME: Resolution Management Conference Set
Docket Date
8/24/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/2023
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
8/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to Petition for Dissolution of Marriage without Minor Children/EFILE BILLING $274.00
Filing Date
8/14/2023
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
8/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
8/1/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
8/2/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER
Filing Date
7/12/2023
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
7/13/2023
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
7/12/2023
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
7/13/2023
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
7/12/2023
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/13/2023
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
7/12/2023
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
7/13/2023
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
7/12/2023
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
7/13/2023
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
11/14/2023
Time
9:30
Event
Resolution Management Conference