« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FN2022-094016
Judge:
Gnepper, Gregory
File Date:
11/22/2022
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Family Court Without Children
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Tyrone Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Princess Ameerah Brown
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2023
Description
DDS - Decree Of Legal Separation
Docket Date
3/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Decree of Legal Separation
Filing Date
3/7/2023
Description
MAD - Motion And Affidavit For Default Dissolution
Docket Date
3/13/2023
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
Motion And Affidavit For Default Decree Without Hearing
Filing Date
2/9/2023
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
2/13/2023
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
APPLICATION AND AFFIDAVIT FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT IN FAMILY CASES
Filing Date
1/6/2023
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
1/6/2023
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
FAMILY DEPARTMENT ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE
Filing Date
11/22/2022
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
11/22/2022
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
Petition
Filing Date
11/22/2022
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
11/22/2022
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
Sensitive Data
Filing Date
11/22/2022
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
11/22/2022
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
Summons princess ameerah brown System Generated
Filing Date
11/22/2022
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
11/22/2022
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
Preliminary Injunction System Generated
Filing Date
11/22/2022
Description
NTC - Notice to Creditors
Docket Date
11/22/2022
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
Notice Regarding Creditors System Generated
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file