« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FN2023-002074
Judge:
Guyton, Lauren
File Date:
5/16/2023
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Family Court Without Children
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Princess A Brown
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Tyrone Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/6/2023
Description
DFS - Default Decree
Docket Date
10/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing
Filing Date
8/22/2023
Description
MAD - Motion And Affidavit For Default Dissolution
Docket Date
8/24/2023
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/26/2023
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
7/3/2023
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/26/2023
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
7/5/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2023
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
5/17/2023
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/16/2023
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
5/17/2023
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/16/2023
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
5/17/2023
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/16/2023
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
5/17/2023
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/16/2023
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
5/17/2023
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file