« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FN2021-090248
Judge:
Gnepper, Gregory
File Date:
1/25/2021
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Family Court Without Children
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Elizabeth Mary Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Michael Alvarez
Party Name
Delvin Ross Bingham
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Jennifer Walston
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2022
Description
NWA - Notice Of Withdrawal Of Attorney
Docket Date
4/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney of Record For Petitioner
Filing Date
4/6/2022
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED / AMENDING DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED 3/14/22
Filing Date
3/14/2022
Description
DDI - Decree Of Dissolution
Docket Date
3/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Decree of Dissolution
Filing Date
3/1/2022
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet
Docket Date
3/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2022
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
2/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/17/2022
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
2/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing Petitioner's Updated Affidavit of Financial Information
Filing Date
2/17/2022
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
2/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Pretrial Statement
Filing Date
9/27/2021
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/4/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE NOTICE OF CONFLICT AND MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL SET FOR JANUARTY 5 2022 AT 9AM
Filing Date
9/9/2021
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
9/10/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Conflict and Motion to Continue Trial Set for January 5, 2022 at 9:00 a.m.
Filing Date
8/31/2021
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting
Docket Date
8/31/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/2021
Description
MSE - Motion To Set & Cert/Readiness
Docket Date
8/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Set and Certificate of Readiness
Filing Date
5/10/2021
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
5/10/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2021
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
4/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Respondents Proposed Resolution Statement
Filing Date
4/28/2021
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
4/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Affidavit of Financial Information
Filing Date
4/26/2021
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
4/27/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Petitioners Proposed Resolution Statement
Filing Date
4/12/2021
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
4/15/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing Petitioners Affidavit of Financial Information
Filing Date
2/22/2021
Description
700 - ME: Resolution Management Conference Set
Docket Date
2/22/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2021
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
2/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance of Counsel
Filing Date
2/15/2021
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
2/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to Petition for Dissolution of Non-Covenant Marriage Without Minor Children/PD 274 REC 28130939
Filing Date
1/28/2021
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/1/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/2021
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
1/27/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/2021
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
1/27/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/2021
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
1/27/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/2021
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
1/27/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/2021
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
1/27/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/2021
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
1/27/2021
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
5/7/2021
Time
10:30
Event
Resolution Management Conference
Date
1/5/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial/Evidentiary Hearing
Date
2/24/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial/Evidentiary Hearing