« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FN2020-070433
Judge:
Garbarino, David
File Date:
2/24/2020
Location:
Northwest
Case Type:
Family Court Without Children
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Colleen Marie Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
William Wayde Viss
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2021
Description
NWA - Notice Of Withdrawal Of Attorney
Docket Date
8/19/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD
Filing Date
9/1/2020
Description
CDS - Consent Decree
Docket Date
9/3/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing
Filing Date
7/22/2020
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/23/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT
Filing Date
7/15/2020
Description
NOS - Notice Of Settlement
Docket Date
7/20/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Settlement
Filing Date
5/28/2020
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
5/28/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/26/2020
Description
ORA - Order To Appear
Docket Date
5/26/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Alternative Dispute Resolution
Filing Date
5/18/2020
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
5/19/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Respondents Proposed Resolution Management Statement
Filing Date
5/15/2020
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
5/18/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/15/2020
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
5/18/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
PROPOSED RESOLUTION
Filing Date
5/11/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
5/11/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/16/2020
Description
700 - ME: Resolution Management Conference Set
Docket Date
3/16/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/12/2020
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
3/12/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to Petition for Dissolution of Marriage without Children
Filing Date
3/12/2020
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
3/12/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid
Filing Date
3/9/2020
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
3/11/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
2/28/2020
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/4/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/2020
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
2/25/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/24/2020
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
2/25/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/24/2020
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/25/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/24/2020
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
2/25/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/24/2020
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
2/25/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
5/26/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Resolution Management Conference
Date
9/3/2020
Time
9:30
Event
Family Settlement Conference